LNWR/LMS Whale "G" Class 0-8-0
Class | LNWR | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
G | 1887 | 9148 | 49148 | 09/1901 | 4D 4B W |
Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 31/07/1957 |
31/07/1957 |
G | 1891 | 9348 | 49348 | 12/1901 | 10B 9D W |
Preston Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
G | 1893 | 9085 | 49085 | 12/1901 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/08/1950 |
12/08/1950 |
G | 1895 | 9066 | 49066 | 12/1901 | 8C 3C W |
Speke Junction Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/03/1948 02/11/1957 |
02/11/1957 |
G | 1900 | 9065 | 49065 | 12/1901 | 8C 10D W |
Speke Junction Plodder Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 03/1950 |
03/1950 |
G | 898 | 9146 | 49146 | 04/1902 | 4D 85C 87K W |
Abergavenny Hereford Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 20/04/1957 28/02/1958 |
28/02/1958 |
G | 2562 | 9152 | 49152 | 08/1902 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1948 |
09/1948 |
G | 2251 | 9067 | 49067 | 09/1902 | 8D W |
Widnes Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 |
G | 1035 | 9133 | 49133 | 09/1902 | 2A 2F 2A 3C W |
Rugby Coventry Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 30/04/1949 04/06/1949 02/1950 |
02/1950 |
G | 2566 | 9153 | 49153 | 10/1902 | 2C 8C W |
Northampton Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
G | 2569 | 9072 | 49072 | 10/1902 | 6B 6C 10E W |
Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 28/08/1948 26/02/1949 |
26/02/1949 |
G | 1070 | 9120 | 49120 | 12/1902 | 6B 8C 2A 2A 2B 2B 2C 2B W |
Mold Junction Speke Junction Rugby Rugby Nuneaton Nuneaton Warwick Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 21/07/1951 11/08/1951 29/12/1951 09/10/1954 05/09/1959 |
05/09/1959 |
G | 1091 | 8925 | 48925 | 12/1902 | 2B W |
Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1949 |
17/09/1949 |
G | 1190 | 9076 | 49076 | 12/1902 | 2B 10C W |
Bletchley Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 05/1950 |
05/1950 |
G | 1228 | 9142 | 49142 | 01/1903 | 3A 9B 9B 2B 8A 8F 8A W |
Bescot Stockport Edgeley Stockport Edgeley Nuneaton Edge Hill Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 21/02/1953 28/01/1961 11/04/1961 17/06/1961 22/12/1962 |
22/12/1962 |
G | 1229 | 9070 | 49070 | 01/1903 | 5B 2A 2A 2B 2B 91M 1A 1A 2A 1A 21C W |
Crewe South Rugby Rugby Bletchley Bletchley To London Midland Region Willesden Willesden Rugby Willesden Bushbury Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 04/06/1949 26/11/1949 24/12/1949 23/10/1950 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 23/02/1957 20/04/1957 14/01/1961 17/11/1962 |
17/11/1962 |
G | 1231 | 9147 | 49147 | 01/1903 | 10D 10C W |
Plodder Lane Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1954 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 |
G | 1243 | 9150 | 49150 | 04/1903 | 2D 10B 8D 8F W |
Nuneaton Preston Widnes Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/01/1949 04/10/1958 08/11/1958 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
G | 1245 | 9073 | 49073 | 04/1903 | 8D 10A W |
Widnes Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 11/01/1958 |
11/01/1958 |
G | 1271 | 9145 | 49145 | 04/1903 | 1C 10A W |
Watford Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1956 04/01/1958 |
04/01/1958 |
G | 1274 | 9071 | 49071 | 05/1903 | 8D 3A 3A W |
Widnes Bescot Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 13/01/1951 |
13/01/1951 |
G | 1277 | 9149 | 49149 | 06/1903 | 10A 8B 10B 10D 10C W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Preston Plodder Lane Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 21/03/1953 11/07/1953 09/10/1954 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
G | 1280 | 9100 | 49100 | 07/1903 | 2B 8C 3C W |
Bletchley Speke Junction Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 29/10/1949 05/1950 |
05/1950 |
G | 1286 | 9347 | 49347 | 09/1903 | 8D 9D W |
Widnes Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 01/1951 |
01/1951 |
G | 1299 | 9074 | 49074 | 10/1903 | 8D 8C W |
Widnes Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 16/12/1950 |
16/12/1950 |
G | 1401 | 9075 | 49075 | 10/1903 | 8B 3B 3B W |
Warrington Dallam Bushbury Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 28/01/1950 |
28/01/1950 |
G | 1449 | 9122 | 49122 | 01/1904 | 15B 2B 1A 8F W |
Kettering Bletchley Willesden Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 22/07/1950 28/01/1961 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 508 | 9090 | 49090 | 02/1904 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/12/1950 |
16/12/1950 |
G | 641 | 9151 | 49151 | 02/1904 | 11A 9B 9B W |
Carnforth Stockport Edgeley Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/04/1951 19/05/1951 09/08/1952 |
09/08/1952 |
G | 509 | 9069 | 49069 | 05/1904 | 2A 2C 1A W |
Rugby Northampton Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/08/1948 09/04/1949 17/06/1950 |
17/06/1950 |
G | 1122 | 9099 | 49099 | 05/1904 | 3A 21C W |
Bescot Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1962 21/07/1962 |
21/07/1962 |
G | 503 | 9068 | 49068 | 05/1904 | 2D W |
Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1957 |
19/01/1957 |
G | 818 | 9132 | 49132 | 05/1904 | 9D 9D 8A W |
Buxton (LNWR) Buxton (LNWR) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 03/01/1959 18/04/1959 |
18/04/1959 |
G | 2653 | 9154 | 49154 | 01/1910 | 2B 10A W |
Bletchley Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 07/10/1961 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 2654 | 9077 | 49077 | 01/1910 | 6B 1A 1C 1A W |
Mold Junction Willesden Watford Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/08/1950 28/10/1950 04/10/1952 15/12/1962 |
07/10/1961 |
G | 2655 | 9078 | 49078 | 01/1910 | 3A 1C 1A 1E 21B 1E W |
Bescot Watford Willesden Bletchley Bescot Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 04/10/1952 28/01/1961 22/04/1961 27/01/1962 01/12/1962 |
15/12/1962 |
G | 2656 | 9079 | 49079 | 02/1910 | 8D W 8F 2B 21B |
Widnes Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) Nuneaton Bescot |
01/01/1948 02/1950 08/11/1958 07/11/1959 05/05/1962 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 2657 | 9080 | 49080 | 02/1910 | 2D 8D W |
Nuneaton Widnes Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1951 01/12/1962 |
02/1950 |
G | 2658 | 9081 | 49081 | 02/1910 | 3A 10B 6B 6C 10A 8A 5C 21B W |
Bescot Preston Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Stafford Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/12/1948 01/10/1949 18/02/1950 08/04/1950 23/09/1950 30/11/1957 17/09/1960 15/10/1960 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 2659 | 9086 | 49086 | 02/1910 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1950 |
04/1949 |
G | 2660 | 9087 | 49087 | 02/1910 | 20B 10C W |
Stourton Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 09/1949 |
22/09/1962 |
G | 2661 | 9088 | 49088 | 02/1910 | 11E 5B W 3A 4A 1A |
Tebay Crewe South Withdrawn Bescot Bletchley Willesden |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 04/1949 02/12/1950 24/02/1951 04/10/1952 |
16/11/1957 |
G | 2662 | 9089 | 49089 | 02/1910 | 3A 3D W |
Bescot Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1951 22/09/1962 |
14/01/1950 |
G | 1354 | 9082 | 49082 | 03/1910 | 2D 10B 2A 2B 8A 4A 1A 85C 86K 84B 84G W 8A |
Nuneaton Preston Rugby Bletchley Edge Hill Bletchley Willesden Hereford Tredegar Oxley Shrewsbury Withdrawn Edge Hill |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 04/06/1949 26/11/1949 07/10/1950 28/02/1951 04/10/1952 14/07/1956 20/04/1957 18/05/1957 15/06/1957 16/11/1957 28/02/1959 |
15/10/1960 |
G | 1380 | 9083 | 49083 | 03/1910 | 3A W 3D |
Bescot Withdrawn Aston |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 14/07/1951 |
01/1950 |
G | 1411 | 9084 | 49084 | 03/1910 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
G | 1456 | 9092 | 49092 | 03/1910 | 9B 9D 9D 10A 3A 3A 3C 3D W |
Stockport Edgeley Buxton (LNWR) Buxton (LNWR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Bescot Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 19/02/1949 03/03/1951 24/03/1951 29/12/1951 14/06/1952 27/09/1952 |
27/09/1952 |
G | 1497 | 9093 | 49093 | 03/1910 | 2B 9D 5B 3A 8B 8B 10A 1E W |
Bletchley Buxton (LNWR) Crewe South Bescot Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Springs Branch (Wigan) Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 24/04/1948 21/05/1949 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 16/07/1955 05/10/1957 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 1556 | 9094 | 49094 | 03/1910 | 6C 2F 2F 10C 9G 10C 1E W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Coventry Coventry Patricroft Northwich Patricroft Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 23/07/1949 25/02/1950 05/09/1953 03/10/1953 11/08/1956 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 1582 | 9095 | 49095 | 03/1910 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1948 |
06/1948 |
G | 1591 | 9096 | 49096 | 03/1910 | 3A 4B 4B W |
Bescot Northampton Northampton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 05/04/1952 |
05/04/1952 |
G | 1619 | 9097 | 49097 | 03/1910 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1950 |
03/1950 |
G | 1629 | 9098 | 49098 | 03/1910 | 5C 9B 3A 3A W |
Stafford Stockport Edgeley Bescot Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 12/05/1951 |
12/05/1951 |
G | 1322 | 9091 | 49091 | 04/1910 | 5C W |
Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 |
09/1949 |
G | 1464 | 9101 | 49101 | 04/1910 | 6C 10D W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Plodder Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1949 06/1949 |
30/09/1950 |
G | 1511 | 9102 | 49102 | 04/1910 | 10B W |
Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
06/1949 |
G | 1570 | 9103 | 49103 | 04/1910 | 2C 3A 2F 2F 10B 10B W |
Northampton Bescot Coventry Coventry Preston Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 16/07/1949 23/07/1949 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 01/12/1962 |
16/07/1949 |
G | 1578 | 9104 | 49104 | 04/1910 | 11E 8A 8A 4B W 8F |
Tebay Edge Hill Edge Hill Northampton Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 05/03/1949 31/12/1950 14/11/1959 09/09/1961 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 1600 | 9105 | 49105 | 05/1910 | 6B 4B 3B W |
Mold Junction Northampton Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 12/07/1952 15/12/1962 |
14/11/1959 |
G | 1647 | 9106 | 49106 | 05/1910 | 3A 2D W 3B 3A 1E |
Bescot Nuneaton Withdrawn Bushbury Bescot Bletchley |
01/01/1948 30/10/1948 29/04/1950 12/07/1952 16/05/1953 27/01/1962 |
15/12/1962 |
G | 1664 | 9107 | 49107 | 05/1910 | 2A 3C W |
Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 23/11/1957 |
29/04/1950 |
G | 1687 | 9108 | 49108 | 05/1910 | 9B 3C W |
Stockport Edgeley Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 07/03/1959 |
23/11/1957 |
G | 1699 | 9109 | 49109 | 05/1910 | 11A W 8C 2A 8C |
Carnforth Withdrawn Speke Junction Rugby Speke Junction |
01/01/1948 03/1949 21/04/1956 23/02/1957 20/04/1957 |
07/03/1959 |
G | 1503 | 9110 | 49110 | 05/1910 | 3B W |
Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
G | 1540 | 9111 | 49111 | 05/1910 | 9B 9B 8C 8B 2B W |
Stockport Edgeley Stockport Edgeley Speke Junction Warrington Dallam Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 23/02/1952 12/07/1952 29/11/1952 14/11/1959 |
03/1949 |
G | 1609 | 9112 | 49112 | 06/1910 | 6B 11A 8C 8B 2B W |
Mold Junction Carnforth Speke Junction Warrington Dallam Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 23/02/1952 12/07/1952 29/11/1952 31/01/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
G | 1634 | 9113 | 49113 | 06/1910 | 4D 3A 6C 2A 86G W |
Abergavenny Bescot Birkenhead Mollington Street Rugby Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 03/11/1951 10/11/1951 08/10/1955 01/12/1962 |
19/01/1959 |
G | 1637 | 9114 | 49114 | 06/1910 | 2D 5C 3C 3A W 8A |
Nuneaton Stafford Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Withdrawn Edge Hill |
01/01/1948 05/11/1949 30/11/1957 14/06/1958 14/11/1959 18/11/1961 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 1639 | 9115 | 49115 | 06/1910 | 6B W |
Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
G | 1660 | 9116 | 49116 | 06/1910 | 5B 2D 5B 2A 8D 8D 3A 2A 84G 87K 8A W |
Crewe South Nuneaton Crewe South Rugby Widnes Widnes Bescot Rugby Shrewsbury Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 12/06/1948 04/06/1949 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 05/05/1951 15/09/1951 22/03/1952 27/12/1952 08/11/1958 31/03/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
G | 1789 | 9117 | 49117 | 06/1910 | W 2B 1A 3A 2A 84G 84G 84G 87K 87K |
