Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 2033 Today
» 2521 Yesterday
» 16385 Week
» 63218 Month
» 365239 Year
» 2765703 Total
|
Record: 6840 (19/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotives of the Midland Railway
Build Date |
MR Class |
LMS Class |
First MR Number |
Wheels |
Designer |
Manufacturer |
Order Number |
Works Number |
Withdrawn |
06/1869 |
690 |
|
690 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
869 |
06/1928 |
06/1869 |
690 |
|
691 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
870 |
08/1934 |
06/1869 |
690 |
|
692 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
871 |
07/1928 |
06/1869 |
690 |
|
693 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
872 |
12/1930 |
07/1869 |
690 |
|
694 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
873 |
08/1928 |
07/1869 |
690 |
|
695 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
874 |
01/1926 |
1870 |
780 |
|
780 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
357 |
07/1928 |
1870 |
780 |
|
781 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
358 |
07/1928 |
1870 |
780 |
|
782 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
359 |
07/1930 |
1870 |
780 |
|
783 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
360 |
12/1933 |
1870 |
780 |
|
784 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
361 |
09/1930 |
1870 |
780 |
|
785 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
362 |
05/1935 |
1870 |
780 |
|
786 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
363 |
10/1921 |
1870 |
780 |
|
787 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
364 |
06/1927 |
1870 |
780 |
|
788 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
365 |
05/1931 |
1870 |
780 |
|
789 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
366 |
10/1932 |
1870 |
780 |
|
790 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
367 |
11/1931 |
1870 |
780 |
|
791 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
368 |
04/1925 |
1870 |
780 |
|
792 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
369 |
09/1931 |
1870 |
780 |
|
793 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
370 |
11/1935 |
1870 |
780 |
|
794 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
371 |
11/1933 |
1870 |
780 |
|
795 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
372 |
05/1925 |
1870 |
780 |
|
796 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
373 |
11/1934 |
1870 |
780 |
|
797 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
374 |
11/1924 |
1870 |
780 |
|
798 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
375 |
03/1928 |
1870 |
780 |
|
799 |
0-4-4T |
M. Kirtley |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
376 |
11/1931 |
1874 |
|
|
1102 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1901 |
07/1928 |
1874 |
|
|
1103 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1902 |
12/1928 |
1874 |
|
|
1104 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1903 |
12/1926 |
1874 |
|
|
1105 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1904 |
12/1928 |
1874 |
|
|
1106 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1905 |
07/1928 |
1874 |
|
|
1107 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1906 |
05/1928 |
1874 |
|
|
1108 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1907 |
08/1927 |
1874 |
|
|
1109 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1908 |
05/1928 |
1874 |
|
|
1110 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1909 |
04/1920 |
06/1874 |
|
|
1070 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2393 |
11/1933 |
06/1874 |
|
|
1071 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2394 |
11/1931 |
06/1874 |
|
|
1072 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2395 |
06/1929 |
06/1874 |
|
|
1074 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2397 |
12/1928 |
07/1874 |
|
|
1073 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2396 |
04/1924 |
07/1874 |
|
|
1075 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2398 |
11/1933 |
09/1874 |
|
|
1076 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2399 |
10/1926 |
09/1874 |
|
|
1077 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2400 |
11/1928 |
09/1874 |
|
|
1078 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2401 |
11/1924 |
10/1874 |
|
|
1079 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2402 |
08/1929 |
10/1874 |
|
|
1080 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2403 |
11/1933 |
10/1874 |
|
|
1081 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2404 |
02/1928 |
12/1874 |
|
|
1082 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2405 |
08/1924 |
12/1874 |
|
|
1083 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2406 |
08/1924 |
12/1874 |
|
|
1084 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2407 |
10/1921 |
12/1874 |
|
|
1085 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2408 |
12/1931 |
1875 |
|
|
1112 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1997 |
07/1928 |
1875 |
|
|
1113 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1998 |
11/1930 |
1875 |
|
|
1114 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1999 |
10/1926 |
1875 |
|
|
1115 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2000 |
02/1926 |
1875 |
|
|
1116 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2001 |
04/1927 |
1875 |
|
|
1117 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2002 |
10/1926 |
1875 |
|
|
1118 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2003 |
10/1923 |
1875 |
|
|
1119 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2004 |
08/1927 |
1875 |
|
|
1120 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2005 |
12/1928 |
1875 |
|
|
1121 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2006 |
10/1927 |
1875 |
|
|
1122 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2007 |
10/1927 |
1875 |
|
|
1123 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2008 |
02/1926 |
1875 |
|
|
1124 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2009 |
12/1928 |
1875 |
|
|
1125 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2010 |
12/1926 |
1875 |
|
|
1126 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2011 |
12/1932 |
1875 |
|
|
1127 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
756 |
08/1925 |
1875 |
|
|
1128 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
757 |
01/1929 |
1875 |
|
|
1129 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
758 |
12/1931 |
1875 |
|
|
1130 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
759 |
08/1929 |
1875 |
|
|
1131 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
760 |
11/1929 |
1875 |
|
|
1132 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
761 |
12/1931 |
1875 |
|
|
1133 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
762 |
03/1925 |
1875 |
|
|
1134 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
763 |
12/1929 |
1875 |
|
|
1135 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
764 |
03/1931 |
01/1875 |
|
|
1086 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2409 |
07/1925 |
01/1875 |
|
|
1087 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2410 |
12/1931 |
01/1875 |
|
|
1088 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2411 |
08/1928 |
01/1875 |
|
|
1089 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2412 |
11/1928 |
01/1875 |
|
|
1111 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1910 |
01/1928 |
02/1875 |
|
|
1142 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2002 |
14/07/1957 |
03/1875 |
|
|
1143 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2003 |
24/03/1961 |
03/1875 |
|
|
1144 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2004 |
28/01/1960 |
03/1875 |
|
|
1145 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2005 |
21/04/1929 |
03/1875 |
|
|
1146 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2006 |
24/03/1956 |
03/1875 |
|
|
1147 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2007 |
19/05/1930 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1148 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2008 |
03/11/1927 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1149 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2009 |
28/01/1960 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1150 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2010 |
31/12/1933 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1151 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2011 |
30/11/1933 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1162 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
805 |
31/12/1946 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1163 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
806 |
25/02/1955 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1164 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
807 |
19/05/1959 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1165 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
808 |
25/02/1961 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1166 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
809 |
19/05/1959 |
04/1875 |
|
|
1167 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
810 |
31/12/1955 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1168 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
811 |
30/11/1928 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1169 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
812 |
30/11/1933 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1170 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
813 |
08/09/1927 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1171 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
814 |
06/10/1934 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1172 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
815 |
25/02/1950 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1173 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
816 |
06/10/1946 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1174 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
817 |
11/08/1927 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1175 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
818 |
31/12/1946 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1176 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
819 |
06/10/1961 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1177 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
820 |
06/10/1957 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1152 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2012 |
14/07/1928 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1153 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2013 |
19/05/1959 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1154 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2014 |
17/11/1962 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1155 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2015 |
19/05/1957 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1178 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
821 |
06/10/1961 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1179 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
822 |
22/12/1962 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1180 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
823 |
24/03/1930 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1181 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
824 |
19/05/1931 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1182 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
825 |
30/11/1956 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1183 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
826 |
14/07/1957 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1184 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
827 |
08/09/1925 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1185 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
828 |
08/09/1948 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1186 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
829 |
28/01/1957 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1187 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
830 |
30/11/1963 |
06/1875 |
6 |
|
137 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
19/04/1930 |
06/1875 |
6 |
|
140 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
01/12/1928 |
06/1875 |
6 |
|
141 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
06/11/1927 |
06/1875 |
6 |
|
142 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
31/01/1926 |
06/1875 |
6 |
|
143 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
17/05/1925 |
06/1875 |
6 |
|
15 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
01/12/1928 |
06/1875 |
6 |
|
18 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
31/12/1938 |
06/1875 |
6 |
|
6 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
29/11/1930 |
07/1875 |
|
|
1156 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2016 |
25/02/1931 |
07/1875 |
|
|
1188 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
831 |
19/05/1928 |
07/1875 |
|
|
1189 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
832 |
14/07/1934 |
07/1875 |
|
|
1190 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
833 |
19/05/1960 |
07/1875 |
|
|
1191 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
M7943/b |
834 |
08/09/1953 |
08/1875 |
|
|
1157 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2017 |
08/09/1961 |
08/1875 |
|
|
1158 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2018 |
31/12/1946 |
08/1875 |
|
|
1159 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2019 |
25/02/1930 |
09/1875 |
|
|
1160 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2020 |
07/07/1962 |
09/1875 |
|
|
1161 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M7943/a |
2021 |
11/08/1935 |
11/1875 |
1262 |
|
1262 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2038 |
01/12/1934 |
11/1875 |
1262 |
|
1263 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2039 |
29/11/1930 |
11/1875 |
1262 |
|
1264 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2040 |
02/11/1935 |
11/1875 |
1262 |
|
1265 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2041 |
21/05/1949 |
11/1875 |
1262 |
|
1266 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2042 |
24/03/1945 |
11/1875 |
1262 |
|
1267 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2043 |
03/12/1932 |
12/1875 |
|
|
1136 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
765 |
12/1928 |
12/1875 |
1262 |
|
1268 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2044 |
29/11/1930 |
12/1875 |
1262 |
