Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 5343 Today
» 4610 Yesterday
» 5343 Week
» 84278 Month
» 563504 Year
» 3590357 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
Locomotives of the Caledonian Railway
Build Date CR Class LMS Class First CR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
1873 446   446 0-4-0T B. Connor Dübs & Co ?? 630 08/1926
1873 446   447 0-4-0T B. Connor Dübs & Co ?? 631 08/1926
1876 502   502 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2122 1921
1876 502   503 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2123 09/1939
1876 502   504 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2124 1919
1876 502   505 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2202 01/1939
1878 502   528 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2347 1920
1878 502   529 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2348 1940
1878 502   530 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2349 1917
1878 502   531 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2350 1918
1878 670   670 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1138 1922
1878 670   671 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1139 1922
1878 670   672 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1140 1925
1878 670   673 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1141 1925
1878 670   674 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1142 1930
1878 670   675 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1143 1929
1878 670   676 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1144 1930
1878 670   677 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1145 1927
1878 670   678 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1146 1922
1878 670   679 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1147 1927
1881 486   1 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2697 1913
1881 486   2 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2698 1913
1881 486   4 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2699 07/1919
1881 486   486 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2697 1913
1881 486   487 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2698 1913
1881 486   488 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2699 07/1919
1881 486   489 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2700 1928
1881 486   490 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2701 1921
1881 486   491 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2702 1921
1881 486   5 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2700 1928
1881 502   532 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2741 1926
1881 502   533 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2742 1921
1881 502   534 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2743 1929
1881 502   535 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2744 1921
1881 502   536 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2745 1922
1881 502   537 0-4-0ST B. Connor Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2746 1922
1881 486   6 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2701 1921
1881 486   7 0-6-0ST G. Brittain Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2702 1921
1881 670   700 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1485 1923
1881 670   701 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1486 1922
1881 670   702 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1487 1923
1881 670   703 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1488 1928
1881 670   704 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1489 1922
1881 670   705 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1490 1932
1881 670   706 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1491 1920
1881 670   707 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1492 1927
1881 670   708 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1493 1930
1881 670   709 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1494 1922
1881 670   710 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1495 1928
1881 670   711 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1496 1928
1881 670   712 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1497 1926
1882 179   179 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1672 1930
1882 179   180 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1673 1925
1882 179   181 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1674 1923
1882 179   182 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1675 1930
1882 179   183 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1676 1927
1882 179   184 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1677 1922
1882 179   185 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1678 1922
1882 179   186 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1679 1930
1882 179   187 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1680 1924
1882 179   188 4-4-0 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1681 1925
1882 670   713 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1498 1922
1882 670   714 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1499 1930
1882 670   715 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1500 1922
1882 670   716 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1501 1926
1882 670   717 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1502 1932
1882 670   718 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1503 1926
1882 670   719 0-4-2 G. Brittain Dübs & Co ?? 1504 1928
02/1882 80   81 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y13   1930
03/1882 80   85 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y13   1916
04/1882 80   116 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y13   04/1921
04/1882 80   86 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y13   08/1921
11/1883 294   294 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3043 16/07/1962
11/1883 294   295 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3044 15/05/1961
11/1883 294   296 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3045 02/10/1961
11/1883 294   297 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3046 03/1957
11/1883 294   298 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3047 02/10/1961
11/1883 294   299 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3048 25/07/1956
11/1883 294   300 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3049 04/1949
11/1883 294   349 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works RA   08/10/1962
11/1883 294   350 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works RA   12/09/1961
12/1883 294   301 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3050 28/10/1955
12/1883 294   302 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3051 12/09/1961
12/1883 294   303 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3052 29/05/1959
12/1883 294   304 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3053 16/07/1962
12/1883 294   305 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3054 17/06/1959
12/1883 294   306 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3055 13/09/1961
12/1883 294   307 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3056 02/10/1961
12/1883 294   351 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works RA   27/11/1961
12/1883 294   352 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works RA   08/10/1962
01/1884 294   308 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3057 29/07/1959
01/1884 294   353 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works RA   13/09/1961
01/1884 294   354 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works RA   08/10/1962
02/1884 66   66 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3058 01/1930
02/1884 66   67 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3059 1927
03/1884 66   68 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3060 1924
03/1884 66   69 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3061 1925
03/1884 66   70 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3062 1927
03/1884 66   71 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3063 1927
03/1884 66   72 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3064 1924
04/1884 66   73 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3065 1928
04/1884 66   74 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3066 1923
04/1884 66   75 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3067 10/1929
05/1884 171   171 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   11/1921
06/1884 171   172 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   1925
06/1884 171   173 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   08/1922
07/1884 171   174 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   1924
07/1884 171   175 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   1928
07/1884 294   517 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3252 23/08/1963
07/1884 294   518 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3253 22/11/1962
07/1884 294   519 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3254 08/10/1962
08/1884 171   176 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   03/1921
08/1884 294   520 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3255 30/07/1962
08/1884 294   521 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3256 24/03/1952
08/1884 294   522 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3257 02/10/1961
08/1884 294   523 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3258 02/10/1961
09/1884 294   524 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3259 08/10/1962
09/1884 294   525 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3260 08/10/1962
09/1884 294   526 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3261 07/10/1955
09/1884 294   680 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3262 07/11/1963
10/1884 294   681 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3263 29/11/1963
10/1884 294   682 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3264 02/10/1961
10/1884 294   683 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3265 02/10/1961
10/1884 294   684 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3266 25/10/1961
11/1884 294   685 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3267 02/10/1961
11/1884 294   686 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3268 16/07/1962
11/1884 294   687 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3269 13/12/1962
11/1884 294   688 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3270 02/04/1962
12/1884 294   689 0-6-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3271 02/10/1961
1885 66   61 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y   1925
01/00/1885 66   63 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y   11/1916
02/00/1885 66   65 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y   04/1918
02/1885 66   60 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y   10/1929
01/02/1885 66   62 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y   1931
02/02/1885 66   64 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y   12/1920
06/1885 262   262 0-4-2ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   1928
06/1885 262   263 0-4-2ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   04/1947
06/1885 264   264 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   1925
06/1885 264   265 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   12/1934
07/1885 264   266 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   1926
07/1885 264   267 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   03/1946
07/1885 264   268 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   03/1950
08/1885 264   269 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   1922
08/1885 264   270 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   06/01/1959
09/1885 264   271 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y1   1925
12/1885 294   690 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SW   20/11/1959
12/1885 294   691 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SW   01/10/1951
12/1885 294   692 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SW   01/02/1960
12/1885 294   693 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SW   30/04/1962
12/1885 294   694 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SW   02/04/1962
