Database Search
Searching the database for objects matching '549'Steam Locomotive: '549'
Built For | Designer | Works Num | Power | Class | Wheels | Intro. | Built | Withdrawn | Number Type | Number | Number Start | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GWR | Armstrong | 549 | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1881 | 10/1892 | 01/12/1949 | GWR | 2007 | 10/1892 | ||
GWR | Dean | 1590 | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 1883 | 09/1897 | 10/1940 | GWR WD (WD) |
2549 165 |
09/1897 10/1940 |
||
GWR | Dean | 1549 | Duke | 4-4-0 | 1895 | 03/1897 | 10/1938 | GWR (Orig) GWR (1912) |
3290 3279 |
03/1897 12/1912 |
Tor Bay | |
GWR | Dean | 1125 | 3521 0-4-2T | 0-4-2T | 1887 | 11/1888 | 09/1928 | GWR | 3549 | 11/1888 | ||
GWR | Churchward | 2549 | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 1910 | 11/1913 | 27/09/1962 | GWR | 4230 | 11/1913 | ||
GWR | Churchward | 2606 | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 1906 | 05/1915 | 12/12/1961 | GWR | 4549 | 05/1915 | ||
GWR | Collett | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 1927 | 10/1928 | 08/01/1962 | GWR | 5549 | 10/1928 | |||
GWR | Hawksworth | 7549 | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 1947 | 13/03/1950 | 08/03/1963 | GWR | 9412 | 13/03/1950 | ||
GWR | Hawksworth | 2549/3725 | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 1947 | 31/10/1954 | 03/06/1965 | GWR | 9495 | 31/10/1954 | ||
GWR | 385 | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1872 | 08/1880 | 07/1935 | GWR | 1549 | 08/1880 | |||
GWR | Armstrong | 103 | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1868 | 05/1869 | 08/1929 | GWR GWR (Renum) |
1072 549 |
05/1869 07/1870 |
||
SR | Wainwright | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1901 | 09/1906 | 20/10/1956 | SR (1931) BR |
1549 31549 |
09/1906 04/1949 |
|||
SR | Marsh | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 1893 | 01/1902 | 09/12/1961 | SR (1931) BR |
2549 32549 |
01/1902 07/1948 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 1956 | 8F | 2-8-0 | 1935 | 03/1945 | 25/05/1968 | LMS BR |
8549 48549 |
03/1945 25/03/1950 |
||
LMS | Stanier | 1555 | 8F | 2-8-0 | 1935 | 10/1945 | 27/05/1967 | LNER (1946) LNER (1947) LMS BR |
3149 3549 8754 48754 |
10/1945 02/1947 10/1947 05/02/1949 |
||
LYR | Hughes | 3F | 898 | 0-6-0 | 1906 | 06/1912 | 06/11/1954 | LYR LMS BR |
239 12549 52549 |
06/1912 1924 07/1948 |
||
LNWR | Whale | 4549 | 2P/3P | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 1904 | 05/1906 | 12/1930 | LNWR LMS (1st) |
1787 5252 |
05/1906 02/1927 |
HYPERION |
WD | 25490 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 03/1944 | 04/1950 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3704 73704 |
03/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 25491 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 03/1944 | 01/1950 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3705 73705 |
03/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 25492 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 03/1944 | 05/1951 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3706 73706 |
03/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 25493 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 03/1944 | 04/1951 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3707 73707 |
03/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 25494 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 03/1944 | 10/1951 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3708 73708 |
03/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 25495 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 02/1951 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3709 73709 |
04/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 25496 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 11/1951 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3710 73710 |
04/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 25497 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 08/1951 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3711 73711 |
04/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 25498 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 02/1950 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3712 73712 |
04/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 25499 | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 11/1951 | WD (Orig.) WD |
3713 73713 |
04/1944 1945 |
|||
WD | 4896 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 08/1943 | 17/12/1962 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) BR |
7080 77080 90549 |
08/1943 01/1945 03/1951 |
|||
WD | 25404 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 02/1945 | 11/1949 | WD (7xxxx) NS |
78549 4447 |
02/1945 1946 |
|||
LSWR | Adams | Jubilee | 0-4-2 | 1887 | 06/1889 | 12/1929 | LSWR | 549 | 06/1889 | |||
SR | Maunsell | Q | 0-6-0 | 1938 | 09/1939 | 21/07/1963 | SR (1931) BR |
549 30549 |
09/1939 04/1949 |
|||
MR | Johnson | 1P | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1881 | 03/1882 | 20/06/1926 | MR MR (1907) |
1549 1283 |
03/1882 08/1907 |
||
LNWR | Webb | 4074 | 2F | Cauliflowers (Cauliflower) | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 10/1900 | 11/1950 | LNWR LMS (1924) LMS (Dup.) BR |
540 8549 28549 58410 |
10/1900 08/1928 07/1942 1949 |
|
LNWR | Webb | 2549 | 2F | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | 1873 | 07/1882 | 1907 | LNWR | 2446 | 07/1882 | |
LNWR | Webb | 3205 | 2F | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | 1873 | 09/1891 | 11/1947 | LNWR LNWR (Dup) LMS (1923) LMS (Dup) |
1344 3549 8288 28288 |
09/1891 12/1917 09/1927 07/1940 |
|
LYR | Barton Wright | 2134 | 568 | 0-6-0 | 1876 | 02/1878 | 23/10/1959 | LYR LMS (1924) BR |
549 11358 51358 |
02/1878 1924 26/11/1949 |
||
CR | Drummond | 2F | 294 (Jumbo) | 0-6-0 | 1883 | 06/1886 | 03/1946 | CR CR (1892) LMS |
309 549 17248 |
06/1886 1892 1924 |
||
CR | Drummond | 2F | 294 (Jumbo) | 0-6-0 | 1883 | 08/1892 | 20/11/1961 | CR (Dup) CR LMS BR |
1549 549 17350 57350 |
1919 07/1919 1924 17/09/1949 |
||
MR | Fowler | 4F | 0-6-0 | 1911 | 12/1928 | 02/05/1964 | LMS BR |
4549 44549 |
12/1928 17/06/1950 |
|||
MR | Johnson | 1549 | 2F | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 1875 | 03/1876 | 08/09/1952 | MR MR (1907) LMS (Dup.) BR |
1200 2968 22968 58149 |
03/1876 10/1907 19/05/1934 21/04/1949 |
|
FR | 2204 | 2F | G1 | 0-6-0T | 1867 | 1872 | 04/1925 | FR LMS |
68 11549 |
1872 1924 |
||
LYR | Aspinall | 549 | 2F | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1897 | 12/1897 | 17/01/1959 | LYR LMS BR |
506 11546 51546 |
12/1897 1924 17/09/1949 |
|
LMS | Fowler | 2302 | 3F | 3F | 0-6-0T | 1924 | 06/1927 | 08/09/1962 | LMS LMS (1934) BR |
16549 7466 47466 |
06/1927 1934 04/1950 |
|
LMS | Fowler | 1565 | 3F | 3F | 0-6-0T | 1924 | 12/1927 | 08/1964 | LMS LMS (1934) BR |
16632 7549 47549 |
12/1927 1934 25/11/1950 |
|
LNWR | Webb | 2939 | 2F | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 12/1886 | 07/1931 | LNWR LNWR (Duplicate) LMS |
549 3287 7550 |
12/1886 01/1922 12/1927 |
||
LNWR | Webb | 3549 | A Compound | 0-8-0 | 1893 | 11/1894 | 16/07/1949 | LNWR LMS BR |
2529 8954 48954 |
11/1894 09/1927 1949 |
||
LNWR | Webb | 3674 | A Compound | 0-8-0 | 1893 | 12/1896 | 12/1930 | LNWR LMS |
2549 8963 |
12/1896 07/1927 |
||
LMS | Fowler | 7F | 7F | 0-8-0 | 1929 | 24/08/1929 | 04/1949 | LMS BR |
9549 49549 |
24/08/1929 1949 |
||
LYR | Hughes | 1177 | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1912 | 01/1913 | 12/1936 | LYR LMS |
1549 12843 |
01/1913 1924 |
||
LNWR | Webb | 3864 | John Hick | 2-(2-2)-2 | 1894 | 03/1898 | 08/1909 | LNWR | 1549 | 03/1898 | JOHN RENNIE | |
LNWR | Webb | 2765 | 4ft 6 Tank | 2-4-2T | 1879 | 11/1884 | 11/1930 | LNWR LMS |
998 6549 |
11/1884 07/1928 |
||
LMS | Fowler | 3P | 2-6-2T | 1930 | 03/08/1931 | 03/06/1961 | LMS LMS (1934) BR |
15549 50 40050 |
03/08/1931 15/05/1934 18/11/1950 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 24305 | 4P | 2-6-4T | 1935 | 07/07/1936 | 18/11/1961 | LMS BR |
2549 42549 |
07/07/1936 23/10/1948 |
||
MR | Johnson | 4549 | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1896 | 12/1899 | 17/10/1959 | MR MR (1907) BR |
2431 513 40513 |
1899 1907 05/1948 |
||
MR | Johnson | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1901 | 05/1951 | MR MR (1907) BR |
2637 549 40549 |
1901 1907 1949 |
||||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 12/1943 | 31/12/1966 | LMS BR |
