Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 01/1935 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | K3 |
Information | Hyde Park Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2425 | 24225 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1935 | 04/11/1962 | |
2426 | 24226 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1935 | 04/05/1962 | |
2427 | 24227 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1935 | 31/07/1961 | |
2428 | 24228 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1935 | 16/09/1962 | |
2438 | 24229 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1935 | 09/1962 | |
2439 | 24230 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1935 | 16/09/1962 | |
2440 | 24231 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1935 | 26/02/1962 | |
2442 | 24232 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1935 | 14/06/1962 | |
2443 | 24233 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1935 | 01/08/1962 | |
2447 | 24234 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1935 | 28/03/1962 | |
2448 | 24235 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1935 | 10/04/1962 | |
2449 | 24236 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1935 | 04/11/1962 | |
2450 | 24237 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1935 | 04/11/1962 | |
2451 | 24238 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1935 | 06/12/1962 | |
2459 | 24239 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1935 | 14/03/1962 | |
2461 | 24240 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1935 | 16/09/1962 | |
2463 | 24241 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1935 | 27/05/1960 | |
2466 | 24242 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1935 | 16/09/1962 | |
2467 | 24243 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1935 | 16/09/1962 | |
2468 | 24244 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1935 | 31/05/1962 |