Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1936 |
For | 80 Steam locomotives |
Class | Grange |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6800 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/08/1936 | 15/06/1964 | ||
6801 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 31/08/1936 | 27/10/1960 | ||
6802 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/09/1936 | 09/08/1961 | ||
6803 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/09/1936 | 25/09/1965 | ||
6804 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/09/1936 | 10/08/1964 | ||
6805 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 16/09/1936 | 22/03/1961 | ||
6806 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 21/09/1936 | 23/10/1964 | ||
6807 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/09/1936 | 28/12/1963 | ||
6808 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 24/09/1936 | 15/08/1964 | ||
6809 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 29/09/1936 | 01/07/1963 | ||
6810 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 21/11/1936 | 23/10/1964 | ||
6811 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 25/11/1936 | 18/07/1964 | ||
6812 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/11/1936 | 20/02/1965 | ||
6813 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/12/1936 | 10/09/1965 | ||
6814 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/12/1936 | 16/12/1963 | ||
6815 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/12/1936 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6816 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 17/12/1936 | 21/07/1965 | ||
6817 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/12/1936 | 21/04/1965 | ||
6818 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/12/1936 | 08/04/1964 | ||
6819 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/12/1936 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6820 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/01/1937 | 21/07/1965 | ||
6821 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 13/01/1937 | 06/11/1964 | ||
6822 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 19/01/1937 | 28/09/1964 | ||
6823 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 21/01/1937 | 26/06/1965 | ||
6824 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 30/01/1937 | 08/04/1964 | ||
6825 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/02/1937 | 15/06/1964 | ||
6826 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 16/02/1937 | 07/05/1965 | ||
6827 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 26/02/1937 | 25/09/1965 | ||
6828 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 25/02/1937 | 23/07/1963 | ||
6829 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/03/1937 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6830 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/08/1937 | 09/10/1965 | ||
6831 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 09/08/1937 | 16/10/1965 | ||
6832 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 13/08/1937 | 15/01/1964 | ||
6833 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/08/1937 | 16/10/1965 | ||
6834 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/08/1937 | 27/06/1964 | ||
6835 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/09/1937 | 24/05/1963 | ||
6836 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/09/1937 | 06/08/1965 | ||
6837 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/09/1937 | 21/07/1965 | ||
6838 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/09/1937 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6839 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 16/09/1937 | 09/05/1964 | ||
6840 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 20/09/1937 | 20/02/1965 | ||
6841 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/09/1937 | 03/06/1965 | ||
6842 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 28/09/1937 | 07/11/1964 | ||
6843 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/10/1937 | 26/02/1964 | ||
6844 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/10/1937 | 08/04/1964 | ||
6845 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/10/1937 | 26/09/1964 | ||
6846 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/10/1937 | 28/09/1964 | ||
6847 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 20/10/1937 | 03/12/1965 | ||
6848 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/10/1937 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6849 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 25/10/1937 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6850 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 30/10/1937 | 14/12/1964 | ||
6851 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/11/1937 | 14/08/1965 | ||
6852 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 09/11/1937 | 22/01/1964 | ||
6853 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/11/1937 | 16/10/1965 | ||
6854 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 13/11/1937 | 25/09/1965 | ||
6855 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 24/11/1937 | 23/10/1965 | ||
6856 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 26/11/1937 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6857 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/11/1937 | 09/10/1965 | ||
6858 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/12/1937 | 09/10/1965 | ||
6859 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/12/1937 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6860 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/02/1939 | 06/02/1965 | ||
6861 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/02/1939 | 16/10/1965 | ||
6862 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/02/1939 | 19/06/1965 | ||
6863 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 21/02/1939 | 13/11/1964 | ||
6864 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 24/02/1939 | 09/10/1965 | ||
6865 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/03/1939 | 08/05/1962 | ||
6866 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/03/1939 | 29/05/1965 | ||
6867 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 08/03/1939 | 10/08/1964 | ||
6868 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/03/1939 | 26/10/1965 | ||
6869 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 15/03/1939 | 21/07/1965 | ||
6870 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 25/03/1939 | 11/09/1965 | ||
6871 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 29/03/1939 | 16/10/1965 | ||
6872 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1939 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6873 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/04/1939 | 15/06/1964 | ||
6874 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/04/1939 | 10/09/1965 | ||
6875 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 15/04/1939 | 10/03/1964 | ||
6876 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 20/04/1939 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6877 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/04/1939 | 08/03/1965 | ||
6878 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/05/1939 | 27/11/1964 | ||
6879 | Grange | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/05/1939 | 16/10/1965 |