Miscellaneous Reports
Number | Date To Service | Depot When New | Re-Engined | Time fitted with a Mirrlees engine | Time fitted with an E.E. engine | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D5500 | 10/10/1957 | Stratford | 12/03/1969 | 11.43 | 7.33 | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5501 | 25/11/1957 | Stratford | 27/02/1969 | 11.27 | 7.37 | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5502 | 16/12/1957 | Stratford | 08/1968 | 10.67 | 11.39 | 01/01/1980 | |||
D5503 | 09/01/1958 | Stratford | 19/10/1968 | 10.78 | 11.30 | 03/02/1980 | |||
D5504 | 30/01/1958 | Stratford | 30/10/1968 | 10.76 | 11.94 | 05/10/1980 | |||
D5505 | 20/02/1958 | Stratford | 14/11/1968 | 10.74 | 11.23 | 03/02/1980 | |||
D5506 | 13/03/1958 | Stratford | 25/05/1968 | 10.21 | 11.62 | 05/01/1980 | |||
D5507 | 19/04/1958 | Stratford | 06/02/1969 | 10.81 | 7.75 | 04/11/1976 | |||
D5508 | 17/04/1958 | Stratford | 12/10/1968 | 10.50 | 11.98 | 01/10/1980 | |||
D5509 | 01/05/1958 | Stratford | 13/12/1968 | 10.63 | 7.58 | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5510 | 16/05/1958 | Stratford | 03/01/1969 | 10.64 | 7.52 | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5511 | 05/06/1958 | Stratford | 10/01/1969 | 10.61 | 7.50 | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5512 | 19/06/1958 | Stratford | 11/02/1969 | 10.66 | 7.73 | 04/11/1976 | |||
D5513 | 13/07/1958 | Stratford | 19/04/1968 | 9.78 | 10.87 | 01/03/1979 | |||
D5514 | 24/07/1958 | Stratford | 19/12/1968 | 10.41 | 7.87 | 01/11/1976 | |||
D5515 | 31/07/1958 | Stratford | 17/07/1968 | 9.97 | 11.81 | 04/05/1980 | |||
D5516 | 04/09/1958 | Stratford | 17/01/1969 | 10.38 | 7.48 | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5517 | 25/09/1958 | Stratford | 19/10/1968 | 10.07 | 11.55 | 04/05/1980 | |||
D5518 | 16/10/1958 | Stratford | 30/08/1967 | 8.88 | 25.39 | 11/01/1993 | |||
D5519 | 12/12/1958 | Stratford | 28/11/1968 | 9.97 | 11.86 | 05/10/1980 | |||
D5520 | 26/02/1959 | Stratford | 04/1967 | 8.14 | 29.61 | 11/1996 | |||
D5521 | 05/03/1959 | Ipswich | 10/1966 | 7.62 | 13.98 | 05/10/1980 | |||
D5522 | 12/03/1959 | Stratford | 18/11/1967 | 8.69 | 27.90 | 06/10/1995 | |||
D5523 | 19/03/1959 | Stratford | 02/1967 | 7.92 | 30.23 | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5524 | 26/03/1959 | Stratford | 06/1967 | 8.23 | 28.40 | 01/11/1995 | |||
D5525 | 09/04/1959 | March | 11/09/1965 | 6.43 | 43.17 | 31/10/2008 | |||
D5526 | 16/04/1959 | Stratford | 25/05/1968 | 9.12 | 23.36 | 27/09/1991 | |||
D5527 | 23/04/1959 | Stratford | 03/1965 | 5.90 | 23.01 | 11/03/1988 | |||
D5528 | 30/04/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 05/03/1969 | 9.85 | 37.26 | 31/05/2006 | |||
D5529 | 07/05/1959 | March | 07/05/1968 | 9.01 | 15.11 | 12/06/1983 | |||
D5530 | 14/05/1959 | March | 19/12/1968 | 9.61 | 28.38 | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5531 | 21/05/1959 | Stratford | 08/1968 | 9.24 | 35.98 | 30/07/2004 | |||
D5532 | 04/06/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 14/11/1967 | 8.45 | 27.98 | 01/11/1995 | |||
D5533 | 04/06/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 10/05/1968 | 8.94 | 32.75 | 01/02/2001 | |||
D5534 | 11/06/1959 | March | 03/1965 | 5.76 | 34.92 | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5535 | 18/06/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 20/11/1968 | 9.43 | 18.32 | 11/03/1987 | |||
D5536 | 18/06/1959 | Stratford | 07/1966 | 7.08 | 22.62 | 20/02/1989 | |||
D5537 | 25/06/1959 | Stratford | 07/1967 | 8.06 | 28.19 | 09/1995 | |||
