Miscellaneous Reports
Number | Date To Service | Depot When New | Re-Engined | Time fitted with a MAN engine | Time fitted with a Paxman engine | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D6100 | 02/12/1958 | Hornsey | 08/12/1967 | 9.02 | 3.83 | 06/10/1971 | |||
D6101 | 09/12/1958 | Hornsey | 24/12/1965 | 7.05 | 5.61 | 03/08/1971 | |||
D6102 | 23/12/1958 | Hornsey | 11/06/1966 | 7.47 | 5.32 | 06/10/1971 | |||
D6103 | 05/05/1959 | Hornsey | 15/10/1965 | 6.45 | 5.98 | 05/10/1971 | |||
D6106 | 24/03/1959 | Hornsey | 22/10/1965 | 6.59 | 5.74 | 18/07/1971 | |||
D6107 | 24/03/1959 | Hornsey | 05/06/1967 | 8.21 | 4.34 | 05/10/1971 | |||
D6108 | 14/04/1959 | Hornsey | 20/10/1967 | 8.52 | 1.53 | 01/05/1969 | |||
D6112 | 20/05/1959 | Stratford | 10/09/1966 | 7.32 | 5.31 | 31/12/1971 | |||
D6113 | 27/05/1959 | Stratford | 23/12/1966 | 7.58 | 4.79 | 06/10/1971 | |||
D6114 | 27/05/1959 | Stratford | 25/02/1966 | 6.76 | 5.61 | 05/10/1971 | |||
D6116 | 09/06/1959 | Stratford | 14/07/1966 | 7.10 | 5.47 | 31/12/1971 | |||
D6119 | 30/06/1959 | Stratford | 28/12/1967 | 8.50 | 4.01 | 31/12/1971 | |||
D6121 | 18/08/1959 | Ipswich | 26/02/1966 | 6.53 | 5.61 | 06/10/1971 | |||
D6123 | 22/09/1959 | Ipswich | 05/1963 | 3.65 | 8.36 | 21/09/1971 | |||
D6124 | 29/09/1959 | Ipswich | 08/12/1967 | 8.20 | 3.83 | 06/10/1971 | |||
D6129 | 27/10/1959 | Ipswich | 31/10/1967 | 8.02 | 3.93 | 06/10/1971 | |||
D6130 | 27/10/1959 | Ipswich | 09/04/1966 | 6.45 | 5.49 | 05/10/1971 | |||
D6132 | 17/11/1959 | Ipswich | 02/12/1966 | 7.05 | 4.85 | 06/10/1971 | |||
D6133 | 24/11/1959 | Ipswich | 15/05/1966 | 6.48 | 5.63 | 31/12/1971 | |||
D6137 | 22/12/1959 | Ipswich | 07/11/1967 | 7.88 | 3.46 | 24/04/1971 |
The following reports are available.
- Build dates and withdrawal dates of several classes combined
- Weight/Height/Length/Wheelbase/Wheel Diameter comparisons of locomotive classes
- Maximum speed of locomotive classes
- Diesel locomotive classes by Power Unit
- Western Region Diesel Hydraulics lifespan
- Class 52 'Western' Liveries
- Timelines graph of up to ten classes of locomotive
- Locomotive classes by longevity
- Individual locomotives by longevity
- LNWR 0-8-0/2-8-0 rebuilds
- Snapshot of All Locomotives by Class on a user defined date
- Great Western 4-6-0 identification
- Early Casualties - Diesel and Electric
- Robinson GCR Class 8K/8M 2-8-0 (LNER Class O4/O5/O1) and ROD derivatives
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) re-engine schedule: Mirrlees to English Electric
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) headcode style
- NBL Type 2 (Class 21/29) re-engine schedule: MAN to Paxman
- Incidents of fires on diesel locomotives, 1961-1964
If there are any reports you would like to see, please contact me - see the Contact tab above.