5490 45490 |
12/1943 26/06/1948 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 12/1943 | 17/07/1965 | LMS BR |
5491 45491 |
12/1943 29/05/1948 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 01/1944 | 31/12/1966 | LMS BR |
5492 45492 |
01/1944 02/10/1948 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 01/1944 | 06/01/1968 | LMS BR |
5493 45493 |
01/1944 14/01/1950 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 01/1944 | 16/09/1967 | LMS BR |
5494 45494 |
01/1944 29/01/1949 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 02/1944 | 04/03/1967 | LMS BR |
5495 45495 |
02/1944 21/05/1949 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 02/1944 | 08/06/1964 | LMS BR |
5496 45496 |
02/1944 04/06/1949 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 04/1944 | 02/1964 | LMS BR |
5497 45497 |
04/1944 02/07/1949 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 04/1944 | 26/06/1965 | LMS BR |
5498 45498 |
04/1944 04/06/1949 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 5MT (Black Five) | 4-6-0 | 1934 | 04/1944 | 07/1965 | LMS BR |
5499 45499 |
04/1944 14/08/1948 |
|||
LNWR | Whale | 4684 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 09/1907 | 12/1930 | LNWR LMS |
2112 5490 |
09/1907 02/1927 |
VICTORIA | |
LNWR | Whale | 4686 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 09/1907 | 06/1934 | LNWR LMS |
1135 5491 |
09/1907 03/1927 |
PRINCE GEORGE | |
LNWR | Whale | 4688 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 10/1907 | 11/1928 | LNWR LMS |
1526 5492 |
10/1907 11/1926 |
SANSPAREIL | |
LNWR | Whale | 4689 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 10/1907 | 08/1925 | LNWR LMS |
2161 5493 |
10/1907 1926 |
JEANIE DEANS | |
LNWR | Whale | 4770 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 12/1908 | 06/1929 | LNWR LMS |
322 5494 |
12/1908 06/1927 |
ADRIATIC | |
LNWR | Whale | 4771 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 12/1908 | 12/1930 | LNWR LMS |
884 5495 |
12/1908 01/1928 |
GREATER BRITAIN | |
LNWR | Whale | 4772 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 01/1909 | 03/1932 | LNWR LMS |
887 5496 |
01/1909 01/1928 |
FORTUNA | |
LNWR | Whale | 4773 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 01/1909 | 11/1934 | LNWR LMS LMS (Dup) |
1020 5497 25497 |
01/1909 09/1927 1934 |
MAJESTIC | |
LNWR | Whale | 4774 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 01/1909 | 12/1933 | LNWR LMS |
1483 5498 |
01/1909 06/1927 |
RED GAUNTLET | |
LNWR | Whale | 4775 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 01/1909 | 12/1933 | LNWR LMS |
1490 5499 |
01/1909 12/1927 |
WELLINGTON | |
LNWR | Whale | 4865 | Experiment | 4-6-0 | 1905 | 01/1910 | 03/1932 | LNWR LMS |
1471 5549 |
01/1910 07/1927 |
WORCESTERSHIRE | |
LMS | Fowler | 6P | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 1930 | 27/04/1934 | 16/06/1962 | LMS BR |
5549 45549 |
27/04/1934 12/02/1949 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 5490 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 09/1919 | 01/1936 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
395 5741 25741 |
09/1919 06/1926 11/1934 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 5491 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 10/1919 | 03/1936 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
889 5744 25744 |
10/1919 04/1927 05/1934 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 5492 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 10/1919 | 12/1934 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
1113 5745 25745 |
10/1919 02/1926 1936 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 5493 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 10/1919 | 02/1936 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
1408 5746 25746 |
10/1919 04/1926 10/1934 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 5494 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 10/1919 | 04/1936 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
1422 5747 25747 |
10/1919 11/1923 10/1934 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 5495 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 10/1919 | 10/1936 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
