Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3500 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29534 Week
» 128179 Month
» 330843 Year
» 3357696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8038 |
17/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20038 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
17/10/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
15/08/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/10/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
15/08/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8038 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
02/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
15/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20038 |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
27/03/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20038 |
|
|
30/06/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|