Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1113 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31763 Week
» 130408 Month
» 333072 Year
» 3359925 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5850 |
18/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31316 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31446 |
29/06/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31546 |
30/04/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
18/07/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 01/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/07/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 07/1975 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Not known |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5850 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31316 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
29/06/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31446 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
30/04/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31546 |
|
|
01/11/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31546 |
|
|
04/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|