1478 5748 25748 |
10/1919 02/1928 03/1934 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 5496 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 10/1919 | 01/1946 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
1535 5749 25749 |
10/1919 12/1926 11/1934 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 5497 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 11/1919 | 03/1936 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
1542 5750 25750 |
11/1919 06/1926 10/1934 |
MARATHON | |
LNWR | Cooke | 5498 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 11/1919 | 07/1944 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
1549 5751 25751 |
11/1919 08/1925 01/1935 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 5499 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 11/1919 | 06/1948 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) BR |
1557 5752 25752 58002 |
11/1919 05/1927 06/1934 1949 |
||
LNWR | Cooke | 239 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 02/1922 | 02/1936 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
549 5826 25826 |
02/1922 09/1923 07/1934 |
||
GNR | Gresley | 1605 | A3 | 4-6-2 | 1922 | 25/10/1924 | 11/06/1963 | LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR (BR Tmp) BR |
2549 518 50 E50 60050 |
25/10/1924 19/03/1946 08/07/1946 03/02/1948 18/08/1948 |
PERSIMMON | |
GNR | Gresley | 23118 | A3 | 4-6-2 | 1922 | 09/11/1924 | 01/10/1962 | LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR |
2580 549 81 60081 |
09/11/1924 1946 01/12/1946 03/06/1948 |
SHOTOVER | |
LNER | Thompson | 5498 | 5MT | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1942 | 11/04/1947 | 31/12/1966 | LNER (1946) BR |
1140 61140 |
11/04/1947 19/01/1949 |
|
LNER | Thompson | 5499 | 5MT | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1942 | 11/04/1947 | 25/07/1965 | LNER (1946) BR |
1141 61141 |
11/04/1947 06/11/1948 |
|
GER | Holden | 144 | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 06/1921 | 01/01/1959 | GER LNER (1924) LNER (1942) BR |
1549 8549 7463 61549 |
06/1921 01/1924 1942 12/1948 |
||
GNR | Ivatt | 1163 | C12 | 4-4-2T | 1898 | 08/1907 | 11/1949 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
1549 4549 7399 67399 |
08/1907 12/1924 11/1946 01/1948 |
||
GER | Holden | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1900 | 03/1904 | 12/12/1955 | GER LNER (1924) LNER (1942) LNER (1946) BR |
1858 8858 7728 2549 62549 |
03/1904 1924 01/1943 03/1946 02/1949 |
|||
LNER | Gresley | 1549 | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 1927 | 17/05/1932 | 11/10/1960 | LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
232 2739 62739 |
17/05/1932 04/1946 11/02/1950 |
THE BADSWORTH | |
GNR | Ivatt | 3549 | J3 | 0-6-0 | 1896 | 12/1897 | 03/1951 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
1094 4094 4115 64115 |
12/1897 09/1926 07/1946 1948 |
||
GNR | Ivatt | 1242 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 10/1909 | 11/10/1954 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
31 3031 5490 65490 |
10/1909 12/1926 05/1946 07/1949 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1243 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 11/1909 | 12/10/1953 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
32 3032 5491 65491 |
11/1909 05/1925 06/1946 01/1949 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1246 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 11/1909 | 28/09/1953 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
33 3033 5492 65492 |
11/1909 01/1925 06/1946 01/1949 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1247 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 11/1909 | 02/08/1954 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
34 3034 5493 65493 |
11/1909 01/1925 06/1946 08/1949 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1249 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 12/1909 | 20/01/1955 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
35 3035 5494 65494 |
12/1909 11/1925 07/1946 02/1949 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1252 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 12/1909 | 09/08/1954 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