D5538 | 02/07/1959 | Ipswich | 28/03/1968 | 8.75 | 23.52 | 27/09/1991 | |||
D5539 | 09/07/1959 | Ipswich | 05/12/1968 | 9.42 | 19.75 | 01/09/1988 | |||
D5540 | 16/07/1959 | Ipswich | 02/1965 | 5.59 | 21.95 | 22/01/1987 | |||
D5541 | 23/07/1959 | Ipswich | 03/1965 | 5.65 | 27.02 | 16/03/1992 | |||
D5542 | 30/07/1959 | Ipswich | 08/1968 | 9.05 | 21.79 | 25/05/1990 | |||
D5543 | 30/07/1959 | Ipswich | 08/1968 | 9.05 | 26.35 | 12/1994 | |||
D5544 | 20/08/1959 | Ipswich | 31/07/1968 | 8.95 | 31.48 | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5545 | 08/10/1959 | Stratford | 01/1968 | 8.28 | 21.45 | 21/06/1989 | |||
D5546 | 27/08/1959 | Ipswich | 08/1965 | 5.97 | |||||
D5547 | 27/08/1959 | Ipswich | 01/1968 | 8.39 | |||||
D5548 | 03/09/1959 | Ipswich | 02/1967 | 7.46 | 30.52 | 08/1997 | |||
D5549 | 10/09/1959 | Ipswich | 24/09/1966 | 7.04 | 22.51 | 22/03/1989 | |||
D5550 | 24/09/1959 | Ipswich | 01/05/1968 | 8.61 | 32.15 | 16/06/2000 | |||
D5551 | 10/09/1959 | Ipswich | 10/1967 | 8.10 | 31.15 | 01/12/1998 | |||
D5552 | 17/09/1959 | Ipswich | 26/04/1968 | 8.61 | 31.74 | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5553 | 24/09/1959 | Ipswich | 13/11/1965 | 6.14 | 34.25 | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5554 | 01/10/1959 | Ipswich | 01/11/1968 | 9.09 | 11.82 | 24/08/1980 | |||
D5555 | 01/10/1959 | Ipswich | 05/1967 | 7.62 | 28.57 | 01/12/1995 | |||
D5556 | 08/10/1959 | Ipswich | 04/1965 | 5.52 | 23.82 | 02/02/1989 | |||
D5557 | 15/10/1959 | Ipswich | 03/1965 | 5.42 | 30.48 | 01/09/1995 | |||
D5558 | 22/10/1959 | Ipswich | 02/1968 | 8.32 | 29.06 | 01/03/1997 | |||
D5559 | 22/10/1959 | Ipswich | 04/1965 | 5.48 | 23.80 | 25/01/1989 | |||
D5560 | 29/10/1959 | Ipswich | 08/1968 | 8.80 | 31.74 | 05/05/2000 | |||
D5561 | 29/10/1959 | Ipswich | 06/1967 | 7.63 | 21.51 | 12/12/1988 | |||
D5562 | 05/11/1959 | Ipswich | 12/03/1966 | 6.35 | |||||
D5563 | 12/11/1959 | March | 05/04/1968 | 8.40 | 31.80 | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5564 | 12/11/1959 | March | 29/03/1968 | 8.38 | 32.01 | 24/03/2000 | |||
D5565 | 19/11/1959 | March | 29/03/1968 | 8.36 | |||||
D5566 | 19/11/1959 | Stratford | 05/1967 | 7.49 | 28.15 | 01/07/1995 | |||
D5567 | 26/11/1959 | Hornsey | 19/07/1968 | 8.65 | 31.82 | 05/05/2000 | |||
D5568 | 03/12/1959 | Hornsey | 11/09/1965 | 5.78 | 10.07 | 04/10/1975 | |||
D5569 | 03/12/1959 | Hornsey | 03/1967 | 7.28 | 19.56 | 01/10/1986 | |||
D5570 | 10/12/1959 | March | 26/06/1965 | 5.55 | 23.95 | 01/06/1989 | |||
D5571 | 10/12/1959 | March | 08/1965 | 5.68 | 30.73 | 01/05/1996 | |||
D5572 | 17/12/1959 | March | 01/1968 | 8.08 | 38.40 | 31/05/2006 | |||
D5573 | 17/12/1959 | March | 20/06/1968 | 8.52 | 31.95 | 26/05/2000 | |||
D5574 | 23/12/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 13/11/1965 | 5.90 | 26.31 | 28/02/1992 | |||
D5575 | 23/12/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 25/04/1968 | 8.35 | 28.04 | 01/05/1996 | |||
D5576 | 31/12/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 13/11/1965 | 5.87 | 34.67 | 07/07/2000 | |||
D5577 | 31/12/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 08/1968 | 8.63 | 27.84 | 12/06/1996 | |||
D5578 | 07/01/1960 | Stratford | 18/06/1968 | 8.45 | 31.59 | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5579 | 07/01/1960 | Stratford | 25/05/1968 | 8.39 | 23.12 | 01/07/1991 | |||
D5580 | 14/01/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 02/12/1967 | 7.89 | 24.43 | 01/05/1992 | |||
D5581 | 14/01/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 01/1966 | 6.01 | 33.03 | 19/01/1999 | |||