12/1885 294   695 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SW   26/11/1949
1886 123   123 4-2-2 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 3553 04/1935
1886 124   124 4-4-0 D. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 2245 1925
02/1886 171   177 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   11/1945
03/1886 171   178 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   06/1933
03/1886 171   228 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   09/1921
04/1886 171   229 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   1925
04/1886 171   230 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   10/1922
05/1886 171   231 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works SN   09/1922
06/1886 294   309 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   03/1946
06/1886 294   310 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   19/06/1948
06/1886 294   311 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   02/02/1951
07/1886 294   312 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   08/10/1962
07/1886 294   313 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   27/11/1961
07/1886 294   314 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   02/1949
08/1886 294   315 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   07/08/1963
08/1886 294   316 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   27/11/1961
08/1886 294   317 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   27/11/1961
09/1886 294   318 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   27/11/1961
09/1886 294   319 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   11/1947
09/1886 294   320 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y5   12/10/1951
12/1886 294   355 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   18/04/1951
12/1886 294   356 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   21/06/1963
12/1886 294   357 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   23/10/1959
12/1886 294   358 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   09/1952
12/1886 294   359 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   11/1947
12/1886 294   360 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   15/11/1955
01/1887 294   366 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   05/06/1948
01/1887 294   367 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   27/08/1951
01/1887 294   368 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   02/1949
01/1887 294   369 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   25/06/1951
01/1887 294   370 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   20/08/1959
02/1887 294   371 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y9   22/05/1948
05/1887 294   321 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   31/12/1949
05/1887 294   322 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   07/11/1963
05/1887 294   339 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   17/09/1962
06/1887 294   340 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   11/06/1962
06/1887 294   341 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   29/11/1963
06/1887 294   342 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   11/1947
07/1887 294   343 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   06/04/1950
07/1887 294   344 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   22/10/1962
07/1887 294   345 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   11/06/1962
08/1887 323   323 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y14   1926
08/1887 294   346 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   22/05/1948
08/1887 294   347 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   17/10/1963
08/1887 294   348 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y12   25/10/1961
08/1887 323   385 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y14   1930
08/1887 323   506 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y14   1928
09/1887 323   507 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y14   1928
09/1887 323   538 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y14   1929
09/1887 323   539 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y14   1930
12/1887 323 Ext   232 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y18   1928
12/1887 323 Ext   233 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y18   1927
12/1887 323 Ext   234 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y18   12/1922
12/1887 323 Ext   235 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y18   1929
01/1888 323 Ext   216 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y18   1927
01/1888 323 Ext   217 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y18   1927
02/1888 80   80 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y13   1927
03/1888 80   82 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y13   1927
04/1888 272   272 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y16   03/1922
04/1888 272   273 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y16   08/1929
04/1888 272   274 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y16   1928
05/1888 272   508 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y16   08/1922
05/1888 272   509 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y16   1928
05/1888 272   527 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y16   12/1921
11/1888 323 Ext   218 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y20   1928
11/1888 323 Ext   219 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y20   1933
12/1888 323 Ext   220 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y20   1930
12/1888 323 Ext   221 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y20   1930
12/1888 323 Ext   386 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y20   1923
12/1888 323 Ext   387 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y20   1923
02/1889 171   222 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y19   1924
02/1889 171   223 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y19   1927
02/1889 171   224 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y19   1925
02/1889 171   225 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y19   12/1923
02/1889 171   226 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y19   05/1921
02/1889 171   227 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y19   1925
04/1889 264   615 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y22   10/1935
05/1889 264   616 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y22   11/1936
05/1889 264   617 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y22   1925
06/1889 264   618 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y22   02/1924
06/1889 264   619 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y22   1920
07/1889 264   620 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y22   01/1935
07/1889 66 Y21   76 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y21   08/1920
07/1889 66 Y21   77 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y21   08/1922
08/1889 66 Y21   78 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y21   08/1921
09/1889 66 Y21   79 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y21   1928
10/1889 66 Y21   84 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y21   1927
11/1889 294   403 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   12/1948
11/1889 294   404 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   12/03/1962
11/1889 294   406 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   01/12/1955
11/1889 294   407 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   22/10/1949
11/1889 294   408 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   27/11/1961
11/1889 294   409 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   16/10/1951
11/1889 66 Y21   87 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y21   1916
01/1890 294   410 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   05/12/1961
01/1890 294   411 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   10/03/1956
01/1890 294   412 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   20/11/1961
02/1890 294   413 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   02/1953
02/1890 294   414 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   23/05/1951
02/1890 294   415 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y23   15/05/1961
04/1890 264   510 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y27   03/1955
04/1890 264   511 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y27   1924
04/1890 264   512 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y27   10/1935
05/1890 323 Ext   388 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1928
05/1890 323 Ext   389 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1925
05/1890 323 Ext   391 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1925
05/1890 264   513 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y27   1923
05/1890 264   514 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y27   1927
05/1890 264   515 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y27   05/1960
06/1890 323 Ext   392 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1928
06/1890 323 Ext   394 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   09/1922
06/1890 323 Ext   395 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1925
07/1890 323 Ext   396 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1922
07/1890 323 Ext   398 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1927
07/1890 323 Ext   399 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1928
08/1890 323 Ext   400 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1929
08/1890 323 Ext   401 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1926
08/1890 323 Ext   402 0-6-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y24   1926
01/1891 66 Y25   83 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y25   1928
01/1891 66 Y25   88 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y25   02/1930
02/1891 66 Y25   89 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y25   02/1921
02/1891 66 Y25   90 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y25   1924
03/1891 66 Y25   113 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y25   02/1921
03/1891 66 Y25   91 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y25   12/1922
04/1891 171   189 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y26   04/1917
04/1891 171   190 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y26   1928
04/1891 171   191 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y26   1924
05/1891 171   192 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y26   1925
05/1891 171   193 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y26   1924
05/1891 171   194 0-4-4T D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y26   1930
07/1891 80 Lrg   114 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y28   1927
07/1891 80 Lrg   115 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y28   08/1922
08/1891 80 Lrg   195 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y28   1923
08/1891 80 Lrg   196 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y28   1930
09/1891 80 Lrg   197 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y28   1930
09/1891 80 Lrg   198 4-4-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y28   1929
11/1891 294   372 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   04/12/1961
11/1891 294   373 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   22/04/1963
11/1891 294   374 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   01/03/1963
12/1891 294   375 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   17/04/1948
12/1891 294   376 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   08/04/1963
12/1891 294   377 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   08/10/1962
12/1891 294   378 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   12/06/1948
12/1891 294   379 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   24/09/1962
02/1892 294   540 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   14/11/1952
02/1892 294   541 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   20/03/1948
03/1892 294   542 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   07/03/1951