36 3036 5495 65495 |
12/1909 04/1924 06/1946 12/1949 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1251 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 12/1909 | 08/02/1954 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
37 3037 5496 65496 |
12/1909 10/1925 06/1946 04/1949 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1253 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 12/1909 | 23/11/1953 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
38 3038 5497 65497 |
12/1909 12/1925 06/1946 09/1949 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1254 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 12/1909 | 30/12/1955 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
39 3039 5498 65498 |
12/1909 06/1925 06/1946 12/1948 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1255 | 3F | J5 | 0-6-0 | 1909 | 01/1910 | 20/04/1953 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
40 3040 5499 65499 |
01/1910 12/1925 06/1946 02/1949 |
|
GNR | Ivatt | 1384 | 3F | J6 | 0-6-0 | 1911 | 05/1913 | 18/03/1959 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
549 3549 4198 64198 |
05/1913 09/1924 07/1946 11/1949 |
|
GCR | Parker | J8 (Bashers) | 0-6-0 | 1887 | 07/1888 | 08/1928 | GCR GCR (Renum) LNER (1924) |
163 549 5549 |
07/1888 10/1893 06/1925 |
|||
GCR | Robinson | 4549 | J11 (Pom-Pom) | 0-6-0 | 1901 | 03/1904 | 17/12/1958 | GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
224 5224 4345 64345 |
03/1904 05/1924 09/1946 07/1949 |
||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 12/1882 | 12/1925 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
490 5490 |
12/1882 1924 |
|||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 11/1882 | 12/1926 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
491 5491 |
11/1882 1924 |
|||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 01/1883 | 04/1926 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
492 5492 |
01/1883 1924 |
|||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 01/1883 | 07/1926 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
493 5493 |
01/1883 04/1924 |
|||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 02/1883 | 06/1927 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
494 5494 |
02/1883 03/1924 |
|||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 02/1883 | 10/1928 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
495 5495 |
02/1883 01/1925 |
|||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 02/1883 | 09/1928 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
496 5496 |
02/1883 03/1925 |
|||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 03/1883 | 08/1929 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
497 5497 |
03/1883 11/1924 |
|||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 03/1883 | 10/1925 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
498 5498 |
03/1883 1924 |
|||
MSLR | Sacré | J12 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | 11/1883 | 02/1928 | MSLR LNER (1924) |
499 5499 |
11/1883 02/1925 |
|||
GER | Holden | 954 | J14 | 0-6-0 | 1893 | 1898 | 1909 | GER | 549 | 1898 | ||
GER | Worsdell | J15 | 0-6-0 | 1883 | 08/1913 | 08/02/1960 | GER (1st) LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
549 7549 5477 65477 |
08/1913 1924 12/1946 05/1948 |
|||
GER | Holden | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1900 | 11/1902 | 19/12/1960 | GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
1199 8199 5549 65549 |
11/1902 1924 06/1946 07/1951 |
|||
NER | Worsdell | 143 | 2F | J21 | 0-6-0 | 1886 | 03/1891 | 12/1946 | NER LNER (1946) |
1549 5074 |
03/1891 05/1946 |
|
HBR | Stirling | 549 | J23 | 0-6-0 | 1889 | 10/1897 | 01/1936 | HBR NER LNER (1924) |
72 3072 2453 |
10/1897 1922 05/1924 |
||
NBR | Drummond | J34 | 0-6-0 | 1879 | 1880 | 03/1926 | NBR NBR (Dupl) LNER (1924 1st) LNER (1924 Final) |
509 1415 9549 10415 |
1880 1920 1924 08/1924 |
|||
NBR | Drummond | J34 | 0-6-0 | 1879 | 10/1882 | 07/1923 | NBR LNER (1924 Final) |
549 9549 |
10/1882 08/1924 |
|||
NBR | Reid | 4F | J37 | 0-6-0 | 1914 | 11/1915 | 13/07/1964 | NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
431 9431 4549 64549 |
11/1915 09/1925 11/1946 08/1950 |
||
