GWR Collett "4900" Class 4-6-0
GWR | GWR (Hall Rbld) | GWR (Oil Burner) | GWR (Ex-Oil) | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Mileage | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2925 | 4900 | 17/09/1907 | 12/1924 from 2900 |
Newton Abbot | 03/04/1959 | 51.58 | ||||||||
4901 | 12/1928 | 16/09/1960 | 31.75 | 32.02 | ||||||||||
4902 | 12/1928 | 17/09/1963 | 34.75 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 05/1964 | 35.44 | |||||||
4903 | 12/1928 | 09/10/1964 | 35.83 | 36.36 | ||||||||||
4904 | 12/1928 | 28/12/1963 | 35 | 35.52 | ||||||||||
4905 | 12/1928 | 13/11/1963 | 34.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1964 | 35.52 | |||||||
4906 | 01/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1963 | 34.77 | |||||||
4907 | 3903 | 4907 | 01/1929 | 01/08/1963 | 34.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1964 | 35.02 | |||||
4908 | 01/1929 | 22/10/1963 | 34.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1964 | 35.35 | |||||||
4909 | 01/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1964 | 35.27 | |||||||
4910 | 01/1929 | 02/12/1963 | 34.92 | 35.27 | ||||||||||
4911 | 02/1929 | 06/1941 | 12.33 | |||||||||||
4912 | 02/1929 | 24/08/1962 | 33.5 | 33.77 | ||||||||||
4913 | 02/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.58 | 35.19 | ||||||||||
4914 | 02/1929 | 02/12/1963 | 34.83 | 35.19 | ||||||||||
4915 | 02/1929 | 26/02/1963 | 34 | 34.18 | ||||||||||
4916 | 02/1929 | 10/08/1964 | 35.5 | 35.85 | ||||||||||
4917 | 03/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1964 | 35.28 | |||||||
4918 | 03/1929 | 24/06/1963 | 34.25 | 35.02 | ||||||||||
4919 | 03/1929 | 09/10/1964 | 35.58 | 35.95 | ||||||||||
4920 | 03/1929 | 03/12/1965 | 36.75 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
4921 | 04/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.42 | 34.86 | ||||||||||
4922 | 04/1929 | 04/07/1963 | 34.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1964 | 34.78 | |||||||
4923 | 04/1929 | 30/05/1964 | 35.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1964 | 35.36 | |||||||
4924 | 05/1929 | 03/10/1963 | 34.42 | 35.11 | ||||||||||
4925 | 05/1929 | 07/08/1962 | 33.25 | 33.27 | ||||||||||
4926 | 05/1929 | 25/09/1961 | 32.33 | 32.44 | ||||||||||
4927 | 05/1929 | 23/09/1963 | 34.33 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 01/1964 | 34.69 | |||||||
4928 | 05/1929 | 02/12/1963 | 34.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1965 | 35.70 | |||||||
4929 | 05/1929 | 19/03/1965 | 35.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1965 | 36.19 | |||||||
4930 | 05/1929 | 02/12/1963 | 34.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
4931 | 05/1929 | 13/07/1962 | 33.17 | 33.53 | ||||||||||
4932 | 06/1929 | 06/11/1964 | 35.42 | 35.86 | ||||||||||
4933 | 06/1929 | 15/08/1964 | 35.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1964 | 35.36 | |||||||
4934 | 06/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1964 | 35.11 | |||||||
4935 | 06/1929 | 22/03/1963 | 33.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1964 | 34.61 | |||||||
4936 | 06/1929 | 15/01/1964 | 34.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
4937 | 06/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.25 | 33.27 | ||||||||||
4938 | 06/1929 | 26/11/1962 | 33.42 | 33.69 | ||||||||||
4939 | 07/1929 | 11/02/1963 | 33.58 | 33.77 | ||||||||||
4940 | 07/1929 | 09/11/1959 | 30.33 | 30.44 | ||||||||||
