Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 914 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31564 Week
» 130209 Month
» 332873 Year
» 3359726 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #3300
Type |
LP Series 1 |
Company |
SR |
Water |
4,500gal |
Coal |
5t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
42t 12cwt |
Wheelbase |
6' 6" + 6' 6" = 13' 0" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C149 |
ANTI AIRCRAFT COMMAND |
09/12/1946 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34004 |
YEOVIL |
24/07/1948 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C155 |
FIGHTER PILOT |
07/01/1949 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C157 |
BIGGIN HILL |
05/05/1949 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34058 |
SIR FREDERICK PILE |
01/01/1951 |
|