Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3691 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34341 Week
» 132986 Month
» 335650 Year
» 3362503 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NBR/LNER Reid "N15" Class 0-6-2T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
NBR |
924 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9924 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
|
NBR |
7 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9007 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
|
NBR |
166 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9166 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
NBR |
399 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9399 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
NBR |
923 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9923 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
NBR |
22 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9022 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
|
NBR |
257 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9257 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
|
NBR |
264 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9264 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
|
NBR |
398 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9398 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
|
NBR |
921 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9921 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
|
NBR |
210 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9210 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
|
NBR |
259 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9259 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
|
NBR |
387 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9387 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
|
NBR |
917 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9917 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
|
NBR |
107 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9107 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
NBR |
61 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9061 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
NBR |
914 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9914 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
NBR |
106 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9106 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
|
NBR |
223 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9223 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
|
NBR |
209 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9209 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
NBR |
388 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9388 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
NBR |
389 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9389 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
NBR |
54 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9054 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
NBR |
909 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9909 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
NBR |
915 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9915 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
|
NBR |
920 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9920 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
|
NBR |
922 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9922 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
|
NBR |
219 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9219 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
|
NBR |
392 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9392 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
|
NBR |
911 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9911 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
|
NBR |
108 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9108 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
|
NBR |
96 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9096 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
|
NBR |
522 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9522 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
|
NBR |
396 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9396 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
|
NBR |
397 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9397 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
|
NBR |
521 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9521 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
|
NBR |
525 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9525 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
|
NBR |
69 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9069 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
|
NBR |
165 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9165 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
|
NBR |
252 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9252 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
|
NBR |
916 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9916 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
|
NBR |
246 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9246 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
NBR |
918 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9918 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
NBR |
97 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9097 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
NBR |
125 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9125 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
|
NBR |
251 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9251 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
|
NBR |
912 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9912 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
|
NBR |
913 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9913 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
|
NBR |
391 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9391 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
|
NBR |
49 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9049 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
|
NBR |
520 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9520 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
|
NBR |
527 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9527 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
|
NBR |
70 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9070 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
|
NBR |
229 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9229 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
|
NBR |
23 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9023 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
|
NBR |
29 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9029 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
|
NBR |
65 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9065 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
|
NBR |
908 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9908 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
|
NBR |
919 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9919 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
|
NBR |
224 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9224 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
NBR |
240 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9240 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
NBR |
390 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9390 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
NBR |
453 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9453 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
NBR |
47 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9047 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
NBR |
519 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9519 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
NBR |
524 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9524 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
NBR |
528 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9528 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
NBR |
925 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9925 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
NBR |
154 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9154 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
|
NBR |
276 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9276 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
|
NBR |
31 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9031 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
|
NBR |
20 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9020 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
|
NBR |
230 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9230 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
|
NBR |
393 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9393 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
|
NBR |
523 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9523 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
|
NBR |
78 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9078 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
|
NBR |
386 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9386 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
NBR |
907 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9907 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
NBR |
910 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9910 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
NBR |
926 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9926 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
NBR |
282 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9282 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
|
NBR |
526 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9526 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
|
NBR |
60 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9060 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
|
NBR |
99 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9099 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
|
NBR |
67 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9067 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
|
NBR |
74 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9074 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
|
NBR |
142 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9142 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
|
NBR |
79 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9079 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
|
NBR |
19 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9019 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1926 |
|
NBR |
77 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9077 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1926 |
|
NBR |
52 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9052 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
|
NBR |
75 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9075 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
|
NBR |
55 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9055 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
|
NBR |
76 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9076 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
|
NBR |
71 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9071 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
|
LNER |
9210 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9129 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1946 |
|
LNER |
9386 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9132 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
9389 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9135 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
9055 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9210 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
9097 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9191 |
1946 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
9108 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9194 |
1946 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
9393 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9139 |
1946 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
9399 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9143 |
1946 |
on |
17/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
9219 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9185 |
1946 |
on |
24/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
9922 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9159 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
LNER |
9099 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9219 |
1946 |
on |
03/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
9060 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9211 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
9077 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9216 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
9165 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9182 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
9224 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9165 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
9519 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9196 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
9522 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9199 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
9908 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9145 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
9007 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9126 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9020 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9186 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9023 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9207 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9071 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9178 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9227 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9224 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9246 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9168 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9251 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9130 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9252 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9169 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9257 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9170 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9264 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9171 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9391 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9137 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9520 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9197 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9521 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9198 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
9019 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9206 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9022 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9187 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9029 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9188 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9054 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9173 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9067 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9212 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9074 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9213 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9075 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9214 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9078 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9217 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9079 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9218 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9259 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9184 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9276 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9179 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9392 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9138 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9396 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9140 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9911 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9148 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9913 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9150 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9915 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9152 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9919 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9156 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9923 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9160 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9926 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9163 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
9047 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9172 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
9065 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9175 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
9107 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9193 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
9142 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9181 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
9525 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9202 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
9069 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9176 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
9096 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9190 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
9282 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9131 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
9387 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9133 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
9388 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9134 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
9397 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9141 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
9916 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9153 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
9918 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9155 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
9230 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9167 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
9398 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9142 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
9453 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9180 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
9907 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9144 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
9909 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9146 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
9052 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9209 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
9125 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9220 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
9174 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9222 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
9209 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9128 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
9912 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9149 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
9921 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9158 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
9031 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9208 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9049 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9189 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9061 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9174 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9070 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9177 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9076 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9215 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9106 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9192 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9147 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9221 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9154 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9127 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9166 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9183 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9223 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9164 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9225 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9223 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9229 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9166 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9528 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9205 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9910 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9147 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9914 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9151 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9917 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9154 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9920 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9157 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9924 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9161 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9925 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9162 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
9240 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9195 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
9390 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9136 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
9523 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9200 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
9526 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9203 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
9524 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9201 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
9527 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9204 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
9186 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69186 |
|
m/e |
03/1948 |
|
LNER |
9149 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69149 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9175 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69175 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9185 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69185 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9199 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69199 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9212 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69212 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9221 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69221 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9169 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69169 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9187 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69187 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9198 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69198 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9201 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69201 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9219 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69219 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9126 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69126 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9137 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69137 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9145 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69145 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9154 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69154 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9164 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69164 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9178 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69178 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9179 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69179 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9190 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69190 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9206 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69206 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9213 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69213 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9130 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69130 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
9142 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69142 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
9156 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69156 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
9159 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69159 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
9167 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69167 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
9134 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69134 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9135 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69135 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9144 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69144 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9150 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69150 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9158 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69158 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9223 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69223 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9153 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69153 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9155 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69155 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9163 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69163 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9174 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69174 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9197 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69197 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9211 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69211 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9215 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69215 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9218 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69218 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9139 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69139 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9184 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69184 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9208 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69208 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9141 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69141 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
9203 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69203 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
9204 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69204 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
9210 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69210 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
9152 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69152 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
9200 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69200 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
9136 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69136 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9147 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69147 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9202 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69202 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9222 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69222 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9140 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69140 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9183 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69183 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9207 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69207 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9146 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69146 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9168 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69168 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9196 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69196 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9209 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69209 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9132 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69132 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
9157 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69157 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
9166 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69166 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
9192 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69192 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
9129 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69129 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
9177 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69177 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
9224 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69224 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
9143 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69143 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
9165 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69165 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
9216 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69216 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
9133 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69133 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
9176 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69176 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
9188 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69188 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
9193 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69193 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
9195 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69195 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
9205 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69205 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
9214 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69214 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
9170 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69170 |
|
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
LNER |
9160 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69160 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
9194 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69194 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
9162 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69162 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
9173 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69173 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
9151 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69151 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
9171 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69171 |
|
m/e |
07/1950 |
|
LNER |
9180 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69180 |
|
m/e |
08/1950 |
|
LNER |
9128 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69128 |
|
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
LNER |
9131 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69131 |
|
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
LNER |
9189 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69189 |
|
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
9182 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69182 |
|
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
|
LNER |
9148 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69148 |
|
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
|
LNER |
9127 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69127 |
|
m/e |
01/1951 |
|
LNER |
9138 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69138 |
|
m/e |
01/1951 |
|
LNER |
9161 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69161 |
|
m/e |
02/1951 |
|
LNER |
9172 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69172 |
|
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
LNER |
9217 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69217 |
|
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
LNER |
9181 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69181 |
|
m/e |
04/1951 |
|
LNER |
9191 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69191 |
|
m/e |
05/1951 |
|
LNER |
9220 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69220 |
|
m/e |
06/1951 |
|