4941 | 07/1929 | 22/10/1962 | 33.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1964 | 34.94 | |||||||
4942 | 07/1929 | 28/12/1963 | 34.42 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
4943 | 07/1929 | 16/12/1963 | 34.42 | 34.69 | ||||||||||
4944 | 07/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.17 | 34.53 | ||||||||||
4945 | 08/1929 | 03/11/1961 | 32.25 | 32.36 | ||||||||||
4946 | 08/1929 | 24/06/1963 | 33.83 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 04/1964 | 34.69 | |||||||
4947 | 08/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.08 | 34.61 | ||||||||||
4948 | 3902 | 4948 | 08/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1964 | 34.69 | |||||
4949 | 08/1929 | 01/09/1964 | 35.08 | 35.44 | ||||||||||
4950 | 08/1929 | 06/05/1964 | 34.75 | 35.02 | ||||||||||
4951 | 07/1929 | 25/06/1964 | 34.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1964 | 35.44 | |||||||
4952 | 08/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.08 | 34.44 | ||||||||||
4953 | 08/1929 | 02/05/1963 | 33.75 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
4954 | 08/1929 | 14/11/1964 | 35.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1964 | 35.36 | |||||||
4955 | 08/1929 | 21/10/1963 | 34.17 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 04/1964 | 34.69 | |||||||
4956 | 09/1929 | 04/07/1963 | 33.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1964 | 34.77 | |||||||
4957 | 09/1929 | 30/03/1962 | 32.5 | 32.77 | ||||||||||
4958 | 09/1929 | 21/09/1964 | 35 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1965 | 35.36 | |||||||
4959 | 09/1929 | 26/12/1964 | 35.25 | 35.61 | ||||||||||
4960 | 09/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1963 | 34.02 | |||||||
4961 | 11/1929 | 05/11/1962 | 33 | 33.27 | ||||||||||
4962 | 11/1929 | 01/10/1965 | 35.92 | 36.35 | ||||||||||
4963 | 11/1929 | 05/06/1962 | 32.58 | 32.85 | ||||||||||
4964 | 11/1929 | 15/10/1963 | 33.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1964 | 34.77 | |||||||
4965 | 11/1929 | 26/03/1962 | 32.33 | 32.44 | ||||||||||
4966 | 11/1929 | 01/11/1963 | 34 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1964 | 34.44 | |||||||
4967 | 12/1929 | 13/09/1962 | 32.75 | 33.94 | ||||||||||
4968 | 3900 | 4968 | 12/1929 | 13/07/1962 | 32.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1962 | 32.94 | |||||
4969 | 12/1929 | 13/09/1962 | 32.75 | 32.77 | ||||||||||
4970 | 12/1929 | 29/07/1963 | 33.58 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 01/1964 | 34.11 | |||||||
4971 | 3901 | 4971 | 01/1930 | 13/08/1962 | 32.58 | 34.02 | ||||||||
4972 | 3904 | 4972 | 01/1930 | 14/02/1964 | 34.08 | 34.52 | ||||||||
4973 | 01/1930 | 13/07/1962 | 32.5 | 32.85 | ||||||||||
4974 | 01/1930 | 13/04/1962 | 32.25 | 32.69 | ||||||||||
4975 | 01/1930 | 30/09/1963 | 33.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1964 | 34.52 | |||||||
4976 | 01/1930 | 06/05/1964 | 34.33 | 34.52 | ||||||||||
4977 | 01/1930 | 10/05/1962 | 32.33 | 32.44 | ||||||||||
4978 | 02/1930 | 21/09/1964 | 34.58 | 34.85 | ||||||||||
4979 | 02/1930 | 28/12/1963 | 33.83 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
4980 | 02/1930 | 04/07/1963 | 33.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1964 | 34.35 | |||||||
4981 | 12/1930 | 03/10/1963 | 32.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1964 | 33.61 | |||||||
4982 | 01/1931 | 11/05/1962 | 31.33 | 31.52 | ||||||||||
4983 | 01/1931 | 28/12/1963 | 32.92 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
