Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 918 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3233 Week
» 31191 Month
» 65833 Year
» 1287398 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

116


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50092 20/04/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.90
50093 27/04/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.88
50094 04/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.86
50095 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.84
50096 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 07/10/1967 10.42 62.84
50097 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.82
50098 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.82
50099 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50100 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50101 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50102 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50103 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50104 29/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.70
50105 15/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.74
50106 08/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50107 08/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50108 17/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.57
50109 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50110 15/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.74
50111 22/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.72
50112 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50113 20/07/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.65
50114 03/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.61
50115 29/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.70
50116 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50117 10/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.59
50118 10/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.59
50119 17/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.57
50120 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50121 28/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.45
50122 05/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.44
50123 05/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.44
50124 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50125 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 31/08/1961 4 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/09/1961 4.07
50126 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50127 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50128 07/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.51
50129 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50130 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50131 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50132 21/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.47
50133 19/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.40
50871
50873
50874
50875
50876
50877
50878
50879
50880
50881
50882
50883
50884
50885
50886
50887
50888
50889
50890
50891
50892
50893
50894
50895
50896
50897
50898
50899
50900
50901
50902
50903
50904
50905
50906
50907
50908
50909
50910
50911
50912
50913
50914
50916
50917
50918
50919
50920
50921
50922
50923
51141 31/07/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.62
51142 31/08/1958 61.53
51143 31/08/1958 61.53
51144 31/08/1958 61.53
51145 31/08/1958 61.53
51146 31/08/1958 61.53
51147 30/09/1958 61.45
51148 30/09/1958 61.45
51149 30/09/1958 61.45
51151 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.36
51152 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.36
51153 30/11/1958 61.28