NER/LNER Worsdell "G5" Class 0-4-4T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 1737 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 1881 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 1888 | MAL | Malton | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 1334 | DAR | Darlington | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 408 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7240 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7241 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7242 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7243 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7244 | SBH | Blyth (South) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7245 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7246 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7247 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7248 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7249 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7250 | DAR | Darlington | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7251 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7252 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7253 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7254 | SKN | Stockton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7255 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7256 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7257 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7259 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7260 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7261 | SBH | Blyth (South) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7262 | WBY | Whitby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7264 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7265 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7266 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7267 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7268 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7269 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7270 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7271 | WHL | West Hartlepool | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7272 | SKN | Stockton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7273 | SBK | Starbeck | MAL | Malton | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7274 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7275 | MAL | Malton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7276 | MAL | Malton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7277 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7278 | SBK | Starbeck | NEV | Neville Hill | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7279 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7280 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7281 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7282 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7283 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7284 | MAL | Malton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7285 | SBH | Blyth (South) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7286 | MAL | Malton | SBK | Starbeck | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7287 | KIT | Kittybrewster | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7288 | SKN | Stockton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7289 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7290 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7291 | WHL | West Hartlepool | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7292 | KEI | Keith | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7293 | WBY | Whitby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7294 | SKN | Stockton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7295 | SBH | Blyth (South) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7297 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7299 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7300 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7301 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7302 | WBY | Whitby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7303 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7304 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7305 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7306 | AUK | West Auckland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7308 | WBY | Whitby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7309 | DAR | Darlington | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7310 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7311 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7312 | AUK | West Auckland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7313 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7314 | WHL | West Hartlepool | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7315 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7316 | WHL | West Hartlepool | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7317 | AUK | West Auckland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7318 | SKN | Stockton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7319 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7320 | SBH | Blyth (South) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7321 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7322 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7323 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7324 | NLN | Northallerton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7325 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7326 | SBH | Blyth (South) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7327 | KIT | Kittybrewster | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7328 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7329 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7330 | MAL | Malton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7331 | WHL | West Hartlepool | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7332 | SBK | Starbeck | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7333 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7334 | SBH | Blyth (South) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7335 | WBY | Whitby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7336 | DAR | Darlington | SUN | Sunderland | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7337 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7338 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7339 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7340 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7341 | SBH | Blyth (South) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7342 | SBK | Starbeck | DAR | Darlington | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7343 | WHL | West Hartlepool | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7344 | NLN | Northallerton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7345 | AUK | West Auckland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7346 | NLN | Northallerton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7347 | SBH | Blyth (South) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7348 | SUN | Sunderland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7349 | MAL | Malton | |||
