Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2680 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33330 Week
» 131975 Month
» 334639 Year
» 3361492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GCR/LNER Robinson "B7" Class 4-6-0
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
GCR |
458 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
458C |
1923 Int |
|
03/11/1923 |
|
GCR |
72 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
72C |
1923 Int |
|
03/11/1923 |
|
GCR |
73 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
73C |
1923 Int |
|
17/11/1923 |
|
GCR |
37 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
37C |
1923 Int |
|
01/12/1923 |
|
GCR |
459 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
459C |
1923 Int |
|
19/01/1924 |
|
GCR |
470 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5470 |
1924 |
|
09/02/1924 |
|
GCR |
78 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5078 |
1924 |
|
01/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
462 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5462 |
1924 |
|
15/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
463 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5463 |
1924 |
|
15/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
467 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5467 |
1924 |
|
15/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
38 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5038 |
1924 |
|
22/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
468 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5468 |
1924 |
|
12/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
460 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5460 |
1924 |
|
19/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
464 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5464 |
1924 |
|
26/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
473 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5473 |
1924 |
|
26/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
472 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5472 |
1924 |
|
03/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
469 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5469 |
1924 |
|
10/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
36 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5036 |
1924 |
|
17/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
465 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5465 |
1924 |
|
24/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
461 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5461 |
1924 |
|
05/07/1924 |
|
GCR |
466 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5466 |
1924 |
|
05/07/1924 |
|
GCR |
34 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5034 |
1924 |
|
26/07/1924 |
|
GCR |
474 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5474 |
1924 |
|
26/07/1924 |
|
GCR |
471 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5471 |
1924 |
|
27/09/1924 |
|
LNER |
458C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5458 |
1924 |
|
22/11/1924 |
|
GCR |
31 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5031 |
1924 |
|
29/11/1924 |
|
GCR |
35 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5035 |
1924 |
|
29/11/1924 |
|
GCR |
32 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5032 |
1924 |
|
28/02/1925 |
|
LNER |
478C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5478 |
1924 |
|
25/07/1925 |
|
LNER |
480C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5480 |
1924 |
|
25/07/1925 |
|
GCR |
33 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5033 |
1924 |
|
26/09/1925 |
|
LNER |
37C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5037 |
1924 |
|
10/10/1925 |
|
LNER |
72C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5072 |
1924 |
|
07/11/1925 |
|
LNER |
479C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5479 |
1924 |
|
14/11/1925 |
|
LNER |
73C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5073 |
1924 |
|
14/11/1925 |
|
LNER |
477C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5477 |
1924 |
|
21/11/1925 |
|
LNER |
476C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5476 |
1924 |
|
05/12/1925 |
|
LNER |
475C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5475 |
1924 |
|
12/12/1925 |
|
LNER |
459C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5459 |
1924 |
|
13/02/1926 |
|
LNER |
5034 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1386 |
1946 |
|
30/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5458 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1366 |
1946 |
|
20/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5464 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1372 |
1946 |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5471 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1379 |
1946 |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5459 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1367 |
1946 |
|
27/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5038 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1365 |
1946 |
|
31/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5031 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1383 |
1946 |
|
02/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5460 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1368 |
1946 |
|
03/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5073 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1361 |
1946 |
|
21/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5480 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1393 |
1946 |
|
08/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5465 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1373 |
1946 |
|
14/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5078 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1362 |
1946 |
|
15/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5468 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1376 |
1946 |
|
21/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5481 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1394 |
1946 |
|
21/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5467 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1375 |
1946 |
|
28/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5036 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1363 |
1946 |
|
04/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5037 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1364 |
1946 |
|
10/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5476 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1389 |
1946 |
|
20/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5483 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1396 |
1946 |
|
20/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5462 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1370 |
1946 |
|
02/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5479 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1392 |
1946 |
|
02/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5482 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1395 |
1946 |
|
02/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5072 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1360 |
1946 |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5484 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1397 |
1946 |
|
10/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5469 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1377 |
1946 |
|
13/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5466 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1374 |
1946 |
|
15/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5461 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1369 |
1946 |
|
22/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5470 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1378 |
1946 |
|
22/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5477 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1390 |
1946 |
|
22/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5478 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1391 |
1946 |
|
25/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5463 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1371 |
1946 |
|
26/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5033 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1385 |
1946 |
|
01/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5474 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1382 |
1946 |
|
01/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5035 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1387 |
1946 |
|
08/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5472 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1380 |
1946 |
|
15/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5475 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1388 |
1946 |
|
19/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5032 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1384 |
1946 |
|
20/12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5473 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1381 |
1946 |
|
12/01/1947 |
|
LNER |
1370 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E1370 |
BR Tmp |
|
17/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
1387 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E1387 |
BR Tmp |
|
31/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
1391 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E1391 |
BR Tmp |
|
28/02/1948 |
|
BR |
E1391 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61391 |
BR 1st |
|
29/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
1396 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61396 |
BR 1st |
|
19/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
1375 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61704 |
BR 2nd |
|
30/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
1381 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61706 |
BR 2nd |
|
30/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
1382 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61707 |
BR 2nd |
|
30/04/1949 |
|
BR |
61391 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61711 |
BR 2nd |
|
30/04/1949 |
|
BR |
61396 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61713 |
BR 2nd |
|
30/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
1365 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61702 |
BR 2nd |
|
07/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
1367 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61703 |
BR 2nd |
|
07/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
1377 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61705 |
BR 2nd |
|
07/05/1949 |
|
BR |
E1387 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61709 |
BR 2nd |
|
07/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
1388 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61710 |
BR 2nd |
|
14/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
1392 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61712 |
BR 2nd |
|
14/05/1949 |
|