03/1892 294   543 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y29   30/10/1961
04/1892 294   691 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y30   06/1950
04/1892 294   692 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y30   17/04/1948
04/1892 294   693 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y30   12/1951
05/1892 294   694 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y30   12/03/1962
05/1892 294   695 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y30   20/08/1957
05/1892 294   696 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y30   26/03/1962
07/1892 294   544 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   16/09/1963
07/1892 294   545 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   04/12/1952
07/1892 294   546 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   26/03/1962
07/1892 294   547 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   30/06/1959
07/1892 294   548 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   19/07/1961
08/1892 294   549 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   20/11/1961
08/1892 294   550 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   26/03/1962
08/1892 294   551 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   29/11/1962
08/1892 294   552 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   16/07/1962
08/1892 294   553 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y31   09/1949
12/1892 294 Y32   554 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   06/1949
12/1892 294 Y32   555 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   26/03/1962
12/1892 294 Y32   556 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   14/03/1963
12/1892 294 Y32   557 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   24/12/1959
12/1892 294 Y32   558 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   05/10/1951
01/1893 294 Y32   559 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   11/06/1962
01/1893 294 Y32   560 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   04/12/1961
01/1893 294 Y32   561 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   04/12/1961
01/1893 294 Y32   562 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   21/05/1962
01/1893 294 Y32   563 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y32   27/11/1961
03/1893 294 Y32   697 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y33   11/12/1961
03/1893 294 Y32   698 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y33   12/1961
04/1893 294 Y32   699 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y33   08/10/1962
04/1893 294 Y32   700 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y33   26/03/1962
05/1893 294 Y32   701 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y33   24/07/1948
05/1893 294 Y32   702 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y33   09/01/1952
07/1893     1 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   1933
07/1893     2 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   11/1934
08/1893     3 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   12/1933
08/1893     4 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   10/1934
09/1893     5 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   10/1935
09/1893     6 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   06/1938
10/1893     7 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   1931
10/1893     8 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   08/1935
11/1893     10 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   1932
11/1893     9 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   08/1926
12/1893     11 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   1927
01/1894     12 4-4-0T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y34   1930
02/1894 294 Y32   199 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y36   19/07/1961
02/1894 294 Y32   200 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y36   22/05/1948
02/1894 294 Y32   201 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y36   29/11/1963
02/1894 294 Y32   202 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y36  
04/1894 13   13 4-4-0 J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y35   1927
04/1894 13   14 4-4-0 J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y35   11/1920
05/1894 13   15 4-4-0 J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y35   1930
05/1894 13   16 4-4-0 J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y35   10/1922
05/1894 13   17 4-4-0 J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y35   1916
05/1894 13   18 4-4-0 J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y35   1930
05/1894 294 Y37   256 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   06/10/1961
05/1894 294 Y37   257 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   24/09/1962
06/1894 294 Y37   258 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   16/02/1951
07/1894 294 Y37   259 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   27/11/1961
07/1894 294 Y37   260 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   06/05/1950
07/1894 294 Y37   261 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   24/04/1948
08/1894 294 Y37   334 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   09/1949
08/1894 294 Y37   335 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   25/10/1950
08/1894 294 Y37   336 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   07/1962
11/1894 294 Y37   203 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   30/07/1962
11/1894 294 Y37   204 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   21/01/1963
11/1894 294 Y37   337 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y37   04/12/1961
11/1894 294 Y37   703 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y38   20/11/1961
11/1894 294 Y37   704 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y38   11/06/1962
11/1894 294 Y37   705 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y38   09/12/1959
11/1894 294 Y37   706 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y38   21/05/1962
11/1894 294 Y37   707 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y38   29/11/1963
11/1894 294 Y37   708 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y38   06/06/1961
01/1895 211   211 0-6-0ST J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y39   1928
02/1895 211   212 0-6-0ST J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y39   1926
02/1895 211   213 0-6-0ST J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y39   1928
02/1895 211   214 0-6-0ST J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y39   08/1929
03/1895 211   215 0-6-0ST J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y39   1928
04/1895 19   19 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   07/1947
04/1895 19   20 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   29/05/1948
04/1895 19   21 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   19/06/1948
04/1895 19   22 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   12/1947
04/1895 19   23 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   14/07/1953
04/1895 19   24 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   03/1946
05/1895 19   25 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   12/06/1952
05/1895 19   26 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   17/01/1952
05/1895 19   27 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   14/01/1950
05/1895 19   28 0-4-4T J. Lambie St. Rollox Works Y40   09/1961
06/1895 294 Y37   709 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y38   14/11/1952
06/1895 294 Y37   710 0-6-0 D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y38   02/1953
06/1895 711   711 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   04/1949
06/1895 711   712 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   21/11/1951
07/1895 711   713 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   31/03/1953
07/1895 711   714 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   06/05/1958
10/1895 264   611 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y43   06/1950
10/1895 264   612 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y43   15/10/1960
10/1895 264   613 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y43   21/05/1957
11/1895 29   203 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y42   30/04/1962
11/1895 29   204 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y42   11/10/1956
11/1895 29   205 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y42   17/12/1957
11/1895 29   29 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y42   27/02/1956
11/1895 264   614 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y43   29/12/1962
12/1895 29   206 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y42   07/11/1959
12/1895 29   207 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y42   02/12/1958
12/1895 29   208 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y42   05/02/1953
01/1896 29   209 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y42   04/09/1958
01/1896 29   210 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y42   01/03/1961
01/1896 721   721 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   1931
02/1896 721   722 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   11/1933
02/1896 721   723 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   08/1933
02/1896 721   724 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   1930
02/1896 721   725 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   10/1935
03/1896 721   726 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   10/1935
03/1896 721   727 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   1932
03/1896 721   728 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   12/1934
04/1896 721   729 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   04/1932
04/1896 721   730 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   1931
04/1896 721   731 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   1931
04/1896 721   732 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   12/1933
05/1896 711   564 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   16/05/1952
05/1896 711   565 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   09/05/1961
05/1896 711   566 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   05/02/1960
05/1896 721   733 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   1932
05/1896 721   734 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   1930
05/1896 721   735 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y44   1933
06/1896 711   567 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   30/10/1961
06/1896 711   568 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   08/1958
06/1896 711   569 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   05/1953
06/1896 711   570 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   10/02/1953
06/1896 711   571 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   05/1950
06/1896 711   572 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   29/11/1961
06/1896 711   573 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   24/07/1948
07/1896 711   574 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   25/08/1958
07/1896 711   575 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y46   12/11/1959
07/1896 711   715 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   02/1953
07/1896 711   716 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   21/05/1962
07/1896 711   717 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   09/1949
08/1896 711   718 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   06/1949
08/1896 711   719 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   02/1950
08/1896 711   720 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y41   08/1949
09/1896 711   736 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   10/1949
09/1896 711   737 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   02/10/1961
09/1896 711   738 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   17/09/1958
09/1896 711   739 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   01/1948
09/1896 711   740 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   05/05/1959
10/1896 711   741 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   02/1948