GNR | Gresley | 1549 | J50 | 0-6-0T | 1922 | 12/1922 | 18/03/1963 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
226 3226 8925 68925 |
12/1922 07/1926 06/1946 02/12/1950 |
||
GER | Holden | J67 | 0-6-0T | 1890 | 05/1894 | 11/02/1962 | GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
373 7373 8549 68549 |
05/1894 1924 05/1946 02/1949 |
|||
NER | Worsdell | J73 | 0-6-0T | 1891 | 05/1892 | 08/02/1960 | NER LNER (1946) BR |
549 8360 68360 |
05/1892 05/1946 10/07/1948 |
|||
HBR | Stirling | 4549 | J75 | 0-6-0T | 1901 | 02/1908 | 09/1937 | HBR NER LNER (1924) |
146 3146 2527 |
02/1908 1923 12/1924 |
||
GNR | Gresley | 22626 | 3MT | N2 | 0-6-2T | 1920 | 04/1921 | 12/09/1961 | GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR |
1770 4770 9549 69549 |
04/1921 05/1924 10/1946 03/1949 |
|
GCR | Robinson | 3709 | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1911 | 01/1918 | 20/09/1941 | ROD LNER (1924) WD |
1665 6549 700 |
01/1918 30/03/1929 20/09/1941 |
||
USA | 70549 | USA | 2-8-0 | 1942 | 1943 | 2067 | 1943 | |||||
USA | 69549 | USA | 2-8-0 | 1942 | 1943 | 2306 | 1943 | |||||
USA | 8366 | USA | 2-8-0 | 1942 | 1943 | 2549 | 1943 | |||||
USA | 71549 | USA | 2-8-0 | 1942 | 1944 | 3294 | 1944 | |||||
USA | 70506 | USA | 2-8-0 | 1942 | 1944 | 3549 | 1944 | |||||
USA | 8549 | USA | 2-8-0 | 1942 | 1944 | 3636 | 1944 |
Diesel Locomotive: '549'
Built For | Builder | Works Num | Type | Class | Wheels | Intro. | Built | Withdrawn | Number Type | Number | Number Start | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BR | Brush Traction, Loughborough | 442 | Type4 | 47 | Co-Co | 1962 | 26/10/1963 | 31/12/1992 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (47/4) |
D1549 47434 |
26/10/1963 06/1974 |
|
BR | Brush Traction, Loughborough | 486 | Type4 | 47 | Co-Co | 1962 | 17/03/1964 | 01/08/1991 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (47/0) BR (47/4) |
D1724 47133 47549 |
17/03/1964 1973 02/1975 |
|
BR | Brush Traction, Loughborough | 549 | Type4 | 47 | Co-Co | 1962 | 26/11/1964 | 31/05/2006 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (47/3) |
D1787 47306 |
26/11/1964 04/1974 |
|
BR | Derby Works | Shunter | 08 | 0-6-0 | 1953 | 26/09/1958 | 10/02/1992 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D3549 08434 |
26/09/1958 02/1974 |
||
BR | Darlington Works | Shunter | 08 | 0-6-0 | 1953 | 03/09/1959 | 24/11/1985 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D3713 08549 |
03/09/1959 03/1974 |
||
BR | Brush Traction, Loughborough | Type2 | 30, 31 | A1A-A1A | 1957 | 10/09/1959 | 22/03/1989 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (31/1) |
D5549 31131 |
10/09/1959 26/01/1974 |
||
BR | Brush Traction, Loughborough | Type2 | 30, 31 | A1A-A1A | 1957 | 10/05/1962 | 01/03/1996 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (31/1) BR (31/5) BR (31/4 (2)) |
D5840 31307 31549 31449 |
10/05/1962 02/1974 04/10/1990 05/02/2001 |
||
BR | BRCW | Type3 | 33 | Bo-Bo | 1960 | 01/04/1961 | 06/02/1989 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D6549 33031 |
01/04/1961 02/1974 |
||
BR | English Electric Vulcan Foundry | 3549/D978 | Type3 | 37 | Co-Co | 1960 | 17/06/1965 | 01/08/2005 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (37/0) BR (37/4) |
D6989 37289 37408 |
17/06/1965 02/1974 21/08/1985 |
|
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 28/05/1965 | 09/02/1987 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7549 25199 |
28/05/1965 03/1974 |
||
BR | Clayton Equipment Co. Ltd., Hatton, Derby | Type1 | 17 | Bo-Bo | 1962 | 08/10/1963 | 21/09/1971 | BR (Pre Tops) | D8549 | 08/10/1963 | ||
BR | Swindon Works | Type1 | 14 | 0-6-0 | 1964 | 19/08/1965 | 01/04/1968 | BR (Pre Tops) | D9549 | 19/08/1965 |
Diesel Multiple Unit Vehicles: '549'
Built For | Builder | Class | Wheels | Intro. | Number Type | Number | Type |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BR | 104 | BR | 50549 | 1stGen | |||
BR | Rolls Royce | 111 | BR | 51549 | 1stGen | ||
BR | 171 | BR | 59549 | 1stGen |
Orders: '549'
Manufacturer | Order Number | Order Date | Company | Locomotive Class | Designer | Wheels | Order Size |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neilson, Reid & Co. | 549 | 1882 | NBR | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 2 |
156 matches