Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 88 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 26122 Week
» 124767 Month
» 327431 Year
» 3354284 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7617
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HC |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7024 |
POWIS CASTLE |
30/06/1949 |
Castle |
7019 |
FOWEY CASTLE |
12/04/1951 |
Castle |
5018 |
ST MAWES CASTLE |
10/05/1957 |
Castle |
7011 |
BANBURY CASTLE |
22/11/1962 |
|