10/1896 711   742 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   21/01/1950
10/1896 711   743 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   12/02/1953
10/1896 711   744 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   13/09/1961
10/1896 711   745 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   28/03/1956
11/1896 711   576 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   06/08/1962
11/1896 711   746 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   17/10/1958
11/1896 711   747 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   24/04/1959
11/1896 711   748 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   11/1949
11/1896 711   749 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   26/07/1961
12/1896 711   577 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   02/10/1961
12/1896 711   578 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   08/10/1962
12/1896 711   579 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   16/02/1960
12/1896 711   580 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   11/1949
12/1896 711   581 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   02/1953
12/1896 711   582 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   02/10/1961
02/1897 711 Con   583 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   20/11/1948
02/1897 711 Con   584 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   02/10/1961
02/1897 711 Con   585 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   11/09/1948
02/1897 711 Con   586 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   13/09/1961
02/1897 711 Con   587 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y47   27/06/1961
02/1897 711   750 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   08/10/1962
03/1897 711   751 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   02/10/1961
03/1897 711   752 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   29/05/1959
03/1897 711   753 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   10/1949
03/1897 711   754 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   02/10/1948
03/1897 711   755 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   05/06/1948
03/1897 711   756 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   09/03/1953
04/1897 711   757 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   08/12/1959
04/1897 711   758 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   06/11/1950
04/1897 711   759 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   13/09/1961
04/1897 711   760 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y45   08/1949
04/1897 711   761 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   06/02/1953
05/1897 711   762 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   24/04/1959
05/1897 711   763 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   04/1949
05/1897 92   92 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   16/01/1957
05/1897 92   93 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   19/07/1961
06/1897 711   764 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   10/02/1950
06/1897 711   765 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   04/02/1952
06/1897 92   94 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   03/1950
06/1897 92   95 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   05/1946
06/1897 92   96 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   08/1950
06/1897 92   97 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   18/12/1948
07/1897 92   100 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   11/12/1948
07/1897 92   101 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   09/04/1951
07/1897 92   102 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   01/07/1953
07/1897 92   103 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   29/12/1952
07/1897 92   98 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   07/1946
07/1897 92   99 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y48   04/10/1951
08/1897 711   588 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   07/1949
08/1897 711   589 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   10/1950
09/1897 711   329 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   08/1947
09/1897 711   330 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   13/09/1961
09/1897 711   590 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   19/03/1953
09/1897 711   591 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   06/06/1951
09/1897 711   592 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y49   12/01/1956
10/1897 711   331 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   27/09/1957
10/1897 711   332 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   20/06/1961
10/1897 711   333 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   02/10/1961
10/1897 711   593 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   27/02/1956
10/1897 711   594 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   04/11/1952
11/1897 711   595 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   11/12/1956
11/1897 711   596 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   07/01/1957
11/1897 711   597 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   02/10/1961
11/1897 711   598 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   16/06/1959
11/1897 711   599 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y50   11/12/1961
12/1897 766   766 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   01/1936
12/1897 766   767 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   11/1939
01/1898 766   768 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   08/1936
01/1898 766   769 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   02/1936
02/1898 766   770 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   10/1940
02/1898 766   771 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   03/1935
02/1898 766   772 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   04/1937
02/1898 766   773 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   12/1936
02/1898 766   774 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   1941
03/1898 766   775 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   1945
03/1898 766   776 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   07/1946
03/1898 766   777 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   09/1947
04/1898 766   778 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   04/1936
04/1898 766   779 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   10/1939
04/1898 766   780 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y51   06/1939
06/1898 782   782 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y52   16/04/1958
06/1898 782   783 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y52   12/1958
06/1898 782   784 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y52   06/1959
06/1898 782   785 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y52   03/1957
07/1898 782   786 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y52   03/1953
07/1898 782   787 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y52   07/1960
07/1898 782   788 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y52   09/12/1960
08/1898 782   789 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   05/10/1956
08/1898 782   790 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   19/01/1959
09/1898 782   791 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   12/12/1955
09/1898 782   792 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   20/10/1959
09/1898 782   793 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   09/1958
09/1898 782   794 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   12/11/1959
09/1898 782   795 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   08/07/1958
09/1898 782   796 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   22/02/1952
09/1898 782   797 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   08/12/1959
10/1898 782   798 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   23/10/1948
10/1898 782   799 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   11/05/1956
10/1898 782   800 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   10/10/1958
10/1898 782   801 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   05/1956
10/1898 782   802 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   02/1958
10/1898 782   803 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   26/03/1958
10/1898 782   804 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   05/02/1953
11/1898 782   805 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   30/04/1958
11/1898 782   806 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   11/06/1962
11/1898 782   807 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   11/1960
11/1898 782   808 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   24/12/1957
11/1898 782   809 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   13/11/1958
11/1898 782   810 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   02/04/1962
12/1898 782   236 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   07/1961
12/1898 782   237 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   20/01/1960
12/1898 782   238 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   07/1961
12/1898 782   239 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   08/02/1957
12/1898 782   240 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   28/05/1958
12/1898 782   241 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   02/1959
12/1898 782   811 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y53   09/1958
01/1899 782   242 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   10/04/1961
01/1899 782   243 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   07/01/1959
01/1899 782   244 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   07/01/1955
01/1899 782   245 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   10/1956
01/1899 782   246 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   02/1954
01/1899 782   247 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   11/1958
01/1899 782   485 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   03/1959
01/1899 782   516 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y55   12/1958
03/1899 104   104 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   08/1929
03/1899 104   105 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   1931
03/1899 104   106 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   04/1936
03/1899 104   107 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   08/1935
03/1899 104   108 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   03/1937
03/1899 104   109 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   10/1934
04/1899 104   110 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   04/1938
04/1899 104   111 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   1930
04/1899 104   167 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   10/1935
04/1899 104   168 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   06/1937
04/1899 104   169 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   12/1934
05/1899 812   812 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   29/12/1962
05/1899 812   813 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   17/07/1948
05/1899 812   814 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   18/12/1959
06/1899 104   170 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y56   10/1935
06/1899 812   815 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   23/10/1959
06/1899 812   816 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   06/1960
06/1899 812   817 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   15/11/1962
06/1899 812   818 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   10/04/1958
06/1899 812   819 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   09/1962
06/1899 812   820 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   16/09/1960
07/1899 812   821 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   02/10/1961
07/1899 812   822 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   02/10/1961
07/1899 812   823 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   07/1949
07/1899 812   824 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   21/05/1962
