09/1907 |
Condemned |
2057 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1911 |
Condemned |
2128 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2023 |
|
|
SDN |
Swindon |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2039 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2050 |
|
|
PZ |
Penzance |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2059 |
|
|
NEATH |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2081 |
|
|
LLY.2 |
Llanelli & Mynydd Mawr (Sandy) |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2102 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2103 |
|
|
TN |
Taunton |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2116 |
|
|
LA |
Laira |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2039 |
LYD |
Lydney |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2096 |
|
|
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2114 |
|
|
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2133 |
|
|
WES |
Westbury |
|
11/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
2088 |
|
|
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
11/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
2102 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
11/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
2115 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
11/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
2142 |
|
|
AYN |
Abercynon |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2038 |
|
|
TN |
Taunton |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2102 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2155 |
|
|
HFD |
Hereford |
|
09/1938 |
Condemned |
2028 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1939 |
Condemned |
2036 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1939 |
Condemned |
2024 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/11/1944 |
Condemned |
2049 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/12/1944 |
Condemned |
2078 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
24/02/1945 |
Condemned |
2139 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
17/09/1945 |
Condemned |
2058 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/11/1945 |
Condemned |
2158 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/12/1945 |
Reallocation |
2140 |
|
|
18 |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
26/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
2052 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
26/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
2107 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
06/02/1946 |
Condemned |
2116 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
16/02/1946 |
Condemned |
2084 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
23/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
2022 |
|
|
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
23/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
2099 |
|
|
HFD |
Hereford |
|
23/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
2102 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
23/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
2107 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
23/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
2146 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
26/03/1946 |
Condemned |
2103 |
TN |
Taunton |
|
COND |
|
18/05/1946 |
Reallocation |
2030 |
|
|
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
18/05/1946 |
Reallocation |
2097 |
153 |
|
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
15/08/1946 |
Condemned |
2119 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/09/1946 |
Condemned |
2120 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
14/02/1947 |
Condemned |
2142 |
AYN |
Abercynon |
|
COND |
|
28/02/1947 |
Condemned |
2077 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
31/03/1947 |
Condemned |
2041 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2021 |
|
|
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2022 |
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2023 |
SDN |
Swindon |
WES |
Westbury |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2025 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2026 |
|
|
HFD |
Hereford |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2027 |
|
|
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2029 |
|
|
HFD |
Hereford |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2030 |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
WLN |
Wellington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2031 |
|
|
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2032 |
|
|
OSY |
Oswestry |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2033 |
|
|
PILL |
Newport Pill |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2034 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2035 |
|
|
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2037 |
|
|
WOS |
Worcester |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2038 |
TN |
Taunton |
TN |
Taunton |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2039 |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2040 |
|
|
HFD |
Hereford |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2042 |
|
|
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2043 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2044 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2045 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2047 |
|
|
CARM |
Carmarthen |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2048 |
|
|
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2050 |
PZ |
Penzance |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2051 |
|
|
WOS |
Worcester |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2052 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2053 |
|
|
WES |
Westbury |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2054 |
|
|
OSY |
Oswestry |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2055 |
|
|
SLO |
Slough |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2056 |
|
|
CARM |
Carmarthen |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2059 |
NEATH |
Neath (Court Sart) |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2060 |
|
|
SDN |
Swindon |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2061 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2063 |
|
|
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2064 |
|
|
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2065 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2066 |
|
|
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2067 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2068 |
|
|
OSY |
Oswestry |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2069 |
|
|
CARM |
Carmarthen |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2070 |
|
|
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2071 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2072 |
|
|
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2073 |
|
|
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2183 |
|
|
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2075 |
|
|
OSY |
Oswestry |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2076 |
|
|
RDGw |
Reading (W.R.) |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2079 |
|
|
DYD |
Duffryn Yard |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2080 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2081 |
LLY.2 |
Llanelli & Mynydd Mawr (Sandy) |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2082 |
|
|
DG |
Danygraig |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2083 |
|
|
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2085 |
|
|
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2086 |
|
|
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2188 |
|
|
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2088 |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
EXE |
Exeter |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2089 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2090 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2091 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2092 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2093 |
|
|
KDR |
Kidderminster |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2094 |
|
|
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2095 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2096 |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2097 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2098 |
|
|
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2099 |
HFD |
Hereford |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2100 |
|
|
WOS |
Worcester |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2101 |
