Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 129 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 16992 Week
» 8048 Month
» 354472 Year
» 3381325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
SR Billinton "E2" Class 0-6-0T
SR (1931) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
2100
|
32100
|
06/1913 |
|
11/11/1961 |
|
48.42 |
|
|
|
48.62 |
2101
|
32101
|
08/1913 |
|
15/09/1962 |
|
49.08 |
|
|
|
49.12 |
2102
|
32102
|
10/1913 |
|
07/10/1961 |
|
48 |
|
|
|
48.03 |
2103
|
32103
|
12/1913 |
|
06/10/1962 |
|
48.83 |
|
|
|
48.87 |
2104
|
32104
|
01/1914 |
|
28/04/1963 |
|
49.25 |
|
|
|
49.36 |
2105
|
32105
|
08/1915 |
|
15/09/1962 |
|
47.08 |
|
|
|
47.20 |
2106
|
32106
|
09/1915 |
|
06/10/1962 |
|
47.08 |
|
|
|
47.12 |
2107
|
32107
|
03/1916 |
|
25/02/1961 |
|
44.92 |
|
|
|
45.03 |
2108
|
32108
|
07/1916 |
|
06/1961 |
|
44.92 |
|
|
|
45.03 |
2109
|
32109
|
10/1916 |
|
28/04/1963 |
|
46.5 |
|
|
|
46.53 |