Depot: Oban
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15187 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15215 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15263 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17396 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17411 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 17411 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 06/06/1950 | 55198 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 55198 | Transfer in from: | 63E | Oban | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 55198 | Transfer out to: | 63E | Oban | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 04/02/1951 | 55198 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 55187 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 55195 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 55195 | Transfer in from: | 63E | Oban | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 55195 | Transfer out to: | 63E | Oban | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 57424 | Transfer in from: | 31B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 57396 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 05/09/1953 | 55226 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 55226 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 44707 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 55208 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 55195 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 57576 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 57276 | Transfer in from: | 30C | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 57576 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 57368 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 57424 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 44707 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/08/1956 | 55200 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 57667 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 57368 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/01/1957 | 55220 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/01/1957 | 55200 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1957 | 55213 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 06/05/1958 | 55213 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 57689 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 57571 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 57689 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 55126 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 57276 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 55224 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 55230 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1960 | 76001 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 57635 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 76001 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Fort William | ||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 55237 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 55124 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 55204 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 55207 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 55233 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 55260 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 46468 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | 46468 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 46468 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | on | 13/07/1961 | 55237 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | on | 19/07/1961 | 55126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 46460 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 55173 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 55124 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 13/09/1961 | 55207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 14/09/1961 | 55230 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 15/09/1961 | 55233 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1961 | 57587 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1961 | 57667 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 02/10/1961 | 55208 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 02/10/1961 | 55215 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 02/10/1961 | 55220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 02/10/1961 | 55224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 55217 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 57571 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | on | 13/11/1961 | 55263 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 04/01/1962 | 55173 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1962 | 57635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 46468 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 55204 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 55260 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1962 | 57587 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 30/07/1962 | 55217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1963 | 46460 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South |