|
1269 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2045 |
06/11/1927 |
12/1875 |
1262 |
|
1270 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2046 |
01/1929 |
12/1875 |
1262 |
|
1271 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2047 |
09/1920 |
12/1875 |
1262 |
|
1272 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2048 |
18/06/1949 |
12/1875 |
6 |
|
144 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
06/09/1930 |
12/1875 |
6 |
|
147 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
0.1 |
|
23/02/1935 |
12/1875 |
|
|
381 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2049 |
07/07/1962 |
1876 |
|
|
10 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1928 |
1876 |
|
|
1137 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
766 |
07/1928 |
1876 |
|
|
1138 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
767 |
10/1925 |
1876 |
|
|
1139 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
768 |
08/1930 |
1876 |
|
|
1140 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
769 |
10/1929 |
1876 |
|
|
1141 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
770 |
09/1928 |
1876 |
|
|
1282 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
910 |
12/1939 |
1876 |
|
|
1283 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
911 |
12/1930 |
1876 |
|
|
1284 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
912 |
08/1926 |
1876 |
|
|
1285 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
913 |
10/1922 |
1876 |
|
|
1286 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
914 |
08/1926 |
1876 |
|
|
1287 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
915 |
08/1934 |
1876 |
|
|
1288 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
916 |
09/1931 |
1876 |
|
|
1289 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
917 |
12/1930 |
1876 |
|
|
1290 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
918 |
08/1927 |
1876 |
|
|
1291 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
919 |
06/1928 |
1876 |
|
|
1292 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
920 |
01/1931 |
1876 |
|
|
1293 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
921 |
01/1931 |
1876 |
|
|
1294 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
922 |
11/1929 |
1876 |
|
|
1295 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
923 |
09/1928 |
1876 |
|
|
1296 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
924 |
05/1929 |
1876 |
|
|
1297 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
925 |
12/1932 |
1876 |
|
|
1298 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
926 |
06/1928 |
1876 |
|
|
1299 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
927 |
07/1928 |
1876 |
|
|
13 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/1923 |
1876 |
|
|
1300 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
928 |
12/1930 |
1876 |
|
|
1301 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
929 |
04/1924 |
1876 |
|
|
1302 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
930 |
01/1931 |
1876 |
|
|
1303 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
931 |
12/1931 |
1876 |
|
|
1304 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
932 |
02/1936 |
1876 |
|
|
1305 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
933 |
12/1928 |
1876 |
|
|
1306 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
934 |
12/1933 |
1876 |
|
|
1307 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
935 |
12/1932 |
1876 |
|
|
1308 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
936 |
11/1939 |
1876 |
|
|
1309 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
937 |
11/1927 |
1876 |
|
|
1311 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
939 |
10/1931 |
1876 |
|
|
146 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/1934 |
1876 |
|
|
50 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1930 |
1876 |
|
|
51 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/1936 |
1876 |
|
|
52 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1926 |
1876 |
|
|
53 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1930 |
1876 |
|
|
54 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1928 |
1876 |
|
|
55 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1927 |
1876 |
|
|
57 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/1939 |
1876 |
|
|
58 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1933 |
1876 |
|
|
58 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/1934 |
1876 |
|
|
59 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/1924 |
1876 |
|
|
70 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1919 |
1876 |
|
|
71 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1925 |
1876 |
|
|
73 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1937 |
1876 |
|
|
74 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/1928 |
01/1876 |
1262 |
|
1273 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2049 |
31/12/1949 |
01/1876 |
1262 |
|
1274 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2050 |
14/06/1925 |
01/1876 |
1262 |
|
1275 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2063 |
09/09/1950 |
01/1876 |
|
|
382 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2050 |
30/11/1955 |
01/1876 |
|
|
383 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2051 |
14/07/1940 |
01/1876 |
|
|
384 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2052 |
30/11/1933 |
01/1876 |
|
|
385 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2053 |
16/06/1956 |
02/1876 |
|
|
1 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/1924 |
02/1876 |
|
|
1192 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1541 |
19/05/1928 |
02/1876 |
|
|
1193 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1542 |
03/11/1935 |
02/1876 |
|
|
1194 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1543 |
24/03/1932 |
02/1876 |
1262 |
|
1276 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2064 |
26/03/1932 |
02/1876 |
|
|
400 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2054 |
30/11/1933 |
02/1876 |
|
|
401 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2055 |
30/11/1955 |
02/1876 |
|
|
402 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2056 |
06/10/1946 |
02/1876 |
|
|
403 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2057 |
14/07/1946 |
02/1876 |
|
|
404 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
M8275/a |
2058 |
13/10/1962 |
02/1876 |
|
|
9 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1912 |
03/1876 |
|
|
1195 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1544 |
28/01/1960 |
03/1876 |
|
|
1196 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1545 |
30/11/1933 |
03/1876 |
|
|
1197 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1546 |
31/12/1952 |
03/1876 |
|
|
1198 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1547 |
08/09/1930 |
03/1876 |
|
|
1199 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1548 |
31/12/1963 |
03/1876 |
|
|
1200 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1549 |
08/09/1952 |
03/1876 |
|
|
1201 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1550 |
08/09/1948 |
03/1876 |
|
|
1202 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1551 |
21/04/1951 |
03/1876 |
1262 |
|
1277 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2065 |
07/10/1950 |
03/1876 |
1262 |
|
1278 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2066 |
28/01/1950 |
03/1876 |
1262 |
|
1279 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2067 |
07/09/1946 |
03/1876 |
1262 |
|
1280 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2051 |
31/01/1926 |
03/1876 |
1262 |
|
1281 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2052 |
15/07/1950 |
04/1876 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/10/1948 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1203 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1552 |
30/11/1955 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1204 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1553 |
03/11/1934 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1205 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1554 |
30/11/1933 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1206 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1555 |
11/08/1960 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1207 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1556 |
16/06/1956 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1208 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1557 |
24/03/1950 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1209 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1558 |
24/03/1957 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1210 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1559 |
03/11/1958 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1211 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8238/a |
1560 |
16/06/1946 |
04/1876 |
1262 |
|
1252 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2053 |
01/12/1928 |
04/1876 |
1262 |
|
1253 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2054 |
26/12/1931 |
04/1876 |
1262 |
|
1254 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2055 |
27/02/1937 |
04/1876 |
1262 |
|
1255 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2056 |
08/09/1934 |
04/1876 |
1262 |
|
1256 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2057 |
15/05/1948 |
04/1876 |
|
|
1310 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
14/08/1948 |
04/1876 |
|
|
96 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
28/10/1950 |
05/1876 |
|
|
1222 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2082 |
21/04/1955 |
05/1876 |
|
|
1223 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2083 |
30/11/1933 |
05/1876 |
|
|
1224 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2084 |
08/09/1960 |
05/1876 |
1262 |
|
1257 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2058 |
19/06/1954 |
05/1876 |
1262 |
|
1258 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2059 |
29/11/1930 |
05/1876 |
1262 |
|
1259 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2060 |
18/04/1936 |
05/1876 |
1262 |
|
1260 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2061 |
04/12/1927 |
05/1876 |
1262 |
|
1261 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2062 |
18/05/1929 |
06/1876 |
|
|
1225 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2085 |
24/03/1962 |
06/1876 |
|
|
1226 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2086 |
11/08/1959 |
06/1876 |
|
|
1227 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2087 |
14/07/1960 |
06/1876 |
|
|
1228 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2088 |
25/02/1961 |
06/1876 |
|
|
1229 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2089 |
06/10/1960 |
06/1876 |
|
|
1230 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2090 |
08/09/1959 |
06/1876 |
|
|
1231 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2091 |
19/05/1954 |
07/1876 |
|
|
1232 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2092 |
16/06/1960 |
07/1876 |
|
|
1233 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2093 |
09/12/1961 |
07/1876 |
|
|
1234 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2094 |
16/12/1961 |
07/1876 |
|
|
1235 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2095 |
14/07/1956 |
10/1876 |
|
|
1236 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2096 |
14/07/1935 |
10/1876 |
|
|
1237 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2097 |
29/09/1962 |
10/1876 |
|
|
1238 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2098 |
19/05/1959 |
10/1876 |
|
|
1239 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2099 |
21/04/1956 |
10/1876 |
|
|
1240 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2100 |
03/11/1953 |
11/1876 |
|
|
1241 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8238/b |
2101 |
14/07/1961 |
11/1876 |
|
|
1242 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2102 |
28/01/1964 |
11/1876 |
|
|
1243 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2103 |
28/01/1960 |
11/1876 |
|
|
1312 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2087 |
11/1924 |
11/1876 |
|
|
1313 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2088 |
08/1920 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1212 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1561 |
16/06/1926 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1213 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1562 |
06/10/1935 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1214 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1563 |
19/05/1960 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1215 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1564 |
24/03/1956 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1216 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1565 |
08/09/1962 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1217 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1566 |
11/08/1936 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1218 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1567 |
08/09/1934 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1219 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1568 |
25/02/1953 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1220 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1569 |
06/10/1955 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1221 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
M8275/b |
1570 |
03/11/1961 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1244 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2104 |
30/11/1956 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1245 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2105 |
07/07/1962 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1246 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2106 |
25/02/1961 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1247 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2107 |
31/12/1927 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1248 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2108 |
24/03/1948 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1249 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2109 |
08/09/1929 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1250 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2110 |
14/07/1957 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1251 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
M8275/c |
2111 |
16/06/1926 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1314 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2089 |