D5582 | 21/01/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 02/1968 | 8.07 | |||||
D5583 | 21/01/1960 | Stratford | 05/10/1968 | 8.71 | 31.32 | 21/01/2000 | |||
D5584 | 25/01/1960 | March | 01/1966 | 5.98 | 33.03 | 19/01/1999 | |||
D5585 | 25/01/1960 | March | 07/09/1967 | 7.62 | 21.07 | 27/09/1988 | |||
D5586 | 04/02/1960 | Hornsey | 08/09/1967 | 7.60 | 24.30 | 20/12/1991 | |||
D5587 | 04/02/1960 | Hornsey | 08/1965 | 5.53 | 28.48 | 01/02/1994 | |||
D5588 | 11/02/1960 | Hornsey | 18/11/1967 | 7.77 | 22.16 | 08/01/1990 | |||
D5589 | 11/02/1960 | Hornsey | 25/05/1968 | 8.29 | 19.86 | 31/03/1988 | |||
D5590 | 18/02/1960 | Hornsey | 03/1966 | 6.07 | 37.65 | 31/10/2003 | |||
D5591 | 18/02/1960 | Hornsey | 13/11/1965 | 5.74 | 35.16 | 01/01/2001 | |||
D5592 | 25/02/1960 | Hornsey | 25/05/1968 | 8.25 | 23.84 | 20/03/1992 | |||
D5593 | 25/02/1960 | Hornsey | 30/11/1966 | 6.77 | 22.39 | 14/04/1989 | |||
D5594 | 03/03/1960 | Hornsey | 11/09/1965 | 5.53 | |||||
D5595 | 03/03/1960 | Hornsey | 05/1966 | 6.20 | 20.81 | 02/03/1987 | |||
D5596 | 10/03/1960 | Hornsey | 07/1966 | 6.35 | 33.58 | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5597 | 10/03/1960 | Hornsey | 29/12/1967 | 7.81 | 19.34 | 27/04/1987 | |||
D5598 | 17/03/1960 | Hornsey | 10/1967 | 7.58 | 21.73 | 01/07/1989 | |||
D5599 | 17/03/1960 | Hornsey | 18/07/1968 | 8.34 | 31.95 | 23/06/2000 | |||
D5600 | 24/03/1960 | Hornsey | 03/1967 | 6.98 | 28.65 | 01/11/1995 | |||
D5601 | 24/03/1960 | Hornsey | 12/1965 | 5.73 | 34.24 | 03/03/2000 | |||
D5602 | 31/03/1960 | Hornsey | 01/1966 | 5.80 | 37.18 | 13/03/2003 | |||
D5603 | 31/03/1960 | Hornsey | 04/1967 | 7.04 | |||||
D5604 | 07/04/1960 | Hornsey | 05/1966 | 6.11 | 22.16 | 08/07/1988 | |||
D5605 | 07/04/1960 | Hornsey | 04/1966 | 6.02 | 24.87 | 21/02/1991 | |||
D5606 | 14/04/1960 | Hornsey | 05/1966 | 6.09 | |||||
D5607 | 14/04/1960 | Hornsey | 10/1967 | 7.51 | 32.33 | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5608 | 21/04/1960 | Hornsey | 05/1966 | 6.07 | 33.90 | 31/03/2000 | |||
D5609 | 21/04/1960 | Hornsey | 05/1966 | 6.07 | |||||
D5610 | 28/04/1960 | Finsbury Park | 30/11/1966 | 6.59 | 33.28 | 03/03/2000 | |||
D5611 | 28/04/1960 | Finsbury Park | 05/1966 | 6.05 | 32.72 | 24/01/1999 | |||
D5612 | 05/05/1960 | Finsbury Park | 02/1967 | 6.79 | 22.29 | 26/05/1989 | |||
D5613 | 05/05/1960 | Finsbury Park | 01/1966 | 5.70 | |||||
D5614 | 12/05/1960 | Finsbury Park | 05/1966 | 6.01 | |||||
D5615 | 12/05/1960 | Finsbury Park | 01/1968 | 7.68 | 14.75 | 10/10/1982 | |||
D5616 | 19/05/1960 | Stratford | 11/12/1965 | 5.57 | 25.08 | 04/01/1991 | |||
D5617 | 19/05/1960 | Stratford | 05/1967 | 6.99 | 27.98 | 01/05/1995 | |||
D5618 | 26/05/1960 | Stratford | 05/1967 | 6.97 | 31.74 | 01/02/1999 | |||
D5619 | 26/05/1960 | Stratford | 06/1968 | 8.06 | 19.65 | 04/02/1988 | |||
D5620 | 02/06/1960 | March | 08/1965 | 5.21 | 27.55 | 26/02/1993 | |||
D5621 | 02/06/1960 | March | 04/04/1968 | 7.84 | 28.43 | 01/09/1996 | |||
D5622 | 09/06/1960 | Ipswich | 03/1966 | 5.77 | 24.02 | 16/03/1990 | |||
D5623 | 09/06/1960 | Ipswich | 24/11/1967 | 7.46 | 32.47 | 05/05/2000 | |||
D5624 | 16/06/1960 | Ipswich | 03/1967 | 6.75 | 40.32 | 30/06/2007 | |||
D5625 | 16/06/1960 | Ipswich | 05/1966 | 5.92 | 33.88 | 24/03/2000 | |||
D5626 | 23/06/1960 | Ipswich | 01/1966 | 5.57 | 22.80 | 28/10/1988 | |||
D5627 | 23/06/1960 | Ipswich | 07/1966 | 6.06 | |||||
D5628 | 30/06/1960 | Ipswich | 10/1967 | 7.30 | 19.39 | 01/03/1987 | |||
