Depot: Cudworth
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/07/1924 | 3119 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/01/1925 | 2508 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1929 | 6576 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/10/1929 | 2500 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2508 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1930 | 6549 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1930 | 6577 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1930 | 6578 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1934 | 6579 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1934 | 6611 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/07/1935 | 6632 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 875 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1935 | 6614 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6549 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6576 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6577 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6578 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6579 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6611 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6632 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6549 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6576 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6577 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6578 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6579 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6611 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6614 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6632 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/10/1936 | 6580 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/08/1937 | 6615 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1938 | 6615 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1940 | 6577 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1940 | 6578 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/03/1940 | 2250 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/03/1940 | 943 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/04/1940 | 6580 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1940 | 6611 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/06/1940 | 6549 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1940 | 943 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/07/1940 | 1114 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/07/1940 | 1195 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1940 | 6632 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2250 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 6576 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 6579 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/03/1944 | 2251 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/03/1944 | 2278 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/03/1944 | 2287 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/05/1944 | 2246 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/05/1944 | 2278 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/07/1946 | 2246 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/09/1946 | 3311 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/09/1946 | 772 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/09/1946 | 2287 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/09/1946 | 3408 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/07/1947 | 3272 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5032 | Snapshot | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5714 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 65703 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/11/1948 | 3620 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/11/1948 | 3667 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/11/1948 | 3751 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 3620 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 3667 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 3751 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 3620 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 3667 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 3751 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 3311 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/02/1949 | 63272 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/02/1949 | 63332 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1949 | 65703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/10/1949 | 63849 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/10/1949 | 69789 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 63849 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 5667 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 63849 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/03/1950 | 69771 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 65712 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/08/1950 | 63843 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 65712 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/10/1950 | 5698 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1950 | 65714 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 5698 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/11/1950 | 63754 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/11/1950 | 63845 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/11/1950 | 63857 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63754 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63845 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63857 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63754 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63845 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63857 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 65647 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1951 | 63620 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1951 | 63843 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 65647 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 65698 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/04/1951 | 63667 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/05/1951 | 63772 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/05/1951 | 63772 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/05/1951 | 63772 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63751 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63754 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63772 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63845 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63849 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63857 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston |