GCR/LNER Robinson "D9" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/1935 | Reallocation | 6018 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 6024 | PBE | Peterborough East | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 6031 | PBE | Peterborough East | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 6040 | PBE | Peterborough East | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 6017 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 5112 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6015 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
05/1939 | Condemned | 6028 | COND | ||||
06/1939 | Condemned | 5113 | COND | ||||
07/1939 | Condemned | 6042 | COND | ||||
03/1942 | Condemned | 5110 | COND | ||||
08/1942 | Condemned | 6022 | COND | ||||
02/1943 | Condemned | 6020 | COND | ||||
09/1944 | Condemned | 5104 | COND | ||||
03/1945 | Condemned | 6032 | COND | ||||
06/1945 | Condemned | 5105 | COND | ||||
11/1945 | Condemned | 6025 | COND | ||||
01/1946 | Condemned | 2320 | COND | ||||
01/1946 | Condemned | 2323 | COND | ||||
09/1946 | Condemned | 2331 | COND | ||||
03/1947 | Condemned | 2328 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2300 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2301 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2302 | LIN | Lincoln | LIV | Brunswick | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2303 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2304 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | LIV | Brunswick | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2305 | KL | Kings Lynn | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2306 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2307 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2308 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2309 | PBE | Peterborough East | LIV | Brunswick | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2311 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2312 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2313 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2314 | STP | Heaton Mersey | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2315 | PBE | Peterborough East | LIV | Brunswick | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2317 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2318 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2319 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2321 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2322 | STP | Heaton Mersey | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2324 | PBE | Peterborough East | LIV | Brunswick | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2325 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2329 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2330 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2332 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2333 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | LIV | Brunswick | |
10/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2326 | 98W | DAR | Darlington | ||
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2326 | DAR | Darlington | NLN | Northallerton | |
01/1949 | Condemned | 62306 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
01/1949 | Condemned | 62322 | STP | Heaton Mersey | COND | ||
02/1949 | Condemned | 62329 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
09/05/1949 | Condemned | 62314 | STP | Heaton Mersey | COND | ||
18/07/1949 | Condemned | 62311 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | COND | ||
18/07/1949 | Condemned | 62315 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
18/07/1949 | Condemned | 62317 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
18/07/1949 | Condemned | 62319 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
15/08/1949 | Condemned | 62303 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
15/08/1949 | Condemned | 62308 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
15/08/1949 | Condemned | 62330 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
09/1949 | Condemned | 62332 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
12/10/1949 | Condemned | 62313 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
12/10/1949 | Condemned | 62321 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
11/1949 | Condemned | 62300 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
07/11/1949 | Condemned | 62324 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
21/11/1949 | Condemned | 62309 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
21/11/1949 | Condemned | 62318 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
12/12/1949 | Condemned | 62333 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
01/1950 | Reallocation | 62304 | LIV | Brunswick | LIV | Brunswick | |
16/01/1950 | Condemned | 62304 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
06/02/1950 | Condemned | 62325 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
20/03/1950 | Condemned | 62302 | LIV | Brunswick | COND | ||
04/1950 | Condemned | 62301 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
04/1950 | Condemned | 62312 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
12/06/1950 | Condemned | 62307 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND | ||
24/07/1950 | Condemned | 62305 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | COND |