D5629 | 30/06/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 09/07/1968 | 8.03 | 31.63 | 18/02/2000 | |||
D5630 | 07/07/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 01/1966 | 5.53 | 40.90 | 30/11/2006 | |||
D5631 | 07/07/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 10/1966 | 6.28 | |||||
D5632 | 14/07/1960 | Stratford | 06/1965 | 4.92 | 24.76 | 13/03/1990 | |||
D5633 | 14/07/1960 | Stratford | 11/12/1965 | 5.41 | 37.45 | 15/05/2003 | |||
D5634 | 21/07/1960 | Stratford | 02/05/1968 | 7.79 | |||||
D5635 | 21/07/1960 | Stratford | 04/1967 | 6.74 | 23.73 | 01/01/1991 | |||
D5636 | 28/07/1960 | Stratford | 18/11/1967 | 7.31 | 24.09 | 16/12/1991 | |||
D5637 | 28/07/1960 | Stratford | 25/08/1967 | 7.08 | |||||
D5638 | 11/08/1960 | Stratford | 12/1966 | 6.35 | 16.42 | 15/05/1983 | |||
D5639 | 11/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 05/1968 | 7.76 | 25.07 | 04/06/1993 | |||
D5640 | 18/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 24/09/1966 | 6.10 | 39.71 | 31/05/2006 | |||
D5641 | 18/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 21/03/1968 | 7.59 | 29.96 | 01/03/1998 | |||
D5642 | 18/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 13/11/1965 | 5.24 | 27.67 | 08/07/1993 | |||
D5643 | 25/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 12/1966 | 6.31 | 21.36 | 20/04/1988 | |||
D5644 | 25/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 12/03/1966 | 5.55 | 33.96 | 18/02/2000 | |||
D5645 | 01/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 03/1965 | 4.54 | 30.98 | 01/03/1996 | |||
D5646 | 01/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 03/1966 | 5.54 | |||||
D5647 | 01/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 03/1967 | 6.54 | 24.48 | 30/08/1991 | |||
D5648 | 08/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 07/1967 | 6.85 | 21.26 | 13/10/1988 | |||
D5649 | 08/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 10/1966 | 6.10 | 25.19 | 16/12/1991 | |||
D5650 | 15/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 11/12/1965 | 5.24 | 34.58 | 30/06/2000 | |||
D5651 | 15/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 13/11/1965 | 5.16 | 23.33 | 07/03/1989 | |||
D5652 | 22/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 26/03/1968 | 7.51 | 20.79 | 03/01/1989 | |||
D5653 | 22/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 05/1966 | 5.65 | 22.61 | 16/12/1988 | |||
D5654 | 29/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 18/11/1967 | 7.14 | |||||
D5655 | 29/09/1960 | March | 05/10/1968 | 8.02 | 32.87 | 10/08/2001 | |||
D5656 | 06/10/1960 | March | 23/07/1968 | 7.80 | 22.47 | 04/01/1991 | |||
D5657 | 06/10/1960 | March | 15/11/1968 | 8.12 | |||||
D5658 | 13/10/1960 | March | 15/12/1967 | 7.18 | 22.12 | 22/01/1990 | |||
D5659 | 20/10/1960 | March | 09/1968 | 7.91 | 31.72 | 26/05/2000 | |||
D5660 | 20/10/1960 | March | 02/1967 | 6.33 | |||||
D5661 | 27/10/1960 | March | 20/12/1968 | 8.15 | 24.49 | 11/06/1993 | |||
D5662 | 27/10/1960 | March | 30/11/1966 | 6.10 | 33.51 | 26/05/2000 | |||
D5663 | 03/11/1960 | March | 03/1967 | 6.36 | 28.32 | 01/07/1995 | |||
D5664 | 03/11/1960 | March | 10/1966 | 5.95 | 33.69 | 16/06/2000 | |||
D5665 | 10/11/1960 | March | 12/1966 | 6.10 | 33.10 | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5666 | 10/11/1960 | March | 10/1967 | 6.93 | |||||
D5667 | 17/11/1960 | March | 10/1966 | 5.91 | 23.27 | 17/01/1990 | |||
D5668 | 17/11/1960 | March | 07/1967 | 6.66 | 14.67 | 14/03/1982 | |||
D5669 | 24/11/1960 | March | 10/12/1968 | 8.05 | 34.58 | 30/06/2003 | |||