01/1920 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1315 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2090 |
01/1924 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1316 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2091 |
03/1925 |
12/1876 |
|
|
1317 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2092 |
09/1926 |
1877 |
|
|
1327 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1003 |
03/1928 |
1877 |
|
|
1328 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1004 |
10/1934 |
1877 |
|
|
1329 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1005 |
09/1920 |
1877 |
|
|
1330 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1006 |
08/1920 |
1877 |
|
|
1331 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1007 |
12/1928 |
1877 |
|
|
1332 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1008 |
1904 |
1877 |
|
|
1333 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1009 |
11/1912 |
1877 |
|
|
1334 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1010 |
11/1912 |
1877 |
|
|
1335 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1011 |
12/1924 |
1877 |
|
|
1336 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1012 |
1904 |
1877 |
|
|
1337 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1013 |
11/1924 |
1877 |
|
|
1338 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1014 |
09/1928 |
1877 |
|
|
1339 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1015 |
03/1921 |
1877 |
|
|
1340 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1016 |
08/1920 |
1877 |
|
|
1341 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1017 |
12/1928 |
1877 |
|
|
1342 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1018 |
11/1912 |
1877 |
|
|
1343 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1019 |
08/1928 |
1877 |
|
|
1344 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1020 |
08/1928 |
1877 |
|
|
1345 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1021 |
06/1925 |
1877 |
|
|
1346 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1022 |
08/1919 |
1877 |
|
|
1347 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/1924 |
1877 |
|
|
1348 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1930 |
1877 |
|
|
1349 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1919 |
1877 |
|
|
1350 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1928 |
1877 |
|
|
1351 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1928 |
1877 |
|
|
1352 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/1926 |
1877 |
|
|
1353 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1934 |
1877 |
|
|
1354 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
1941 |
1877 |
|
|
1355 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1926 |
1877 |
|
|
1356 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/1928 |
01/1877 |
|
|
1318 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2093 |
11/1930 |
01/1877 |
|
|
1319 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2094 |
05/1911 |
02/1877 |
|
|
1320 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2095 |
12/1925 |
02/1877 |
|
|
1321 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
2096 |
11/1912 |
01/01/1878 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
25/04/1957 |
01/01/1878 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
09/1957 |
01/01/1878 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
28/11/1959 |
01/01/1878 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
10/1959 |
01/01/1878 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
14/04/1956 |
01/01/1878 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
02/1956 |
01/01/1878 |
|
|
3037 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
12/1958 |
05/1878 |
|
|
1377 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
16/05/1953 |
06/1878 |
|
|
1378 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
07/1959 |
06/1878 |
|
|
1379 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
12/1933 |
06/1878 |
|
|
1380 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
09/1932 |
07/1878 |
|
|
1381 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
21/11/1953 |
07/1878 |
|
|
1382 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
12/1937 |
07/1878 |
|
|
1383 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
06/1953 |
07/1878 |
|
|
1384 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
09/1932 |
07/1878 |
|
|
1385 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
02/1948 |
08/1878 |
|
|
1386 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
204 |
|
08/1935 |
10/1878 |
|
|
1387 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
07/1938 |
10/1878 |
|
|
1388 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
14/02/1948 |
11/1878 |
|
|
1389 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
31/12/1955 |
11/1878 |
|
|
1390 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
12/1930 |
11/1878 |
|
|
1391 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
29/05/1948 |
12/1878 |
|
|
1392 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
12/1932 |
12/1878 |
|
|
1393 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
03/1949 |
12/1878 |
|
|
1394 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
07/1931 |
12/1878 |
|
|
1395 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
05/1933 |
1879 |
|
|
1400 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/1937 |
1879 |
|
|
1401 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1933 |
1879 |
|
|
1402 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1932 |
1879 |
|
|
1403 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/1926 |
1879 |
|
|
1404 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1934 |
1879 |
|
|
1405 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/1929 |
1879 |
|
|
1406 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1934 |
1879 |
|
|
1407 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1934 |
1879 |
|
|
1408 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1934 |
01/1879 |
|
|
1347 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
02/1932 |
01/1879 |
|
|
1396 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
10/1934 |
02/1879 |
|
|
1348 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
05/1946 |
02/1879 |
|
|
1349 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
29/01/1955 |
02/1879 |
|
|
1350 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
11/1932 |
02/1879 |
|
|
1351 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
07/1928 |
02/1879 |
|
|
1352 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
06/1932 |
02/1879 |
|
|
1353 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
09/1956 |
03/1879 |
|
|
1354 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
12/1932 |
03/1879 |
|
|
1355 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
12/1932 |
03/1879 |
|
|
1356 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
218 |
|
12/1933 |
10/1879 |
|
|
1420 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
05/1951 |
11/1879 |
|
|
1409 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1949 |
11/1879 |
|
|
1421 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
05/1935 |
11/1879 |
|
|
1422 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
10/1934 |
11/1879 |
|
|
1423 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
12/1933 |
11/1879 |
|
|
1424 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
11/1935 |
12/1879 |
|
|
1425 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
11/04/1953 |
12/1879 |
|
|
1426 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
02/1936 |
12/1879 |
|
|
1427 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
12/1932 |
12/1879 |
|
|
220 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
08/1932 |
12/1879 |
|
|
221 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
239 |
|
23/02/1957 |
1880 |
|
|
111 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1930 |
1880 |
|
|
112 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/1928 |
1880 |
|
|
113 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
1943 |
1880 |
|
|
114 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1932 |
1880 |
|
|
115 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/1936 |
1880 |
|
|
1472 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/1931 |
1880 |
|
|
1473 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/1926 |
1880 |
|
|
1474 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1932 |
1880 |
|
|
1475 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1939 |
1880 |
|
|
1476 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/1931 |
1880 |
|
|
1477 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/1934 |
1880 |
|
|
1478 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1934 |
1880 |
|
|
1479 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1932 |
1880 |
|
|
1480 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1930 |
1880 |
|
|
1481 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/1929 |
1880 |
|
|
1482 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1925 |
1880 |
|
|
1483 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1928 |
1880 |
|
|
1484 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1929 |
1880 |
|
|
1485 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1930 |
1880 |
|
|
1486 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1928 |
1880 |
|
|
1487 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1931 |
1880 |
|
|
1488 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1938 |
1880 |
|
|
1489 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/1928 |
1880 |
|
|
1490 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1933 |
1880 |
|
|
1491 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1929 |
01/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
04/08/1951 |
01/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
04/1950 |
01/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
25/01/1958 |
01/01/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
06/10/1951 |
03/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/09/1954 |
03/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/07/1958 |
03/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/11/1960 |
03/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/09/1959 |
03/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
26/12/1959 |
03/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
17/06/1954 |
03/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
16/05/1959 |
03/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
19/06/1948 |
04/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
08/1957 |
04/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
30/09/1955 |
05/1880 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
08/1949 |
05/1880 |
|
|
1410 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
01/1947 |
05/1880 |
|
|
1411 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
12/1930 |
06/1880 |
|
|
1412 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
30/06/1962 |
06/1880 |
|
|
1413 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
12/1932 |
06/1880 |
|
|
1414 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
12/1933 |
06/1880 |
|
|
1415 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
11/1933 |
06/1880 |
|
|
1416 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
06/04/1957 |
06/1880 |
|
|
1417 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
08/1930 |
06/1880 |
|
|
1418 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
25/12/1966 |
06/1880 |
|
|
1419 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
262 |
|
07/1932 |
1881 |
|
|
1492 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/1931 |
1881 |
|
|
1493 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1930 |
1881 |
|
|
1494 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1931 |
1881 |
|
|
1495 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1930 |
1881 |
|
|
1496 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1933 |
1881 |
|
|
1497 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1924 |
1881 |
|
|
1498 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1930 |
1881 |
|
|
1499 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1931 |
1881 |
|
|
1500 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1928 |
1881 |
|
|
1501 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/1926 |
1881 |
|
|
1502 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2650 |
08/1937 |
1881 |
|
|
1503 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2651 |
12/1928 |
1881 |
|
|
1504 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2652 |
12/1928 |
1881 |
|
|
1505 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2653 |
12/1936 |
1881 |
|
|
1506 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2654 |
10/1934 |
1881 |
|
|
1507 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2655 |
07/1928 |
1881 |
|
|
1508 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2656 |
11/1929 |
1881 |
|
|
1509 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2657 |
08/1926 |
1881 |
|
|
1510 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2658 |
12/1933 |
1881 |
|
|
1511 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2659 |
1940 |
1881 |
|
|
1512 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2660 |
07/1928 |
1881 |
|
|
1513 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2661 |
02/1937 |
1881 |
|
|
1514 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2662 |
11/1939 |
1881 |
|
|
1515 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2663 |
11/1924 |
1881 |
|
|
1516 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2664 |
12/1932 |
1881 |
|
|
1517 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2665 |
12/1932 |
1881 |
|
|
1518 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2666 |
12/1931 |
1881 |
|
|
1519 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2667 |
08/1929 |
1881 |
|
|
1520 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2668 |
12/1931 |
1881 |
|
|
1520 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2678 |
11/1929 |
1881 |
|
|
1521 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2669 |
10/1934 |
1881 |
|
|
1522 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2670 |
10/1931 |
1881 |
|
|
1523 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2671 |
12/1930 |
1881 |
|
|
1524 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2672 |
05/1932 |
1881 |
|
|
1525 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2673 |
12/1932 |
1881 |
|
|
1526 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2674 |
1940 |
1881 |
|
|
1527 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2675 |
12/1938 |
1881 |
|
|
1528 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2676 |
12/1932 |
1881 |
|
|
1529 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2677 |
10/1935 |
1881 |
|
|
1531 |
2-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2679 |
09/1928 |
04/1881 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
19/03/1955 |
05/1881 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/04/1950 |
05/1881 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/12/1951 |
06/1881 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
09/1960 |
07/1881 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
12/06/1948 |
07/1881 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
05/1953 |
08/1881 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
|
24/03/1956 |
08/1881 |
1532 |
|
1532 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/05/1935 |
08/1881 |
1532 |
|
1533 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/11/1944 |
08/1881 |
1532 |
|
1534 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
17/05/1925 |
09/1881 |
1532 |
|
1535 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/05/1935 |
09/1881 |
1532 |
|
1536 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/07/1925 |
10/1881 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/02/1951 |
10/1881 |
1532 |
|
1537 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/11/1927 |
10/1881 |
1532 |
|
1538 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/10/1948 |
10/1881 |
1532 |
|
1539 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
19/03/1955 |
11/1881 |
1532 |
|
1540 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1938 |
11/1881 |
1532 |
|
1541 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/04/1950 |
12/1881 |
1532 |
|
1542 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
26/03/1938 |
12/1881 |
1532 |
|
1543 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/05/1946 |
12/1881 |
1532 |
|
1544 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/12/1951 |
12/1881 |
1532 |
|
1545 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
27/02/1937 |
12/1881 |
1532 |
|
1546 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
20/04/1924 |
1882 |
|
|
1563 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
05/1930 |
1882 |
|
|
1564 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
11/1932 |
1882 |
|
|
1565 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
04/1928 |
1882 |
|
|
1567 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
12/1926 |
1882 |
|
|
1568 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
04/1930 |
1882 |
|
|
1569 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
06/1927 |
1882 |
|
|
1570 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
08/1932 |
02/1882 |
1532 |
|
1547 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/1919 |
02/1882 |
1532 |
|
1548 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/1920 |
03/1882 |
1532 |
|
1549 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
20/06/1926 |
04/1882 |
1532 |
|
1550 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
24/04/1927 |
04/1882 |
1532 |
|
1551 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
28/11/1931 |
04/1882 |
|
|
1552 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
07/1957 |
05/1882 |
|
|
1553 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
09/10/1954 |
05/1882 |
|
|
1554 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
10/1964 |
05/1882 |
|
|
1555 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
13/08/1955 |
05/1882 |
|
|
1556 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
15/05/1948 |
05/1882 |
|
|
1557 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
12/1932 |
06/1882 |
|
|
1558 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
12/1932 |
06/1882 |
|
|
1559 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
11/1935 |
06/1882 |
|
|
1560 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
21/08/1948 |
06/1882 |
|
|
1561 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
340 |
|
06/1932 |
09/1882 |
|
|
1562 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
02/1928 |
10/1882 |
|
|
1566 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
22/09/1959 |
11/1882 |
|
|
1571 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
370 |
|
12/04/1958 |
12/1882 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
17/04/1948 |
12/1882 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
08/08/1959 |
1883 |
|
|
1322 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
341 |
|
01/1926 |
1883 |
|
|
1323 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
341 |
|
25/12/1966 |
1883 |
|
|
1324 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
341 |
|
09/1924 |
1883 |
|
|
1325 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
341 |
|
07/1928 |
1883 |
|
|
1326 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
341 |
|
11/1927 |
1883 |
|
|
1572 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
02/1937 |
1883 |
|
|
1573 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
05/1928 |
1883 |
|
|
1574 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
08/1930 |
1883 |
|
|
1575 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
12/1926 |
1883 |
|
|
1576 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
12/1933 |
1883 |
|
|
1577 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
01/1926 |
1883 |
|
|
1578 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
12/1926 |
1883 |
|
|
1579 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
08/1925 |
1883 |
|
|
1580 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
03/1928 |
1883 |
|
|
1581 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
400 |
|
12/1932 |
1883 |
|
|
1657 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
04/1927 |
1883 |
|
|
1658 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
10/1927 |
1883 |
|
|
1659 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
04/1932 |
1883 |
|
|
1661 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
07/1926 |
1883 |
|
|
1663 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
10/1926 |
1883 |
|
|
1664 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
09/1926 |
1883 |
|
|
1666 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
11/1926 |
01/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
10/02/1962 |
01/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
18/03/1961 |
02/1883 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
20/10/1951 |
02/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
16/05/1957 |
04/1883 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
15/12/1951 |
04/1883 |
|
|
210 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
24/11/1956 |
05/1883 |
|
|
211 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
12/1932 |
05/1883 |
|
|
212 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
12/1930 |
05/1883 |
|
|
215 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
12/1930 |
06/1883 |
|
|
1397 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
01/03/1952 |
06/1883 |
|
|
1398 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
12/1932 |
06/1883 |
|
|
1399 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
07/1931 |
06/1883 |
1532 |
|
1632 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/08/1946 |
06/1883 |
1532 |
|
1633 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
24/02/1951 |
06/1883 |
|
|
216 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
14/06/1958 |
06/1883 |
|
|
218 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
08/1955 |
06/1883 |
|
|
219 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
414 |
|
04/07/1959 |
07/1883 |
1532 |
|
1634 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
28/11/1931 |
07/1883 |
1532 |
|
1636 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
17/04/1948 |
08/1883 |
1532 |
|
1635 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/10/1931 |
10/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
15/10/1960 |
10/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
18/03/1961 |
10/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
30/04/1949 |
10/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
11/12/1958 |
10/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
19/01/1952 |
10/1883 |
|
|
1660 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
12/1953 |
10/1883 |
|
|
1662 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
07/1953 |
11/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
05/1949 |
11/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
03/11/1956 |
11/1883 |
|
|
1665 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
430 |
|
24/08/1957 |
12/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
10/10/1959 |
12/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
07/07/1962 |
12/1883 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
20/02/1960 |
12/1883 |
1532 |
|
1637 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
29/11/1930 |
12/1883 |
1532 |
|
1638 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/10/1931 |
12/1883 |
1532 |
|
1639 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/11/1935 |
1884 |
|
|
1667 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
08/1949 |
1884 |
|
|
1668 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
29/08/1953 |
1884 |
|
|
1669 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
10/08/1957 |
1884 |
|
|
1670 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
23/02/1957 |
1884 |
|
|
1671 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
28/01/1961 |
1884 |
|
|
1672 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
16/12/1950 |
1884 |
|
|
1673 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
19/08/1960 |
02/1884 |
1532 |
|
1640 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
20/04/1946 |
02/1884 |
1532 |
|
1641 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/11/1951 |
02/1884 |
1532 |
|
1642 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
29/01/1938 |
02/1884 |
1532 |
|
1643 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/10/1946 |
03/1884 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/1949 |
03/1884 |
1532 |
|
1644 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
29/12/1951 |
03/1884 |
1532 |
|
1645 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/10/1930 |
03/1884 |
1532 |
|
1646 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1938 |
03/1884 |
1532 |
|
1647 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
13/06/1936 |
03/1884 |
1532 |
|
1648 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/10/1946 |
04/1884 |
1532 |
|
1649 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/08/1952 |
04/1884 |
1532 |
|
1650 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
22/03/1930 |
04/1884 |
1532 |
|
1651 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/09/1931 |
05/1884 |
1532 |
|
1652 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/05/1935 |
05/1884 |
1532 |
|
1653 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
21/02/1948 |
06/1884 |
1532 |
|
1654 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
25/01/1930 |
06/1884 |
1532 |
|
1655 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/12/1934 |
06/1884 |
1532 |
|
1656 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
28/12/1924 |
08/1884 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1952 |
09/1884 |
|
|
1677 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
12/1936 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1678 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
12/1932 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1679 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
11/1932 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1680 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
05/1933 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1681 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
25/12/1966 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1682 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
12/1932 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1683 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
08/1932 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1684 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
12/1930 |
11/1884 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
22/05/1948 |
11/1884 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
|
24/03/1962 |
11/1884 |
|
|
1090 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
12/1938 |
11/1884 |
|
|
1091 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
12/1932 |
11/1884 |
|
|
1092 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
03/1946 |
11/1884 |
|
|
1094 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
12/1939 |
11/1884 |
|
|
1685 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
02/1947 |
11/1884 |
|
|
1686 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
16/06/1963 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1095 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
496 |
|
12/1930 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1687 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
07/04/1951 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1688 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
06/1935 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1689 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
11/12/1954 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1690 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
28/09/1957 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1691 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
25/06/1955 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1692 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
12/1932 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1693 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
07/1946 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1694 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
18/01/1958 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1695 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
09/02/1957 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1696 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
31/12/1959 |
1885 |
|
|
1674 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
14/01/1950 |
1885 |
|
|
1675 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
04/10/1960 |
1885 |
|
|
1676 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
444 |
|
18/12/1948 |
1885 |
|
|
1740 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
12/1923 |
1885 |
|
|
1741 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
11/1929 |
1885 |
|
|
3137 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