03/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7266 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
06/03/1948 | Reallocation | 7250 | DAR | Darlington | SEL | Selby | |
06/03/1948 | Reallocation | 7278 | NEV | Neville Hill | DAR | Darlington | |
08/05/1948 | Reallocation | 7269 | SBK | Starbeck | STR | Stratford | |
08/05/1948 | Reallocation | 7279 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | STR | Stratford | |
06/1948 | Condemned | 7306 | AUK | West Auckland | COND | ||
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 7242 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | AUK | West Auckland | |
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 7266 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | NEV | Neville Hill | |
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 7333 | HTN | Heaton | AUK | West Auckland | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 7262 | WBY | Whitby | NEV | Neville Hill | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 7308 | WBY | Whitby | NEV | Neville Hill | |
21/08/1948 | Reallocation | 7286 | SBK | Starbeck | MAL | Malton | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 7286 | MAL | Malton | SBK | Starbeck | |
18/09/1948 | Reallocation | 7286 | SBK | Starbeck | SEL | Selby | |
01/01/1949 | Reallocation | 7302 | WBY | Whitby | NEV | Neville Hill | |
05/02/1949 | Reallocation | 67293 | WBY | Whitby | NEV | Neville Hill | |
05/02/1949 | Reallocation | 7302 | NEV | Neville Hill | WBY | Whitby | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 67241 | HTN | Heaton | BLA | Blaydon | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 67317 | AUK | West Auckland | SKN | Stockton | |
14/05/1949 | Reallocation | 67284 | MAL | Malton | SBK | Starbeck | |
14/05/1949 | Reallocation | 7332 | SBK | Starbeck | MAL | Malton | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 7303 | HTN | Heaton | TWD | Tweedmouth | |
23/07/1949 | Reallocation | 67246 | HTN | Heaton | SBH | Blyth (South) | |
23/07/1949 | Reallocation | 7304 | HTN | Heaton | BLA | Blaydon | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 7333 | AUK | West Auckland | DAR | Darlington | |
24/09/1949 | Reallocation | 67254 | SKN | Stockton | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
24/09/1949 | Reallocation | 67305 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | SKN | Stockton | |
12/1949 | Reallocation | 67272 | SKN | Stockton | DAR | Darlington | |
12/1949 | Reallocation | 67278 | DAR | Darlington | SKN | Stockton | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 67272 | DAR | Darlington | DAR | Darlington | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 67278 | SKN | Stockton | SKN | Stockton | |
07/01/1950 | Reallocation | 7276 | MAL | Malton | SUN | Sunderland | |
21/01/1950 | Reallocation | 67242 | AUK | West Auckland | SKN | Stockton | |
21/01/1950 | Reallocation | 67294 | SKN | Stockton | AUK | West Auckland | |
18/02/1950 | Reallocation | 7304 | BLA | Blaydon | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
04/03/1950 | Reallocation | 67290 | SBX | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
08/05/1950 | Condemned | 67299 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67320 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 52A | Gateshead | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67325 | BLA | Blaydon | 52A | Gateshead | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67329 | BLA | Blaydon | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/1950 | Condemned | 67285 | SBH | Blyth (South) | COND | ||
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 7309 | DAR | Darlington | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 67320 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 67325 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 67329 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
20/08/1950 | Reallocation | 67288 | SKN | Stockton | 54B | Tyne Dock | |
01/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67273 | MAL | Malton | 51A | Darlington | |
01/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67284 | SBK | Starbeck | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67273 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67284 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
22/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67272 | DAR | Darlington | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
22/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67291 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 51F | West Auckland | |
22/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67294 | AUK | West Auckland | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
29/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67316 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 51A | Darlington | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67272 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67291 | 51F | West Auckland | 51F | West Auckland | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67294 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67316 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
23/12/1950 | Reallocation | 67284 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 51A | Darlington | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 67284 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
25/02/1951 | Reallocation | 67337 | NEV | Neville Hill | 50D | Starbeck | |
03/03/1951 | Reallocation | 67337 | 50D | Starbeck | 50D | Starbeck | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 67337 | 50D | Starbeck | 50D | Starbeck | |
07/04/1951 | Reallocation | 67253 | SBK | Starbeck | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
07/04/1951 | Reallocation | 67337 | 50D | Starbeck | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 67253 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 67337 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
02/05/1951 | Condemned | 67255 | BLA | Blaydon | COND | ||
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 67325 | 52A | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67242 | SKN | Stockton | 51F | West Auckland | |
