Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 854 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31504 Week
» 130149 Month
» 332813 Year
» 3359666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LMS Stanier "6P5F" Class 2-6-0 - 'Lobster'
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
LMS |
13246 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2946 |
1934 |
|
21/04/1934 |
|
LMS |
13276 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2976 |
1934 |
|
01/08/1934 |
|
LMS |
13251 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2951 |
1934 |
|
11/08/1934 |
|
LMS |
13265 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2965 |
1934 |
|
11/09/1934 |
|
LMS |
13261 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2961 |
1934 |
|
29/10/1934 |
|
LMS |
13259 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2959 |
1934 |
|
22/11/1934 |
|
LMS |
13245 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2945 |
1934 |
|
14/12/1934 |
|
LMS |
13262 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2962 |
1934 |
|
15/12/1934 |
|
LMS |
13263 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2963 |
1934 |
y/e |
1935 |
|
LMS |
13256 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2956 |
1934 |
|
30/01/1935 |
|
LMS |
13257 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2957 |
1934 |
|
29/03/1935 |
|
LMS |
13253 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2953 |
1934 |
|
13/04/1935 |
|
LMS |
13255 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2955 |
1934 |
|
15/04/1935 |
|
LMS |
13282 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2982 |
1934 |
|
16/04/1935 |
|
LMS |
13260 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2960 |
1934 |
|
18/04/1935 |
|
LMS |
13284 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2984 |
1934 |
|
03/05/1935 |
|
LMS |
13281 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2981 |
1934 |
|
27/05/1935 |
|
LMS |
13270 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2970 |
1934 |
|
13/06/1935 |
|
LMS |
13283 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2983 |
1934 |
|
01/07/1935 |
|
LMS |
13278 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2978 |
1934 |
|
22/07/1935 |
|
LMS |
13279 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2979 |
1934 |
|
25/07/1935 |
|
LMS |
13280 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2980 |
1934 |
|
29/07/1935 |
|
LMS |
13269 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2969 |
1934 |
|
21/08/1935 |
|
LMS |
13248 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2948 |
1934 |
|
30/08/1935 |
|
LMS |
13268 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2968 |
1934 |
|
20/09/1935 |
|
LMS |
13247 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2947 |
1934 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
|
LMS |
13250 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2950 |
1934 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
|
LMS |
13275 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2975 |
1934 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
|
LMS |
13267 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2967 |
1934 |
|
11/12/1935 |
|
LMS |
13249 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2949 |
1934 |
4w/e |
31/12/1935 |
|
LMS |
13254 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2954 |
1934 |
4w/e |
31/12/1935 |
|
LMS |
13271 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2971 |
1934 |
4w/e |
31/12/1935 |
|
LMS |
13266 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2966 |
1934 |
|
30/01/1936 |
|
LMS |
13272 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2972 |
1934 |
|
05/02/1936 |
|
LMS |
13264 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2964 |
1934 |
|
11/02/1936 |
|
LMS |
13274 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2974 |
1934 |
|
25/02/1936 |
|
LMS |
13252 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2952 |
1934 |
|
02/03/1936 |
|
LMS |
13277 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2977 |
1934 |
|
12/03/1936 |
|
LMS |
13273 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2973 |
1934 |
|
11/04/1936 |
|
LMS |
13258 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
2958 |
1934 |
|
15/06/1936 |
|
LMS |
2958 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42958 |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2964 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42964 |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2954 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42954 |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2975 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42975 |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2973 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42973 |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2967 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42967 |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2962 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42962 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2961 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42961 |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2983 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42983 |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2948 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42948 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2977 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42977 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2984 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42984 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2982 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42982 |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2947 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42947 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2978 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42978 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2979 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42979 |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2968 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42968 |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2946 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42946 |
|
|
31/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2952 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42952 |
|
|
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2971 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42971 |
|
|
17/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2956 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42956 |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2950 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42950 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2955 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42955 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2957 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42957 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2966 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42966 |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2976 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42976 |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2953 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42953 |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2972 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42972 |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2965 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42965 |
|
|
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
2981 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42981 |
|
|
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
2945 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42945 |
|
|
10/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
2969 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42969 |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
2980 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42980 |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
2963 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42963 |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
2949 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42949 |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2960 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42960 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
2974 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42974 |
|
|
01/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
2951 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42951 |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
2970 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42970 |
|
w/e |
16/12/1950 |
|
LMS |
2959 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42959 |
|
|
06/01/1951 |
|