24/10/1959 |
01/1885 |
|
|
1096 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
09/1946 |
01/1885 |
|
|
1097 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
05/1949 |
01/1885 |
|
|
1098 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
12/1932 |
01/1885 |
|
|
1099 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
12/1932 |
01/1885 |
|
|
1100 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
499 |
|
24/01/1948 |
01/01/1885 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1954 |
01/01/1885 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1954 |
01/01/1885 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1954 |
01/01/1885 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1955 |
01/01/1885 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1955 |
01/01/1885 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1955 |
01/01/1885 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/11/1955 |
01/01/1885 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/11/1955 |
01/01/1885 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/11/1955 |
01/01/1885 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/07/1951 |
01/01/1885 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/07/1951 |
01/01/1885 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/07/1951 |
01/01/1885 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
30/11/1957 |
01/01/1885 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
30/11/1957 |
01/01/1885 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
30/11/1957 |
02/1885 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
16/06/1956 |
02/1885 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
16/06/1956 |
02/1885 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
16/06/1956 |
05/1885 |
1532 |
|
1718 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
30/11/1924 |
05/1885 |
1532 |
|
1719 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
13/07/1935 |
06/1885 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/1950 |
06/1885 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/1953 |
06/1885 |
1532 |
|
1720 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/12/1934 |
06/1885 |
1532 |
|
1721 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
14/06/1925 |
06/1885 |
1532 |
|
1722 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/11/1949 |
06/1885 |
1532 |
|
1723 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/08/1925 |
06/1885 |
1532 |
|
1724 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/08/1933 |
06/1885 |
1532 |
|
1725 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
22/02/1930 |
06/1885 |
1532 |
|
1726 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/1924 |
06/1885 |
1532 |
|
1727 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
26/12/1931 |
11/1885 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/1952 |
11/1885 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/1952 |
11/1885 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/1952 |
11/1885 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/1954 |
11/1885 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/1954 |
11/1885 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/1954 |
11/1885 |
|
|
1738 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
07/1929 |
11/1885 |
|
|
1739 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
02/1954 |
12/1885 |
|
|
1742 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
15/12/1956 |
1886 |
|
|
1743 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
09/1928 |
1886 |
|
|
1745 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
12/1936 |
1886 |
|
|
1746 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
08/1931 |
1886 |
|
|
1747 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
06/1926 |
1886 |
|
|
1748 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
12/1939 |
1886 |
|
|
1749 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
1940 |
1886 |
|
|
1751 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
06/1927 |
1886 |
|
|
1752 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
06/1940 |
1886 |
|
|
1753 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
11/1925 |
1886 |
|
|
1754 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
05/1935 |
1886 |
|
|
1755 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
07/1926 |
1886 |
|
|
1756 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
10/1935 |
01/1886 |
|
|
1744 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
554 |
|
16/06/1956 |
01/01/1886 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1950 |
01/01/1886 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1950 |
01/01/1886 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1950 |
01/01/1886 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/05/1953 |
01/01/1886 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/05/1953 |
01/01/1886 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/05/1953 |
01/01/1886 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
30/06/1955 |
01/01/1886 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
30/06/1955 |
01/01/1886 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
30/06/1955 |
01/01/1886 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/12/1954 |
01/01/1886 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/12/1954 |
01/01/1886 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/12/1954 |
03/1886 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
14/04/1951 |
03/1886 |
1532 |
|
1728 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/12/1934 |
03/1886 |
1532 |
|
1729 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
25/03/1950 |
03/1886 |
1532 |
|
1730 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/07/1925 |
03/1886 |
1532 |
|
1731 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
21/02/1953 |
04/1886 |
1532 |
|
1732 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/09/1937 |
04/1886 |
1532 |
|
1733 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
29/11/1930 |
05/1886 |
1532 |
|
1734 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
20/04/1940 |
05/1886 |
1532 |
|
1735 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
28/11/1931 |
05/1886 |
1532 |
|
1736 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
13/07/1935 |
05/1886 |
1532 |
|
1737 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/11/1956 |
06/1886 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
27/10/1956 |
06/1886 |
|
|
1750 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
06/01/1951 |
12/1886 |
|
|
1757 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
815 |
|
09/1955 |
1887 |
|
|
26 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
07/1919 |
1887 |
|
|
27 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
01/1922 |
1887 |
|
|
28 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
01/1922 |
1887 |
|
|
29 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
01/1922 |
1887 |
|
|
3178 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/03/1960 |
1887 |
|
|
3180 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
17/01/1959 |
1887 |
|
|
3181 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
13/04/1957 |
1887 |
|
|
3183 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
27/06/1959 |
1887 |
|
|
3185 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
19/08/1961 |
1887 |
|
|
3186 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/01/1959 |
1887 |
|
|
3187 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
20/08/1960 |
1887 |
|
|
3188 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
23/04/1960 |
1887 |
|
|
3189 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/12/1960 |
01/01/1887 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
|
?? |
|
07/03/1953 |
01/01/1887 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
|
?? |
|
14/08/1948 |
01/01/1887 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/1954 |
01/01/1887 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/1954 |
01/01/1887 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/1954 |
01/01/1887 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1950 |
01/01/1887 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1950 |
01/01/1887 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1950 |
01/01/1887 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
13/06/1959 |
01/01/1887 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
13/06/1959 |
01/01/1887 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
13/06/1959 |
01/01/1887 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/01/1958 |
01/01/1887 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/01/1958 |
01/01/1887 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/01/1958 |
01/01/1887 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1951 |
01/01/1887 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1951 |
01/01/1887 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/1951 |
01/01/1887 |
1357 |
|
3168 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1949 |
01/01/1887 |
H |
|
3168 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1949 |
01/01/1887 |
37 |
|
3168 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1949 |
06/1887 |
|
|
25 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
09/1928 |
10/1887 |
|
|
3174 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
20/02/1960 |
1888 |
|
|
1808 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
09/1947 |
1888 |
|
|
1809 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
12/1937 |
1888 |
|
|
1810 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
12/1932 |
1888 |
|
|
1811 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
03/1936 |
1888 |
|
|
1812 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
10/1935 |
1888 |
|
|
1814 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
10/1925 |
1888 |
|
|
1816 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
10/1931 |
1888 |
|
|
1817 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
12/1936 |
1888 |
|
|
1818 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
734 |
|
03/1930 |
1888 |
|
|
1819 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
734 |
|
02/1935 |
1888 |
|
|
1820 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
734 |
|
11/1932 |
1888 |
|
|
1822 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
734 |
|
12/1932 |
06/1888 |
|
|
1813 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
05/07/1952 |
06/1888 |
|
|
1815 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
678 |
|
08/1949 |
09/1888 |
|
|
1821 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
734 |
|
08/1949 |
09/1888 |
|
|
3191 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
22/05/1954 |
09/1888 |
|
|
3192 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
22/08/1959 |
10/1888 |
|
|
3193 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
22/03/1958 |
12/1888 |
|
|
30 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
10/1921 |
1889 |
|
|
1428 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
816 |
|
12/1924 |
1889 |
|
|
1855 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
02/1922 |
1889 |
|
|
1856 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
11/1921 |
1889 |
|
|
1857 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
02/1922 |
1889 |
|
|
1859 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
02/1922 |
1889 |
|
|
1860 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
11/1921 |
1889 |
|
|
1861 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
11/1921 |
1889 |
|
|
1863 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
809 |
|
02/1922 |
1889 |
|
|
1864 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
809 |
|
11/1921 |
1889 |
|
|
1865 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
809 |
|
11/1921 |
1889 |
|
|
202 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
816 |
|
01/1907 |
01/1889 |
|
|
31 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
01/1922 |
01/1889 |
|
|
32 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
01/1922 |
04/1889 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
14/02/1953 |
04/1889 |
1532 |
|
1823 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
28/11/1931 |
05/1889 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/11/1955 |
05/1889 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/06/1948 |
05/1889 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/1954 |
05/1889 |
1532 |
|
1824 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/09/1931 |
05/1889 |
1532 |
|
1825 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
26/12/1931 |
05/1889 |
1532 |
|
1826 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/11/1946 |
05/1889 |
1532 |
|
1827 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/07/1925 |
05/1889 |
1532 |
|
1828 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
28/11/1931 |
05/1889 |
1532 |
|
1829 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
21/04/1951 |
05/1889 |
1532 |
|
1830 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/10/1947 |
05/1889 |
1532 |
|
1831 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
26/12/1931 |
05/1889 |
1532 |
|
1832 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
21/02/1953 |
06/1889 |
|
|
1853 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
745 |
|
11/1921 |
06/1889 |
|
|
1854 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
01/1922 |
06/1889 |
|
|
34 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
745 |
|
09/1920 |
08/1889 |
|
|
37 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
09/1925 |
09/1889 |
|
|
1858 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
11/1922 |
11/1889 |
|
|
200 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
08/1932 |
11/1889 |
|
|
201 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
06/1933 |
12/1889 |
|
|
213 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
09/1948 |
12/1889 |
|
|
214 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
25/12/1966 |
1890 |
|
|
1429 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
816 |
|
01/1905 |
1890 |
|
|
1697 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
816 |
|
07/1928 |
1890 |
|
|
1866 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
809 |
|
11/1921 |
1890 |
|
|
1867 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
809 |
|
02/1922 |
1890 |
|
|
3200 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
29/04/1961 |
1890 |
|
|
3203 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
01/10/1960 |
1890 |
|
|
3205 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3207 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
05/1960 |
1890 |
|
|
3208 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