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67291 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67316 | 51A | Darlington | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67324 | NLN | Northallerton | 51F | West Auckland | |
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67331 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 51A | Darlington | |
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67333 | DAR | Darlington | 51J | Northallerton | |
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67344 | NLN | Northallerton | 51A | Darlington | |
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67345 | AUK | West Auckland | 51E | Stockton | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67242 | 51F | West Auckland | 51F | West Auckland | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67291 | 51J | Northallerton | 51J | Northallerton | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67316 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67324 | 51F | West Auckland | 51F | West Auckland | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67331 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67333 | 51J | Northallerton | 51J | Northallerton | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67344 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67345 | 51E | Stockton | 51E | Stockton | |
25/06/1951 | Condemned | 67245 | BLA | Blaydon | COND | ||
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67244 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 52A | Gateshead | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67252 | SUN | Sunderland | 52B | Heaton | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67270 | SUN | Sunderland | 52B | Heaton | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67293 | NEV | Neville Hill | 50C | Selby | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67310 | SUN | Sunderland | 52B | Heaton | |
11/07/1951 | Condemned | 67264 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67244 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67252 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67270 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67293 | 50C | Selby | 50C | Selby | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67310 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67316 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 52C | Blaydon | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67342 | DAR | Darlington | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
28/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67269 | STR | Stratford | 31A | Cambridge | |
28/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67279 | STR | Stratford | 31A | Cambridge | |
28/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67322 | STR | Stratford | 31A | Cambridge | |
04/08/1951 | Reallocation | 67289 | SBK | Starbeck | 50B | Neville Hill | |
18/08/1951 | Reallocation | 67269 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
18/08/1951 | Reallocation | 67279 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
18/08/1951 | Reallocation | 67289 | 50B | Neville Hill | 50B | Neville Hill | |
18/08/1951 | Reallocation | 67322 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/08/1951 | Condemned | 67313 | BLA | Blaydon | COND | ||
28/08/1951 | Condemned | 67317 | SKN | Stockton | COND | ||
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 67309 | 52A | Gateshead | 52C.1 | Alston | |
17/11/1951 | Reallocation | 67288 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 52B | Heaton | |
17/11/1951 | Reallocation | 67310 | 52B | Heaton | 54A | Sunderland | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67242 | 51F | West Auckland | 51E | Stockton | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67278 | SKN | Stockton | 51F | West Auckland | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67324 | 51F | West Auckland | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67331 | 51A | Darlington | 51J | Northallerton | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67333 | 51J | Northallerton | 51A | Darlington | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67342 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51F | West Auckland | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67344 | 51A | Darlington | 51J | Northallerton | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67346 | NLN | Northallerton | 51A | Darlington | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67242 | 51E | Stockton | 51E | Stockton | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67278 | 51F | West Auckland | 51F | West Auckland | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67324 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67331 | 51J | Northallerton | 51J | Northallerton | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67333 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67342 | 51F | West Auckland | 51F | West Auckland | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67344 | 51J | Northallerton | 51J | Northallerton | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67346 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67288 | 52B | Heaton | 51A | Darlington | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 67288 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 67318 | SKN | Stockton | 51F | West Auckland | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 67252 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 67270 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 67252 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 67270 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67248 | TWD | Tweedmouth | 52C | Blaydon | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67252 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67270 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67304 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67248 | 52C | Blaydon | 52C | Blaydon | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67252 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67270 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67304 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67252 | 52B | Heaton | 52C | Blaydon | |
12/08/1952 | Condemned | 67292 | KEI | Keith | COND | ||
