GNR/LNER Gresley "K1" Class 2-6-0
Class | GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
K1 | 1630 | 4630 | 1720 | 61720 | 08/1912 | CLK MAR CLK CAM NWE GRA NWE BOS NWE BOS CLK IMM 40F W |
Colwick March Colwick Cambridge New England Grantham New England Boston New England Boston Colwick Immingham Boston Withdrawn |
08/1912 05/1924 30/07/1925 11/06/1927 30/09/1927 30/12/1930 09/11/1932 07/03/1936 16/05/1938 17/06/1943 16/04/1945 27/04/1947 10/07/1955 12/06/1956 |
12/06/1956 |
K1 | 1631 | 4631 | 1721 | 61721 | 02/1913 | CLK CAM NWE STR STR COL PKS COL NOR NOR MAR NOR STR 65A 91X 62C 62C W |
Colwick Cambridge New England Southend Victoria Stratford Colchester Parkeston Quay Colchester Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe March Norwich Thorpe Stratford Eastfield To Scottish Region Dunfermline Upper Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
02/1913 05/1924 30/09/1927 1928 25/01/1930 15/09/1932 03/04/1934 14/11/1935 01/1936 05/02/1936 19/02/1945 22/06/1947 13/10/1947 03/06/1951 09/06/1951 20/01/1952 26/01/1952 30/12/1959 |
30/12/1959 |
K1 | 1632 | 4632 | 1722 | 61722 | 02/1913 | KX DON STR CLK DON MEX DON CLK IMM 65A 65A 65C 65C W |
Kings Cross Doncaster Stratford Colwick Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster Colwick Immingham Eastfield Eastfield Parkhead Parkhead Withdrawn |
02/1913 25/03/1923 05/1924 17/04/1926 13/08/1930 09/10/1930 28/02/1940 21/08/1946 27/04/1947 11/03/1951 31/03/1951 24/02/1952 22/03/1952 22/09/1955 |
22/09/1955 |
K1 | 1633 | 4633 | 1723 | 61723 | 02/1913 | CLK STR CLK MEX DON MEX DON DON MAR DON FRO DON BFD ARD BFD CLK W |
Colwick Stratford Colwick Mexborough Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster March Doncaster Frodingham Doncaster Bradford Hammerton Street Ardsley Bradford Hammerton Street Colwick Withdrawn |
02/1913 05/1924 01/07/1925 14/01/1931 18/01/1933 06/03/1933 11/1935 11/12/1935 04/11/1937 16/02/1938 04/07/1943 25/07/1943 30/07/1945 30/12/1945 30/06/1946 18/08/1946 04/11/1959 |
04/11/1959 |
K1 | 1634 | 4634 | 1724 | 61724 | 02/1913 | ARD STR CLK NWE DON MEX DON DON FRO DON CLK IMM 41A W |
Ardsley Stratford Colwick New England Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Frodingham Doncaster Colwick Immingham Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
02/1913 05/1924 22/06/1925 23/08/1927 10/05/1929 16/05/1929 11/1935 07/12/1935 04/07/1943 25/07/1943 23/08/1946 27/04/1947 10/07/1955 03/01/1958 |
03/01/1958 |
K1 | 1635 | 4635 | 1725 | 61725 | 03/1913 | CLK NWE BOS NWE BOS W |
Colwick New England Boston New England Boston Withdrawn |
03/1913 29/07/1925 17/07/1940 16/04/1945 04/08/1946 26/01/1958 |
26/01/1958 |
K1 | 1636 | 4636 | 1726 | 61726 | 03/1913 | NWE STR CLK MEX DON CLK W |
New England Stratford Colwick Mexborough Doncaster Colwick Withdrawn |
03/1913 12/07/1923 07/08/1925 29/07/1930 27/02/1940 23/08/1946 07/05/1957 |
07/05/1957 |
K1 | 1637 | 4637 | 1727 | 61727 | 03/1913 | NWE DON CLK DON MEX DON MEX DON FRO DON ARD CLK IMM W |
New England Doncaster Colwick Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster Frodingham Doncaster Ardsley Colwick Immingham Withdrawn |
03/1913 25/03/1923 22/07/1925 11/05/1929 16/05/1929 27/05/1936 21/07/1936 27/02/1940 04/07/1943 25/07/1943 30/07/1945 18/08/1946 27/04/1947 06/06/1956 |
06/06/1956 |
K1 | 1638 | 4638 | 1728 | 61728 | 04/1913 | CLK DON MEX DON CLK IMM 40F 41A W |
Colwick Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster Colwick Immingham Boston Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
04/1913 01/11/1933 27/04/1935 28/02/1940 23/08/1946 27/04/1947 15/03/1953 10/07/1955 06/12/1960 |
06/12/1960 |
K1 | 1639 | 4639 | 1729 | 61729 | 04/1913 | CLK STR CLK NWE GRA NWE ARD NWE GRA NWE NWE BOS NWE EFD PKD NWE NWE 35B 35B 38A 38A W |
Colwick Stratford Colwick New England Grantham New England Ardsley New England Grantham New England New England Boston New England Eastfield Parkhead New England New England Grantham Grantham Colwick Colwick Withdrawn |
04/1913 09/1923 15/08/1925 04/08/1930 09/10/1930 31/12/1930 14/07/1931 17/08/1931 14/06/1932 12/1935 27/12/1935 10/03/1936 29/09/1938 14/12/1945 14/12/1947 13/11/1949 19/11/1949 19/11/1950 30/11/1950 21/01/1951 31/01/1951 25/06/1957 |
25/06/1957 |