07/1899 812   825 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   11/12/1961
08/1899 812   826 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   02/10/1961
08/1899 812   827 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   29/12/1962
08/1899 812   828 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y54   08/08/1963
09/1899 812   282 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   01/10/1962
09/1899 812   283 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   26/03/1962
09/1899 812   284 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   27/06/1961
09/1899 812   285 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   11/06/1962
09/1899 812   286 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   30/04/1962
10/1899 812   287 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   16/07/1962
10/1899 812   288 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   20/11/1961
10/1899 812   289 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   05/1949
10/1899 812   290 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   06/1963
10/1899 812   291 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   05/03/1962
11/1899 812   292 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   07/11/1963
11/1899 812   293 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y58   02/02/1960
12/1899 812   829 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5612 11/1947
12/1899 812   830 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5613 29/11/1963
12/1899 812   831 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5614 12/11/1962
12/1899 812   832 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5615 09/1960
12/1899 812   833 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5616 30/04/1962
12/1899 812   834 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5617 27/06/1963
12/1899 812   835 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5618 21/11/1957
12/1899 812   836 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5619 19/06/1948
12/1899 812   837 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5620 10/1959
12/1899 812   838 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5621 02/10/1961
12/1899 900   900 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y57   10/1928
12/1899 900   901 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y57   11/1937
12/1899 900   902 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y57   10/1939
01/1900 879   879 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y59   10/1947
01/1900 879   880 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y59   30/06/1951
02/1900 879   881 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y59   18/08/1952
02/1900 879   882 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y59   01/09/1952
02/1900 879   883 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y59   01/07/1958
02/1900 879   884 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y59   01/12/1952
02/1900 879   885 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y59   26/05/1953
02/1900 879   886 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y59   08/1952
03/1900 879   437 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y60   18/04/1955
03/1900 879   438 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y60   21/08/1954
03/1900 439   439 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y61   11/1949
03/1900 439   440 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y61   01/10/1958
04/1900 439   441 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y61   24/10/1953
04/1900 439   442 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y61   08/05/1956
04/1900 439   443 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y61   03/1946
04/1900 812   839 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5622 30/07/1962
04/1900 812   840 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5623 06/11/1948
04/1900 812   841 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5624 27/11/1961
04/1900 812   842 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5625 20/11/1961
04/1900 812   843 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5626 07/11/1963
04/1900 812   844 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5627 27/09/1957
04/1900 812   845 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5628 27/11/1961
04/1900 812   846 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5629 06/1949
04/1900 812   864 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3880 29/12/1962
04/1900 812   865 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3881 26/03/1962
04/1900 900   887 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   04/1947
04/1900 900   899 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   1944
05/1900 812   847 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5630 27/11/1961
05/1900 812   848 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5631 27/06/1961
05/1900 812   866 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3882 10/12/1962
05/1900 812   867 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3883 05/05/1960
05/1900 812   868 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3884 11/09/1948
05/1900 812   869 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3885 14/03/1963
05/1900 812   870 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3886 17/12/1962
05/1900 812   871 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3887 14/07/1960
05/1900 812   872 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3888 11/1946
05/1900 812   873 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3889 12/11/1962
05/1900 812   874 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3890 30/04/1962
05/1900 812   875 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3891 10/09/1962
05/1900 812   876 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3892 01/10/1962
05/1900 812   877 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3893 05/11/1962
05/1900 812   878 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Dübs & Co ?? 3894 22/05/1948
05/1900 900   888 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   03/1946
05/1900 900   889 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   1941
05/1900 900   896 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   1941
05/1900 900   897 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   03/1939
05/1900 900   898 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   06/1939
06/1900 900   890 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   12/1946
06/1900 900   891 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   08/1939
06/1900 900   894 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   17/04/1948
06/1900 900   895 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   1941
07/1900 264   621 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y63   10/05/1958
07/1900 264   622 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y63   02/04/1962
07/1900 264   623 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y63   15/10/1960
07/1900 264   624 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y63   10/1935
07/1900 900   892 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   03/1939
07/1900 900   893 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y62   1932
08/1900 264   625 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y63   10/1935
08/1900 264   626 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y63   03/08/1960
08/1900 812   849 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4634 16/07/1962
08/1900 812   850 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4635 17/01/1958
08/1900 812   851 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4636 19/10/1956
08/1900 812   852 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4637 16/09/1963
08/1900 812   853 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4638 20/06/1961
08/1900 812   854 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4639 12/08/1963
08/1900 812   855 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4640 20/11/1961
08/1900 812   856 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4641 29/12/1962
08/1900 812   857 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4642 20/11/1959
08/1900 812   858 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4643 01/10/1962
08/1900 812   859 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4644 02/04/1962
08/1900 812   860 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4645 10/1946
08/1900 812   861 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4646 05/11/1959
08/1900 812   862 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4647 29/11/1963
08/1900 812   863 0-6-0 J. McIntosh Sharp Stewart ?? 4648 29/12/1962
09/1900 439   444 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   09/02/1959
09/1900 439   445 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   10/1961
09/1900 439   446 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   30/09/1953
10/1900 439   447 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   07/1961
10/1900 439   448 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   09/05/1957
10/1900 439   449 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   18/05/1961
11/1900 439   450 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   27/10/1952
11/1900 439   451 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   19/10/1951
11/1900 439   452 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   28/11/1952
12/1900 439   453 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   04/01/1962
12/1900 439   454 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   23/01/1956
12/1900 439   455 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y64   06/02/1953
07/1901 600   600 0-8-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y65   1929
07/1901 600   601 0-8-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y65   1929
05/1902 55   55 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y66   08/1934
05/1902 55   56 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y66   10/1934
05/1902 55   57 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y66   02/1928
06/1902 55   58 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y66   10/1935
06/1902 55   59 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y66   12/1936
12/1902 264   627 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y68   1925
12/1902 264   628 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y68   12/1935
01/1903 600   602 0-8-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y67   1927
02/1903 600   603 0-8-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y67   1928
02/1903 600   604 0-8-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y70   1928
03/1903 49   49 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y69   03/1933
04/1903 49   50 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y69   12/1933
05/1903 600   605 0-8-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y70   1930
06/1903 600   606 0-8-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y70   1928
06/1903 600   607 0-8-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y70   1928
11/1903 492   492 0-8-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y71   09/1936
12/1903 492   493 0-8-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y71   1932
12/1903 492   494 0-8-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y71   1936
12/1903 492   495 0-8-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y71   07/1935
01/1904 492   496 0-8-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y71   1932
01/1904 492   497 0-8-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y71   03/1939
05/1904 140   140 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y72   1941
05/1904 140   141 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y72   10/1945
06/1904 140   142 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y72   10/1939
06/1904 140   143 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y72   07/1937
06/1904 140   144 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y72   04/1937
10/1904 782 Y73   631 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   21/09/1959
10/1904 782 Y73   632 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   05/1958
11/1904 782 Y73   633 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   14/04/1959
11/1904 782 Y73   634 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   09/01/1959