|
|
WOS |
Worcester |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2102 |
HFD |
Hereford |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2104 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2189 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2106 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2107 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2108 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2109 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2110 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2111 |
|
|
CARM |
Carmarthen |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2112 |
|
|
SLO |
Slough |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2113 |
|
|
PILL |
Newport Pill |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2114 |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2115 |
LYD |
Lydney |
WOS |
Worcester |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2117 |
|
|
ABDR |
Aberdare |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2186 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2121 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2122 |
|
|
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2123 |
|
|
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2124 |
|
|
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2182 |
|
|
SBZ |
St Blazey |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2127 |
|
|
TN |
Taunton |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2129 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2130 |
|
|
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2131 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2132 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2181 |
WES |
Westbury |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2134 |
|
|
DG |
Danygraig |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2135 |
|
|
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2136 |
|
|
PILL |
Newport Pill |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2137 |
|
|
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2138 |
|
|
HFD |
Hereford |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2140 |
18 |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
AYN |
Abercynon |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2141 |
|
|
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2187 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2144 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2184 |
|
|
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2146 |
LYD |
Lydney |
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2147 |
|
|
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2148 |
|
|
PZ |
Penzance |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2185 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2150 |
|
|
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2151 |
|
|
MCH |
Machynlleth |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2152 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2153 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2154 |
|
|
PILL |
Newport Pill |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2155 |
175 |
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2156 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2190 |
|
|
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2159 |
|
|
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
2160 |
|
|
LYD |
Lydney |
|
16/06/1947 |
Condemned |
2046 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
2096 |
HFD |
Hereford |
LYD |
Lydney |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
2160 |
LYD |
Lydney |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
31/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
2050 |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
PZ |
Penzance |
|
31/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
2051 |
WOS |
Worcester |
KDR |
Kidderminster |
|
31/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
2181 |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
PZ |
Penzance |
|
30/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
2045 |
LYD |
Lydney |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
30/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
2071 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
30/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
2076 |
RDGw |
Reading (W.R.) |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
30/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
2081 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
30/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
2085 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
LDR |
Landore |
|
30/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
2093 |
KDR |
Kidderminster |
WOS |
Worcester |
|
31/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
2045 |
HFD |
Hereford |
LYD |
Lydney |
|
31/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
2059 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
LDR |
Landore |
|
31/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
2085 |
LDR |
Landore |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
30/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2181 |
PZ |
Penzance |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2050 |
PZ |
Penzance |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2081 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
LDR |
Landore |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2102 |
HFD |
Hereford |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
07/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
2042 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
LDR |
Landore |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
2082 |
DG |
Danygraig |
LDR |
Landore |
|
14/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
2082 |
LDR |
Landore |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
30/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
2029 |
HFD |
Hereford |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
30/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
2042 |
LDR |
Landore |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
2027 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
2029 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
2065 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
2081 |
LDR |
Landore |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
2126 |
|
|
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
29/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
2152 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
26/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
2065 |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
2076 |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
SHL |
Southall |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
2140 |
AYN |
Abercynon |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
2156 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
23/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
2027 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
23/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
2029 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
23/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
2156 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
2055 |
SLO |
Slough |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
30/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
2055 |
DG |
Danygraig |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
2151 |
MCH |
Machynlleth |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
10/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
2140 |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
2067 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
WLN |
Wellington |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
2115 |
WOS |
Worcester |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
07/11/1949 |
Condemned |
2059 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
23/11/1949 |
Condemned |
2064 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
25/11/1949 |
Condemned |
2029 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
28/11/1949 |
Condemned |
2102 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
29/11/1949 |
Condemned |
2065 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
06/12/1949 |
Condemned |
2022 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
12/12/1949 |
Condemned |
2137 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/12/1949 |
Condemned |
2047 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
23/12/1949 |
Condemned |
2114 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/12/1949 |
Condemned |
2045 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
2067 |
WLN |
Wellington |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
2076 |
SHL |
Southall |
SLO |
Slough |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
2109 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
2097 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
TR |
Truro |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
2117 |
ABDR |
Aberdare |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
2148 |
PZ |
Penzance |
LA |
Laira |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
2159 |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
ABEEG |
Aberbeeg |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
2159 |
ABEEG |
Aberbeeg |
86J |
Aberdare |
|
20/03/1950 |
Condemned |
2113 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
2076 |
SLO |
Slough |
81F |
Oxford |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
2152 |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
10/04/1950 |
Condemned |
2039 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/04/1950 |
Condemned |
2091 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
08/05/1950 |
Condemned |
2096 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
20/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
2159 |
86J |
Aberdare |
86J |
Aberdare |
|
31/05/1950 |
Condemned |
2052 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/05/1950 |
Condemned |
2130 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
05/06/1950 |
Condemned |
2071 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
2092 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
2126 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
03/07/1950 |
Condemned |
2124 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
20/07/1950 |
Condemned |
2037 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/07/1950 |
Condemned |
2110 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
11/08/1950 |
Condemned |
2132 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
12/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
2126 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
31/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
2126 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
2115 |
HFD |
Hereford |
85A |
Worcester |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
2115 |
85A |
Worcester |
85A |
Worcester |
|
03/10/1950 |
Condemned |
2189 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
COND |
|
16/10/1950 |
Condemned |
2141 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/10/1950 |
Condemned |
2184 |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1950 |
Condemned |
2155 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
2097 |
TR |
Truro |
83G |
Penzance |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
2097 |
83G |
Penzance |
83G |
Penzance |
|
11/12/1950 |
Condemned |
2153 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
2082 |
DG |
Danygraig |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
20/01/1951 |
Condemned |
2055 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
2082 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
2109 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
2025 |
LYD |
Lydney |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
2082 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
2109 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
2121 |
LYD |
Lydney |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
15/03/1951 |
Condemned |
2054 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/03/1951 |
Condemned |
2075 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
22/03/1951 |
Condemned |
2033 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
27/03/1951 |
Condemned |
2056 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
2025 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
2082 |
87C |
Danygraig |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
2121 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
13/04/1951 |
Condemned |
2190 |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
2043 |
LYD |
Lydney |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
2144 |
LYD |
Lydney |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
26/04/1951 |
Condemned |
2026 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
26/04/1951 |
Condemned |
2095 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
2109 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85A |
Worcester |
|
07/05/1951 |
Condemned |
2063 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
07/05/1951 |
Condemned |
2098 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
11/05/1951 |
Condemned |
2104 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
2034 |
LYD |
Lydney |
85A |
Worcester |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
2043 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85C |
Hereford |
|
01/06/1951 |
Condemned |
2021 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
2185 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
2159 |
86J |
Aberdare |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
18/06/1951 |
Condemned |
2073 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
19/06/1951 |
Condemned |
2032 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
25/06/1951 |
Condemned |
2117 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
2159 |
86B |
Newport Pill |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
14/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
2090 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
30/07/1951 |
Condemned |
2044 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/07/1951 |
Condemned |
2051 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
2090 |
89A |
Oswestry |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
07/08/1951 |
Condemned |
2159 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
2027 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
2146 |
LYD |
Lydney |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
31/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
2027 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
31/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
2146 |
87C |
Danygraig |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
03/09/1951 |
Condemned |
2089 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
2086 |
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
2090 |
89A |
Oswestry |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
2101 |
WOS |
Worcester |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
17/09/1951 |
Condemned |
2066 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
2086 |
86B |
Newport Pill |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
2090 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
2101 |
85D |
Kidderminster |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
02/10/1951 |
Condemned |
2076 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
10/10/1951 |
Condemned |
2050 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
2068 |
OSY |
Oswestry |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
31/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
2144 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
2048 |
CED |
Cardiff East Dock |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
2097 |
83G |
Penzance |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
2144 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
09/11/1951 |
Condemned |
2083 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/11/1951 |
Condemned |
2131 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
22/11/1951 |
Condemned |
2152 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
2085 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
2042 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
2140 |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
31/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
2085 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
03/01/1952 |
Condemned |
2150 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/01/1952 |
Condemned |
2023 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
2027 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
2085 |
87F |
Llanelli |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
2088 |
EXE |
Exeter |
83D |
Laira |
|
26/01/1952 |
Condemned |
2093 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
2140 |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
02/02/1952 |
Condemned |
2188 |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1952 |
Condemned |
2148 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
05/02/1952 |
Condemned |
2154 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
11/02/1952 |
Condemned |
2181 |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1952 |
Condemned |
