Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2011 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 13226 Week
» 4282 Month
» 350706 Year
» 3377559 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D241 |
26/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40041 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
26/10/1959 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
18/01/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 11/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements,poor condition,required for spares |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
26/10/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/10/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
18/04/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D241 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40041 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
18/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40041 |
|
|
06/03/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
11/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|