Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4399 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35049 Week
» 133694 Month
» 336358 Year
» 3363211 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NER/LNER Worsdell "G5" Class 0-4-4T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
NER |
1783 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7246 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1946 |
|
NER |
1914 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7292 |
1946 |
on |
13/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1096 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7240 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1169 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7255 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1779 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7272 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1786 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7274 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1913 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7291 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1916 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7294 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1917 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7295 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1780 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7269 |
1946 |
on |
26/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1793 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7258 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1912 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7290 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1918 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7296 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1775 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7308 |
1946 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
|
NER |
1778 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7261 |
1946 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
|
NER |
1911 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7289 |
1946 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
|
NER |
1915 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7293 |
1946 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
|
NER |
1319 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7335 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
NER |
1865 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7262 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
NER |
505 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7276 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
NER |
1759 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7306 |
1946 |
on |
15/03/1946 |
|
NER |
1740 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7280 |
1946 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
NER |
1762 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7268 |
1946 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
NER |
1316 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7260 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
NER |
1334 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7336 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
NER |
1752 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7299 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
NER |
1867 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7264 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
NER |
1919 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7297 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
NER |
1920 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7298 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
NER |
1737 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7273 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
NER |
1788 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7247 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
NER |
1866 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7263 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
NER |
2100 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7329 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
NER |
1692 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7300 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
1695 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7337 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
1701 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7243 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
1764 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7309 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
1765 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7245 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
1791 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7249 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
1868 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7265 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
1889 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7287 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
526 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7304 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
529 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7270 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
540 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7333 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
1837 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7250 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
NER |
1838 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7251 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
NER |
1882 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7279 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
NER |
1739 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7302 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
1769 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7248 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
1772 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7252 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
1840 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7254 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
1881 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7278 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
1885 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7283 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
1886 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7284 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
1887 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7285 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
2081 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7310 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
2083 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7312 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
2087 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7316 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
2090 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7319 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
2092 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7321 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
2097 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7326 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
394 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7275 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
1687 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7241 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
1691 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7242 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
1745 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7303 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
1751 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7267 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
1754 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7307 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
1883 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7281 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
1884 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7282 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
1888 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7286 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
1890 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7288 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2082 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7311 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2084 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7313 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2085 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7314 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2086 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7315 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2088 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7317 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2091 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7320 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2094 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7323 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2095 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7324 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
2096 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7325 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
427 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7344 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
NER |
1795 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7259 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
NER |
1730 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7257 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
2098 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7327 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
2099 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7328 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
405 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7277 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
468 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7332 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
149 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7338 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
1693 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7301 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
1702 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7244 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
1748 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7266 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
1755 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7305 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2089 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7318 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
2093 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7322 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
381 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7330 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
384 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7341 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
387 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7340 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
433 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7345 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
436 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7347 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
580 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7334 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
1703 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7256 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
1839 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7253 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
380 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7339 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
408 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7342 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
413 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7343 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
435 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7346 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
439 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7331 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
441 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7349 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
1713 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7271 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
NER |
437 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7348 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
7253 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67253 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
7263 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67263 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
7275 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67275 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
7281 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67281 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
7301 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67301 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
7254 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67254 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
7261 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67261 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
7265 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67265 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
7284 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67284 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
7313 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67313 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
7317 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67317 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
7259 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67259 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
7264 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67264 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
7310 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67310 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
7318 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67318 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
7247 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67247 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
7273 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67273 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
7298 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67298 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
7305 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67305 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
7246 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67246 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7252 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67252 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7272 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67272 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7289 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67289 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7295 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67295 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7330 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67330 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7251 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67251 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
7266 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67266 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
7282 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67282 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
7290 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67290 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
7324 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67324 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
7329 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67329 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
7344 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67344 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
7248 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67248 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7250 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67250 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7256 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67256 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7260 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67260 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7293 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67293 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7299 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67299 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7307 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67307 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7314 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67314 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7294 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67294 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7300 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67300 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7311 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67311 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7312 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67312 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7325 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67325 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7341 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67341 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7342 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67342 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7345 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67345 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7242 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67242 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7271 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67271 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7283 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67283 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7288 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67288 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7308 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67308 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7326 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67326 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7348 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67348 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7241 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67241 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
7297 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67297 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
7320 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67320 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
7336 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67336 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
7347 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67347 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
7245 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67245 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
7255 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67255 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
7244 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67244 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7262 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67262 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7268 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67268 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7346 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67346 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7349 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67349 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7277 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67277 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
7319 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67319 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
7327 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67327 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
7249 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67249 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
7267 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67267 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
7278 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67278 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
7292 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67292 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
7331 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67331 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
7269 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67269 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
7270 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67270 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
7343 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67343 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
7302 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67302 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
7316 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67316 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
7332 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67332 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
7340 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67340 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
7240 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67240 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
7291 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67291 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
7258 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67258 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
7337 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67337 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
7257 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67257 |
|
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
LNER |
7274 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67274 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
7328 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67328 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
7339 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67339 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
7280 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67280 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
7303 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67303 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
7315 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67315 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
7243 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67243 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
7338 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67338 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
7286 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67286 |
|
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
LNER |
7335 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67335 |
|
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
LNER |
7287 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67287 |
|
m/e |
07/1950 |
|
LNER |
7321 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67321 |
|
m/e |
07/1950 |
|
LNER |
7323 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67323 |
|
m/e |
07/1950 |
|
LNER |
7276 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67276 |
|
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
LNER |
7333 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67333 |
|
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
LNER |
7334 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67334 |
|
on |
08/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
7279 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67279 |
|
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
|
LNER |
7296 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67296 |
|
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
LNER |
7309 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67309 |
|
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
LNER |
7322 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67322 |
|
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
LNER |
7304 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67304 |
|
m/e |
10/1951 |
|