D5670 | 05/01/1961 | March | 09/1968 | 7.70 | 30.27 | 14/12/1998 | |||
D5671 | 13/10/1960 | Sheffield Darnall | 21/12/1967 | 7.19 | 23.31 | 08/04/1991 | |||
D5672 | 24/11/1960 | Finsbury Park | 01/1968 | 7.15 | 15.38 | 31/05/1983 | |||
D5673 | 01/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 10/1966 | 5.87 | 20.24 | 05/01/1987 | |||
D5674 | 01/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 18/11/1967 | 6.97 | 28.81 | 01/09/1996 | |||
D5675 | 08/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 12/1965 | 5.02 | 34.16 | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5676 | 08/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 07/1966 | 5.60 | 33.73 | 31/03/2000 | |||
D5677 | 15/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 03/1964 | 3.25 | 27.77 | 16/12/1991 | |||
D5678 | 15/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 05/1966 | 5.42 | 33.77 | 11/02/2000 | |||
D5679 | 22/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 01/1968 | 7.07 | 25.65 | 01/09/1993 | |||
D5680 | 22/12/1960 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1965 | 4.48 | 34.82 | 31/03/2000 | |||
D5681 | 05/01/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 08/1965 | 4.61 | 29.40 | 01/01/1995 | |||
D5682 | 12/01/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 21/09/1968 | 7.70 | 11.20 | 01/12/1979 | |||
D5683 | 19/01/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 12/03/1966 | 5.15 | |||||
D5684 | 26/01/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1965 | 4.22 | |||||
D5685 | 02/02/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 12/1966 | 5.87 | 23.75 | 10/09/1990 | |||
D5686 | 09/02/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 11/09/1965 | 4.59 | 33.16 | 01/11/1998 | |||
D5687 | 16/02/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1965 | 4.33 | 23.73 | 02/03/1989 | |||
D5688 | 23/02/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 05/1966 | 5.22 | 23.68 | 12/01/1990 | |||
D5689 | 02/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 03/1966 | 5.04 | 20.82 | 05/01/1987 | |||
D5690 | 09/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 05/1967 | 6.19 | 16.05 | 29/05/1983 | |||
D5691 | 16/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 05/1966 | 5.17 | 39.57 | 30/11/2005 | |||
D5692 | 23/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 05/1967 | 6.15 | 39.07 | 31/05/2006 | |||
D5693 | 30/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 03/1967 | 5.96 | 34.43 | 10/08/2001 | |||
D5694 | 13/04/1961 | Stratford | 12/1966 | 5.68 | 24.33 | 08/04/1991 | |||
D5695 | 20/04/1961 | Stratford | 06/11/1968 | 7.55 | |||||
D5696 | 04/05/1961 | Stratford | 09/12/1967 | 6.60 | 25.00 | 01/12/1992 | |||
D5697 | 11/05/1961 | Stratford | 26/06/1965 | 4.13 | 30.45 | 01/12/1995 | |||
D5698 | 18/05/1961 | Stratford | 02/1967 | 5.75 | 33.01 | 11/02/2000 | |||
D5699 | 27/04/1961 | Stratford | 04/1967 | 5.97 | 24.56 | 01/11/1991 | |||
D5800 | 01/06/1961 | March | 07/1966 | 5.12 | 33.89 | 26/05/2000 | |||
D5801 | 08/06/1961 | Stratford | 03/1967 | 5.77 | 30.15 | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5802 | 15/06/1961 | March | 10/1966 | 5.34 | 28.85 | 15/08/1995 | |||
D5803 | 22/06/1961 | March | 10/08/1967 | 6.14 | 33.70 | 12/04/2001 | |||
D5804 | 29/06/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 03/1967 | 5.71 | 24.48 | 01/09/1991 | |||
D5805 | 06/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 24/09/1966 | 5.22 | 38.38 | 31/01/2005 | |||
D5806 | 13/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 02/1967 | 5.60 | 33.01 | 11/02/2000 | |||