4984 | 01/1931 | 21/09/1962 | 31.67 | 33.19 | ||||||||||
4985 | 01/1931 | 28/09/1964 | 33.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1965 | 34.02 | |||||||
4986 | 01/1931 | 11/05/1962 | 31.33 | 31.85 | ||||||||||
4987 | 01/1931 | 09/04/1962 | 31.25 | 33.11 | ||||||||||
4988 | 01/1931 | 14/02/1964 | 33.08 | 33.19 | ||||||||||
4989 | 02/1931 | 06/11/1964 | 33.75 | 34.10 | ||||||||||
4990 | 02/1931 | 05/04/1962 | 31.17 | 31.35 | ||||||||||
4991 | 02/1931 | 28/12/1963 | 32.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1964 | 33.35 | |||||||
4992 | 02/1931 | 30/04/1965 | 34.17 | 34.52 | ||||||||||
4993 | 02/1931 | 06/02/1965 | 34 | 34.19 | ||||||||||
4994 | 02/1931 | 15/03/1963 | 32.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1964 | 32.94 | |||||||
4995 | 02/1931 | 08/06/1962 | 31.33 | 31.52 | ||||||||||
4996 | 03/1931 | 30/09/1963 | 32.5 | 33.28 | ||||||||||
4997 | 03/1931 | 30/10/1961 | 30.58 | 30.61 | ||||||||||
4998 | 03/1931 | 22/10/1963 | 32.58 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 05/1964 | 33.19 | |||||||
4999 | 03/1931 | 21/09/1962 | 31.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1963 | 32.53 | |||||||
5900 | 03/1931 | 02/12/1963 | 32.75 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
5901 | 05/1931 | 25/06/1964 | 33.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1964 | 33.61 | |||||||
5902 | 05/1931 | 13/11/1962 | 31.5 | 31.61 | ||||||||||
5903 | 05/1931 | 10/09/1963 | 32.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1964 | 33.44 | |||||||
5904 | 05/1931 | 13/11/1963 | 32.5 | 33.19 | ||||||||||
5905 | 05/1931 | 29/07/1963 | 32.17 | 33.11 | ||||||||||
5906 | 05/1931 | 25/05/1962 | 31 | 31.53 | ||||||||||
5907 | 05/1931 | 03/11/1961 | 30.5 | 30.53 | ||||||||||
5908 | 06/1931 | 29/07/1963 | 32.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1964 | 33.11 | |||||||
5909 | 06/1931 | 30/07/1962 | 31.08 | 31.44 | ||||||||||
5910 | 06/1931 | 21/09/1962 | 31.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1963 | 32.52 | |||||||
5911 | 06/1931 | 21/09/1962 | 31.25 | 32.44 | ||||||||||
5912 | 06/1931 | 18/12/1962 | 31.5 | 32.27 | ||||||||||
5913 | 06/1931 | 14/05/1962 | 30.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1962 | 31.36 | |||||||
5914 | 07/1931 | 22/01/1964 | 32.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1964 | 32.94 | |||||||
5915 | 07/1931 | 13/01/1960 | 28.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1960 | 28.77 | |||||||
5916 | 07/1931 | 13/07/1962 | 31 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1962 | 31.27 | |||||||
5917 | 07/1931 | 21/09/1962 | 31.17 | 32.53 | ||||||||||
5918 | 07/1931 | 21/09/1962 | 31.17 | 32.53 | ||||||||||
5919 | 07/1931 | 26/08/1963 | 32.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1964 | 33.02 | |||||||
5920 | 08/1931 | 18/01/1962 | 30.42 | 30.44 | ||||||||||
5921 | 11/05/1933 | 08/01/1962 | 28.67 | 28.79 | ||||||||||
5922 | 16/05/1933 | 06/01/1964 | 30.67 | 30.77 | ||||||||||
5923 | 22/05/1933 | 02/12/1963 | 30.58 | 31.00 | ||||||||||
5924 | 27/05/1933 | 28/12/1963 | 30.58 | 30.99 | ||||||||||
5925 | 27/05/1933 | 15/10/1962 | 29.42 | 29.49 | ||||||||||
5926 | 01/06/1933 | 21/09/1962 | 29.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1963 | 30.56 | |||||||
5927 | 02/06/1933 | 24/10/1964 | 31.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1965 | 31.64 | |||||||
5928 | 08/06/1933 | 11/05/1962 | 28.92 | 29.21 | ||||||||||
5929 | 12/06/1933 | 28/10/1963 | 30.33 | 30.70 | ||||||||||
5930 | 14/06/1933 | 21/09/1962 | 29.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1964 | 30.61 | |||||||
5931 | 21/06/1933 | 21/09/1962 | 29.25 | 30.17 | ||||||||||
5932 | 23/06/1933 | 26/10/1965 | 32.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1966 | 32.59 | |||||||
5933 | 28/06/1933 | 06/08/1965 | 32.17 | 32.41 | ||||||||||
5934 | 28/06/1933 | 06/05/1964 | 30.92 | 31.15 | ||||||||||
5935 | 05/07/1933 | 15/05/1962 | 28.83 | 31.05 | ||||||||||
5936 | 07/07/1933 | 15/01/1965 | 31.5 | 31.63 | ||||||||||
5937 | 10/07/1933 | 13/11/1963 | 30.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1964 | 31.04 | |||||||
5938 | 13/07/1933 | 03/05/1963 | 29.83 | 30.19 | ||||||||||
5939 | 31/07/1933 | 23/10/1964 | 31.25 | 31.48 | ||||||||||
5940 | 01/08/1933 | 21/09/1962 | 29.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1963 | 30.14 | |||||||
5941 | 20/02/1935 | 13/07/1962 | 27.42 | 27.59 | ||||||||||
5942 | 28/02/1935 | 02/12/1963 | 28.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1964 | 29.32 | |||||||
5943 | 05/03/1935 | 24/06/1963 | 28.25 | 29.30 | ||||||||||
5944 | 12/03/1935 | 08/04/1963 | 28.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1964 | 29.28 | |||||||
5945 | 21/03/1935 | 08/04/1963 | 28.08 | 28.42 | ||||||||||
5946 | 20/03/1935 | 10/07/1962 | 27.33 | 27.68 | ||||||||||
5947 | 25/03/1935 | 13/07/1962 | 27.33 | 27.50 | ||||||||||
5948 | 28/05/1935 | 26/08/1963 | 28.25 | 28.74 | ||||||||||
5949 | 03/04/1935 | 30/05/1961 | 26.08 | 26.47 | ||||||||||
5950 | 11/04/1935 | 17/11/1961 | 26.58 | 26.70 | ||||||||||
5951 | 05/12/1935 | 20/04/1964 | 28.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 08/1964 | 28.72 | |||||||
5952 | 07/12/1935 | 15/06/1964 | 28.5 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
5953 | 11/12/1935 | 15/10/1962 | 26.83 | 27.03 | ||||||||||
5954 | 12/12/1935 | 10/10/1963 | 27.83 | 28.61 | ||||||||||
5955 | 3950 | 5955 | 14/12/1935 | 30/04/1965 | 29.33 | 29.69 | ||||||||
5956 | 18/12/1935 | 15/03/1963 | 27.25 | 27.42 | ||||||||||
5957 | 20/12/1935 | 06/07/1964 | 28.58 | 29.01 | ||||||||||
5958 | 01/01/1936 | 10/03/1964 | 28.17 | 28.56 | ||||||||||
5959 | 03/01/1936 | 21/09/1962 | 26.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1963 | 27.88 | |||||||
5960 | 09/01/1936 | 21/09/1962 | 26.67 | 26.95 | ||||||||||
5961 | 26/06/1936 | 06/08/1965 | 29.17 | 29.32 | ||||||||||
5962 | 02/07/1936 | 27/11/1964 | 28.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1965 | 28.72 | |||||||
5963 | 07/07/1936 | 08/06/1964 | 27.92 | 28.46 | ||||||||||
5964 | 23/07/1936 | 21/09/1962 | 26.17 | 26.33 | ||||||||||
5965 | 01/08/1936 | 13/07/1962 | 25.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1962 | 26.14 | |||||||
5966 | 20/03/1937 | 21/09/1962 | 25.5 | 26.76 | ||||||||||
5967 | 23/03/1937 | 01/06/1964 | 27.25 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
5968 | 25/03/1937 | 27/09/1962 | 25.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1964 | 27.08 | |||||||
5969 | 02/04/1937 | 29/08/1962 | 25.33 | 25.55 | ||||||||||
5970 | 07/04/1937 | 11/11/1963 | 26.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1964 | 27.04 | |||||||
5971 | 17/04/1937 | 31/12/1965 | 28.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1966 | 29.18 | |||||||
5972 | 22/04/1937 | 28/12/1963 | 26.67 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||||
5973 | 01/05/1937 | 21/09/1962 | 25.33 | 25.56 | ||||||||||