2030 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
2099 |
HFD |
Hereford |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
26/02/1952 |
Condemned |
2109 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
26/02/1952 |
Condemned |
2187 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
COND |
|
29/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
2027 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
29/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
2038 |
TN |
Taunton |
83D |
Laira |
|
18/03/1952 |
Condemned |
2080 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
2027 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
2061 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
2082 |
87C |
Danygraig |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
2099 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
2144 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85C |
Hereford |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
2082 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
30/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
2027 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
30/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
2061 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
30/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
2144 |
85C |
Hereford |
85C |
Hereford |
|
17/05/1952 |
Condemned |
2048 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
COND |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
2061 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
17/05/1952 |
Condemned |
2140 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
19/05/1952 |
Condemned |
2151 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
23/05/1952 |
Condemned |
2094 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
27/05/1952 |
Condemned |
2086 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
29/05/1952 |
Condemned |
2025 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
02/06/1952 |
Condemned |
2121 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
11/06/1952 |
Condemned |
2100 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
23/06/1952 |
Condemned |
2115 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
2040 |
HFD |
Hereford |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
2081 |
LLY |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
2136 |
PILL |
Newport Pill |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
2081 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
26/08/1952 |
Condemned |
2106 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
2081 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
19/09/1952 |
Condemned |
2127 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
2035 |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
2040 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85A |
Worcester |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
2088 |
83D |
Laira |
83B |
Taunton |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
2136 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
06/10/1952 |
Condemned |
2123 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
13/11/1952 |
Condemned |
2067 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
19/11/1952 |
Condemned |
2122 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
20/11/1952 |
Condemned |
2079 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
2112 |
SLO |
Slough |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
23/12/1952 |
Condemned |
2185 |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
2107 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
2112 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
09/01/1953 |
Condemned |
2135 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/01/1953 |
Condemned |
2031 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
19/01/1953 |
Condemned |
2068 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
2111 |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
2112 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
2144 |
85C |
Hereford |
85A |
Worcester |
|
09/02/1953 |
Condemned |
2156 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
2053 |
WES |
Westbury |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
2061 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84H |
Wellington |
|
07/03/1953 |
Condemned |
2147 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/03/1953 |
Condemned |
2111 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
23/03/1953 |
Condemned |
2129 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
25/03/1953 |
Condemned |
2146 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
20/04/1953 |
Condemned |
2038 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
20/04/1953 |
Condemned |
2042 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
2043 |
85C |
Hereford |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
2101 |
85D |
Kidderminster |
85A |
Worcester |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
2144 |
85A |
Worcester |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
2107 |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
24/08/1953 |
Condemned |
2085 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
2097 |
83E |
St Blazey |
83D |
Laira |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
2101 |
85A |
Worcester |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
2072 |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
2040 |
85A |
Worcester |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
13/04/1954 |
Condemned |
2053 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
2034 |
85A |
Worcester |
85C |
Hereford |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
2040 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85A |
Worcester |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
2144 |
85D |
Kidderminster |
85A |
Worcester |
|
01/06/1954 |
Condemned |
2099 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
2040 |
85A |
Worcester |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/09/1954 |
Condemned |
2112 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
18/10/1954 |
Condemned |
2081 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
2072 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/12/1954 |
Condemned |
2060 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
29/12/1954 |
Condemned |
2108 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
10/01/1955 |
Condemned |
2043 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
2069 |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
2160 |
HFD |
Hereford |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/03/1955 |
Condemned |
2035 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/03/1955 |
Condemned |
2090 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/03/1955 |
Condemned |
2097 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
04/04/1955 |
Condemned |
2186 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
COND |
|
12/04/1955 |
Condemned |
2061 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
23/04/1955 |
Condemned |
2136 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/05/1955 |
Condemned |
2183 |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
26/05/1955 |
Condemned |
2144 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
13/06/1955 |
Condemned |
2082 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/08/1955 |
Condemned |
2092 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/08/1955 |
Condemned |
2070 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/08/1955 |
Condemned |
2088 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/08/1955 |
Condemned |
2182 |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
|
COND |
|
12/09/1955 |
Condemned |
2034 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
12/03/1956 |
Condemned |
2101 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
12/05/1956 |
Condemned |
2138 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
05/06/1956 |
Condemned |
2107 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/07/1956 |
Condemned |
2072 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
08/10/1956 |
Condemned |
2040 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
04/02/1957 |
Condemned |
2027 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
04/03/1957 |
Condemned |
2160 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
08/05/1957 |
Condemned |
2134 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
2069 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
99W |
Wolverton Works |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
2069 |
99W |
Wolverton Works |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/04/1959 |
Condemned |
2069 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|