Manufacturer: Gateshead Works
Builder | Gateshead Works |
Order Date | 1901 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Q5 |
Information | NER Class T |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2116 | 10 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 08/1901 | 26/06/1948 | |
2117 | 11 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 09/1901 | 20/12/1950 | |
2118 | 12 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 10/1901 | 07/02/1948 | |
2119 | 13 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 10/1901 | 22/11/1948 | |
2120 | 14 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 10/1901 | 11/06/1948 | |
2121 | 15 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 10/1901 | 03/11/1949 | |
2122 | 16 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 11/1901 | 12/06/1950 | |
2123 | 17 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 12/1901 | 27/11/1950 | |
2124 | 18 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 12/1901 | 26/04/1947 | |
2125 | 19 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 12/1901 | 09/05/1951 |