5974 | 30/04/1937 | 26/12/1964 | 27.67 | 27.89 | ||||||||||
5975 | 26/05/1937 | 24/07/1964 | 27.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1964 | 27.58 | |||||||
5976 | 3951 | 5976 | 01/09/1938 | 24/07/1964 | 25.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1964 | 26.31 | |||||
5977 | 02/09/1938 | 19/08/1963 | 24.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1964 | 25.88 | |||||||
5978 | 05/09/1938 | 21/10/1963 | 25.08 | 25.71 | ||||||||||
5979 | 08/09/1938 | 06/11/1964 | 26.17 | 26.62 | ||||||||||
5980 | 18/09/1938 | 21/09/1962 | 24 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1964 | 25.59 | |||||||
5981 | 03/10/1938 | 21/09/1962 | 23.92 | 25.13 | ||||||||||
5982 | 05/10/1938 | 01/09/1962 | 23.92 | 25.30 | ||||||||||
5983 | 12/10/1938 | 10/04/1965 | 26.5 | 26.95 | ||||||||||
5984 | 14/10/1938 | 15/01/1965 | 26.25 | 26.52 | ||||||||||
5985 | 18/10/1938 | 13/09/1963 | 24.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1964 | 25.68 | |||||||
5986 | 3954 | 5986 | 21/11/1939 | 10/09/1963 | 23.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1965 | 25.75 | |||||
5987 | 23/11/1939 | 15/01/1964 | 24.17 | 24.75 | ||||||||||
5988 | 28/11/1939 | 09/10/1965 | 25.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 26.07 | |||||||
5989 | 05/12/1939 | 13/07/1962 | 22.58 | 23.21 | ||||||||||
5990 | 06/12/1939 | 16/01/1965 | 25.08 | 25.54 | ||||||||||
5991 | 14/12/1939 | 18/07/1964 | 24.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1964 | 24.85 | |||||||
5992 | 18/12/1939 | 06/08/1965 | 25.67 | 25.84 | ||||||||||
5993 | 22/12/1939 | 13/05/1963 | 23.42 | 23.66 | ||||||||||
5994 | 29/12/1939 | 07/03/1963 | 23.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1964 | 24.23 | |||||||
5995 | 04/01/1940 | 25/04/1963 | 23.25 | 23.46 | ||||||||||
5996 | 03/06/1940 | 27/08/1962 | 22.17 | 22.38 | ||||||||||
5997 | 07/06/1940 | 24/07/1962 | 22.08 | 22.37 | ||||||||||
5998 | 12/06/1940 | 17/03/1964 | 23.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1964 | 24.02 | |||||||
5999 | 14/06/1940 | 21/09/1962 | 22.25 | 22.44 | ||||||||||
6900 | 22/06/1940 | 23/10/1964 | 24.33 | 24.67 | ||||||||||
6901 | 01/07/1940 | 15/06/1964 | 23.92 | 24.31 | ||||||||||
6902 | 04/07/1940 | 01/05/1961 | 20.83 | 20.88 | ||||||||||
6903 | 10/07/1940 | 18/09/1965 | 25.17 | 25.53 | ||||||||||
6904 | 13/07/1940 | 23/01/1965 | 24.5 | 24.85 | ||||||||||
6905 | 20/07/1940 | 08/06/1964 | 23.92 | 24.25 | ||||||||||
6906 | 08/11/1940 | 03/04/1965 | 24.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1965 | 24.62 | |||||||
6907 | 09/11/1940 | 06/02/1965 | 24.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1965 | 24.53 | |||||||
6908 | 20/11/1940 | 21/07/1965 | 24.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1965 | 24.92 | |||||||
6909 | 27/11/1940 | 25/06/1964 | 23.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1964 | 24.07 | |||||||
6910 | 10/12/1940 | 01/10/1965 | 24.83 | 25.20 | ||||||||||
6911 | 10/01/1941 | 24/04/1965 | 24.25 | 24.86 | ||||||||||
6912 | 30/01/1941 | 14/02/1964 | 23.08 | 23.47 | ||||||||||
6913 | 07/02/1941 | 25/06/1964 | 23.33 | 23.87 | ||||||||||
6914 | 11/02/1941 | 01/04/1964 | 23.17 | 23.44 | ||||||||||
6915 | 15/02/1941 | 13/02/1965 | 24 | 24.35 | ||||||||||
6916 | 11/06/1941 | 14/08/1965 | 24.17 | 24.70 | ||||||||||
6917 | 14/06/1941 | 25/09/1965 | 24.25 | 24.61 | ||||||||||
6918 | 18/06/1941 | 10/09/1965 | 24.25 | 24.51 | ||||||||||
6919 | 21/06/1941 | 26/08/1963 | 22.17 | 22.33 | ||||||||||
