Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3569 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34219 Week
» 132864 Month
» 335528 Year
» 3362381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5861 |
18/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31326 |
10/10/1973 |
|
TOPS (31/9) |
31970 |
04/09/1987 |
|
Departmental (97/2) |
97204 |
04/09/1987 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
18/10/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5861 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 397 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) (UNKNOWN DEPOT) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
10/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31326 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
07/01/1982 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/09/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31970 |
|
|
04/09/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97204 |
|
|
01/09/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31970 |
|
|
01/09/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 97204 |
|
|
03/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|