09/08/1958 |
1890 |
|
|
3210 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
08/08/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3212 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
09/07/1960 |
1890 |
|
|
3213 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
19/05/1962 |
1890 |
|
|
3214 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
17/06/1961 |
1890 |
|
|
3219 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
28/11/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3222 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
27/06/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3223 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
13/06/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3224 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
30/11/1957 |
1890 |
|
|
3225 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
29/04/1961 |
1890 |
|
|
3226 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
15/09/1956 |
1890 |
|
|
3231 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
11/10/1958 |
1890 |
|
|
3232 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
03/09/1956 |
1890 |
|
|
3233 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
11/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3234 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
04/02/1961 |
1890 |
|
|
3235 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
20/08/1960 |
1890 |
|
|
3237 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
30/05/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3239 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
28/12/1957 |
1890 |
|
|
3240 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
29/09/1962 |
1890 |
|
|
3241 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
20/06/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3242 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
04/08/1962 |
1890 |
|
|
3243 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
30/07/1960 |
1890 |
|
|
3244 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
10/01/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3245 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
01/04/1961 |
1890 |
|
|
3246 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
27/10/1956 |
1890 |
|
|
3247 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
21/11/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3249 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3250 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
13/05/1961 |
1890 |
|
|
3251 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3252 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
18/06/1955 |
1890 |
|
|
3253 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
02/05/1959 |
1890 |
|
|
3254 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
18/08/1962 |
1890 |
|
|
3256 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
27/02/1960 |
1890 |
|
|
3257 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
29/09/1962 |
01/1890 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
12/1949 |
01/1890 |
|
|
1862 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
655 |
|
11/1921 |
01/1890 |
|
|
217 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
12/1932 |
01/01/1890 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
12/1951 |
01/01/1890 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
29/12/1951 |
02/1890 |
|
|
222 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
12/1932 |
02/1890 |
|
|
223 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
10/1934 |
03/1890 |
|
|
1093 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
08/09/1951 |
03/1890 |
|
|
1101 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
31/12/1949 |
03/1890 |
|
|
1430 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
816 |
|
10/1949 |
03/1890 |
|
|
1431 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
824 |
|
28/02/1962 |
04/1890 |
|
|
1843 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
07/1953 |
04/1890 |
|
|
1844 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
07/1946 |
04/1890 |
|
|
1845 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
12/1933 |
04/1890 |
|
|
1846 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
07/1960 |
05/1890 |
|
|
14 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
07/1957 |
05/1890 |
|
|
1847 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
12/1930 |
05/1890 |
|
|
74 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
12/1952 |
05/1890 |
|
|
85 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
12/1933 |
05/1890 |
|
|
86 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
12/1932 |
06/1890 |
|
|
11 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
02/1947 |
06/1890 |
|
|
87 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
854 |
|
03/03/1956 |
07/1890 |
|
|
1848 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
07/1951 |
07/1890 |
|
|
1849 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
05/1933 |
07/1890 |
|
|
1850 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
12/1932 |
07/1890 |
|
|
1851 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
12/1930 |
07/1890 |
|
|
1852 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
08/1947 |
07/1890 |
|
|
1973 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
10/1932 |
07/1890 |
|
|
1974 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
12/1931 |
07/1890 |
|
|
1975 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
04/1949 |
07/1890 |
|
|
203 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
02/1953 |
08/1890 |
|
|
1976 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
869 |
|
12/1933 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1878 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
924 |
|
11/1927 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1977 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
924 |
|
12/1932 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1979 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
924 |
|
09/1932 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1980 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
924 |
|
13/10/1951 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1981 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
924 |
|
05/1952 |
10/1890 |
|
|
880 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
05/1959 |
10/1890 |
|
|
881 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
11/1937 |
10/1890 |
|
|
882 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
09/1959 |
11/1890 |
|
|
883 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
12/1932 |
11/1890 |
|
|
884 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
12/1938 |
11/1890 |
|
|
885 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
07/1931 |
11/1890 |
|
|
886 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
12/1930 |
11/1890 |
|
|
887 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
09/1947 |
12/1890 |
|
|
3258 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/07/1959 |
12/1890 |
|
|
3259 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
16/02/1957 |
12/1890 |
|
|
888 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
23/11/1957 |
12/1890 |
|
|
889 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
883 |
|
25/12/1966 |
1891 |
|
|
1868 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
935 |
|
02/1922 |
1891 |
|
|
1869 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
935 |
|
03/1922 |
1891 |
|
|
1870 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
935 |
|
04/1925 |
1891 |
|
|
1871 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
935 |
|
11/1926 |
1891 |
|
|
1872 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
935 |
|
11/1921 |
1891 |
|
|
3261 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
08/12/1962 |
1891 |
|
|
3263 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
02/06/1962 |
1891 |
|
|
3265 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
29/05/1948 |
1891 |
|
|
3266 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
18/03/1961 |
1891 |
|
|
3267 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
22/04/1961 |
1891 |
|
|
3268 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
17/06/1961 |
1891 |
|
|
3269 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
29/05/1948 |
1891 |
|
|
3271 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1891 |
|
|
3273 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
22/10/1955 |
1891 |
|
|
3274 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
10/01/1959 |
1891 |
|
|
3275 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
14/01/1956 |
1891 |
|
|
3277 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
15/07/1961 |
1891 |
|
|
3278 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1891 |
|
|
3281 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
22/12/1956 |
1891 |
|
|
3282 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
13/10/1962 |
1891 |
|
|
3283 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
29/08/1953 |
1891 |
|
|
3284 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
03/06/1961 |
1891 |
|
|
3286 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
14/09/1957 |
1891 |
|
|
3287 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1891 |
|
|
3290 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
28/12/1957 |
1891 |
|
|
3292 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
03/1959 |
1891 |
|
|
3293 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
05/12/1953 |
1891 |
|
|
3294 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
14/11/1959 |
1891 |
|
|
3295 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
28/10/1961 |
1891 |
|
|
3296 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
13/03/1954 |
1891 |
|
|
3297 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
10/06/1950 |
1891 |
|
|
3298 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
26/11/1955 |
1891 |
|
|
3299 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
14/08/1954 |
1891 |
|
|
3340 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
15/10/1960 |
1891 |
|
|
3341 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1957 |
1891 |
|
|
3342 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
24/08/1963 |
1891 |
|
|
3344 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/05/1960 |
1891 |
|
|
3351 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
10/12/1955 |
1891 |
|
|
3355 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/05/1959 |
1891 |
|
|
3356 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
19/07/1958 |
1891 |
|
|
3357 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/1959 |
1891 |
|
|
3359 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
20/08/1960 |
1891 |
|
|
3361 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
15/10/1960 |
1891 |
|
|
3364 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
26/12/1953 |
1891 |
|
|
3367 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/01/1958 |
1891 |
|
|
3368 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
14/11/1961 |
1891 |
|
|
3369 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/08/1959 |
1891 |
|
|
80 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
12/1928 |
1891 |
|
|
85 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
09/1926 |
1891 |
|
|
86 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
10/1925 |
01/01/1891 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
15/03/1952 |
01/01/1891 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
04/09/1948 |
01/01/1891 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
01/1949 |
01/01/1891 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
05/11/1955 |
06/1891 |
|
|
81 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
03/1949 |
06/1891 |
|
|
82 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
25/09/1954 |
06/1891 |
|
|
83 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
18/02/1961 |
06/1891 |
|
|
84 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
03/03/1951 |
06/1891 |
|
|
87 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
01/1949 |
08/1891 |
|
|
11 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
08/1953 |
08/1891 |
|
|
14 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
920 |
|
17/09/1960 |
09/1891 |
|
|
1982 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
21/04/1956 |
09/1891 |
|
|
1983 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
12/1932 |
09/1891 |
|
|
1984 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
12/1938 |
09/1891 |
|
|
1985 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
07/1931 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1986 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
12/1932 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1987 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
10/1947 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1988 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
04/09/1954 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1989 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
09/1932 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1990 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
15/05/1954 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1991 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
968 |
|
03/1956 |
10/1891 |
|
|
3300 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
13/12/1958 |
10/1891 |
|
|
3301 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
25/10/1958 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1107 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
01/1946 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1108 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
11/1936 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1109 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
26/06/1948 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1110 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
08/1937 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1992 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
08/1947 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1111 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
02/08/1952 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1112 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
12/1930 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1113 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
12/1932 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1114 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
12/1932 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1115 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
