Depot: Truro
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Truro | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3153 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | TR | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4911 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | TR | m/e | 06/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6100 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | TR | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4950 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | TR | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4991 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | TR | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4559 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | TR | on | 15/06/1947 | SBZ | St Blazey |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4098 | on | 27/01/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 06/03/1937 | TR | on | 18/08/1937 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4087 | on | 07/05/1937 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 08/07/1937 | TR | on | 15/10/1937 | PZ | Penzance |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5028 | on | 03/01/1938 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 06/1938 | TR | m/e | 10/1938 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4032 | on | 01/04/1933 | LA | Laira | m/e | 07/1938 | TR | m/e | 10/1938 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4087 | on | 04/02/1939 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 28/06/1939 | TR | on | 03/01/1941 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | on | 06/01/1936 | LA | Laira | m/e | 08/1939 | TR | on | 31/12/1939 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4581 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | TR | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | Truro | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4532 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | TR | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | Truro |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1023 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | EXE | Exeter | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1782 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | m/e | 11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4523 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4532 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | TR | Truro | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4554 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | na | Kingsbridge | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | m/e | 31/03/1948 | PZ | Penzance |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4561 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4569 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4581 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | TR | Truro | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4588 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4589 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4906 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4929 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4936 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5500 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5526 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 82D | Westbury | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5537 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 83G | Penzance | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5562 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83G | Penzance | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5779 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 83B | Taunton | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6373 | on | 01/01/1934 | 121 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 83D | Laira | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6931 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7422 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | EXE | Exeter | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1753 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | m/e | 04/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4554 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | PZ | Penzance | m/e | 30/06/1948 | TR | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1799 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | TR | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6872 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | TR | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4504 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | PZ | Penzance | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | TR | m/e | 06/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4167 | on | 22/10/1948 | NA | Newton Abbot (New) | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | TR | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2097 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | TR | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1004 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1023 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | EXE | Exeter | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8412 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1013 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5515 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5515 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4032 | on | 27/06/1950 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 83F | m/e | 10/1950 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5551 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5551 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5150 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8404 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5150 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8404 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 83F | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9434 | on | 31/01/1951 (New) | 83F | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83F | Truro | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9434 | on | 31/01/1951 | 83F | Truro (New) | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83F | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1023 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 83F | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1023 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 83F | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4952 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83F | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4952 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 83F | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5376 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 83F | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5376 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 83F | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8485 | on | 30/06/1952 (New) | 83F | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83F | Truro | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8486 | on | 30/06/1952 (New) | 83F | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83F | Truro | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8485 | on | 30/06/1952 | 83F | Truro (New) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83F | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8486 | on | 30/06/1952 | 83F | Truro (New) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83F | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8486 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 83F | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8486 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 83F | Truro | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 83F | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 81B | Slough |
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 5147 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83F | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5193 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83F | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5196 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83F | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1010 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 83F | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4598 | on | 15/06/1947 | SBZ | St Blazey | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83F | m/e | 12/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4985 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5985 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83F | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6827 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4570 | on | 15/06/1947 | SBZ | St Blazey | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83F | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5505 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 83F | m/e | 05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6848 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 83F | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7814 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 83F | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4587 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 83F | m/e | 08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5972 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 83F | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1007 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 83F | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1006 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83F | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5552 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83F | m/e | 10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7806 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83F | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4523 | on | 19/11/1953 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 83F | m/e | 10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3702 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 83F | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1023 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 83F | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6849 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 83F | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7823 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 83F | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 8104 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4106 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4107 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4134 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5102 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7823 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9434 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4508 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6300 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9311 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6871 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9311 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 83F | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4574 | on | 15/06/1947 | PZ | Penzance | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 83F | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4924 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 83F | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4928 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 83F | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5376 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 83F | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6805 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83F | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5525 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 83F | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4508 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83F | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3526 | on | 20/06/1958 (New) | 83F | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3527 | on | 20/06/1958 (New) | 83F | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3510 | on | 02/05/1958 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83F | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5559 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83F | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5361 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 83F | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6805 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 83F | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6823 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 83F | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5533 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 83F | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6828 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 83F | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6855 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 83F | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6879 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 83F | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83E | St Blazey |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3509 | on | 02/05/1958 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 83F | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5546 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83F | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9476 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 83F | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4108 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83F | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7812 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83F | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 89D | Oswestry |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4622 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 83F | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7813 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 83F | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7820 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 83F | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4593 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83F | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5509 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83F | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5538 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83F | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6770 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83F | on | 30/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3709 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 83F | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4673 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 83F | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5744 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 83F | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5544 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83F | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4549 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 83F | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5509 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 83F | m/e | 12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3509 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83F | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 84B | St Blazey |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6854 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 83F | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4567 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 83F | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 83D | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3526 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83D | Laira | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 84C | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 84B | St Blazey |