11/1904 782 Y73   636 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   29/06/1959
11/1904 782 Y73   637 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   23/07/1959
12/1904 782 Y73   635 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   11/1960
12/1904 782 Y73   638 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   27/05/1960
12/1904 782 Y73   639 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   05/11/1958
12/1904 782 Y73   640 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y73   29/04/1957
03/1905 782 Y73   641 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   24/12/1959
03/1905 782 Y73   642 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   20/08/1959
04/1905 782 Y73   643 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   25/11/1957
04/1905 782 Y73   644 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   25/10/1961
04/1905 782 Y73   645 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   02/1957
04/1905 782 Y73   646 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   11/1960
05/1905 782 Y73   647 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   07/10/1958
05/1905 782 Y73   648 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   29/12/1962
05/1905 782 Y73   649 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   31/08/1956
05/1905 782 Y73   650 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y74   29/01/1957
08/1905 55 Y66   51 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y75   02/1937
09/1905 55 Y66   52 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y75   11/1937
09/1905 55 Y66   53 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y75   10/1934
09/1905 55 Y66   54 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y75   12/1935
11/1905 140   145 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y76   1942
12/1905 140   146 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y76   05/1939
12/1905 140   147 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y76   05/1941
12/1905 140   148 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y76   08/1938
12/1905 140   149 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y76   1940
01/1906 140   150 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y76   10/1938
03/1906 439 Y77   151 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y77   10/10/1958
03/1906 439 Y77   473 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y77   01/12/1958
03/1906 439 Y77   655 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y77   30/06/1955
04/1906 439 Y77   125 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y78   21/08/1948
04/1906 439 Y77   384 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y78   21/05/1958
04/1906 439 Y77   660 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y78   25/01/1952
05/1906 903   903 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y80   12/1930
05/1906 903   904 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y80   05/1929
06/1906 903   905 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y80   09/1927
06/1906 903   906 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y80   02/1928
07/1906 903   907 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y80   01/1916
07/1906 918   918 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y79   12/1930
07/1906 918   919 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y79   12/1930
07/1906 918   922 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y79   04/1930
08/1906 918   920 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y79   12/1930
08/1906 918   921 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y79   05/1929
10/1906 908   908 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   03/1933
10/1906 908   909 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   07/1933
11/1906 908   910 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   12/1931
11/1906 908   911 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   11/1931
11/1906 908   912 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   09/1932
12/1906 439 Y77   112 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y78   25/09/1953
12/1906 908   913 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   05/1930
12/1906 908   914 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   11/1931
12/1906 908   915 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   03/1930
01/1907 439 Y77   424 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y78   12/11/1951
01/1907 439 Y77   464 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y78   08/1950
01/1907 439 Y77   465 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y78   11/1949
01/1907 908   916 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   04/1930
01/1907 908   917 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y81   02/1935
02/1907 439 Y77   466 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y78   07/1961
02/1907 439 Y77   666 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y78   18/02/1955
04/1907 782 Y73   128 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   21/03/1960
04/1907 782 Y73   129 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   04/12/1961
04/1907 782 Y73   166 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   04/12/1958
04/1907 782 Y73   324 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   19/10/1956
04/1907 782 Y73   425 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   14/10/1960
04/1907 782 Y73   472 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   08/01/1959
05/1907 782 Y73   434 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   21/05/1962
05/1907 782 Y73   501 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   08/01/1962
05/1907 782 Y73   668 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   25/05/1956
06/1907 782 Y73   630 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y82   15/05/1958
09/1907 782 Y73   417 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y83   04/11/1960
09/1907 782 Y73   426 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y83   31/01/1961
10/1907 782 Y73   629 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y83   14/02/1958
10/1907 782 Y73   667 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y83   10/10/1959
10/1907 782 Y73   669 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y83   26/06/1959
11/1907 439 Y77   158 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y84   03/1951
11/1907 439 Y77   419 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y84   29/12/1962
11/1907 439 Y77   422 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y84   05/06/1948
11/1907 439 Y77   429 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y84   28/11/1950
11/1907 439 Y77   470 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y84   12/10/1950
12/1907 140   923 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y85   20/05/1955
01/1908 140   924 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y85   18/08/1958
01/1908 140   925 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y85   12/1943
01/1908 140   926 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y85   03/1937
02/1908 140   927 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y85   04/1937
03/1908 652   652 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y87   18/09/1948
03/1908 652   653 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y87   14/11/1963
03/1908 652   654 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y87   01/10/1962
03/1908 652   656 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y87   11/12/1961
03/1908 652   657 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y87   23/08/1963
06/1908 652   658 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y86   26/03/1962
06/1908 652   659 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y86   04/12/1948
06/1908 652   665 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y87   20/11/1961
08/1908 652   662 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y86   07/12/1961
09/1908 652   663 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y86   10/1959
09/1908 652   664 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y86   04/09/1948
12/1908 264   431 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y88   08/10/1962
12/1908 264   463 0-4-0ST D. Drummond St. Rollox Works Y88   19/05/1959
06/1909 652   325 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y89   03/04/1948
06/1909 652   326 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y89   16/07/1962
06/1909 652   327 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y89   01/10/1962
06/1909 652   328 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y89   01/10/1962
06/1909 652   423 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y89   20/11/1961
06/1909 652   460 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y89   19/11/1962
10/1909 439 Y77   126 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   07/04/1955
10/1909 439 Y77   127 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   03/03/1955
11/1909 439 Y77   420 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   27/06/1961
11/1909 439 Y77   421 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   16/12/1955
11/1909 439 Y77   427 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   19/11/1954
11/1909 439 Y77   428 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   18/05/1961
12/1909 439 Y77   456 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   26/07/1961
12/1909 439 Y77   467 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   23/08/1961
12/1909 439 Y77   468 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   02/10/1961
12/1909 439 Y77   469 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y90   23/08/1961
01/1910 782 Y73   432 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y91   29/12/1962
02/1910 782 Y73   433 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y91   28/05/1958
02/1910 782 Y73   475 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y91   31/05/1956
03/1910 782 Y73   416 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   02/09/1958
03/1910 782 Y73   418 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   16/06/1960
04/1910 439 Y77   155 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y94   21/12/1961
04/1910 439 Y77   160 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y94   29/12/1962
04/1910 439 Y77   459 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y94   07/1956
06/1910 140   137 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y92   30/10/1948
07/1910 140   136 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y92   10/1939
07/1910 140   138 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y92   03/1939
07/1910 139   139 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y92   03/01/1957
07/1910 782 Y73   435 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y93   30/10/1961
07/1910 782 Y73   436 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y93   23/09/1959
07/1910 782 Y73   476 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y93   01/1957
07/1910 782 Y73   477 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y93   18/09/1959
07/1910 782 Y73   478 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y93   30/09/1959
07/1910 782 Y73   479 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y93   07/10/1958
08/1910 782 Y73   480 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y93   20/03/1961
09/1910 782 Y73   481 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   10/05/1958
10/1910 782 Y73   474 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   05/08/1957
10/1910 782 Y73   483 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   10/10/1959
10/1910 782 Y73   484 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   10/10/1959
10/1910 782 Y73   500 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   17/01/1958
11/1910 782 Y73   608 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   14/07/1960
11/1910 782 Y73   609 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   29/12/1962
11/1910 782 Y73   610 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y95   30/06/1961
01/1911 439 Y77   461 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y94   27/09/1961
03/1911 439 Y77   152 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y96   13/09/1961
