Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 673 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5144 Week
» 16190 Month
» 16190 Year
» 1681566 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Miscellaneous Reports

Class 52 Diesel Hydraulic Liveries
Number Livery Applied Livery Depot Name
D1000 02/06/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN ENTERPRISE
D1000 08/10/1964 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN ENTERPRISE
D1000 05/11/1962 Desert Sand bodywork with small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN ENTERPRISE
D1000 20/12/1961 Desert Sand bodywork over whole body. Red buffer beam.   WESTERN ENTERPRISE
D1001 12/10/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN PATHFINDER
D1001 12/02/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Laira WESTERN PATHFINDER
D1001 20/11/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN PATHFINDER
D1001 27/05/1968 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Landore WESTERN PATHFINDER
D1002 08/05/1965 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Bristol Bath Road WESTERN EXPLORER
D1002 19/03/1962 GSYP: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN EXPLORER
D1002 02/12/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN EXPLORER
D1002 28/10/1969 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Landore WESTERN EXPLORER
D1003 14/04/1962 GSYP: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN PIONEER
D1003 01/11/1965 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN PIONEER
D1003 31/12/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Landore WESTERN PIONEER
D1004 12/05/1962 GSYP: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN CRUSADER
D1004 08/02/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN CRUSADER
D1005 18/06/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Laira WESTERN VENTURER
D1005 24/07/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN VENTURER
D1005 18/01/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN VENTURER
D1006 22/03/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN STALWART
D1006 06/07/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Laira WESTERN STALWART
D1006 13/12/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN STALWART
D1007 01/08/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Laira WESTERN TALISMAN
D1007 29/10/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN TALISMAN
D1007 29/11/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN TALISMAN
D1008 04/09/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Laira WESTERN HARRIER
D1008 13/10/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN HARRIER
D1008 19/03/1968 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Landore WESTERN HARRIER
D1008 22/01/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN HARRIER
D1009 23/03/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN INVADER
D1009 02/07/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN INVADER
D1009 24/09/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Old Oak Common WESTERN INVADER
D1010 15/08/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN CAMPAIGNER
D1010 15/10/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN CAMPAIGNER
D1011 07/03/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN THUNDERER
D1011 27/10/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN THUNDERER
D1012 17/11/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN FIREBRAND
D1012 01/03/1968 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN FIREBRAND
D1012 04/03/1971 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN FIREBRAND
D1013 13/12/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN RANGER
D1013 16/08/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Landore WESTERN RANGER
D1014 24/12/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN LEVIATHAN
D1014 15/05/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN LEVIATHAN
D1015 21/01/1963 Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt - also, at 'A' end only, yellow bands extending around the cabsides - never ran in BR service in this livery. Cardiff Canton WESTERN CHAMPION
D1015 25/01/1963 Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt. Cardiff Canton WESTERN CHAMPION
D1015 08/11/1965 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN CHAMPION
D1015 08/11/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN CHAMPION
D1016 16/02/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN GLADIATOR
D1016 13/03/1968 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN GLADIATOR
D1016 17/07/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN GLADIATOR
D1017 15/03/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN WARRIOR
D1017 07/03/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN WARRIOR
D1017 03/02/1967 BSYP: BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN WARRIOR
D1018 04/09/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN BUCCANEER
D1018 02/04/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN BUCCANEER
D1019 09/12/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN CHALLENGER
D1019 02/05/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN CHALLENGER
D1020 29/11/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN HERO
D1020 21/05/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN HERO
D1021 19/04/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN CAVALIER
D1021 17/06/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN CAVALIER
D1022 06/07/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN SENTINEL
D1022 16/07/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN SENTINEL
D1023 23/09/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN FUSILIER
D1023 19/12/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN FUSILIER
D1024 20/04/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN HUNTSMAN
D1024 01/10/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN HUNTSMAN
D1025 09/01/1968 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN GUARDSMAN
D1025 09/01/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN GUARDSMAN
D1025 01/11/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN GUARDSMAN
D1026 14/06/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN CENTURION
D1026 24/12/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN CENTURION
D1027 09/03/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN LANCER
D1027 28/01/1964 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN LANCER
D1028 04/07/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN HUSSAR
D1028 25/02/1964 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Swindon WESTERN HUSSAR
D1029 20/04/1964 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Bristol Bath Road WESTERN LEGIONNAIRE
D1029 15/09/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN LEGIONNAIRE
D1030 01/04/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN MUSKETEER
D1030 02/08/1966 BSYP: BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN MUSKETEER
D1030 05/12/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN MUSKETEER
D1031 01/11/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN RIFLEMAN
D1031 20/12/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN RIFLEMAN
D1032 26/05/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN MARKSMAN
D1032 31/12/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN MARKSMAN
D1033 31/12/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN TROOPER
D1033 17/01/1964 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN TROOPER
D1034 18/03/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN DRAGOON
D1034 15/04/1964 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN DRAGOON
D1035 27/07/1962 GSYP: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN YEOMAN
D1035 02/02/1966 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN YEOMAN
