Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1792 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32442 Week
» 131087 Month
» 333751 Year
» 3360604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
02 0-4-0
Class |
Number |
Built |
Name |
Name Date |
Notes |
Removed |
Date Withdrawn |
02 |
02003 |
25/10/1960 |
|
|
|
|
01/06/1975 |
02 |
2854 |
04/11/1960 |
|
|
|
|
28/02/1970 |
02 |
2858 |
21/12/1960 |
|
|
|
|
28/02/1970 |
02 |
2860 |
13/09/1961 |
|
|
|
|
13/12/1970 |
02 |
2866 |
10/11/1961 |
|
|
|
|
28/02/1970 |
02 |
2867 |
17/11/1961 |
|
|
|
|
12/09/1970 |
02 |
2868 |
27/11/1961 |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1969 |