991 |
|
02/1951 |
12/1891 |
|
|
3305 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
02/04/1960 |
12/1891 |
|
|
3306 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
11/03/1961 |
12/1891 |
|
|
3307 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
30/07/1960 |
1892 |
|
|
100 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
11/1921 |
1892 |
|
|
122 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
10/1921 |
1892 |
|
|
129 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
11/1921 |
1892 |
|
|
133 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
10/1927 |
1892 |
|
|
145 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
06/1927 |
1892 |
|
|
16 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
08/1927 |
1892 |
|
|
17 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
11/1921 |
1892 |
|
|
20 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
10/1926 |
1892 |
|
|
24 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
01/1922 |
1892 |
|
|
33 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
03/1925 |
1892 |
|
|
3370 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
21/11/1959 |
1892 |
|
|
3371 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
26/08/1961 |
1892 |
|
|
3373 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
21/05/1960 |
1892 |
|
|
3374 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
24/06/1961 |
1892 |
|
|
3378 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1892 |
|
|
3379 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
28/11/1959 |
1892 |
|
|
3381 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
27/06/1959 |
1892 |
|
|
3386 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
22/04/1961 |
1892 |
|
|
3387 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1892 |
|
|
3388 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
12/09/1959 |
1892 |
|
|
3389 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
04/08/1962 |
1892 |
|
|
3392 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
25/01/1958 |
1892 |
|
|
3394 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
09/07/1960 |
1892 |
|
|
3395 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
11/03/1961 |
1892 |
|
|
3396 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
17/08/1957 |
1892 |
|
|
3398 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
05/12/1959 |
1892 |
|
|
3399 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
27/08/1960 |
1892 |
|
|
3410 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
24/03/1962 |
1892 |
|
|
3411 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
27/05/1961 |
1892 |
|
|
3419 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
06/09/1958 |
1892 |
|
|
3427 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
27/06/1961 |
1892 |
|
|
3428 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/12/1962 |
1892 |
|
|
3429 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
23/04/1960 |
1892 |
|
|
35 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
11/1921 |
1892 |
|
|
36 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
11/1921 |
1892 |
|
|
38 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
11/1927 |
1892 |
|
|
39 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
04/1925 |
1892 |
|
|
4 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
04/1927 |
1892 |
|
|
8 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
998 |
|
10/1921 |
1892 |
|
|
94 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
03/1925 |
1892 |
|
|
97 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
04/1926 |
1892 |
|
|
98 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
09/1927 |
1892 |
|
|
99 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1080 |
|
10/1921 |
01/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
06/1951 |
01/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
02/1950 |
01/1892 |
1532 |
|
1833 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2847 |
25/02/1933 |
01/1892 |
1532 |
|
1834 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2848 |
26/12/1931 |
01/1892 |
|
|
3308 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
17/10/1959 |
01/1892 |
|
|
3309 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
01/04/1961 |
01/1892 |
|
|
3310 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
10/12/1955 |
01/1892 |
|
|
3312 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
18/01/1958 |
01/1892 |
|
|
3313 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
14/04/1956 |
01/01/1892 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
12/1953 |
01/01/1892 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
12/1952 |
01/01/1892 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
09/11/1960 |
01/01/1892 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
23/01/1960 |
01/01/1892 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
06/01/1951 |
02/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
07/1952 |
02/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
28/02/1956 |
02/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
11/1959 |
02/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
02/10/1958 |
02/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
02/1953 |
02/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
17/10/1953 |
02/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
10/05/1952 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1322 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
03/12/1955 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1323 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/06/1948 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1324 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
22/05/1937 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1835 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2849 |
07/10/1950 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1836 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2850 |
13/07/1935 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1837 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2851 |
22/02/1936 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1838 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2852 |
02/11/1935 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1839 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2853 |
12/07/1952 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1840 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2854 |
02/12/1950 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1841 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2855 |
29/12/1928 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
1842 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2856 |
24/03/1956 |
02/1892 |
1532 |
|
202 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
30/11/1947 |
28/02/1892 |
|
|
3314 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
02/04/1960 |
28/02/1892 |
|
|
3315 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
22/08/1959 |
28/02/1892 |
|
|
3317 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
15/10/1955 |
28/02/1892 |
|
|
3318 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
22/08/1959 |
28/02/1892 |
|
|
3319 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
09/12/1950 |
03/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
25/11/1950 |
03/1892 |
1532 |
|
1325 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/09/1954 |
03/1892 |
1532 |
|
1326 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
26/12/1931 |
03/1892 |
1532 |
|
1428 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/12/1934 |
03/1892 |
1532 |
|
1429 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
21/05/1949 |
03/1892 |
1532 |
|
1430 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
28/11/1931 |
03/1892 |
1532 |
|
1697 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
01/11/1952 |
03/1892 |
|
|
3321 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
18/02/1961 |
03/1892 |
|
|
3323 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
06/1958 |
03/1892 |
|
|
3324 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
04/04/1959 |
03/1892 |
|
|
3325 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
18/02/1961 |
03/1892 |
|
|
3326 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
30/07/1960 |
03/1892 |
|
|
3327 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
04/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
21/02/1953 |
04/1892 |
1532 |
|
2013 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2857 |
21/02/1948 |
04/1892 |
1532 |
|
2014 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2858 |
06/09/1930 |
04/1892 |
|
|
2183 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3793 |
17/06/1950 |
04/1892 |
|
|
2184 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3794 |
07/1957 |
04/1892 |
|
|
2185 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3795 |
06/1955 |
04/1892 |
|
|
2186 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3796 |
01/1951 |
04/1892 |
|
|
3329 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
04/06/1960 |
04/1892 |
|
|
3330 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
26/08/1961 |
05/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1949 |
05/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
18/10/1952 |
05/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
09/1950 |
05/1892 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
07/1956 |
05/1892 |
1532 |
|
2015 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2859 |
22/05/1937 |
05/1892 |
1532 |
|
2016 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2860 |
18/06/1938 |
05/1892 |
1532 |
|
2017 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2861 |
16/06/1951 |
05/1892 |
1532 |
|
2018 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2862 |
25/02/1950 |
05/1892 |
1532 |
|
2019 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2863 |
31/10/1959 |
05/1892 |
1532 |
|
2020 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2864 |
04/10/1958 |
05/1892 |
1532 |
|
2021 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2865 |
18/04/1936 |
05/1892 |
1532 |
|
2022 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
2866 |
21/02/1953 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2187 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3797 |
06/1958 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2188 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3798 |
25/12/1948 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2189 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3799 |
13/07/1957 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2190 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3800 |
02/1953 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2191 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3801 |
18/02/1961 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2192 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3802 |
09/05/1959 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2194 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3804 |
26/01/1957 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2195 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3805 |
06/1952 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2196 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3806 |
02/05/1959 |
05/1892 |
|
|
2197 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3807 |
16/02/1952 |
05/1892 |
|
|
3331 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
03/12/1955 |
05/1892 |
|
|
3332 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
10/05/1958 |
05/1892 |
|
|
3333 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
21/01/1961 |
05/1892 |
|
|
3334 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
10/03/1956 |
05/1892 |
|
|
3335 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
22/08/1959 |
05/1892 |
|
|
3336 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
23/08/1952 |
06/1892 |
|
|
3337 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
17/02/1960 |
06/1892 |
|
|
3338 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
27/03/1948 |
06/1892 |
|
|
3339 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Kitson |
?? |
|
22/08/1959 |
07/1892 |
|
|
1993 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1357 |
05/1933 |
07/1892 |
|
|
1994 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1358 |
16/06/1956 |
07/1892 |
|
|
2198 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3808 |
05/01/1957 |
07/1892 |
|
|
2199 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3809 |
10/09/1955 |
07/1892 |
|
|
2200 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3810 |
22/11/1958 |
07/1892 |
|
|
2201 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3811 |
28/01/1961 |
07/1892 |
|
|
2202 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3812 |
17/10/1953 |
08/1892 |
|
|
1995 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1359 |
12/1938 |
08/1892 |
|
|
1996 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1360 |
12/1930 |
09/1892 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/11/1953 |
09/1892 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/11/1953 |
09/1892 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/11/1953 |
09/1892 |
|
|
1997 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1361 |
05/01/1952 |
09/1892 |
|
|
1998 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1362 |
04/1937 |
09/1892 |
|
|
1999 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1363 |
09/1939 |
09/1892 |
|
|
2000 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1364 |
12/1939 |
09/1892 |
|
|
2193 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3803 |
10/01/1959 |
10/1892 |
1357 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1955 |
10/1892 |
H |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1955 |
10/1892 |
37 |
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
11/1955 |
10/1892 |
|
|
2001 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1365 |
12/1953 |
10/1892 |
|
|
2002 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1366 |
12/1932 |
10/1892 |
|
|
2003 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1367 |
25/12/1966 |
10/1892 |
|
|
2004 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1368 |
07/1933 |
10/1892 |
|
|
2005 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1369 |
01/1932 |
10/1892 |
|
|
2006 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1370 |
05/1956 |
11/1892 |
|
|
2007 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1371 |
16/06/1956 |
11/1892 |
|
|
2008 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1372 |
11/1932 |
11/1892 |
|
|