D1035 03/02/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN YEOMAN
D1036 29/08/1962 GSYP: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN EMPEROR
D1036 03/11/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN EMPEROR
D1036 25/11/1966 BSYP: BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN EMPEROR
D1037 31/08/1962 GSYP: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN EMPRESS
D1037 25/06/1971 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN EMPRESS
D1037 27/01/1967 BSYP: BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN EMPRESS
D1038 07/09/1962 GSYP: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN SOVEREIGN
D1038 27/03/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN SOVEREIGN
D1038 27/01/1966 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Landore WESTERN SOVEREIGN
D1039 17/05/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN KING
D1039 07/09/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Laira WESTERN KING
D1039 19/04/1968 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN KING
D1039 24/02/1971 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN KING
D1040 21/06/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN QUEEN
D1040 17/04/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN QUEEN
D1040 20/09/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Old Oak Common WESTERN QUEEN
D1041 21/05/1968 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN PRINCE
D1041 06/05/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN PRINCE
D1041 13/10/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN PRINCE
D1041 10/10/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Old Oak Common WESTERN PRINCE
D1042 20/05/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN PRINCESS
D1042 30/09/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN PRINCESS
D1042 19/10/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Old Oak Common WESTERN PRINCESS
D1043 22/12/1966 BSYP: BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel Bristol Bath Road WESTERN DUKE
D1043 19/12/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN DUKE
D1043 02/11/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN DUKE
D1043 26/10/1962 MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. Old Oak Common WESTERN DUKE
D1044 12/11/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN DUCHESS
D1044 25/04/1968 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN DUCHESS
D1044 26/06/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN DUCHESS
D1045 16/11/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN VISCOUNT
D1045 11/04/1968 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN VISCOUNT
D1045 20/08/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN VISCOUNT
D1046 24/12/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Bristol Bath Road WESTERN MARQUIS
D1046 12/05/1971 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN MARQUIS
D1047 04/02/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN LORD
D1047 09/07/1971 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN LORD
D1047 23/12/1966 BSYP: BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN LORD
D1048 15/12/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN LADY
D1048 14/11/1966 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN LADY
D1049 14/12/1962 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN MONARCH
D1049 07/04/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN MONARCH
D1050 01/01/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN RULER
D1050 04/05/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN RULER
D1051 15/09/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN AMBASSADOR
D1051 02/01/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel   WESTERN AMBASSADOR
D1052 04/02/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN VICEROY
D1052 14/03/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN VICEROY
D1053 14/11/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN PATRIARCH
D1053 11/02/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN PATRIARCH
D1054 02/03/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN GOVERNOR
D1054 10/03/1970 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN GOVERNOR
D1054 09/12/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN GOVERNOR
D1055 02/03/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN ADVOCATE
D1055 15/11/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN ADVOCATE
D1056 08/03/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN SULTAN
D1056 15/09/1967 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN SULTAN
D1056 06/04/1971 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN SULTAN
D1057 03/01/1972 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN CHIEFTAIN
D1057 04/01/1967 BSYP: BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel Laira WESTERN CHIEFTAIN
D1057 06/04/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Newton Abbot WESTERN CHIEFTAIN
D1058 25/03/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Bristol Bath Road WESTERN NOBLEMAN
D1058 01/11/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN NOBLEMAN
D1059 06/04/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN EMPIRE
D1059 11/05/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN EMPIRE
D1060 24/05/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN DOMINION
D1060 11/04/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN DOMINION
D1061 20/12/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN ENVOY
D1061 19/04/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN ENVOY
D1062 31/10/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN COURIER
D1062 06/05/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN COURIER
D1063 11/10/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN MONITOR
D1063 17/05/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN MONITOR
D1064 24/05/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN REGENT
D1064 08/03/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN REGENT
D1065 07/07/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN CONSORT
D1065 18/06/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN CONSORT
D1066 14/06/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN PREFECT
D1066 26/07/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN PREFECT
D1067 18/07/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN DRUID
D1067 19/10/1967 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN DRUID
D1067 25/02/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN DRUID
D1068 17/10/1967 MFYE: Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN RELIANCE
D1068 22/04/1970 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Landore WESTERN RELIANCE
D1068 12/07/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN RELIANCE
D1069 21/10/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN VANGUARD
D1069 11/05/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN VANGUARD
D1070 28/10/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Cardiff Canton WESTERN GAUNTLET
D1070 03/02/1969 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN GAUNTLET
D1071 09/07/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Bristol Bath Road WESTERN RENOWN
D1071 07/11/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN RENOWN
D1072 13/12/1967 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN GLORY
D1072 07/11/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN GLORY
D1073 05/01/1968 BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front Laira WESTERN BULWARK
D1073 03/12/1963 MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel Old Oak Common WESTERN BULWARK

The following reports are available.

If there are any reports you would like to see, please contact me - see the Contact tab above.