Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2479 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33129 Week
» 131774 Month
» 334438 Year
» 3361291 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
47 Co-Co
Class |
Number |
Built |
Name |
Name Date |
Notes |
Removed |
Date Withdrawn |
47 |
47401 |
28/09/1962 |
|
|
|
|
05/06/1992 |
47 |
47402 |
13/11/1962 |
|
|
|
|
01/06/1992 |
47 |
47417 |
10/04/1963 |
|
|
|
|
24/02/1992 |
47 |
47004 |
14/06/1963 |
|
|
|
|
31/08/2006 |
47 |
47449 |
23/03/1964 |
|
|
|
|
14/05/1993 |
47 |
47635 |
29/07/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/02/2004 |
47 |
47564 |
12/09/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/11/2003 |
47 |
47631 |
19/12/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/03/2000 |
47 |
47834 |
01/02/1965 |
|
|
|
|
01/02/2004 |
47 |
47840 |
13/02/1965 |
NORTH STAR |
20/03/1965 |
After naming hauled 10.42 ‘North Star’ special to Bristol for naming of ‘Isambard Kingdom Brunel’. |
|
01/05/2007 |
47 |
47484 |
20/02/1965 |
ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL |
20/03/1965 |
After 1965 naming worked special from Bristol to Paddington |
|
01/06/1998 |
47 |
47105 |
06/12/1963 |
|
|
|
|
13/12/1993 |
47 |
47540 |
17/03/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/05/1998 |
47 |
47490 |
24/03/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/07/2000 |
47 |
47605 |
19/08/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/12/2003 |
47 |
47541 |
14/08/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/02/2004 |
47 |
47492 |
08/09/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/02/1999 |
47 |
47580 |
01/09/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/04/2004 |
47 |
47579 |
23/10/1964 |
|
|
|
|
01/02/2004 |
47 |
47192 |
14/05/1965 |
|
|
|
|
18/05/1988 |
47 |
47205 |
24/08/1965 |
|
|
|
|
30/09/2004 |
47 |
47367 |
26/08/1965 |
|
|
|
|
31/12/2002 |
47 |
47376 |
01/09/1965 |
|
|
|
|
31/12/2002 |
47 |
47820 |
19/10/1965 |
|
|
|
|
01/09/2003 |
47 |
47701 |
24/02/1966 |
|
|
|
|
01/12/2003 |
47 |
47596 |
02/03/1966 |
|
|
|
|
01/04/1999 |
47 |
47715 |
30/06/1966 |
|
|
|
|
01/03/1997 |
47 |
47503 |
06/07/1966 |
|
|
|
|
01/03/2000 |
47 |
47643 |
22/10/1965 |
|
|
|
|
01/04/1991 |
47 |
47295 |
03/06/1966 |
|
|
|
|
31/01/2003 |