D5807 | 20/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 07/1966 | 4.99 | 28.57 | 01/02/1995 | |||
D5808 | 20/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1967 | 5.74 | 21.97 | 29/03/1989 | |||
D5809 | 27/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 07/1967 | 5.97 | |||||
D5810 | 03/08/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1967 | 5.70 | 21.54 | 24/10/1988 | |||
D5811 | 24/08/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 03/1967 | 5.56 | 22.18 | 15/05/1989 | |||
D5812 | 31/08/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1967 | 5.79 | 29.90 | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5813 | 07/09/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 30/11/1966 | 5.23 | 27.15 | 17/01/1994 | |||
D5814 | 14/09/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1967 | 5.75 | 31.65 | 01/02/1999 | |||
D5815 | 21/09/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 10/1966 | 5.07 | 23.07 | 03/11/1989 | |||
D5816 | 28/09/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 03/1967 | 5.46 | 22.48 | 30/08/1989 | |||
D5817 | 05/10/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1967 | 5.70 | |||||
D5818 | 12/10/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 07/1967 | 5.76 | 24.45 | 20/12/1991 | |||
D5819 | 19/10/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1967 | 5.49 | 20.42 | 09/09/1987 | |||
D5820 | 26/10/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1967 | 5.47 | 24.00 | 08/04/1991 | |||
D5821 | 02/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 16/08/1967 | 5.79 | 24.56 | 01/03/1992 | |||
D5822 | 09/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1967 | 5.43 | 32.83 | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5823 | 16/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1967 | 5.58 | |||||
D5824 | 23/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 05/1967 | 5.48 | 28.15 | 01/07/1995 | |||
D5825 | 30/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 10/1966 | 4.88 | 23.33 | 07/02/1990 | |||
D5826 | 07/12/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/09/1967 | 5.75 | 23.19 | 09/11/1990 | |||
D5827 | 14/12/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 05/1967 | 5.42 | 32.75 | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5828 | 28/12/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1967 | 5.47 | 28.57 | 01/01/1996 | |||
D5829 | 04/01/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 02/1967 | 5.12 | 26.81 | 01/12/1993 | |||
D5830 | 11/01/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 10/1967 | 5.76 | 30.32 | 01/02/1998 | |||
D5831 | 18/01/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 10/1967 | 5.74 | 19.74 | 06/07/1987 | |||
D5832 | 01/02/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 16/11/1967 | 5.79 | 22.92 | 10/10/1990 | |||
D5833 | 15/02/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 08/12/1967 | 5.81 | 29.42 | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5834 | 01/03/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 10/1966 | 4.63 | |||||
D5835 | 26/04/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1968 | 5.98 | 31.77 | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5836 | 12/04/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 01/1968 | 5.76 | 27.98 | 01/01/1996 | |||
D5837 | 19/04/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 10/1967 | 5.49 | 32.27 | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5838 | 26/04/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 16/12/1967 | 5.64 | 23.91 | 08/11/1991 | |||
D5839 | 03/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 02/1968 | 5.79 | |||||
D5840 | 10/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 13/11/1965 | 3.52 | 30.32 | 01/03/1996 | |||
D5841 | 17/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 03/1965 | 2.83 | |||||
D5842 | 24/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1967 | 5.06 | 28.32 | 01/10/1995 | |||
D5843 | 31/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1967 | 5.04 | 23.83 | 08/04/1991 | |||
D5844 | 07/06/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 11/09/1965 | 3.27 | |||||
D5845 | 14/06/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 08/1965 | 3.17 | 23.50 | 07/02/1989 | |||
D5846 | 21/06/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 13/11/1965 | 3.40 | 30.19 | 14/01/1996 | |||
D5847 | 28/06/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 10/11/1967 | 5.37 | 15.56 | 31/05/1983 | |||
D5848 | 05/07/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 02/1965 | 2.62 | 17.60 | 19/09/1982 | |||
D5849 | 12/07/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1965 | 2.76 | 32.98 | 01/04/1998 | |||
D5850 | 18/07/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1965 | 2.75 | 30.57 | 01/11/1995 | |||
D5851 | 26/07/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 21/09/1968 | 6.16 | |||||
D5852 | 02/08/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 30/11/1967 | 5.33 | 28.27 | 01/03/1996 | |||
D5853 | 23/08/1962 | Stratford | 01/1968 | 5.40 | 39.32 | 30/04/2007 | |||
D5854 | 23/08/1962 | Stratford | 10/1967 | 5.15 | 22.55 | 28/04/1990 | |||
D5855 | 30/08/1962 | March | 08/1965 | 2.96 | |||||
D5856 | 30/08/1962 | March | 01/1966 | 3.38 | 39.90 | 30/11/2005 | |||
D5857 | 06/09/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 07/09/1967 | 5.01 | 21.90 | 28/07/1989 | |||
D5858 | 20/09/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 18/11/1967 | 5.16 | 21.57 | 08/06/1989 | |||
D5859 | 04/10/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 13/11/1965 | 3.11 | 27.44 | 16/04/1993 | |||
D5860 | 11/10/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 02/1968 | 5.35 | 22.89 | 01/01/1991 | |||
D5861 | 18/10/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 04/1965 | 2.49 | 26.40 | 01/09/1991 | |||
D5862 | 25/10/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 03/1966 | 3.39 |
The following reports are available.
- Build dates and withdrawal dates of several classes combined
- Weight/Height/Length/Wheelbase/Wheel Diameter comparisons of locomotive classes
- Maximum speed of locomotive classes
- Diesel locomotive classes by Power Unit
- Western Region Diesel Hydraulics lifespan
- Class 52 'Western' Liveries
- Timelines graph of up to ten classes of locomotive
- Locomotive classes by longevity
- Individual locomotives by longevity
- LNWR 0-8-0/2-8-0 rebuilds
- Snapshot of All Locomotives by Class on a user defined date
- Great Western 4-6-0 identification
- Early Casualties - Diesel and Electric
- Robinson GCR Class 8K/8M 2-8-0 (LNER Class O4/O5/O1) and ROD derivatives
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) re-engine schedule: Mirrlees to English Electric
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) headcode style
- NBL Type 2 (Class 21/29) re-engine schedule: MAN to Paxman
- Incidents of fires on diesel locomotives, 1961-1964
If there are any reports you would like to see, please contact me - see the Contact tab above.