Depot: Thirsk
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Thirsk | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1114 | m/e | 11/1910 (New) | TSK | on | 10/03/1924 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1176 | m/e | 02/1911 (New) | TSK | on | 12/12/1927 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1213 | y/e | 1923 | TSK | y/e | 1925 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1179 | m/e | 02/1911 | SKN | Stockton (New) | on | 18/02/1927 | TSK | on | 12/12/1927 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 715 | on | 30/01/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 24/11/1927 | TSK | on | 09/08/1929 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 443 | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 12/03/1928 | TSK | on | 01/08/1929 | SHI | Shildon |