BR
Database
Complete BR Locomotive Database 1948-1997
Home
Guestbook
Contact
Links
Preferences
Menu
Locomotives
Build Dates
Withdrawals
Names
Snapshots
Regional
Locomotives
Workings
ReClassifications
Pilot Scheme
Prototypes
Preservation
Diesels
Electrics
Steam
Classes
Steam
Standards
GWR
1850-1947
Barry
Brecon & Merthyr Junction
Burry Port & Gwendraeth Valley
Cambrian
Cardiff
Midland & South Western Junction
Powlesland & Mason
Port Talbot
Rhymney
Swansea Harbour Trust
Taff Vale
Vale of Rheidol
SR
1923-1947
London South Western
London, Brighton & South Coast
South Eastern & Chatham
LNER
LNER Designs 1923-1947
Great Central
Great Eastern
Great Northern
Great North of Scotland
Hull and Barnsley
Midland and Great Northern
North British
North Eastern
LMS
LMS Designs 1923-1947
Caledonian
Furness
Glasgow & South Western
Highland
London & North Western
London, Tilbury & Southend
Lancashire & Yorkshire
Maryport & Carlisle
Midland
North Staffordshire
Somerset & Dorset
ex WD
by Wheels
2 Driver Tank Engines
2-2-4T
2 Driver Tender Engines
2-2-2
4 Coupled Tank Engines
0-4-0T
0-4-0ST
0-4-2T
0-4-2ST
0-4-4T
2-4-0T
2-4-0WT
2-4-2T
4-4-0T
4-4-2T
4-4-4T
4 Coupled Tender Engines
0-4-0
0-4-2
0-4-4
2-4-0
2-4-2
4-4-0
4-4-2
4-4-4
6 Coupled Tank Engines
0-6-0T
0-6-0PT
0-6-0ST
0-6-2T
0-6-2ST
0-6-4T
2-6-0T
2-6-2T
2-6-4T
4-6-0T
4-6-2T
4-6-4T
6 Coupled Tender Engines
0-6-0
0-6-2
0-6-4
2-6-0
2-6-2
2-6-4
4-6-0
4-6-2
4-6-4
8 Coupled Tank Engines
0-8-0T
0-8-2T
0-8-4T
2-8-0T
2-8-2T
8 Coupled Tender Engines
0-8-0
0-8-2
0-8-4
2-8-0
2-8-2
10 Coupled Tank Engines
0-10-0T
10 Coupled Tender Engines
0-10-0
2-10-0
Special
0-6-6-0T
2-6-6-2T
2-8-8-2T
Diesel
Shunters
Type 1
Type 2
Type 3
Type 4
Type 5
Electric
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Multiple Units
Steam Railmotors
GWR Railmotors
LNER Railmotors
LMS Railmotors
Diesel Multiple Units
GWR Railcars
LNER Railcars
1st Generation DMU's
2nd Generation DMU's
DEMU's
Pullman
HST
Electric Multiple Units
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Sites
Depots
Builders
Locomotive Works
Scrapyards
People
Chief Mechanical Engineers
Management
Miscellaneous
Companies
British Railways
GWR & Constituents
Taff Vale
Rhymney
Cambrian
Barry
Cardiff Railway
SR & Constituents
LSWR
LBSCR
SECR
LNER & Constituents
GER
GCR
GNR
MGNR
NER
NBR
GNSR
ex LMS
MR
LNWR
LYR
LTSR
S&DJR
G&SWR
CR
HR
Timelines
Line Closures
Workings
Events
News Stories
Miscellaneous
Reports
Graphs
Anecdotes
Headcodes
Royal Trains
Accidents
Wheel Arrangements
Modernisation Plan 1955
The Beeching Plan
Generate an ABC!
Background Images
On This Day ...
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.
?
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 3280 Today
» 3782 Yesterday
» 23442 Week
» 99755 Month
» 401776 Year
» 2802240 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(
Free MySQL Counter
)
Locomotives of the Rhymney Railway
Build Date
RR Class
GWR Class
First RR Number
Wheels
Designer
Manufacturer
Order Number
Works Number
Withdrawn
06/1904
M
47
0-6-2T
R. Jenkins
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
18/04/1949
08/1904
M
110
0-6-2T
R. Jenkins
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
25/10/1948
30/08/1904
M
33
0-6-2T
R. Jenkins
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
06/02/1951
12/1907
R
30
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
09/05/1949
12/1907
R
31
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
09/03/1951
12/1907
R
32
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
20/02/1950
06/1908
S
111
0-6-0T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
04/05/1954
07/1908
S
112
0-6-0T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
17/05/1954
07/1908
S
113
0-6-0T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
28/09/1953
08/1908
S
114
0-6-0T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
30/04/1954
07/1909
P
76
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
01/11/1950
07/1909
P
82
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
17/05/1954
08/1909
P
83
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
09/05/1955
09/1909
R
34
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
24/11/1949
10/1909
R
46
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
10/07/1950
05/1910
A
52
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
29/11/1949
05/1910
A
53
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
13/06/1949
05/1910
A
54
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
24/04/1948
05/1910
A
55
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
04/02/1953
05/1910
A
56
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
28/09/1953
06/1910
A
71
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
06/12/1948
07/1910
A
72
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
26/02/1952
07/1910
A
73
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
11/07/1952
07/1910
A
74
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
20/01/1951
07/1910
A
75
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
26/10/1953
04/1911
A
57
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
29/04/1952
05/1911
A
58
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
08/09/1954
06/1911
A
59
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
29/07/1955
07/1911
A
60
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
13/03/1951
08/1911
A
61
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
20/02/1950
09/1911
A
62
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
06/12/1948
06/1914
A1
63
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
08/09/1952
07/1914
A1
64
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
22/05/1950
08/1914
A1
65
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
01/02/1954
03/1916
A1
66
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
12/07/1955
07/1916
A1
67
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
18/09/1952
04/1917
P
77
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
23/11/1953
09/1918
A1
68
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
29/06/1954
09/1918
A1
69
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
21/07/1955
09/1918
A1
70
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
28/07/1955
06/1920
S1
32
0-6-0T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
1409
18/03/1954
07/1920
S1
33
0-6-0T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
1410
11/06/1954
07/1920
S1
34
0-6-0T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
1406
11/06/1954
07/1921
R1
35
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
12/11/1956
07/1921
R1
36
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
08/10/1957
08/1921
AP
78
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
02/08/1955
08/1921
AP
79
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
21/07/1955
09/1921
R1
37
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
24/09/1956
09/1921
R1
38
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
08/10/1957
11/1921
AP
80
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
01/02/1954
11/1921
AP
81
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Hudswell Clarke
??
17/05/1954
12/1921
R1
39
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
22/08/1955
12/1921
R1
40
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
26/10/1953
12/1921
R1
41
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
22/05/1956
12/1921
R1
42
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
16/09/1957
12/1921
R1
43
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
25/02/1957
12/1921
R1
44
0-6-2T
C. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
23/07/1956