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67252 | 52C | Blaydon | 52C | Blaydon | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67273 | 51A | Darlington | 51F | West Auckland | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67305 | SKN | Stockton | 51A | Darlington | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67324 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51A | Darlington | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67333 | 51A | Darlington | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67343 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 51A | Darlington | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67346 | 51A | Darlington | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67324 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67327 | KIT | Kittybrewster | 61C | Keith | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67333 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67343 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67346 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67273 | 51F | West Auckland | 51A | Darlington | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67296 | RBY | 52A | Gateshead | ||
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67305 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 67296 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 67327 | 61C | Keith | 61C | Keith | |
30/10/1952 | Condemned | 67275 | MAL | Malton | COND | ||
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67273 | 51A | Darlington | 51F | West Auckland | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67278 | 51F | West Auckland | 51E | Stockton | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67305 | 51E | Stockton | 51A | Darlington | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67342 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67344 | 51J | Northallerton | 51F | West Auckland | |
10/11/1952 | Condemned | 67252 | 52C | Blaydon | COND | ||
10/11/1952 | Condemned | 67276 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67273 | 51F | West Auckland | 51F | West Auckland | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67278 | 51E | Stockton | 51E | Stockton | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67305 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67342 | 51J | Northallerton | 51J | Northallerton | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67344 | 51F | West Auckland | 51F | West Auckland | |
17/11/1952 | Condemned | 67244 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
24/11/1952 | Condemned | 67260 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
08/12/1952 | Condemned | 67330 | MAL | Malton | COND | ||
13/12/1952 | Reallocation | 67304 | 52B | Heaton | 52C | Blaydon | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 67304 | 52C | Blaydon | 52C | Blaydon | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 67312 | AUK | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 67331 | 51J | Northallerton | 51F | West Auckland | |
12/01/1953 | Condemned | 67348 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
17/01/1953 | Reallocation | 67312 | 51J | Northallerton | 51J | Northallerton | |
17/01/1953 | Reallocation | 67331 | 51F | West Auckland | 51F | West Auckland | |
09/02/1953 | Condemned | 67242 | 51E | Stockton | COND | ||
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 67273 | 51F | West Auckland | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 67344 | 51F | West Auckland | 54A | Sunderland | |
16/02/1953 | Condemned | 67291 | 51J | Northallerton | COND | ||
23/02/1953 | Condemned | 67303 | TWD | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
23/02/1953 | Condemned | 67331 | 51F | West Auckland | COND | ||
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 67254 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53D | Bridlington | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 67270 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 67318 | 51F | West Auckland | 51J | Northallerton | |
31/03/1953 | Condemned | 67287 | KIT | Kittybrewster | COND | ||
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 67254 | 53D | Bridlington | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 67315 | BLA | Blaydon | 52C | Blaydon | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 67321 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53D | Bridlington | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 67240 | NEV | Neville Hill | 50G | Whitby | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 67314 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 51A | Darlington | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 67324 | 51A | Darlington | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 67343 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 67345 | 51E | Stockton | 51A | Darlington | |
10/08/1953 | Condemned | 67335 | WBY | Whitby | COND | ||
19/12/1953 | Reallocation | 67321 | 53D | Bridlington | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
08/03/1954 | Condemned | 67295 | SBH | Blyth (South) | COND | ||
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 67293 | 50C | Selby | 50B | Neville Hill | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 67296 | 52A | Gateshead | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 67312 | 51J | Northallerton | 51A | Darlington | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 67314 | 51A | Darlington | 51J | Northallerton | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 67318 | 51J | Northallerton | 51A | Darlington | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 67345 | 51A | Darlington | 51J | Northallerton | |
12/04/1954 | Condemned | 67257 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 67259 | BLA | Blaydon | 52A | Gateshead | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 67315 | 52C | Blaydon | 52A | Gateshead | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 67320 | 52A | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 67329 | 52A | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
28/04/1954 | Condemned | 67349 | MAL | Malton | COND | ||
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 67268 | BLA | Blaydon | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 67270 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52C | Blaydon | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 67293 | 50B | Neville Hill | 50F | Malton | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 67345 | 51J | Northallerton | 54A | Sunderland | |
14/06/1954 | Condemned | 67267 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 67289 | 50B | Neville Hill | 50F | Malton | |
28/06/1954 | Condemned | 67288 | 51E | Stockton | COND | ||
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 67271 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 51E | Stockton | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 67272 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51J | Northallerton | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 67278 | 51E | Stockton | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 67314 | 51J | Northallerton | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 67315 | 52A | Gateshead | 54A | Sunderland | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 67343 | 51E | Stockton | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 67346 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51E | Stockton | |
