Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 824 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31474 Week
» 130119 Month
» 332783 Year
» 3359636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NER/LNER Worsdell "D20" Class 4-4-0
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
NER |
1672 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2397 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1946 |
|
NER |
1026 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2380 |
1946 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
|
NER |
1042 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2381 |
1946 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
|
NER |
1078 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2383 |
1946 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
|
NER |
1184 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2384 |
1946 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
|
NER |
1051 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2382 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
NER |
1217 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2389 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
NER |
1223 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2390 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
NER |
1236 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2393 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
NER |
1258 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2394 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
NER |
1260 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2395 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
NER |
1207 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2386 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
NER |
1232 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2391 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
NER |
1235 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2392 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
NER |
2101 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2360 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
NER |
711 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2374 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
NER |
1209 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2387 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
592 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2371 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
712 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2375 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
713 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2376 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
1210 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2388 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
NER |
1665 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2396 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2029 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2358 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2013 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2342 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
NER |
2020 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2349 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
NER |
2012 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2341 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
2028 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2357 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
2106 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2365 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
2011 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2340 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2015 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2344 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2018 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2347 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2019 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2348 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2021 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2350 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2022 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2351 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2023 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2352 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2025 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2354 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2026 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2355 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2030 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2359 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2103 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2362 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2104 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2363 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
476 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2370 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
707 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2372 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
708 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2373 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2016 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2345 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
2024 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2353 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
2102 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2361 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
2105 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2364 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
2107 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2366 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
2108 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2367 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
2110 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2369 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
723 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2377 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
724 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2378 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
2014 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2343 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
NER |
725 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2379 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
2361 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62361 |
|
y/e |
1948 |
|
LNER |
2367 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62367 |
|
y/e |
1948 |
|
LNER |
2370 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62370 |
|
y/e |
1948 |
|
LNER |
2377 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62377 |
|
y/e |
1948 |
|
LNER |
2382 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62382 |
|
y/e |
1948 |
|
LNER |
2386 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62386 |
|
y/e |
1948 |
|
LNER |
2390 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62390 |
|
y/e |
1948 |
|
LNER |
2388 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62388 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2387 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62387 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2347 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62347 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
2376 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62376 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
2340 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62340 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
2389 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62389 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
2379 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62379 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
2366 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62366 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
2373 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62373 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2375 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62375 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2396 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62396 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2342 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62342 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2371 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62371 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2391 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62391 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
2392 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62392 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
2365 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62365 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
2351 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62351 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
2344 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62344 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
2353 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62353 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
2363 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62363 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
2359 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62359 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
2378 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62378 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
2343 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62343 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2397 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62397 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
2362 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62362 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LNER |
2349 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62349 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LNER |
2345 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62345 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LNER |
2358 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62358 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LNER |
2383 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62383 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LNER |
2352 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62352 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LNER |
2380 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62380 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LNER |
2348 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62348 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
LNER |
2354 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62354 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LNER |
2357 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62357 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LNER |
2369 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62369 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LNER |
2341 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62341 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LNER |
2355 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62355 |
|
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
LNER |
2381 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62381 |
|
on |
29/04/1950 |
|
LNER |
2374 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62374 |
|
on |
20/05/1950 |
|
LNER |
2384 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62384 |
|
on |
16/09/1950 |
|
LNER |
2360 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62360 |
|
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
|
LNER |
2372 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62372 |
|
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
|
LNER |
2395 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62395 |
|
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
|