03/1911 439 Y77   153 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y96   02/10/1961
04/1911 139   132 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y97   15/08/1957
04/1911 139   133 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y97   07/1946
04/1911 439 Y77   154 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y96   09/1961
04/1911 782 Y73   277 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y99   24/03/1961
04/1911 782 Y73   390 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y99   17/09/1959
05/1911 139   134 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y97   26/10/1955
05/1911 139   135 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y97   09/10/1953
05/1911 439 Y77   156 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y96   13/07/1961
05/1911 782 Y73   393 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y99   28/08/1956
06/1911 439 Y77   380 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y96   29/09/1961
06/1911 782 Y73   397 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y99   10/10/1959
06/1911 439 Y77   462 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y96   04/12/1958
07/1911 782 Y73   405 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y99   08/03/1961
10/1911 782 Y73   430 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y99   01/1961
10/1911 782 Y73   471 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y99   19/03/1957
01/1912 498   498 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y100   08/09/1961
01/1912 498   499 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y100   04/1959
04/1912 439 Y77   157 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y102   06/05/1958
04/1912 439 Y77   383 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y102   13/09/1961
05/1912 439 Y77   457 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y102   02/10/1961
07/1912 139 Y101   117 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y101   19/12/1952
07/1912 139 Y101   118 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y101   26/08/1955
07/1912 139 Y101   119 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y101   19/06/1953
07/1912 30   30 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y98   08/1935
07/1912 439 Y77   458 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y102   02/10/1961
08/1912 139 Y101   120 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y101   03/1955
08/1912 139 Y101   121 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y101   11/1915
08/1912 139 Y101   122 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y101   19/11/1953
08/1912 30   31 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y98   09/1946
10/1912 782 Y73   171 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y104   16/07/1962
10/1912 30   32 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y98   1945
10/1912 782 Y73   651 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y104   20/11/1948
11/1912 782 Y73   130 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y104   10/10/1958
11/1912 782 Y73   172 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y104   06/05/1960
11/1912 782 Y73   173 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y104   11/03/1960
11/1912 30   33 0-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y98   1945
11/1912 34   34 2-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y103   11/1936
11/1912 34   35 2-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y103   12/1936
11/1912 34   36 2-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y103   11/1935
11/1912 782 Y73   781 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y104   15/05/1959
12/1912 782 Y73   131 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y104   12/09/1957
12/1912 782 Y73   174 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y104   02/07/1957
12/1912 34   37 2-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y103   09/1936
12/1912 34   38 2-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y103   06/1937
05/1913 43   43 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y105   25/10/1955
05/1913 43   44 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y105   14/09/1955
05/1913 43   45 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y105   08/1957
06/1913 439 Y77   228 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y102   30/07/1962
06/1913 439 Y77   229 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y102   13/01/1960
06/1913 439 Y77   230 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y102   25/05/1961
06/1913 439 Y77   231 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y102   02/10/1961
06/1913 43   46 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y105   08/1957
06/1913 43   47 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y105   25/10/1955
06/1913 43   48 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y105   21/08/1954
09/1913 782 Y73   175 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y108   06/1958
09/1913 782 Y73   176 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y108   13/02/1958
09/1913 782 Y73   177 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y108   09/11/1956
09/1913 782 Y73   178 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y108   11/12/1961
10/1913 782 Y73   508 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y108   06/12/1957
10/1913 782 Y73   509 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y108   10/1956
12/1913 179   179 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y107   12/1945
12/1913 179   180 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y107   02/1936
01/1914 179   181 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y107   11/1935
01/1914 179   182 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y107   02/1946
02/1914 179   183 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y107   11/1936
04/1914 43   39 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y109   15/02/1957
04/1914 43   40 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y109   18/02/1955
04/1914 43   41 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y109   28/12/1957
04/1914 43   42 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y109   13/12/1954
05/1914 43   123 4-4-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y109   07/10/1955
08/1914 439 Y77   222 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y110   12/10/1961
08/1914 439 Y77   223 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y110   14/09/1961
09/1914 439 Y77   224 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y110   27/09/1961
09/1914 439 Y77   225 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y110   02/10/1961
10/1914 439 Y77   226 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y110   08/01/1962
10/1914 439 Y77   227 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y110   14/09/1961
12/1914 184   184 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y112   05/1936
12/1914 184   185 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y112   04/1935
12/1914 184   186 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y112   06/1937
12/1914 184   187 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y112   11/1934
12/1914 184   188 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y112   06/1935
03/1915 184   189 4-6-0 J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y112   03/1935
04/1915 498 Y111   527 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y111   24/06/1959
04/1915 498 Y111   528 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y111   06/1959
05/1915 498 Y111   529 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y111   15/09/1958
05/1915 498 Y111   530 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y111   28/10/1959
06/1915 498 Y111   531 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y111   12/1958
06/1915 498 Y111   532 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y111   02/1961
08/1915 439 Y114   159 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y114   18/12/1961
09/1915 439 Y114   161 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y114   29/09/1961
09/1915 439 Y114   162 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y114   29/09/1961
10/1915 439 Y114   163 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y114   14/09/1961
1916 113   928 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21442 20/10/1959
1916 113   929 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21443 12/10/1959
1916 113   930 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21444 05/11/1959
1916 113   931 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21445 17/12/1959
1916 113   932 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21446 06/10/1959
1916 113   933 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21447 20/10/1959
1916 113   934 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21448 21/10/1959
1916 113   935 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21449 06/10/1959
1916 113   936 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21450 06/06/1961
1916 113   937 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21451 15/03/1960
02/1916 113   113 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y113   01/05/1959
02/1916 113   114 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y113   27/05/1960
03/1916 113   115 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y113   17/12/1962
03/1916 113   116 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y113   02/10/1961
04/1916 113   121 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y113   01/10/1962
05/1916 113   124 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y113   12/03/1962
06/1916 782 Y117   232 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y117   19/05/1959
07/1916 782 Y117   233 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y117   23/08/1961
07/1916 782 Y117   234 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y117   18/11/1960
08/1916 782 Y117   235 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y117   04/08/1961
08/1916 782 Y117   272 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y117   25/06/1960
09/1916 782 Y117   273 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y117   15/12/1960
09/1916 782 Y117   274 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y117   15/05/1959
11/1916 60   60 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y115   02/09/1953
12/1916 60   61 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y116   30/03/1950
01/1917 60   62 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y116   13/11/1948
01/1917 944   946 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21482 03/1952
01/1917 944   947 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21483 30/06/1951
01/1917 944   948 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21484 09/1949
01/1917 944   949 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21485 12/1948
01/1917 944   950 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21486 07/1950
01/1917 944   951 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21487 07/1946
02/1917 60   63 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y116   07/1949
03/1917 60   64 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y116   25/01/1952
03/1917 944   944 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21480 31/03/1952
03/1917 944   945 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21481 18/12/1948
04/1917 60   65 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y116   01/1944
04/1917 944   952 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21488 05/1946
04/1917 944   953 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21489 07/10/1953
05/1917 944   954 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21490 19/02/1952
05/1917 944   955 4-6-2T W. Pickersgill North British ?? 21491 06/06/1952
02/1918 300   300 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   07/1936
02/1918 300   301 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   11/1934
02/1918 300   302 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   29/12/1962
03/1918 300   303 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   20/11/1961
03/1918 300   304 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   01/1936
04/1918 300   305 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   16/09/1963
04/1918 300   306 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   1945
04/1918 300   307 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   20/11/1961
05/1918 300   308 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   02/1939
06/1918 300   309 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y119   20/11/1961
07/1918 300   310 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   16/07/1962
07/1918 300   311 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   16/07/1962
07/1918 498 Y111   533 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y121   02/04/1962
09/1918 498 Y111   534 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y121   27/07/1959
09/1918 498 Y111   535 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y121   01/12/1958
10/1918 498 Y111   536 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y121   09/02/1959
10/1918 498 Y111   537 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y121   24/06/1959
10/1918 498 Y111   538 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y121   18/11/1958
12/1918 300   312 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   24/01/1963
12/1918 300   313 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   20/11/1961
12/1918 300   314 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   25/03/1963
01/1919 300   315 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   30/07/1962
02/1919 300   316 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   08/10/1962
03/1919 300   317 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   26/03/1962
03/1919 300   318 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   08/11/1962
04/1919 300   319 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   11/1937
04/1919 300   320 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   12/1937
05/1919 300   321 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y120   11/1936
05/1919 300   323 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y122   29/11/1963
06/1919 300   294 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y122   20/11/1961
06/1919 300   295 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y122   20/11/1961
06/1919 300   296 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y122   04/11/1963
07/1919 300   297 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y122   28/01/1961
07/1919 300   298 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y122   09/04/1962
07/1919 300   299 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y122   02/04/1962
07/1919 300   322 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y122   06/1937
09/1919 300   324 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y122   06/1935
10/1919 300 SV   280 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   11/1963
11/1919 300 SV   281 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   08/10/1962
11/1919 300 SV   670 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   06/1937
11/1919 300 SV   671 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   08/11/1962
11/1919 300 SV   672 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   06/1937
12/1919 300 SV   673 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   26/03/1962
12/1919 300 SV   674 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   09/1946
12/1919 300 SV   675 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   29/11/1963
01/1920 300 SV   676 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   12/08/1963
01/1920 300 SV   677 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   07/08/1963
01/1920 300 SV   679 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   06/1936
02/1920 300 SV   678 0-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y123   16/07/1962
05/1920 72   72 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   27/05/1960
05/1920 72   73 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   07/07/1961
06/1920 72   74 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   12/10/1959
07/1920 72   75 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   24/08/1960
07/1920 72   76 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   29/06/1953
07/1920 72   77 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   12/03/1962
08/1920 72   78 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   06/06/1961
09/1920 72   79 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   04/11/1959
09/1920 72   80 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   12/10/1961
09/1920 72   81 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y124   12/03/1962
10/1920 498 Y111   502 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y126   13/01/1960
11/1920 498 Y111   503 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y126   24/06/1959
12/1920 498 Y111   504 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y126   04/1961
12/1920 498 Y111   510 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y126   04/1961
12/1920 498 Y111   511 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y126   02/03/1961
01/1921 498 Y111   512 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y126   05/02/1960
02/1921 498 Y111   513 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y126   03/1961
02/1921 498 Y111   514 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y126   11/1960
02/1921 498 Y111   515 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y126   11/05/1961
02/1921 72   82 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 111 29/03/1961
03/1921 72   83 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 112 02/02/1961
03/1921 72   84 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 113 04/12/1961
04/1921 72   85 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 114 27/05/1960
04/1921 72   86 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 115 04/12/1961
04/1921 72   87 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 116 27/11/1961
05/1921 72   88 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 117 27/11/1961
05/1921 72   89 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 118 24/08/1960
06/1921 72   90 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 119 12/03/1962
06/1921 72   91 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Armstrong Whitworth ?? 120 20/10/1959
06/1921 956   956 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y125   1931
07/1921 782 Y117   248 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   02/11/1956
07/1921 782 Y117   249 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   01/02/1960
07/1921 956   957 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y125   03/1934
07/1921 956   958 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y125   01/1935
08/1921 782 Y117   250 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   04/12/1961
08/1921 782 Y117   251 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   04/11/1957
08/1921 956   959 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y125   1933
04/1922 782 Y117   252 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   13/02/1961
04/1922 782 Y117   253 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   20/01/1960
05/1922 782 Y117   254 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   11/05/1961
05/1922 782 Y117   255 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   10/10/1959
05/1922 782 Y117   394 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   10/10/1959
06/1922 782 Y117   395 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   07/08/1958
06/1922 782 Y117   396 0-6-0T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y127   10/03/1961
07/1922 439 Y130   425 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y130   29/09/1961
07/1922 439 Y130   426 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y130   15/09/1961
08/1922 439 Y130   418 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y130   06/06/1961
08/1922 439 Y130   430 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y130   29/12/1962
08/1922 431   431 0-4-4T W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y130   13/07/1961
09/1922 431   432 0-4-4T W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y130   13/09/1961
09/1922 431   433 0-4-4T W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y130   11/07/1961
09/1922 431   434 0-4-4T W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works Y130   09/11/1961
10/1922 439 Y130   435 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y130   25/05/1961
11/1922 439 Y130   436 0-4-4T J. McIntosh St. Rollox Works Y130   14/09/1961
11/1922 72   66 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22943 20/10/1959
11/1922 72   67 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22944 27/05/1960
11/1922 72   68 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22945 13/05/1960
12/1922 191   191 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22955 11/1940
12/1922 191   192 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22956 12/1939
12/1922 191   193 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22957 12/1945
12/1922 191   194 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22958 11/1943
12/1922 191   195 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22959 12/1939
12/1922 191   196 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22960 02/1940
12/1922 191   197 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22961 02/1939
12/1922 191   198 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22962 04/1943
12/1922 72   69 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22946 12/03/1962
12/1922 72   70 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22947 11/12/1961
12/1922 72   71 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22948 01/10/1962
12/1922 72   92 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22949 14/10/1959
12/1922 72   93 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22950 20/10/1959
12/1922 72   94 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22951 05/04/1961
12/1922 72   95 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22952 27/11/1961
12/1922 72   96 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22953 27/11/1961
12/1922 72   97 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British ?? 22954 07/12/1959
05/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   29/12/1962
05/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   29/09/1961
05/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   02/10/1961
05/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   13/11/1961
06/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   10/1961
06/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   02/1962
06/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   27/09/1961
06/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   02/10/1961
06/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   27/09/1961
06/1925       0-4-4T J. McIntosh Nasmyth Wilson ??   26/03/1962
07/1925     14630 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   10/01/1951
11/1925     14631 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   22/05/1948
12/1925     14632 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   05/07/1947
01/1926     14633 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   23/03/1946
05/1926     14634 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   03/11/1952
06/1926     14635 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   15/01/1952
06/1926     14636 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   17/02/1953
07/1926     14637 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   13/03/1948
07/1926     14638 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   04/05/1951
08/1926     14639 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   30/12/1953
08/1926     14640 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   02/10/1952
09/1926     14641 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   13/11/1948
09/1926     14642 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   10/1949
10/1926     14643 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   07/02/1948
10/1926     14644 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   24/04/1948
11/1926     14645 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   07/1950
11/1926     14646 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   03/1949
11/1926     14647 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   29/03/1951
11/1926     14648 4-6-0 W. Pickersgill St. Rollox Works ??   21/11/1951
11/1926     14649 4-6-0