Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2558 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 19421 Week
» 10477 Month
» 356901 Year
» 3383754 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #10590/29860
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60153 |
|
26/08/1949 |
A2 |
60527 |
SUN CHARIOT |
10/06/1955 |
A2 |
60531 |
BAHRAM |
05/09/1957 |
A2 |
60535 |
HORNET'S BEAUTY |
28/04/1959 |
A2 |
60527 |
SUN CHARIOT |
30/11/1960 |
A1 |
60151 |
MIDLOTHIAN |
02/11/1962 |
|