07/08/1954 | Reallocation | 67327 | 61C | Keith | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
09/08/1954 | Condemned | 67283 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
25/09/1954 | Reallocation | 67294 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 54A | Sunderland | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 67265 | HEX | 52A | Gateshead | ||
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 67281 | MID | Middlesbrough | 51E | Stockton | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 67323 | BLA | Blaydon | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 67338 | MID | Middlesbrough | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 67339 | BLA | Blaydon | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
08/11/1954 | Condemned | 67272 | 51J | Northallerton | COND | ||
06/12/1954 | Condemned | 67247 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 67259 | 52A | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 67261 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 67277 | BLA | Blaydon | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 67278 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51J | Northallerton | |
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 67320 | 52C | Blaydon | 52A | Gateshead | |
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 67340 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
04/02/1955 | Condemned | 67327 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | ||
07/02/1955 | Condemned | 67271 | 51E | Stockton | COND | ||
19/02/1955 | Reallocation | 67312 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
22/02/1955 | Condemned | 67304 | 52C | Blaydon | COND | ||
08/03/1955 | Condemned | 67241 | BLA | Blaydon | COND | ||
08/03/1955 | Condemned | 67296 | 52F | Blyth (North) | COND | ||
08/03/1955 | Condemned | 67301 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
15/03/1955 | Condemned | 67249 | HEX | COND | |||
15/03/1955 | Condemned | 67309 | 52C.1 | Alston | COND | ||
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 67265 | 52A | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 67320 | 52A | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
22/03/1955 | Condemned | 67336 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
04/04/1955 | Condemned | 67293 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 67281 | 51E | Stockton | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 67319 | NEV | Neville Hill | 50F | Malton | |
27/04/1955 | Condemned | 67268 | 52D | Tweedmouth | COND | ||
14/05/1955 | Reallocation | 67341 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 52C | Blaydon | |
23/05/1955 | Condemned | 67307 | DUR | COND | |||
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 67294 | 54A | Sunderland | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 67315 | 54A | Sunderland | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 67316 | 52C | Blaydon | 54A | Sunderland | |
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 67334 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 54A | Sunderland | |
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 67347 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 54A | Sunderland | |
06/09/1955 | Condemned | 67310 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
19/09/1955 | Condemned | 67243 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 67246 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 52C | Blaydon | |
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 67254 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 67273 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 50C | Selby | |
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 67318 | 51A | Darlington | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 67320 | 52C | Blaydon | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 67326 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 52C | Blaydon | |
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 67341 | 52C | Blaydon | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
21/11/1955 | Condemned | 67328 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
22/11/1955 | Condemned | 67308 | 50Fs1 | COND | |||
06/12/1955 | Condemned | 67266 | NEV | Neville Hill | COND | ||
06/12/1955 | Condemned | 67300 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
12/12/1955 | Condemned | 67314 | 51C | West Hartlepool | COND | ||
13/12/1955 | Condemned | 67316 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
13/12/1955 | Condemned | 67345 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67240 | 50G | Whitby | 50F | Malton | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67259 | 52C | Blaydon | 54A | Sunderland | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67321 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 54A | Sunderland | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67338 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 54A | Sunderland | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67342 | 51J | Northallerton | 54A | Sunderland | |
27/02/1956 | Condemned | 67344 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 67343 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 54A | Sunderland | |
26/03/1956 | Condemned | 67251 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
26/03/1956 | Condemned | 67334 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
26/03/1956 | Condemned | 67347 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
27/03/1956 | Condemned | 67290 | 50B | Neville Hill | COND | ||
09/04/1956 | Condemned | 67312 | 51E | Stockton | COND | ||
10/04/1956 | Condemned | 67302 | WBY | Whitby | COND | ||
12/04/1956 | Condemned | 67332 | MAL | Malton | COND | ||
16/04/1956 | Condemned | 67240 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 67263 | DUR | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 67270 | 52C | Blaydon | 54A | Sunderland | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 67278 | 51J | Northallerton | 54A | Sunderland | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 67294 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 54A | Sunderland | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 67315 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 50F | Malton | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 67325 | 52C | Blaydon | 50F | Malton | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 67333 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 54A | Sunderland | |
01/10/1956 | Condemned | 67269 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
08/10/1956 | Condemned | 67284 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