Withdrawn Bletchley Willesden Bescot Rugby Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
12/1947 01/01/1948 16/04/1949 19/05/1951 06/10/1951 23/02/1952 29/02/1952 30/04/1952 29/11/1952 27/12/1952 |
06/03/1959 |
G | 2030 | 9118 | 49118 | 06/1910 | 6B 6C 8B W |
Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/10/1949 18/02/1950 08/04/1950 07/10/1961 |
12/1947 |
G | 2032 | 9119 | 49119 | 06/1910 | 10B 4D 5C 8B W 26F |
Preston Abergavenny Stafford Warrington Dallam Withdrawn Patricroft |
01/01/1948 04/09/1948 28/12/1957 25/01/1958 30/09/1958 08/11/1958 |
07/10/1961 |
G | 1385 | 9121 | 49121 | 07/1910 | 15A 2B W |
Wellingborough Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 06/1949 |
30/09/1958 |
G | 1492 | 9123 | 49123 | 07/1910 | 15A 2B W |
Wellingborough Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 01/1950 |
06/1949 |
G | 1507 | 9124 | 49124 | 07/1910 | 10A 3B W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/04/1951 15/09/1962 |
01/1950 |
G | 1539 | 9125 | 49125 | 08/1910 | 10A 1C 3B 8D 3A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Watford Bushbury Widnes Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1951 19/05/1951 23/02/1952 01/01/1955 15/09/1962 |
15/09/1962 |
G | 1577 | 9126 | 49126 | 08/1910 | 15B 8A W 1C 8D 5C 21B |
Kettering Edge Hill Withdrawn Watford Widnes Stafford Bescot |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 03/1950 24/02/1951 23/02/1952 08/11/1958 17/09/1960 |
15/09/1962 |
G | 1606 | 9127 | 49127 | 08/1910 | 2B 1C 1A 1C W 1A |
Bletchley Watford Willesden Watford Withdrawn Willesden |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 05/06/1948 17/07/1948 11/1948 12/02/1949 |
03/1950 |
G | 1648 | 9128 | 49128 | 08/1910 | 1A W |
Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1962 |
11/1948 |
G | 1690 | 9129 | 49129 | 08/1910 | 10A 11A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1949 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 1774 | 9130 | 49130 | 08/1910 | 8A W 8A 5B 1E 8A |
Edge Hill Withdrawn Edge Hill Crewe South Bletchley Edge Hill |
01/01/1948 07/1948 15/11/1958 03/01/1959 20/06/1959 17/09/1960 03/06/1961 |
01/12/1962 |
G | 1776 | 9131 | 49131 | 08/1910 | 3A 8C 8C W |
Bescot Speke Junction Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/08/1951 08/09/1951 31/03/1962 |
07/1948 |
G | 1403 | 9134 | 49134 | 08/1910 | 10A 10B W 8F 2B 24K 24C 26F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) Nuneaton Preston Lostock Hall Patricroft |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 11/1949 17/07/1951 15/08/1959 07/11/1959 28/01/1961 16/09/1961 23/09/1961 |
31/03/1962 |
G | 1424 | 9135 | 49135 | 08/1910 | 2F W 2A 3C |
Coventry Withdrawn Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) |
01/01/1948 08/1948 21/08/1948 04/06/1949 |
11/1949 |
G | 1462 | 9136 | 49136 | 09/1910 | 8B 8A W |
Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 07/10/1961 |
08/1948 |
G | 1700 | 9137 | 49137 | 09/1910 | 8A 2A W |
Edge Hill Rugby Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 02/02/1952 |
07/10/1961 |
G | 1727 | 9138 | 49138 | 09/1910 | 4A W |
Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1962 |
02/02/1952 |
G | 1735 | 9139 | 49139 | 09/1910 | 1A W 8F |
Willesden Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 17/09/1955 19/04/1958 |
15/09/1962 |
G | 1775 | 9140 | 49140 | 09/1910 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/12/1950 21/07/1962 |
17/09/1955 |
G | 1794 | 9141 | 49141 | 09/1910 | 10A 10B 8C W 8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Speke Junction Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 20/11/1948 24/10/1959 12/12/1959 |
21/07/1962 |
G | 1788 | 9143 | 49143 | 09/1910 | 6B 8C 11A 8F W |
Mold Junction Speke Junction Carnforth Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 31/01/1951 15/08/1959 10/11/1962 |
24/10/1959 |
G | 2014 | 9144 | 49144 | 09/1910 | 5C 2B 11A 9G 4A 10A 10A 2B 9A 2B 8A W |
Stafford Bletchley Carnforth Northwich Bletchley Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Nuneaton Longsight Nuneaton Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 27/01/1951 18/08/1951 01/09/1951 15/09/1951 09/10/1954 05/10/1957 28/12/1957 25/01/1958 30/01/1960 01/12/1962 |
10/11/1962 |