Depot: To London Midland Region
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | y/e | 1940 | 12124 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | y/e | 1940 | 12174 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | y/e | 1940 | 12388 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | y/e | 1940 | 12401 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | y/e | 1940 | 12562 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 1940 | 12583 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12124 | Snapshot | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12174 | Snapshot | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12388 | Snapshot | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12583 | Snapshot | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1949 | 1225 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/06/1949 | 1225 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 90212 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 90357 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 90361 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 90396 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 07/1949 | 8064 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1949 | 61109 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/07/1949 | 61109 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 42593 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 42593 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 62588 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 62599 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 42323 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 48175 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 48325 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 48335 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 48518 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 62532 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 62587 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 62609 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 9353 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 90332 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 90347 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 90527 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 90622 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 90650 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 70878 | Transfer in from: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 77122 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 77444 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 77481 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 78705 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90332 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90347 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90527 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 62532 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 62587 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 62609 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90332 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90347 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90527 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90622 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90650 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 9353 | Transfer out to: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 77122 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/07/1950 | 90281 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8064 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 23/10/1950 | 9070 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 27/10/1950 | 43001 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90212 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 77226 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90107 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 48518 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90107 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 48325 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 43001 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 90257 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 90562 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90257 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90562 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 05/05/1951 | 44945 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 44945 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 44945 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 90556 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 90564 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90556 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90564 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 90194 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 44945 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90527 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90308 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/03/1952 | 42083 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/03/1952 | 42084 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/03/1952 | 42085 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/03/1952 | 43875 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/03/1952 | 44235 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/03/1952 | 44535 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42083 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42084 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42085 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 44535 | Transfer out to: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62588 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62599 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 49070 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 42323 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 05/05/1956 | 43875 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 90655 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 90357 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 48175 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 44235 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90281 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 42696 | Transfer in from: | 65J | Fort William | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 90361 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 03/12/1961 | 7741 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 03/12/1961 | 7760 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 90345 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 15/08/1964 | 42696 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1965 | D5686 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/06/1965 | D5686 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90347 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90619 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84010 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84013 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84014 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84015 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84016 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84017 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84019 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84025 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84026 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84028 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84010 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84013 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84014 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84015 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84016 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84017 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84019 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84025 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84026 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 84028 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D3165 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D3166 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D3165 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D3166 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 48335 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/11/1966 | D3467 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/01/1967 | 90332 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/03/1967 | D1891 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/03/1967 | D1891 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 90396 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D3197 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D3351 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D3546 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3184 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3352 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3353 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3354 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3359 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3360 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D3197 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D3351 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D3546 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | D3184 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | D3352 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | D3353 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | D3354 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | D3359 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | D3360 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D3390 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3362 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3363 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3364 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3397 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3511 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1968 | D3390 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | D3345 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D3345 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3186 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3404 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3505 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3514 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1968 | D3471 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D3471 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D3186 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D3511 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1971 | D3927 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/04/1972 | D3909 | Transfer in from: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/04/1972 | D3910 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/04/1972 | D3912 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/04/1972 | D3914 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3912 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1972 | D3907 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | D3909 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D3914 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D3907 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D3927 | Transfer out to: | NH | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 27/09/1975 | 08390 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/03/1976 | 20030 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/03/1976 | 20048 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08742 | Transfer out to: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/11/1980 | 08294 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1983 | 08327 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/05/1984 | 08292 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/03/1985 | 08382 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/12/1985 | 08293 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/09/1987 | 08334 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/10/1990 | 20030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/11/1990 | 20048 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1992 | 08399 | Condemned |