08/10/1956 | Condemned | 67286 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
08/10/1956 | Condemned | 67333 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
20/10/1956 | Reallocation | 67280 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
20/10/1956 | Reallocation | 67311 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
11/1956 | Condemned | 67279 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
11/1956 | Condemned | 67322 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
03/12/1956 | Condemned | 67289 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
04/12/1956 | Condemned | 67298 | DUR | COND | |||
15/12/1956 | Reallocation | 67248 | 52C | Blaydon | 54A | Sunderland | |
15/12/1956 | Reallocation | 67256 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53D | Bridlington | |
15/12/1956 | Reallocation | 67323 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
15/12/1956 | Reallocation | 67346 | 51E | Stockton | 50F | Malton | |
07/01/1957 | Condemned | 67321 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
15/01/1957 | Condemned | 67294 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 67246 | 52C | Blaydon | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 67265 | 52C | Blaydon | 54A | Sunderland | |
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 67320 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 54A | Sunderland | |
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 67329 | 52C | Blaydon | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 67337 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
11/02/1957 | Condemned | 67346 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
16/02/1957 | Reallocation | 67246 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 54A | Sunderland | |
16/02/1957 | Reallocation | 67329 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 54A | Sunderland | |
05/03/1957 | Condemned | 67318 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
11/03/1957 | Condemned | 67337 | 51D | Middlesbrough | COND | ||
16/03/1957 | Reallocation | 67280 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
16/03/1957 | Reallocation | 67311 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
16/03/1957 | Reallocation | 67323 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
18/03/1957 | Condemned | 67339 | 52F | Blyth (North) | COND | ||
08/04/1957 | Condemned | 67256 | 53D | Bridlington | COND | ||
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 67280 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53D | Bridlington | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 67311 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53D | Bridlington | |
05/1957 | Condemned | 67273 | 50C | Selby | COND | ||
05/1957 | Condemned | 67282 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 67253 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 67311 | 53D | Bridlington | 50C | Selby | |
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 67326 | 52C | Blaydon | 53D | Bridlington | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67261 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67263 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67274 | NEV | Neville Hill | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67325 | 50F | Malton | 50B | Neville Hill | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67341 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
30/07/1957 | Condemned | 67278 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
24/08/1957 | Reallocation | 67253 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 54A | Sunderland | |
27/08/1957 | Condemned | 67338 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
16/09/1957 | Condemned | 67250 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
21/09/1957 | Reallocation | 67311 | 50C | Selby | 50F | Malton | |
08/10/1957 | Condemned | 67326 | 53D | Bridlington | COND | ||
22/10/1957 | Condemned | 67277 | 52F | Blyth (North) | COND | ||
28/10/1957 | Condemned | 67258 | DUR | COND | |||
04/11/1957 | Condemned | 67343 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
09/11/1957 | Reallocation | 67305 | 51A | Darlington | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
09/11/1957 | Reallocation | 67341 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53D | Bridlington | |
11/11/1957 | Condemned | 67324 | 51C | West Hartlepool | COND | ||
03/12/1957 | Condemned | 67254 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
03/12/1957 | Condemned | 67319 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
17/12/1957 | Condemned | 67259 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
08/01/1958 | Reallocation | 67248 | 54A | Sunderland | 50F | Malton | |
13/01/1958 | Condemned | 67270 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
20/02/1958 | Condemned | 67265 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
08/03/1958 | Reallocation | 67311 | 50F | Malton | 52F | Blyth (North) | |
08/03/1958 | Reallocation | 67342 | 54A | Sunderland | 50F | Malton | |
28/04/1958 | Condemned | 67340 | 52F | Blyth (North) | COND | ||
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 67280 | 53D | Bridlington | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 67341 | 53D | Bridlington | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
15/09/1958 | Condemned | 67297 | SUN | Sunderland | COND | ||
10/10/1958 | Condemned | 67325 | 50B | Neville Hill | COND | ||
28/10/1958 | Condemned | 67263 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
31/10/1958 | Condemned | 67253 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
06/11/1958 | Condemned | 67341 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 67261 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 54A | Sunderland | |
20/11/1958 | Condemned | 67320 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
24/11/1958 | Condemned | 67329 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
27/11/1958 | Condemned | 67246 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
02/12/1958 | Condemned | 67311 | 52F | Blyth (North) | COND | ||
02/12/1958 | Condemned | 67342 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
04/12/1958 | Condemned | 67262 | NEV | Neville Hill | COND | ||
08/12/1958 | Condemned | 67305 | 52F | Blyth (North) | COND | ||
08/12/1958 | Condemned | 67323 | 52F | Blyth (North) | COND | ||
11/12/1958 | Condemned | 67261 | 54A | Sunderland | COND | ||
11/12/1958 | Condemned | 67281 | 52F | Blyth (North) | COND | ||
11/12/1958 | Condemned | 67315 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
16/12/1958 | Condemned | 67274 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
17/12/1958 | Condemned | 67248 | 50F | Malton | COND | ||
22/12/1958 | Condemned | 67280 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | COND |