6920 | 03/07/1941 | 02/12/1963 | 22.42 | 22.64 | ||||||||||
6921 | 11/07/1941 | 26/10/1965 | 24.25 | 24.62 | ||||||||||
6922 | 19/07/1941 | 01/05/1965 | 23.83 | 24.34 | ||||||||||
6923 | 24/07/1941 | 31/12/1965 | 24.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1966 | 24.82 | |||||||
6924 | 05/08/1941 | 26/10/1965 | 24.17 | 24.55 | ||||||||||
6925 | 09/08/1941 | 21/11/1964 | 23.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1965 | 23.54 | |||||||
6926 | 11/11/1941 | 29/05/1965 | 23.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1965 | 23.86 | |||||||
6927 | 15/11/1941 | 01/10/1965 | 23.92 | 24.27 | ||||||||||
6928 | 22/11/1941 | 16/06/1965 | 23.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1965 | 23.91 | |||||||
6929 | 28/11/1941 | 28/10/1963 | 21.92 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 05/1964 | 22.48 | |||||||
6930 | 29/11/1941 | 16/10/1965 | 23.92 | 24.23 | ||||||||||
6931 | 06/12/1941 | 01/10/1965 | 23.83 | 24.21 | ||||||||||
6932 | 11/12/1941 | 31/12/1965 | 24 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1966 | 24.53 | |||||||
6933 | 15/12/1941 | 14/11/1964 | 22.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1964 | 23.02 | |||||||
6934 | 20/12/1941 | 09/10/1965 | 23.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1966 | 24.09 | |||||||
6935 | 20/12/1941 | 06/02/1965 | 23.17 | 23.33 | ||||||||||
6936 | 11/07/1942 | 13/11/1964 | 22.33 | 22.62 | ||||||||||
6937 | 11/07/1942 | 31/12/1965 | 23.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1966 | 23.78 | |||||||
6938 | 22/07/1942 | 19/03/1965 | 22.67 | 23.33 | ||||||||||
6939 | 27/07/1942 | 28/10/1963 | 21.25 | 21.65 | ||||||||||
6940 | 07/08/1942 | 06/05/1964 | 21.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1964 | 21.95 | |||||||
6941 | 15/08/1942 | 24/04/1964 | 21.67 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 09/1964 | 22.10 | |||||||
6942 | 22/08/1942 | 14/12/1964 | 22.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1965 | 22.66 | |||||||
6943 | 26/08/1942 | 28/12/1963 | 21.33 | 21.57 | ||||||||||
6944 | 03/09/1942 | 18/11/1965 | 23.17 | 23.47 | ||||||||||
6945 | 08/09/1942 | 01/09/1964 | 22 | 22.20 | ||||||||||
6946 | 05/12/1942 | 15/06/1964 | 21.5 | 21.88 | ||||||||||
6947 | 07/12/1942 | 18/11/1965 | 22.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1966 | 23.37 | |||||||
6948 | 11/12/1942 | 02/12/1963 | 21 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1964 | 21.53 | |||||||
6949 | 3955 | 6949 | 16/12/1942 | 12/05/1961 | 18.42 | 18.51 | ||||||||
6950 | 23/12/1942 | 25/06/1964 | 21.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1964 | 21.99 | |||||||
6951 | 08/02/1943 | 25/12/1965 | 22.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1966 | 23.20 | |||||||
6952 | 22/02/1943 | 25/12/1965 | 22.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1966 | 23.16 | |||||||
6953 | 3953 | 6953 | 27/02/1943 | 31/12/1965 | 22.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1966 | 23.23 | |||||
6954 | 02/03/1943 | 14/05/1964 | 21.17 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 11/1964 | 21.72 | |||||||
6955 | 14/03/1943 | 06/02/1965 | 21.92 | 21.94 | ||||||||||
6956 | 28/03/1943 | 31/12/1965 | 22.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1966 | 23.23 | |||||||
6957 | 3952 | 6957 | 01/04/1943 | 26/10/1965 | 22.5 | 22.89 | ||||||||
6958 | 08/04/1943 | 16/06/1965 | 22.17 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 10/1965 | 22.54 |