Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 225 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21259 Week
» 119904 Month
» 322568 Year
» 3349421 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2735
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
07/02/1938 |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
20/01/1939 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
22/12/1939 |
Castle |
5050 |
EARL OF ST GERMANS |
21/03/1940 |
Castle |
4094 |
DYNEVOR CASTLE |
28/06/1954 |
Castle |
5091 |
CLEEVE ABBEY |
12/06/1956 |
|