Depot: Swansea (Upper Bank)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Swansea (Upper Bank) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1737 | m/e | 05/1886 | 10B | Bourne (New) | m/e | 04/1892 | 6 | m/e | 01/1899 | 5 | Brecon |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2624 | m/e | 08/1900 (New) | 6 | m/e | 12/1902 | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2624 | m/e | 08/1900 | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) (New) | m/e | 12/1902 | 6 | m/e | 05/1908 | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1424 | m/e | 12/1902 | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) | m/e | 05/1908 | 6 | m/e | 04/1914 | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1424 | m/e | 05/1908 | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) | m/e | 04/1914 | 6 | m/e | 12/1921 | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1424 | m/e | 04/1914 | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) | m/e | 12/1921 | 6 | m/e | 03/1930 | 9 | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1303 | m/e | 03/1930 | M18 | Nottingham | m/e | 09/1933 | 6 | m/e | 11/1945 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1307 | m/e | 03/1930 | M18 | Nottingham | m/e | 09/1933 | 6 | m/e | 11/1945 | 22E | Highbridge |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1346 | m/e | 03/1930 | M18 | Nottingham | m/e | 09/1933 | 6 | m/e | 11/1945 | 22E | Highbridge |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1350 | m/e | 03/1930 | M18 | Nottingham | m/e | 09/1933 | 6 | m/e | 11/1945 | 16D | Mansfield |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1370 | m/e | 03/1930 | M10 | Leicester Midland | m/e | 09/1933 | 6 | m/e | 11/1945 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1387 | m/e | 03/1930 | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | m/e | 09/1933 | 6 | 4w/e | 29/01/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7230 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4C | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | Swansea (Upper Bank) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7655 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 4C | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7477 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7478 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7479 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7480 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7481 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1769 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1824 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1852 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | w/e | 14/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1860 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | m/e | 31/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1893 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | on | 04/09/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7230 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4C | Swansea (Upper Bank) | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7232 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | m/e | 30/04/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7256 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | m/e | 09/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7258 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7259 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7681 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4C | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Coal Engine Saddle Tank | 0-6-0ST | 7479 | m/e | 10/1929 | Withdrawn | w/e | 01/01/1949 (R) | 4C | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7681 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 4C | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |