Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4872 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35522 Week
» 134167 Month
» 336831 Year
» 3363684 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8204 |
17/04/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
17/04/1958 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/04/1958 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8204 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8204 |
|
|
04/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|