Depot: Hasland
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1326 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1326 | Snapshot | 24 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1238 | Snapshot | 24 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1262 | Snapshot | 24 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1267 | Snapshot | 24 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1300 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1326 | Snapshot | 24 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/11/1930 | 1262 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/11/1930 | 1326 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1238 | Snapshot | 28 | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1261 | Snapshot | M18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1267 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1300 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1405 | Snapshot | 28 | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1416 | Snapshot | 28 | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/07/1935 | 1405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1261 | Snapshot | 13E | Upminster | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1416 | Snapshot | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 1518 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1531 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1532 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1873 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2092 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2094 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2095 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2102 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2108 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3211 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3219 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 337 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3769 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3771 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3856 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3890 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3936 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3959 | Snapshot | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4053 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4054 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4107 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4162 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4244 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4274 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4288 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4294 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4410 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 466 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 472 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 490 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 491 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 555 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 556 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 557 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7272 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7278 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7423 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7426 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7535 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7968 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7971 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7973 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7980 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7983 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7984 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7990 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7992 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7993 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7997 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 1813 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3885 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 12/06/1948 | 3769 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 2092 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 2095 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 2102 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 2102 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 2108 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 43802 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 40466 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 409 | Transfer in from: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1949 | 40555 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 3885 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | m/e | 06/1949 | 41920 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 40503 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | m/e | 08/1949 | 41912 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 3890 | Transfer out to: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 40548 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 40506 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 40359 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 40556 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 40537 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | 40490 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 40537 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 40537 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 41873 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 41829 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 47426 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44053 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 40556 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 40370 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 40556 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 40556 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1950 | 43802 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 43970 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 47997 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 43970 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44053 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 43970 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 44053 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 44053 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 43211 | Transfer out to: | 71H | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 43211 | Transfer in from: | 71H | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 43856 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/01/1952 | 41829 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 43723 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 43970 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 40502 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 41846 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 40548 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 40503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 46499 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 46500 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 40409 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 43622 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 58153 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 58176 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/10/1953 | 41846 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 43891 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 44603 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 43219 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 43771 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 40472 | Transfer out to: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 47993 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1954 | 40359 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 40550 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 47978 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 47993 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 47997 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 47971 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 47984 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 47990 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/05/1954 | 41813 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 41875 | Transfer in from: | 17D | Rowsley | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 47997 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 47997 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 48065 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 48095 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 41875 | Transfer out to: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 43936 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 44107 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 44274 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 47986 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 47977 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 47982 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 48371 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 44136 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 41532 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 40418 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 41518 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 43723 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40418 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 41531 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 40691 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1955 | 47993 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | m/e | 01/1956 | 47983 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 47971 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 47988 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 40491 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 11/02/1956 | 47997 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 47969 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 10/03/1956 | 47992 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 47972 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/04/1956 | 40556 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 43631 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 48082 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 58153 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 58176 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 16/06/1956 | 47977 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 47218 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 18/08/1956 | 47988 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 47967 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 47979 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 10/11/1956 | 47971 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 46497 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40537 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40557 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 47994 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 48212 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 43631 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1957 | 43891 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1957 | 43959 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 44133 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 44217 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 02/02/1957 | 47979 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 09/02/1957 | 47980 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 16/03/1957 | 47978 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 06/04/1957 | 47972 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 13/04/1957 | 47973 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 47987 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 47995 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 04/05/1957 | 47987 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 48359 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40537 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40557 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 06/07/1957 | 47986 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 06/07/1957 | 47995 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 03/08/1957 | 47969 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 48125 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 48205 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 46497 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 07/09/1957 | 47968 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 43997 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46497 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 48002 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 48116 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 48364 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 48547 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | w/e | 23/11/1957 | 47967 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 28/12/1957 | 47982 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 48089 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | Garratt | 2-6-6-2T | on | 14/03/1958 | 47994 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/04/1958 | 40337 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 42373 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 47007 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 19/05/1958 | 42336 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 09/06/1958 | 42336 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40537 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40557 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 47007 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 43967 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 44122 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48527 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 43211 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42111 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42186 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42490 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 40502 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 40550 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43212 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 46497 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 46499 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 46500 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 48002 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 48494 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 44294 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 48056 | Transfer in from: | 17D | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 48364 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42184 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42326 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42349 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42184 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42186 | Transfer out to: | 27F | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 13/07/1959 | 42336 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 42352 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 42111 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 42490 | Transfer out to: | 27F | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 28/09/1959 | 42336 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 19/10/1959 | 42336 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 23/10/1959 | 42336 | Transfer out to: | 14C | St Albans | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 40691 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1959 | D3792 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1959 | 43997 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42326 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42349 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42352 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42373 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44133 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44162 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 48187 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 48284 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 44136 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 44217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 48447 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 48215 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 48447 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 44410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 48215 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 44261 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 41531 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 44244 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 43982 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 41531 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 43986 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Coalville | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 10/1961 | 47218 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 44463 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 47006 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 44261 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 44261 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 43940 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 43940 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 47006 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 48089 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 48065 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 44122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 48212 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48056 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48082 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48095 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48284 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48494 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 48125 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 47272 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 48527 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 44053 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 44026 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 44381 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 47272 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 47278 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 44026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 47543 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 47611 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 48495 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 44261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 44381 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 22/02/1964 | 43986 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1964 | 44288 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 44381 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 48116 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 48187 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 48359 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48371 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48495 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48547 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 44235 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 47272 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 47423 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44381 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44463 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 47535 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 47543 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 47611 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D3792 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 43967 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 43982 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44054 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44235 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44603 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48205 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton |