Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 189 Today
» 3545 Yesterday
» 16496 Week
» 68381 Month
» 693736 Year
» 3720589 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
Locomotives of the North British Railway
Build Date NBR Class LNER Class First NBR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
11/1875 R   165 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1923
11/1875 R   166 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1922
11/1875 R   259 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1925
11/1875 R   284 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1924
01/1876 R   241 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1925
01/1876 R   297 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1925
04/1877 R   123 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1926
04/1877 R   161 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1925
05/1877 R   151 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1926
05/1877 R   158 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1925
05/1877 R   162 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1925
05/1877 R   274 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1925
05/1877 R   295 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1925
05/1877 M   476 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. E463 2147 11/1924
06/1877 P   157 0-4-4T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1925
06/1877 P   167 0-4-4T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1925
06/1877 P   314 0-4-4T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1925
06/1877 M   477 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. E463 2148 12/1924
06/1877 M   478 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. E463 2149 09/1924
06/1877 P   480 0-4-4T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
07/1877 M   479 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. E463 2150 12/1923
07/1877 P   88 0-4-4T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1925
07/1877 P   89 0-4-4T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1925
11/1877 R   20 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1925
01/1878 R   240 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1924
01/1878 R   313 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1926
01/1878 R   485 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1924
03/1878 R   22 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1925
03/1878 R   29 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1925
05/1878 R   49 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1924
06/1878 R   108 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1925
06/1878 R   96 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1926
07/1878 R   106 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
07/1878 R   107 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1924
07/1878 R   97 0-6-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1924
10/1878 M   486 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. E492 2384 02/1922
10/1878 M   487 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. E492 2385 09/1926
10/1878 M   488 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. E492 2386 09/1921
10/1878 M   489 4-4-0 D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. E492 2387 06/1922
1879     271 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1925
1879     277 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
1879     279 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   03/1923
1879     288 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1924
1879     289 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1925
1879     296 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1921
1879     300 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   04/1921
1879     301 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1925
1879     302 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1923
1879     303 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1921
1879     306 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1923
1879     34 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1922
1879     35 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
1879     401 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1922
1879     402 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1922
1879     403 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1924
1879     497 0-6-0 D. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 1217 06/1924
1879     498 0-6-0 D. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 1218 11/1925
1879     499 0-6-0 D. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 1219 08/1924
1879     500 0-6-0 D. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 1220 01/1923
1879     501 0-6-0 D. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 1221 08/1924
1879     87 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1925
01/1879 M   490 4-4-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1921
01/1879 M   491 4-4-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   20/09/1926
02/1879 M   492 4-4-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1924
02/1879 M   493 4-4-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1921
04/1879 P   494 4-4-0T D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2420 03/1926
04/1879 P   495 4-4-0T D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2421 02/1926
05/1879     290 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1926
05/1879 P   496 4-4-0T D. Drummond Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 2422 05/1924
1880     171 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1923
1880     175 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1922
1880     273 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1925
1880     46 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1925
1880     506 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1923
1880     507 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1925
1880     508 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1923
1880     509 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   03/1926
1880     510 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1923
1880     511 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1925
1880     512 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1924
1880     513 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1926
1880     514 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1925
1880     515 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   03/1925
1880     516 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1925
1880     517 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1923
1880     84 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1922
07/1880     272 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   03/1926
08/1880 R   110 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1923
08/1880 R   299 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1930
08/1880 R   72 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
08/1880 R   73 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1925
09/1880 R   109 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
09/1880 R   111 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   04/1933
1881     128 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
1881     518 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1925
1881     519 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1924
1881     521 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1924
1881     522 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   03/1925
1881     523 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1926
1881     524 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1924
1881     525 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1923
1881     526 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   03/1924
1881     527 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1923
1881     528 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1923
1881     529 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1923
03/1881     143 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1923
04/1881     520 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1923
05/1881 R   101 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1929
05/1881 R   104 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1931
05/1881 R   105 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1931
05/1881 R   33 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1923
05/1881 R   98 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1931
06/1881 R   103 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   03/1928
11/1881     530 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1923
11/1881     531 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1925
11/1881     532 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
12/1881     533 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1925
1882     541 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   02/1925
1882     543 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1925
1882     551 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1925
01/1882     534 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1927
01/1882     535 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1925
01/1882     536 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1924
01/1882     537 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1925
01/1882     538 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1923
01/1882     539 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
03/1882     540 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1925
04/1882     542 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   04/1926
04/1882     544 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   04/1923
04/1882     545 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1923
05/1882 R   74 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1931
06/1882 R   147 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   04/1929
06/1882 R   19 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1923
06/1882 R   225 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   03/1926
06/1882 R   294 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1932
06/1882 R   60 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
06/1882 R   75 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1924
06/1882 R   99 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1933
07/1882     125 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1923
07/1882     163 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   04/1926
07/1882     184 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1924
07/1882     27 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1926
07/1882     28 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
07/1882     30 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   03/1924
10/1882     548 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   04/1925
10/1882     549 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1923
10/1882     550 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/01/1928
11/1882     552 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1924
11/1882     553 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1925
01/1883 R   268 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1928
01/1883 R   52 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1933
01/1883 R   67 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1923
02/1883 R   174 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   05/1929
02/1883     554 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1925
03/1883     555 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1925
03/1883     556 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1924
04/1883     557 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
04/1883     558 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1925
05/1883     559 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1923
05/1883     560 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   07/1923
06/1883     561 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1924
06/1883     562 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   04/1925
06/1883     563 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   04/1925
06/1883     564 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1925
06/1883     565 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1923
07/1883     138 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/01/1928
07/1883     18 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   12/1923
07/1883     286 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   10/1925
07/1883     311 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1924
07/1883     481 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1923
07/1883     482 0-6-0 D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1923
06/1884 574   574 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1934
06/1884 574   575 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/1937
07/1884 574   576 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1933
07/1884 574   577 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1934
07/1884 574   578 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1933
07/1884 574   579 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1933
09/1884 R   76 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   11/1924
09/1884 R   77 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1929
09/1884 R   78 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   09/1924
10/1884 R   316 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   06/1925
10/1884 R   483 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   08/1927
10/1884 R   79 4-4-0T D. Drummond Cowlairs Works ??   01/1927
04/1886 N   592 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1932
09/1886 N   593 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1926
10/1886 N   594 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1926
03/1887 N   597 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1926
04/1887 N   595 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1932
04/1887 N   596 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1933
02/1888 N   598 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1930
02/1888 N   599 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/1930
02/1888 N   600 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1928
03/1888 N   601 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1926
03/1888 N   602 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1926
03/1888 N   603 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1928
08/1888 C   604 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/10/1962
08/1888 C   605 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1934
08/1888 C   606 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1933
08/1888 C   607 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1934
08/1888 C   608 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1937
08/1888 C   609 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1934
07/1889 C   613 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/1936
07/1889 C   614 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   12/1937
07/1889 C   615 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1935
09/1889 C   616 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1937
09/1889 C   617 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   16/07/1962
09/1889 C   618 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/1936
10/1889 C   619 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1935
10/1889 C   620 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1937
10/1889 C   621 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1937
11/1889 C   145 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1935
11/1889 C   172 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1947
11/1889 C   622 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   15/04/1957
01/1890 C   623 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   14/11/1963
01/1890 C   624 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1937
01/1890 C   625 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   13/04/1950
01/1890 C   626 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   12/1935
01/1890 C   627 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1936
01/1890 C   628 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   30/04/1962
03/1890 C   629 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1937
03/1890 C   630 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1936
03/1890 C   631 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1939
04/1890 C   173 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1936
04/1890 C   176 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/10/1962
04/1890 C   632 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/10/1962
05/1890 633   633 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   01/1939
05/1890 633   634 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1935
05/1890 633   635 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/12/1952
06/1890 633   636 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1937
06/1890 633   637 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1936
06/1890 633   638 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1937
08/1890 633   639 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1935
08/1890 633   640 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1936
08/1890 633   641 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1937
09/1890 633   36 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1935
09/1890 633   37 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1935
09/1890 633   642 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   28/02/1950
02/1891 C   643 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1947
02/1891 C   644 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   23/03/1948
02/1891 C   645 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   23/07/1959
02/1891 C   646 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/11/1963
02/1891 C   647 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1947
02/1891 C   648 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   16/05/1963
04/1891 C   649 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   14/10/1957
04/1891 C   650 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1951
05/1891 C   651 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/08/1961
05/1891 C   652 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
05/1891 C   653 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/05/1960
05/1891 C   654 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/10/1962
07/1891 C   655 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1952
07/1891 C   656 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/10/1961
07/1891 C   657 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/12/1960
07/1891 C   658 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   22/04/1967
08/1891 C   659 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   25/10/1961
08/1891 C   660 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/04/1956
10/1891 C   663 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4382 10/11/1962
10/1891 C   664 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4383 10/07/1951
10/1891 C   665 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4384 04/1931
10/1891 C   666 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4385 11/1935
10/1891 C   667 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4386 04/01/1961
11/1891 C   179 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   12/1937
11/1891 C   661 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   01/1939
11/1891 C   662 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1937
11/1891 C   668 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4387 06/05/1952
11/1891 C   669 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4388 08/10/1962
11/1891 C   670 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4389 26/08/1957
11/1891 C   671 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4390 07/1937
12/1891 C   183 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   18/05/1956
12/1891 C   45 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/01/1962
12/1891 C   672 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4391 01/1931
12/1891 C   673 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4392 14/07/1966
12/1891 C   674 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4393 04/1943
12/1891 C   675 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4394 12/08/1957
12/1891 C   676 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4395 10/1926
12/1891 C   677 0-6-0 M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4396 25/05/1951
12/1891 C   68 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   17/07/1959
02/1892 C   678 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3768 13/10/1960
02/1892 C   679 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3769 08/02/1957
02/1892 C   680 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3770 28/11/1963
02/1892 C   681 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3771 06/05/1960
02/1892 C   682 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3772 30/05/1963
02/1892 C   683 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3773 24/04/1951
02/1892 C   684 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3774 07/09/1951
02/1892 C   685 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3775 14/04/1948
02/1892 C   686 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3776 08/10/1962
02/1892 C   687 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3777 05/03/1962
02/1892 C   688 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3778 02/07/1959
03/1892 C   689 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3779 08/10/1962
03/1892 C   690 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3780 27/06/1963
03/1892 C   691 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3781 06/1945
03/1892 C   692 0-6-0 M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 3782 10/1946
07/1892 C   247 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/07/1952
07/1892 C   248 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   13/12/1963
07/1892 C   357 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   21/05/1962
07/1892 C   358 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   19/11/1966
08/1892 C   611 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   01/11/1962
08/1892 C   612 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1947
01/1893 C   177 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/12/1950
01/1893 C   180 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
03/1893 C   181 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   14/02/1958
03/1893 C   182 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   26/08/1952
03/1893 C   250 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1947
03/1893 C   280 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/11/1963
01/1894 N   693 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1921
01/1894 N   694 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1921
01/1894 N   695 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1943
01/1894 N   696 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1924
01/1894 N   697 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1923
01/1894 N   698 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   1920
04/1894 N   55 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1923
05/1894 N   394 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1922
05/1894 N   395 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1922
05/1894 N   699 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1922
05/1894 N   700 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1921
05/1894 N   701 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1923
11/1894 633   262 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1937
12/1894 633   293 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   01/1938
01/1895 633   211 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1937
01/1895 633   212 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1937
01/1895 633   312 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   12/1938
01/1895 633   404 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/03/1948
06/1895 633   213 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1939
06/1895 633   214 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1939
06/1895 633   215 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1946
06/1895 633   216 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1937
07/1895 633   217 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1939
07/1895 633   218 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1937
01/1896 N   341 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1921
01/1896 N   342 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1924
01/1896 N   343 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1921
01/1896 N   344 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1921
01/1896 N   345 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/1923
01/1896 N   346 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1921
03/1896 N   704 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   01/1924
04/1896 N   227 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   1920
04/1896 N   231 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   12/1922
04/1896 N   232 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1921
04/1896 N   702 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   1919
04/1896 N   703 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   1919
06/1896 C   705 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/03/1961
06/1896 C   706 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/06/1963
06/1896 C   707 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   21/01/1952
06/1896 C   708 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   19/03/1951
06/1896 C   709 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   21/05/1962
06/1896 C   710 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   13/07/1961
11/1896 C   711 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/01/1966
11/1896 C   712 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/12/1952
11/1896 C   713 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1947
11/1896 C   714 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/11/1963
12/1896 C   715 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/02/1952
12/1896 C   716 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   27/06/1963
04/1897 C   717 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/06/1967
04/1897 C   718 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1948
04/1897 C   719 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   01/08/1963
05/1897 C   720 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/11/1950
05/1897 C   721 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   16/02/1951
06/1897 C   722 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/11/1962
07/1897 C   723 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1950
07/1897 C   724 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/04/1961
07/1897 C   725 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   26/02/1962
07/1897 C   726 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/01/1966
07/1897 C   727 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   16/03/1951
07/1897 C   728 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1947
03/1898 729   729 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1946
04/1898 729   730 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   12/1937
04/1898 729   731 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/08/1948
05/1898 729   732 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   20/04/1949
05/1898 729   733 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/05/1948
05/1898 729   734 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1946
07/1898 729   735 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1939
07/1898 729   736 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1931
07/1898 729   737 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1939
07/1898 729   738 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1939
07/1898 729   739 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1947
07/1898 729   740 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1947
10/1898 C   741 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/1943
10/1898 C   742 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   16/07/1962
10/1898 C   743 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/1947
10/1898 C   744 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1947
10/1898 C   745 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
10/1898 C   746 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/10/1962
12/1898 C   747 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   26/02/1962
01/1899 C   748 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   16/07/1962
01/1899 C   749 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   28/12/1963
01/1899 C   750 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   18/06/1951
01/1899 C   751 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/06/1964
01/1899 C   752 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   16/07/1962
03/1899 C   753 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/11/1963
03/1899 C   754 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/11/1962
03/1899 C   755 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   30/07/1962
04/1899 C   756 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   26/08/1955
04/1899 C   757 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   30/04/1962
04/1899 C   758 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
05/1899 C   759 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/07/1960
05/1899 C   760 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   31/05/1962
05/1899 C   761 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   26/09/1966
05/1899 C   762 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   30/04/1962
05/1899 C   763 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/11/1962
06/1899 C   764 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   24/07/1951
09/1899 729   765 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1946
09/1899 729   766 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   06/1937
09/1899 729   767 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1946
11/1899 729   768 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   28/02/1951
11/1899 729   769 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   12/1947
11/1899 729   770 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1946
01/1900 C   771 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   28/12/1963
01/1900 C   772 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   25/02/1957
01/1900 C   773 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/11/1963
01/1900 C   774 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1946
01/1900 C   775 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   13/11/1965
01/1900 C   776 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   03/1948
03/1900 C   777 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   28/12/1963
03/1900 C   778 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   18/06/1962
03/1900 C   779 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/08/1963
03/1900 C   780 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1947
05/1900 C   781 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/09/1959
05/1900 C   782 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/10/1962
07/1900 C   783 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/11/1963
07/1900 C   784 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   10/1947
07/1900 C   785 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   04/1948
07/1900 C   786 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   24/12/1963
07/1900 C   787 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/03/1961
07/1900 C   788 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   21/01/1952
08/1900 D   795 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5733 08/01/1962
08/1900 D   796 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5734 24/02/1961
09/1900 D   797 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5735 13/01/1960
09/1900 D   798 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5736 08/10/1962
09/1900 D   799 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5737 30/03/1956
09/1900 D   800 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5738 24/02/1961
09/1900 D   801 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5739 08/10/1962
09/1900 D   802 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5740 17/09/1958
09/1900 D   803 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5741 05/12/1957
09/1900 D   804 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5742 21/02/1958
12/1900 C   789 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/07/1963
12/1900 C   790 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/02/1960
12/1900 C   791 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   18/02/1960
12/1900 C   792 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   25/10/1962
12/1900 C   793 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   05/06/1967
12/1900 C   794 0-6-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   29/06/1964
03/1901 D   805 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5743 27/06/1958
03/1901 D   806 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5744 08/10/1962
03/1901 D   807 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5745 12/02/1962
03/1901 D   808 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5746 14/05/1956
03/1901 D   809 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5747 16/01/1961
03/1901 D   810 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5748 11/03/1960
03/1901 D   811 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5749 18/01/1962
03/1901 D   812 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5750 08/05/1961
04/1901 D   813 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5751 06/11/1958
04/1901 D   814 0-6-0T M. Holmes Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 5752 06/06/1958
04/1901 D   815 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4723 09/1947
04/1901 D   816 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4724 24/11/1958
04/1901 D   817 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4725 10/03/1958
04/1901 D   818 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4726 12/08/1957
04/1901 D   819 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4727 23/12/1958
04/1901 D   820 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4728 02/09/1959
04/1901 D   821 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4729 18/06/1959
04/1901 D   822 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4730 05/10/1956
04/1901 D   823 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4731 08/10/1962
04/1901 D   824 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4732 04/08/1961
04/1901 D   825 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4733 12/02/1962
04/1901 D   826 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4734 26/05/1956
04/1901 D   827 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4735 18/04/1958
05/1901 D   828 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4736 10/03/1958
05/1901 D   829 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4737 16/03/1956
05/1901 D   830 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4738 29/12/1962
05/1901 D   831 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4739 24/11/1958
05/1901 D   832 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4740 08/10/1962
05/1901 D   833 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4741 12/03/1959
05/1901 D   834 0-6-0T M. Holmes Sharp Stewart ?? 4742 12/02/1962
05/1903 K   317 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1924
06/1903 K   318 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1925
06/1903 K   319 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   09/1922
06/1903 K   320 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   01/1925
07/1903 K   321 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1922
07/1903 K   322 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/1925
09/1903 K   323 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   02/1923
09/1903 K   324 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   12/1924
10/1903 K   325 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1926
10/1903 K   326 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   08/1925
10/1903 K   327 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   11/1925
11/1903 K   328 4-4-0 M. Holmes Cowlairs Works ??   07/1922
12/1904 F   836 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/06/1960
12/1904 F   837 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   20/06/1958
12/1904 F   838 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   18/12/1958
12/1904 F   839 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   05/10/1956
01/1905 F   840 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   03/07/1958
01/1905 F   841 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   20/03/1961
09/1905 F   842 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   16/10/1959
09/1905 F   843 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/07/1958
09/1905 F   844 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   03/03/1958
10/1905 F   845 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   17/02/1959
10/1905 F   846 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   15/08/1958
10/1905 F   847 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/03/1959
06/1906 B   848 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17322 04/09/1959
06/1906 B   849 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17323 02/10/1961
06/1906 B   850 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17324 01/12/1960
06/1906 B   851 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17325 16/09/1960
06/1906 B   852 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17326 30/05/1958
06/1906 B   853 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17327 12/1947
06/1906 B   854 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17328 09/07/1959
06/1906 B   855 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17329 11/1947
06/1906 B   856 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17330 27/05/1960
06/1906 B   857 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L167 17331 12/1946
07/1906     329 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   26/02/1962
07/1906     330 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   09/06/1961
07/1906 I   868 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17369 09/1933
07/1906 H   868 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17369 09/1933
07/1906 I   869 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17370 10/1935
07/1906 H   869 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17370 10/1935
07/1906 I   870 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17371 05/1937
07/1906 H   870 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17371 05/1937
07/1906 I   871 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17372 01/1935
07/1906 H   871 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17372 01/1935
07/1906 I   872 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17373 08/1935
07/1906 H   872 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17373 08/1935
07/1906 I   873 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17374 11/1934
07/1906 H   873 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17374 11/1934
08/1906 I   874 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17375 05/1933
08/1906 H   874 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17375 05/1933
08/1906 I   875 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17376 11/1939
08/1906 H   875 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17376 11/1939
08/1906 I   876 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17377 05/1937
08/1906 H   876 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17377 05/1937
08/1906 I   877 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17378 04/1936
08/1906 H   877 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17378 04/1936
08/1906 I   878 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17379 11/1936
08/1906 H   878 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17379 11/1936
08/1906 I   879 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17380 11/1936
08/1906 H   879 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17380 11/1936
08/1906 I   880 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17381 10/1936
08/1906 H   880 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17381 10/1936
08/1906 I   881 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17382 11/1936
08/1906 H   881 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L175 17382 11/1936
10/1906     882 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/03/1948
11/1906     883 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/09/1948
11/1906     884 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/1949
12/1906     885 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   09/1948
12/1906     886 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/1947
12/1906     887 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/09/1948
12/1906     888 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   13/11/1948
12/1906     889 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   26/02/1948
01/1907     890 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/03/1951
01/1907     891 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   11/1947
01/1907     892 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/05/1948
01/1907     893 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   09/1948
07/1908 B   185 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   26/03/1962
07/1908 B   186 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   09/12/1959
07/1908 B   187 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/10/1961
07/1908 B   188 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   16/04/1959
08/1908 B   189 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   11/05/1961
08/1908 B   190 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   23/11/1961
12/1908     191 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   20/08/1962
12/1908     192 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   14/12/1961
12/1908     193 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   03/09/1962
12/1908     194 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/1947
12/1908     195 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/06/1961
01/1909     196 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/06/1960
03/1909 F   233 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   16/08/1960
03/1909 F   234 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   21/03/1958
03/1909 F   235 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   03/06/1959
03/1909 F   236 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/10/1962
04/1909 F   237 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   28/05/1962
04/1909 F   238 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/11/1955
07/1909 J   895 4-4-0 W. Reid North British L344 18856 20/04/1948
07/1909 J   896 4-4-0 W. Reid North British L344 18857 11/1949
08/1909     197 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18880 30/09/1959
08/1909     198 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18881 02/03/1959
08/1909 J   897 4-4-0 W. Reid North British L344 18858 06/1949
08/1909 J   898 4-4-0 W. Reid North British L344 18859 02/03/1948
08/1909 J   899 4-4-0 W. Reid North British L344 18860 08/1949
09/1909     199 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18882 17/09/1958
09/1909     200 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18883 22/04/1960
09/1909     201 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18884 02/10/1961
09/1909     202 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18885 20/06/1961
09/1909     203 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18886 11/12/1959
09/1909     204 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18887 29/12/1962
09/1909     205 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18888 13/02/1959
09/1909     206 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L347 18889 10/11/1960
09/1909 M   239 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18868 07/1936
09/1909 M   334 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18869 02/1939
09/1909 M   349 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18870 07/1936
09/1909 A   858 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L345 18862 25/03/1954
09/1909 A   859 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L345 18863 09/1947
09/1909 A   860 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L345 18864 11/1947
09/1909 A   861 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L345 18865 12/1947
09/1909 A   862 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L345 18866 03/11/1950
09/1909 A   863 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L345 18867 25/03/1954
09/1909 J   900 4-4-0 W. Reid North British L344 18861 22/02/1951
10/1909 K   331 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   24/08/1951
10/1909 M   350 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18871 01/1939
10/1909 M   351 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18872 11/1939
10/1909 M   352 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18873 06/1937
10/1909 M   353 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18874 10/1937
10/1909 M   354 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18875 09/1936
10/1909 M   355 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18876 09/1939
10/1909 M   356 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18877 05/1939
10/1909 M   475 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18879 11/1940
10/1909 K   864 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   22/12/1949
10/1909 K   865 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/1947
11/1909     364 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18955 06/06/1961
11/1909     365 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18956 20/06/1958
11/1909     366 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18957 06/10/1959
11/1909     367 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18958 09/04/1962
11/1909     368 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18959 21/09/1959
11/1909 M   474 0-4-4T W. Reid North British L346 18878 01/1939
11/1909 K   866 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/06/1952
11/1909 K   867 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   09/1949
11/1909 K   894 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   20/09/1951
12/1909 K   332 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/06/1951
12/1909 K   333 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/11/1952
12/1909     369 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18960 27/10/1962
12/1909     370 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18961 09/06/1961
12/1909     371 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18962 06/08/1959
12/1909     372 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18963 21/09/1960
12/1909     373 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L357 18964 09/1947
12/1909 K   382 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   05/03/1948
01/1910 K   383 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   22/09/1953
02/1910 K   384 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   09/1947
02/1910 K   385 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   01/10/1951
03/1910     207 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19093 16/09/1960
03/1910     208 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19094 23/09/1959
03/1910     374 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19085 23/09/1960
03/1910     375 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19086 25/10/1961
03/1910     376 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19087 03/12/1959
03/1910     377 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19088 11/01/1962
03/1910     378 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19089 10/1946
03/1910     379 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19090 02/10/1959
04/1910     380 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19091 29/11/1962
04/1910     381 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L382 19092 12/10/1959
06/1910     154 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19160 16/06/1959
06/1910     209 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19161 01/10/1962
06/1910     210 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19162 02/12/1958
06/1910     251 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19163 27/12/1957
06/1910 A   386 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19165 18/11/1960
06/1910 A   387 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19166 03/08/1960
06/1910     7 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19159 12/02/1962
07/1910     282 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19164 12/02/1962
07/1910 A   388 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19167 02/03/1961
07/1910 A   389 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19168 01/10/1962
07/1910 A   390 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19169 11/05/1961
07/1910 A   391 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19170 21/05/1962
07/1910 A   392 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19171 01/10/1962
07/1910 A   393 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19172 26/04/1958
08/1910 A   396 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19173 13/06/1958
08/1910 A   397 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19174 02/09/1960
08/1910 A   398 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19175 24/01/1958
08/1910 A   399 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L394 19176 16/09/1960
09/1910     38 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   26/02/1962
09/1910     56 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   27/11/1961
10/1910     115 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   09/04/1962
10/1910     57 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   10/06/1959
10/1910     58 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   17/10/1958
10/1910     59 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   20/11/1961
11/1910     120 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   30/09/1959
12/1910     335 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   03/04/1959
12/1910     336 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/01/1959
12/1910     337 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   24/02/1961
12/1910     347 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/03/1961
01/1911     348 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   16/07/1962
07/1911 I   901 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3428 12/1937
07/1911 H   901 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3428 12/1937
07/1911 I   902 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3429 10/1936
07/1911 H   902 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3429 10/1936
08/1911 I   903 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3430 05/1937
08/1911 H   903 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3430 05/1937
08/1911 I   904 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3431 08/1936
08/1911 H   904 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3431 08/1936
08/1911 I   905 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3432 09/1937
08/1911 H   905 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3432 09/1937
08/1911 I   906 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3433 02/1937
08/1911 H   906 4-4-2 W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E68 3433 02/1937
09/1911 J   243 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   10/1949
10/1911 J   244 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/1947
10/1911 J   245 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   11/1947
10/1911 J   338 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/10/1948
10/1911 J   339 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   14/01/1952
11/1911 J   340 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   14/11/1952
12/1911 M   1 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1066 10/02/1956
12/1911 J   359 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   01/09/1950
12/1911 J   360 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   26/08/1950
12/1911 J   361 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/1946
12/1911 J   362 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/1947
01/1912 M   3 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1067 10/06/1954
03/1912 M   4 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1068 11/02/1955
04/1912 F   114 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   21/10/1958
04/1912 M   5 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1069 30/09/1954
04/1912 F   66 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   15/09/1961
05/1912 F   116 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   28/02/1958
05/1912 F   117 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   19/11/1954
05/1912 F   118 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/02/1962
05/1912 M   122 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1070 28/06/1955
06/1912 F   119 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/10/1960
06/1912 F   121 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   18/01/1961
06/1912 M   131 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1071 16/03/1956
07/1912 F   130 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
07/1912 F   132 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/10/1962
07/1912 M   134 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1072 04/10/1955
07/1912 F   152 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   25/08/1958
07/1912 A   907 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19828 25/02/1960
07/1912 A   908 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19829 11/03/1960
07/1912 A   909 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19830 07/07/1959
08/1912 M   135 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1073 01/04/1960
08/1912 A   910 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19831 06/06/1958
08/1912 A   911 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19832 06/06/1958
08/1912 A   912 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19833 22/03/1960
08/1912 A   913 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19834 01/10/1962
08/1912 A   914 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19835 23/02/1959
08/1912 A   915 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19836 30/12/1958
08/1912 A   916 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19837 22/09/1958
08/1912 A   917 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19838 18/11/1959
08/1912 A   918 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19839 08/09/1962
08/1912 A   919 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19840 12/02/1962
08/1912 A   920 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19841 09/04/1958
08/1912 A   921 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19842 18/05/1958
08/1912 A   922 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19843 30/10/1961
08/1912 A   923 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19844 14/08/1958
08/1912 A   924 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19845 16/08/1960
08/1912 A   925 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19846 02/03/1959
08/1912 A   926 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L492 19847 12/02/1962
09/1912 M   141 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1074 18/12/1954
09/1912 D30   400 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/1945
09/1912 J   400 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/1945
10/1912 M   155 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1075 07/1954
10/1912 D30   363 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/01/1951
10/1912 J   363 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/01/1951
11/1912 M   164 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E181 1076 09/09/1955
11/1912     220 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/09/1958
11/1912     226 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   22/03/1958
12/1912 M   2 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E182 1077 28/01/1954
12/1912     228 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   11/06/1962
12/1912     253 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   21/09/1960
12/1912     254 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/10/1959
01/1913 M   6 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E182 1078 31/08/1953
02/1913 M   12 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E182 1079 19/11/1954
02/1913     124 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   20/11/1961
02/1913 M   15 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E182 1080 18/04/1956
02/1913     86 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   11/07/1961
03/1913     126 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   11/01/1962
03/1913     127 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   11/05/1961
03/1913     129 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   27/11/1961
03/1913 M   25 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E182 1081 16/03/1955
03/1913 M   41 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E182 1082 21/10/1953
04/1913 M   43 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E182 1083 03/09/1954
04/1913 M   48 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E182 1084 06/12/1954
05/1913 A   219 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L528 20164 27/07/1959
05/1913 A   223 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L528 20165 15/04/1959
05/1913 A   224 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L528 20166 19/05/1960
05/1913 A   229 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L528 20167 07/12/1959
05/1913 A   230 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L528 20168 20/12/1957
05/1913 A   246 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L528 20169 05/02/1960
05/1913 A   252 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L528 20170 09/02/1959
05/1913 A   257 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L528 20171 06/01/1960
05/1913 A   264 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L528 20172 16/06/1960
05/1913 M   53 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E182 1085 04/12/1952
07/1913 M   265 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1086 18/04/1956
07/1913 M   267 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1087 18/12/1954
08/1913 M   16 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1089 22/04/1954
08/1913 M   309 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1088 12/04/1960
09/1913 K   149 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   10/08/1960
09/1913 K   221 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   03/09/1958
09/1913 K   256 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   17/12/1962
09/1913 K   258 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   05/05/1959
10/1913 M   26 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1090 15/09/1954
10/1913 K   266 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   24/03/1960
10/1913 M   39 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1091 14/09/1954
11/1913 M   51 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1092 22/02/1956
11/1913 M   64 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1093 29/01/1954
12/1913 M   102 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1094 22/02/1956
12/1913 M   133 4-4-2T W. Reid Yorkshire Engine Company E183 1095 03/02/1956
12/1913 K   307 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/09/1959
12/1913 K   405 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   13/05/1949
12/1913 K   406 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/06/1961
12/1913 K   407 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/06/1959
12/1913 K   408 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   03/02/1950
04/1914     409 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/08/1959
04/1914     410 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   19/09/1957
04/1914     411 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   05/1957
04/1914     412 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   25/06/1960
05/1914     413 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1958
06/1914     414 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   18/12/1957
06/1914     415 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   05/08/1957
06/1914     416 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/1958
07/1914     417 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   25/06/1960
07/1914     418 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   20/04/1959
09/1914     419 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1958
10/1914     420 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   20/08/1957
10/1914     421 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/01/1957
10/1914     422 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   17/10/1958
10/1914     423 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   04/12/1958
12/1914 B   13 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/06/1964
12/1914 S   13 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/06/1964
12/1914 B   44 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/12/1959
12/1914 S   44 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/12/1959
12/1914 B   8 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   22/05/1959
12/1914 S   8 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   22/05/1959
01/1915 B   113 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
01/1915 S   113 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
01/1915 B   62 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/09/1961
01/1915 S   62 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/09/1961
04/1915 B   136 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/07/1964
04/1915 S   136 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/07/1964
04/1915 B   222 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/10/1961
04/1915 S   222 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/10/1961
04/1915 B   255 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   10/12/1962
04/1915 S   255 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   10/12/1962
04/1915 B   260 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
04/1915 S   260 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
05/1915 B   261 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   25/06/1962
05/1915 S   261 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   25/06/1962
06/1915     424 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   11/1947
07/1915     425 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   04/1958
07/1915     426 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   09/12/1957
08/1915     427 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   05/06/1959
08/1915     428 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/1958
11/1915 B   263 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   14/05/1964
11/1915 S   263 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   14/05/1964
11/1915 B   429 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   31/12/1966
11/1915 S   429 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   31/12/1966
11/1915 B   430 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/11/1963
11/1915 S   430 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/11/1963
11/1915 B   431 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   13/07/1964
11/1915 S   431 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   13/07/1964
12/1915 B   432 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   25/12/1963
12/1915 S   432 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   25/12/1963
12/1915 L   438 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21203 09/10/1959
12/1915 L   439 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21204 20/04/1956
12/1915 L   440 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21205 22/04/1960
12/1915 L   441 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21206 03/04/1961
12/1915 L   442 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21207 22/04/1960
01/1916 L   443 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21208 22/10/1959
02/1916 L   444 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21209 09/10/1959
02/1916 L   445 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21210 15/02/1961
02/1916 L   446 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21211 22/04/1960
03/1916 L   447 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21212 02/03/1960
04/1916 L   448 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21213 02/03/1960
04/1916 L   449 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21214 13/04/1956
04/1916 L   450 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21215 15/02/1961
04/1916 L   451 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21216 08/05/1956
05/1916 L   452 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L652 21217 02/03/1960
06/1916 B   433 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   18/09/1963
06/1916 S   433 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   18/09/1963
06/1916 B   434 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/10/1964
06/1916 S   434 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/10/1964
06/1916 B   435 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/03/1962
06/1916 S   435 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/03/1962
06/1916 B   436 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   23/01/1964
06/1916 S   436 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   23/01/1964
06/1916 B   437 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/10/1964
06/1916 S   437 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/10/1964
08/1916 A   47 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21218 13/11/1958
08/1916 A   54 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21219 12/01/1961
09/1916 A   61 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21220 15/11/1958
09/1916 A   65 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21221 07/10/1958
10/1916 A   69 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21222 12/08/1959
12/1916 A   70 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21223 09/08/1960
01/1917 A   276 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21224 29/09/1960
01/1917 A   453 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21225 20/03/1961
02/1917 A   142 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21226 12/02/1962
03/1917 A   165 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21227 02/09/1959
03/1917 A   166 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21228 13/11/1961
03/1917 A   259 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L653 21229 23/11/1960
05/1917 K   100 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   28/10/1959
05/1917 K   291 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   15/12/1959
05/1917 K   298 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/06/1961
06/1917 K   153 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/10/1959
07/1917 K   241 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   16/09/1949
06/1918 B   123 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21927 03/09/1965
06/1918 S   123 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21927 03/09/1965
06/1918 B   139 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21928 29/11/1963
06/1918 S   139 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21928 29/11/1963
06/1918 B   88 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21925 17/12/1962
06/1918 S   88 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21925 17/12/1962
06/1918 B   89 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21926 28/10/1963
06/1918 S   89 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21926 28/10/1963
07/1918 B   151 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21929 08/03/1961
07/1918 S   151 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21929 08/03/1961
07/1918 B   157 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21930 11/05/1964
07/1918 S   157 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21930 11/05/1964
07/1918 B   158 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21931 14/11/1963
07/1918 S   158 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21931 14/11/1963
07/1918 B   161 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21932 19/10/1964
07/1918 S   161 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21932 19/10/1964
07/1918 B   162 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21933 08/06/1964
07/1918 S   162 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21933 08/06/1964
07/1918 B   167 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21934 02/10/1961
07/1918 S   167 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21934 02/10/1961
08/1918 B   274 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21935 09/04/1962
08/1918 S   274 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21935 09/04/1962
08/1918 B   292 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   04/03/1960
08/1918 S   292 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   04/03/1960
08/1918 B   295 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21936 05/08/1963
08/1918 S   295 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21936 05/08/1963
08/1918 B   297 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   10/12/1966
08/1918 S   297 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   10/12/1966
08/1918 B   304 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   19/11/1966
08/1918 S   304 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   19/11/1966
08/1918 B   305 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21937 23/10/1965
08/1918 S   305 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21937 23/10/1965
08/1918 B   314 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21938 14/09/1964
08/1918 S   314 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21938 14/09/1964
08/1918 B   315 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21939 12/10/1964
08/1918 S   315 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21939 12/10/1964
08/1918 B   454 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
08/1918 S   454 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
08/1918 B   456 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21940 04/04/1967
08/1918 S   456 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21940 04/04/1967
09/1918 B   455 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   28/12/1963
09/1918 S   455 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   28/12/1963
09/1918 B   457 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21941 17/08/1966
09/1918 S   457 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21941 17/08/1966
09/1918 B   458 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21942 21/05/1962
09/1918 S   458 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21942 21/05/1962
09/1918 B   459 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21943 28/12/1963
09/1918 S   459 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21943 28/12/1963
09/1918 B   460 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21944 15/10/1965
09/1918 S   460 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21944 15/10/1965
10/1918 B   461 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21945 29/12/1962
10/1918 S   461 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21945 29/12/1962
10/1918 B   462 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21946 25/11/1963
10/1918 S   462 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21946 25/11/1963
10/1918 B   463 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21947 23/12/1963
10/1918 S   463 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21947 23/12/1963
10/1918 B   464 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21948 15/07/1959
10/1918 S   464 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21948 15/07/1959
11/1918 B   465 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21949 30/12/1964
11/1918 S   465 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21949 30/12/1964
11/1918 B   466 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21950 29/06/1964
11/1918 S   466 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21950 29/06/1964
11/1918 B   467 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21951 08/06/1964
11/1918 S   467 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21951 08/06/1964
11/1918 B   468 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21952 23/06/1966
11/1918 S   468 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21952 23/06/1966
11/1918 B   469 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21953 31/05/1963
11/1918 S   469 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21953 31/05/1963
12/1918 B   476 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21954 14/05/1962
12/1918 S   476 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21954 14/05/1962
01/1919 B   477 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21955 12/10/1964
01/1919 S   477 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21955 12/10/1964
01/1919 B   478 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21956 31/07/1965
01/1919 S   478 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21956 31/07/1965
01/1919 B   479 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21957 29/11/1963
01/1919 S   479 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21957 29/11/1963
01/1919 B   480 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21958 29/12/1962
01/1919 S   480 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L695 21958 29/12/1962
03/1919 K   242 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/03/1960
03/1919 K   270 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   24/04/1959
04/1919 K   278 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/11/1961
04/1919 K   281 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/03/1960
04/1919 K   287 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   02/1946
09/1919 F   277 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   14/08/1958
09/1919 F   290 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   26/08/1960
10/1919 F   288 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   16/07/1962
10/1919 F   289 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   09/1960
11/1919 F   271 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/02/1962
11/1919 F   279 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/1960
11/1919 B   313 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22272 03/03/1966
11/1919 S   313 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22272 03/03/1966
11/1919 B   470 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22268 05/04/1961
11/1919 S   470 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22268 05/04/1961
11/1919 B   471 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22269 22/08/1966
11/1919 S   471 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22269 22/08/1966
11/1919 B   472 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22270 06/09/1962
11/1919 S   472 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22270 06/09/1962
11/1919 B   473 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22271 02/10/1965
11/1919 S   473 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22271 02/10/1965
11/1919 B   485 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22273 09/07/1963
11/1919 S   485 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22273 09/07/1963
11/1919 B   486 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22274 29/12/1962
11/1919 S   486 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22274 29/12/1962
11/1919 B   487 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22275 22/04/1967
11/1919 S   487 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22275 22/04/1967
11/1919 B   488 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22276 16/12/1963
11/1919 S   488 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22276 16/12/1963
11/1919 F   87 0-6-0T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/1962
12/1919 B   296 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22490 08/06/1964
12/1919 S   296 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22490 08/06/1964
12/1919 B   300 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22491 14/07/1966
12/1919 S   300 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22491 14/07/1966
12/1919 B   301 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22492 13/08/1962
12/1919 S   301 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22492 13/08/1962
12/1919 B   302 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22493 24/08/1966
12/1919 S   302 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22493 24/08/1966
12/1919 B   489 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22277 27/08/1962
12/1919 S   489 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22277 27/08/1962
01/1920 B   303 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22494 29/12/1962
01/1920 S   303 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22494 29/12/1962
01/1920 B   306 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22495 01/02/1966
01/1920 S   306 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22495 01/02/1966
01/1920 B   401 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22496 22/04/1967
01/1920 S   401 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22496 22/04/1967
01/1920 B   402 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22497 29/12/1962
01/1920 S   402 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22497 29/12/1962
01/1920 B   403 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22498 23/01/1964
01/1920 S   403 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22498 23/01/1964
01/1920 B   491 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22499 17/12/1964
01/1920 S   491 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L716 22499 17/12/1964
02/1920 A   106 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22284 02/03/1959
02/1920 A   20 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22278 31/07/1959
02/1920 A   22 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22279 08/12/1959
02/1920 A   29 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22280 01/10/1962
02/1920 A   49 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22281 18/04/1958
02/1920 A   96 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22282 16/08/1960
02/1920 A   97 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22283 01/10/1962
03/1920 A   107 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22285 07/08/1958
03/1920 A   108 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22286 22/10/1960
03/1920 A   240 0-6-2T W. Reid North British L717 22287 14/03/1958
04/1920 K   304 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   31/10/1960
05/1920 K   490 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   18/12/1959
05/1920 K   502 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   19/02/1959
05/1920 K   503 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   10/09/1959
05/1920 K   505 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   16/12/1947
06/1920 K   34 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   11/06/1959
06/1920 K   35 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   25/06/1960
07/1920 K   492 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   24/04/1959
07/1920 K   493 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   10/04/1961
08/1920 K   494 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   20/11/1961
08/1920 K   495 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   23/02/1960
09/1920 K   496 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   24/03/1960
11/1920     498 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/10/1959
11/1920     499 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/1958
11/1920     500 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/1958
12/1920 B   109 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22672 09/12/1963
12/1920 S   109 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22672 09/12/1963
12/1920 B   110 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22673 22/04/1967
12/1920 S   110 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22673 22/04/1967
12/1920 B   46 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22668 29/12/1962
12/1920 S   46 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22668 29/12/1962
12/1920     497 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   30/10/1957
12/1920     501 4-4-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/1958
12/1920 B   72 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22669 28/12/1963
12/1920 S   72 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22669 28/12/1963
12/1920 B   73 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22670 11/02/1963
12/1920 S   73 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22670 11/02/1963
12/1920 B   84 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22671 19/11/1966
12/1920 S   84 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22671 19/11/1966
01/1921 B   111 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22674 29/05/1965
01/1921 S   111 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22674 29/05/1965
01/1921 B   171 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22675 29/12/1962
01/1921 S   171 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22675 29/12/1962
01/1921 B   175 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22676 19/11/1966
01/1921 S   175 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22676 19/11/1966
01/1921 B   272 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22677 17/01/1966
01/1921 S   272 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22677 17/01/1966
01/1921 B   273 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22678 04/09/1965
01/1921 S   273 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22678 04/09/1965
02/1921 B   299 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22679 29/11/1963
02/1921 S   299 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22679 29/11/1963
02/1921 B   506 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22680 14/10/1963
02/1921 S   506 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22680 14/10/1963
02/1921 B   507 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22681 29/03/1962
02/1921 S   507 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22681 29/03/1962
02/1921 B   508 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22682 28/10/1963
02/1921 S   508 0-6-0 W. Reid North British L739 22682 28/10/1963
02/1921 L   511 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L740 22683 09/10/1959
02/1921 L   512 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L740 22684 01/08/1955
02/1921 L   513 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L740 22685 02/11/1955
03/1921 L   514 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L740 22686 22/10/1959
03/1921 L   515 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L740 22687 22/04/1960
03/1921 L   516 4-4-2T W. Reid North British L740 22688 22/04/1960
06/1921 B   101 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/12/1965
06/1921 S   101 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/12/1965
06/1921 B   103 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/06/1964
06/1921 S   103 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   08/06/1964
06/1921 H   509 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L741 22689 02/1937
06/1921 H   510 4-4-2 W. Reid North British L741 22690 09/1936
06/1921 B   517 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/09/1962
06/1921 S   517 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   06/09/1962
06/1921 B   98 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
06/1921 S   98 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
07/1921 B   33 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   23/01/1964
07/1921 S   33 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   23/01/1964
08/1921 B   104 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
08/1921 S   104 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
08/1921 B   128 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/10/1964
08/1921 S   128 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/10/1964
09/1921 B   105 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   27/08/1962
09/1921 S   105 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   27/08/1962
09/1921 B   143 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
09/1921 S   143 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
10/1921 B   518 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
10/1921 S   518 0-6-0 W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
01/1923 A   519 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3851 01/10/1962
01/1923 A   520 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3852 18/12/1959
02/1923 A   521 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3853 06/06/1960
02/1923 A   522 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3854 18/05/1961
03/1923 A   523 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3855 13/06/1958
03/1923 A   524 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3856 10/01/1958
03/1923 A   525 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3857 17/05/1960
03/1923 A   526 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3858 26/06/1958
03/1923 A   527 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3859 16/07/1962
03/1923 A   528 0-6-2T W. Reid Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E117 3860 18/02/1960
10/1923 A   19 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   17/05/1960
11/1923 A   23 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   17/02/1960
11/1923 A   31 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   25/11/1959
11/1923 A   52 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   22/10/1960
11/1923 A   55 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/10/1957
11/1923 A   60 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   01/10/1962
12/1923 A   67 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   01/10/1962
12/1923 A   71 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   29/12/1962
12/1923 A   74 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   19/10/1959
12/1923 A   75 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   07/05/1959
12/1923 A   76 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   28/11/1959
12/1923 A   77 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   12/02/1962
02/1924 A   78 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   16/10/1959
02/1924 A   79 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   01/10/1962
02/1924 A   99 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   05/12/1961
03/1924 A   125 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   18/11/1958
03/1924 A   9147 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   19/07/1961
03/1924 A   9174 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   22/05/1959
03/1924 A   9225 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   13/08/1960
04/1924 A   9227 0-6-2T W. Reid Cowlairs Works ??   01/10/1962