Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4167 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34817 Week
» 133462 Month
» 336126 Year
» 3362979 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8013 |
26/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20013 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
26/11/1957 to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
Withdrawn |
13/12/1991 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs , 17 dys |
Cut Up |
on 29/09/1993 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
26/11/1957 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/11/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8013 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20013 |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
20/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Wigston (WG) |
|
|
13/12/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20013 |
|
|
29/09/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|