Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2025 Today
» 4706 Yesterday
» 23594 Week
» 14650 Month
» 361074 Year
» 3387927 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2412
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4088 |
DARTMOUTH CASTLE |
09/01/1929 |
Castle |
5008 |
RAGLAN CASTLE |
22/07/1929 |
Castle |
4078 |
PEMBROKE CASTLE |
12/12/1932 |
Castle |
5026 |
CRICCIETH CASTLE |
24/04/1934 |
Star |
4071 |
CLEEVE ABBEY |
10/12/1938 |
Castle |
5027 |
FARLEIGH CASTLE |
21/07/1945 |
Castle |
5031 |
TOTNES CASTLE |
24/10/1945 |
Castle |
5090 |
NEATH ABBEY |
14/06/1947 |
Castle |
5041 |
TIVERTON CASTLE |
04/10/1947 |
Castle |
5044 |
EARL OF DUNRAVEN |
04/10/1947 |
Castle |
5092 |
TRESCO ABBEY |
02/02/1949 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
10/05/1955 |
Castle |
7023 |
PENRICE CASTLE |
25/08/1955 |
Castle |
7010 |
AVONDALE CASTLE |
04/09/1962 |
|