NER/LNER Raven "B15" Class 4-6-0
Class | NER | LNER (1946 1st) | LNER (1946 2nd) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
B15 | 782 | 1313 | 1691 | 12/1911 | HTN HLD YK HLD W |
Heaton Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
12/1911 24/10/1923 06/09/1926 22/09/1926 21/12/1946 |
21/12/1946 |
B15 | 786 | 12/1911 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
12/1911 18/09/1937 |
18/09/1937 | ||
B15 | 787 | 1314 | 1692 | 02/1912 | HTN YK SBK HLD W |
Heaton York (North) Starbeck Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
02/1912 09/03/1924 03/10/1938 28/03/1943 21/12/1946 |
21/12/1946 |
B15 | 788 | 02/1912 | HTN YK HLD W |
Heaton York (North) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
02/1912 09/03/1924 22/07/1929 02/09/1937 |
02/09/1937 | ||
B15 | 791 | 02/1912 | HTN SBK W |
Heaton Starbeck Withdrawn |
02/1912 31/07/1936 23/10/1937 |
23/10/1937 | ||
B15 | 795 | 1315 | 03/1912 | HTN HLD W |
Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
03/1912 30/03/1939 08/12/1945 |
08/12/1945 | |
B15 | 796 | 1316 | 03/1912 | HTN HLD SBK HLD W |
Heaton Hull Dairycoates Starbeck Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
03/1912 30/03/1939 27/05/1940 28/03/1943 18/12/1945 |
18/12/1945 | |
B15 | 797 | 05/1912 | HTN YK SEL W |
Heaton York (North) Selby Withdrawn |
05/1912 09/03/1924 08/09/1936 25/11/1937 |
25/11/1937 | ||
B15 | 798 | 1317 | 06/1912 | HTN HLD W |
Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
06/1912 30/03/1939 16/10/1945 |
16/10/1945 | |
B15 | 799 | 06/1912 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
06/1912 25/11/1937 |
25/11/1937 | ||
B15 | 813 | 1318 | 09/1912 | SCA YK NEV HLD W |
Scarborough York (North) Neville Hill Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
09/1912 01/1924 14/04/1939 28/03/1943 18/03/1944 |
18/03/1944 | |
B15 | 815 | 1319 | 1693 | 09/1912 | DON HLD YK HLD W |
Doncaster Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
09/1912 01/05/1924 06/09/1926 22/09/1926 31/05/1947 |
31/05/1947 |
B15 | 817 | 1320 | 1694 | 10/1912 | YK HLD W |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
10/1912 28/09/1937 06/04/1946 |
06/04/1946 |
B15 | 819 | 1321 | 1695 | 10/1912 | NEV HLD W |
Neville Hill Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
10/1912 28/03/1943 21/12/1946 |
21/12/1946 |
B15 | 820 | 1322 | 1696 | 11/1912 | YK DON YK NEV HLD W |
York (North) Doncaster York (North) Neville Hill Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
11/1912 11/08/1925 01/04/1926 10/04/1939 06/03/1940 27/12/1947 |
27/12/1947 |
B15 | 821 | 1323 | 1697 | 11/1912 | YK NEV HLD W |
York (North) Neville Hill Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
11/1912 14/04/1939 06/03/1940 02/11/1946 |
02/11/1946 |
B15 | 822 | 1324 | 11/1912 | YK NEV HLD W |
York (North) Neville Hill Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
11/1912 14/04/1939 28/03/1943 05/02/1944 |
05/02/1944 | |
B15 | 823 | 1325 | 12/1912 | YK DON YK HLD W |
York (North) Doncaster York (North) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
12/1912 11/08/1925 01/04/1926 22/07/1929 21/10/1944 |
21/10/1944 | |
B15 | 824 | 1326 | 1698 | 12/1912 | DAR NEV SBK HLD W |
Darlington Neville Hill Starbeck (Re-instd) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
12/1912 28/06/1932 12/08/1939 20/11/1939 28/03/1943 27/04/1946 |
27/04/1946 |
B15 | 825 | 1327 | 03/1913 | HTN HLD W |
Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
03/1913 30/03/1939 26/02/1944 |
26/02/1944 |