2009 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1373 |
06/1933 |
11/1892 |
|
|
2010 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1374 |
29/05/1948 |
11/1892 |
|
|
2011 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1375 |
12/1930 |
12/1892 |
|
|
2012 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1376 |
05/1964 |
1893 |
|
|
1118 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1162 |
|
07/1936 |
1893 |
|
|
1119 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1162 |
|
11/1928 |
1893 |
|
|
149 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
10/1921 |
1893 |
|
|
170 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
06/1926 |
1893 |
|
|
171 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
06/1925 |
1893 |
|
|
172 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
11/1921 |
1893 |
|
|
173 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
04/1925 |
1893 |
|
|
174 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
09/1925 |
1893 |
|
|
175 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
11/1921 |
1893 |
|
|
176 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
03/1925 |
1893 |
|
|
177 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
11/1921 |
1893 |
|
|
178 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1094 |
|
04/1925 |
1893 |
|
|
179 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1124 |
|
01/1926 |
1893 |
|
|
180 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1124 |
|
11/1925 |
1893 |
|
|
181 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1124 |
|
06/1926 |
1893 |
|
|
182 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1124 |
|
04/1926 |
1893 |
|
|
183 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1124 |
|
06/1926 |
1893 |
|
|
2203 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3885 |
04/1927 |
1893 |
|
|
2204 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3886 |
10/1926 |
1893 |
|
|
2206 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3888 |
08/1925 |
1893 |
|
|
2210 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3892 |
09/1927 |
1893 |
|
|
2215 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3897 |
06/1926 |
1893 |
|
|
2216 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3898 |
10/1925 |
1893 |
|
|
2217 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3899 |
10/1926 |
1893 |
|
|
3400 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
10/03/1962 |
1893 |
|
|
3401 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
27/04/1957 |
1893 |
|
|
3402 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
13/04/1957 |
1893 |
|
|
3405 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
18/02/1961 |
1893 |
|
|
3406 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
20/02/1960 |
1893 |
|
|
3408 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
|
08/04/1950 |
1893 |
|
|
3431 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
20/02/1960 |
1893 |
|
|
3433 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/12/1959 |
1893 |
|
|
3435 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
21/04/1962 |
1893 |
|
|
3436 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
30/06/1962 |
1893 |
|
|
3439 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
19/06/1948 |
1893 |
|
|
3440 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/12/1959 |
1893 |
|
|
3441 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
29/11/1958 |
1893 |
|
|
3443 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
14/12/1957 |
1893 |
|
|
3444 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
22/11/1960 |
1893 |
|
|
3446 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
17/04/1962 |
1893 |
|
|
3448 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
16/01/1954 |
1893 |
|
|
3449 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/09/1962 |
1893 |
|
|
3453 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
02/03/1963 |
1893 |
|
|
3454 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
12/02/1955 |
1893 |
|
|
3456 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
23/04/1960 |
1893 |
|
|
3457 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/06/1960 |
1893 |
|
|
3458 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
04/1949 |
1893 |
|
|
3459 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/04/1961 |
01/01/1893 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
17/04/1948 |
01/01/1893 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
10/02/1954 |
01/01/1893 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
30/01/1954 |
01/01/1893 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
15/05/1948 |
02/1893 |
|
|
2205 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3887 |
12/04/1952 |
02/1893 |
|
|
2207 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3889 |
10/1953 |
02/1893 |
|
|
2208 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3890 |
11/1957 |
02/1893 |
|
|
2209 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3891 |
10/11/1956 |
03/1893 |
|
|
2211 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3893 |
25/09/1954 |
03/1893 |
|
|
2212 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3894 |
05/1949 |
03/1893 |
|
|
2213 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3895 |
14/08/1954 |
03/1893 |
|
|
2214 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3896 |
28/01/1961 |
05/1893 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
27/10/1956 |
05/1893 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
28/01/1956 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1116 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1162 |
|
07/1926 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1117 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1162 |
|
05/1925 |
07/1893 |
|
|
1120 |
0-4-0ST |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1162 |
|
15/06/1957 |
08/1893 |
1532 |
|
2218 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4607 |
31/10/1953 |
08/1893 |
1532 |
|
2219 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4608 |
25/01/1930 |
08/1893 |
1532 |
|
2220 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4609 |
17/05/1952 |
09/1893 |
1532 |
|
2221 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4610 |
02/11/1946 |
09/1893 |
1532 |
|
2222 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4611 |
21/02/1953 |
09/1893 |
1532 |
|
2223 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4612 |
05/09/1936 |
09/1893 |
1532 |
|
2224 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4613 |
14/07/1956 |
09/1893 |
1532 |
|
2225 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4614 |
03/11/1945 |
09/1893 |
1532 |
|
2226 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4615 |
03/11/1956 |
09/1893 |
1532 |
|
2227 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
4616 |
05/10/1946 |
1894 |
|
|
162 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
02/1930 |
1894 |
|
|
186 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
06/1926 |
1894 |
|
|
190 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
03/1925 |
1894 |
|
|
192 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
02/1926 |
1894 |
|
|
198 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
06/1926 |
1894 |
|
|
3462 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
07/04/1956 |
1894 |
|
|
3463 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/02/1957 |
1894 |
|
|
3464 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
31/03/1962 |
1894 |
|
|
3468 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
27/05/1961 |
1894 |
|
|
3469 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
09/03/1957 |
01/01/1894 |
|
|
|
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
02/1948 |
02/1894 |
|
|
184 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
28/01/1961 |
02/1894 |
|
|
185 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
11/07/1953 |
03/1894 |
|
|
187 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
17/06/1950 |
03/1894 |
|
|
188 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
03/05/1958 |
04/1894 |
|
|
189 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
12/11/1955 |
04/1894 |
|
|
191 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
16/03/1957 |
05/1894 |
|
|
193 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1235 |
|
28/01/1961 |
06/1894 |
|
|
194 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
22/09/1962 |
06/1894 |
|
|
195 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
10/09/1960 |
06/1894 |
|
|
196 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
07/1954 |
06/1894 |
|
|
197 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
10/1949 |
08/1894 |
|
|
161 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
31/12/1949 |
08/1894 |
|
|
199 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
02/02/1957 |
09/1894 |
|
|
163 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
14/02/1959 |
09/1894 |
|
|
164 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1276 |
|
28/04/1951 |
1895 |
|
|
232 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
11/1931 |
1895 |
|
|
234 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
06/1926 |
1895 |
|
|
236 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
12/1926 |
02/1895 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
05/1949 |
02/1895 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
?? |
|
08/1950 |
02/1895 |
2228 |
|
2234 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3201 |
29/01/1938 |
02/1895 |
2228 |
|
2235 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3202 |
03/11/1934 |
02/1895 |
2228 |
|
2236 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3203 |
02/10/1948 |
02/1895 |
2228 |
|
2237 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3204 |
03/10/1953 |
02/1895 |
2228 |
|
2238 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3205 |
02/11/1935 |
02/1895 |
2228 |
|
2240 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3207 |
09/09/1944 |
02/1895 |
2228 |
|
2241 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3208 |
30/12/1939 |
02/1895 |
2228 |
|
2255 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3200 |
26/12/1931 |
02/1895 |
2228 |
|
2259 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3206 |
31/12/1938 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1121 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
12/1932 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1122 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
24/10/1953 |
03/1895 |
2228 |
|
2228 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3215 |
02/12/1933 |
03/1895 |
2228 |
|
2242 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3209 |
20/04/1946 |
03/1895 |
2228 |
|
2243 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3210 |
21/02/1953 |
03/1895 |
2228 |
|
2244 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3211 |
08/10/1955 |
03/1895 |
2228 |
|
2245 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3212 |
01/12/1934 |
03/1895 |
2228 |
|
2246 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3213 |
03/10/1931 |
03/1895 |
2228 |
|
2247 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3214 |
09/10/1937 |
04/1895 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
14/02/1953 |
04/1895 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
21/09/1955 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1123 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
12/03/1960 |
04/1895 |
2228 |
|
2229 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3216 |
28/01/1956 |
04/1895 |
2228 |
|
2230 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3217 |
28/11/1931 |
04/1895 |
2228 |
|
2231 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3218 |
26/12/1931 |
04/1895 |
|
|
2248 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4062 |
04/05/1960 |
04/1895 |
|
|
2249 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4063 |
06/1951 |
04/1895 |
|
|
2250 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4064 |
08/05/1959 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1124 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
10/1932 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1125 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
12/1938 |
05/1895 |
2228 |
|
2232 |
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3219 |
24/01/1948 |
05/1895 |
|
|
2251 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4065 |
07/1931 |
05/1895 |
|
|
2252 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4066 |
10/12/1955 |
06/1895 |
|
|
1126 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
01/1947 |
06/1895 |
|
|
1127 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
01/1939 |
07/1895 |
|
|
1129 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
16/10/1954 |
07/1895 |
|
|
1130 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
07/04/1951 |
08/1895 |
|
|
1128 |
0-6-0T |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1395 |
|
14/04/1951 |
08/1895 |
|
|
230 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
07/1956 |
09/1895 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
02/10/1948 |
09/1895 |
|
|
|
0-4-4T |
S. Johnson |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
|
19/09/1953 |
09/1895 |
|
|
231 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
01/03/1958 |
10/1895 |
|
|
233 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
03/1949 |
11/1895 |
|
|
235 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
05/1950 |
11/1895 |
|
|
237 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
12/05/1951 |
12/1895 |
|
|
238 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
05/01/1952 |
12/1895 |
|
|
239 |
4-4-0 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1410 |
|
10/09/1955 |
1896 |
|
|
3474 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
18/03/1961 |
1896 |
|
|
3476 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
18/05/1957 |
1896 |
|
|
3482 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
01/04/1961 |
1896 |
|
|
3484 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
30/07/1960 |
1896 |
|
|
3490 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1896 |
|
|
3491 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
01/02/1958 |
1896 |
|
|
3494 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
26/11/1955 |
1896 |
|
|
3496 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
04/08/1962 |
1896 |
|
|
3497 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
03/12/1955 |
1896 |
|
|
3499 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
04/08/1962 |
1896 |
|
|
3502 |
0-6-0 |
S. Johnson |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
|
19/12/1959 |
1896 |
|
|
75 |
4-2-2 |
S. Johnson |
Derby Works |
1454 |
|
|