Depot: Manchester Division
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Manchester Division | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D200 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | on | 04/10/1987 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D201 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D202 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D203 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D204 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | on | 02/09/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D205 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D212 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D213 | w/e | 26/08/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D214 | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | on | 08/11/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D225 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | on | 17/10/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D226 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | To Store | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D227 | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | on | 24/04/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D228 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D290 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D291 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D292 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D293 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 05/06/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D294 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D344 | w/e | 13/01/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D369 | w/e | 23/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D370 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D371 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D372 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D373 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D374 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D375 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D376 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D377 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D378 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D379 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D380 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5050 | w/e | 13/01/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5052 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5053 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5054 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5055 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5056 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5061 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5062 | w/e | 13/01/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5063 | w/e | 13/01/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5064 | w/e | 27/01/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5065 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5066 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5134 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5135 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 1B | Camden | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5136 | on | 22/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight (New) | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5137 | on | 18/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight (New) | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5138 | on | 27/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight (New) | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5139 | on | 29/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight (New) | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5142 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5144 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5145 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5146 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5151 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5152 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5153 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5154 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5155 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 16/09/1972 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5156 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 16/09/1972 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5197 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5198 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5199 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5200 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 22/03/1975 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5211 | w/e | 24/02/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5212 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 19/08/1972 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5273 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5274 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5275 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5276 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5277 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5278 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | on | 02/05/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5279 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5293 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7513 | w/e | 23/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7538 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7539 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7540 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7541 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7542 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7543 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 27/02/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7544 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7545 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7558 | w/e | 13/01/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7573 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7588 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7589 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7590 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 17/08/1968 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7591 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 17/08/1968 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7592 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7594 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7595 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7597 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 08/09/1973 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7629 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7630 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7631 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7647 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7648 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7649 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7650 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7651 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7653 | w/e | 01/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7674 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7675 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7676 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7677 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9A | Longsight | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D229 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 29/06/1968 | D09 | on | 25/04/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D230 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 29/06/1968 | D09 | on | 29/04/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D231 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 29/06/1968 | D09 | on | 31/05/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7626 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7614 | on | 07/06/1966 | 65A | Eastfield (New) | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7613 | on | 30/04/1966 | 65A | Eastfield (New) | w/e | 17/08/1968 | D09 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D295 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D09 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D296 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D300 | on | 17/06/1968 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D09 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D301 | on | 17/06/1968 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D09 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D302 | on | 17/06/1968 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D09 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D303 | on | 17/06/1968 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D09 | w/e | 07/08/1971 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D304 | on | 17/06/1968 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D232 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | on | 01/02/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D234 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | on | 06/01/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D235 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | on | 13/08/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D326 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | on | 15/02/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D327 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | on | 14/02/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D328 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | on | 20/09/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D329 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | on | 24/05/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D330 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | w/e | 05/06/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D333 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | w/e | 18/12/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D334 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D09 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5210 | on | 17/06/1968 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7585 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D09 | w/e | 02/08/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D305 | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D09 | m/e | 11/1978 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D318 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D09 | on | 01/02/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D335 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D09 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D336 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D09 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D337 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D09 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D319 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D09 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D320 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D09 | on | 31/05/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5292 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D09 | w/e | 13/12/1969 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7577 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D09 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5266 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 13/12/1969 | D09 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D306 | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D09 | w/e | 26/06/1976 | To Store | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D307 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D09 | on | 20/12/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D308 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D09 | on | 24/08/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D309 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D09 | m/e | 11/1978 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5272 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D09 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D310 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | on | 28/12/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D311 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | 3w/e | 29/11/1975 | To Store | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D312 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | on | 28/12/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D313 | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | on | 18/10/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D314 | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D315 | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | on | 14/03/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D321 | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D323 | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7569 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7570 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7574 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7575 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D201 | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D202 | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D203 | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D205 | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D206 | w/e | 29/07/1969 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D201 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | on | 23/07/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D202 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D203 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D205 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D302 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 13/06/1970 | D09 | w/e | 13/06/1970 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7545 | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 11/07/1970 | D09 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D228 | w/e | 01/08/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 29/08/1970 | D09 | w/e | 25/03/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D302 | w/e | 13/06/1970 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 29/08/1970 | D09 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D203 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D09 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D205 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D09 | w/e | 09/02/1974 | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D208 | w/e | 11/07/1970 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D09 | on | 14/11/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D209 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D09 | m/e | 07/1981 | LO | Longsight |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7589 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D316 | w/e | 29/08/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D09 | on | 01/02/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7645 | w/e | 27/06/1970 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D09 | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7646 | w/e | 27/06/1970 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D09 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7654 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7659 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D09 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5293 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 27/02/1971 | D09 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D206 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 05/06/1971 | D09 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D332 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 05/06/1971 | D09 | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7536 | w/e | 12/07/1969 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D09 | w/e | 07/08/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7539 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D09 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7540 | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D09 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D302 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D09 | w/e | 18/12/1971 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D303 | w/e | 07/08/1971 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D09 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D291 | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D09 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D371 | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D10 | Preston Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D09 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7587 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D09 | w/e | 09/11/1974 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7588 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D09 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7600 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D09 | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7601 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D09 | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7598 | w/e | 13/02/1971 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D09 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7599 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D09 | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5207 | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D09 | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5208 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D09 | w/e | 11/01/1975 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D319 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D09 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D330 | w/e | 05/06/1971 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D09 | on | 14/03/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D377 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D09 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5204 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D09 | m/e | 04/1977 | CW | Cricklewood East |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7536 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D09 | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5269 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5294 | w/e | 05/07/1967 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D09 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5296 | w/e | 05/07/1967 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D09 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D317 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 25/03/1972 | D09 | on | 07/09/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5020 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | D05 | Stoke Division | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D09 | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | To Store | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5021 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | D05 | Stoke Division | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D09 | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | To Store | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5022 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | D05 | Stoke Division | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D09 | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | To Store | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5023 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | D05 | Stoke Division | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D09 | w/e | 09/08/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5024 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D05 | Stoke Division | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D09 | w/e | 01/07/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D221 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D09 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D222 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D09 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D223 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D09 | on | 31/05/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D298 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D10 | Preston Division | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D09 | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5238 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D09 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5247 | w/e | 28/06/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D09 | on | 13/11/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7659 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D09 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D10 | Preston Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5293 | 2w/e | 19/08/1972 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D09 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5176 | w/e | 17/07/1971 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D09 | w/e | 17/08/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5177 | w/e | 17/07/1971 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D09 | on | 08/05/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5024 | w/e | 01/07/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D09 | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | To Store | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5232 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D09 | m/e | 10/1976 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7523 | 2w/e | 19/08/1972 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D09 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7539 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D09 | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7540 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D09 | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7598 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D09 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D255 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 03/02/1973 | D09 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D233 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D09 | on | 03/09/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5295 | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D09 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | BS | Bescot |