Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2138 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28172 Week
» 126817 Month
» 329481 Year
» 3356334 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #10597/29827
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60160 |
|
02/12/1949 |
A1 |
60137 |
REDGAUNTLET |
02/07/1954 |
A1 |
60152 |
HOLYROOD |
17/12/1955 |
A1 |
60143 |
SIR WALTER SCOTT |
20/07/1957 |
A1 |
60117 |
BOIS ROUSSEL |
07/01/1959 |
A1 |
60152 |
HOLYROOD |
13/12/1960 |
|