BR
Database
Complete BR Locomotive Database 1948-1997
Home
Guestbook
Contact
Links
Preferences
Menu
Locomotives
Build Dates
Withdrawals
Names
Snapshots
Regional
Locomotives
Workings
ReClassifications
Pilot Scheme
Prototypes
Preservation
Diesels
Electrics
Steam
Classes
Steam
Standards
GWR
1850-1947
Barry
Brecon & Merthyr Junction
Burry Port & Gwendraeth Valley
Cambrian
Cardiff
Midland & South Western Junction
Powlesland & Mason
Port Talbot
Rhymney
Swansea Harbour Trust
Taff Vale
Vale of Rheidol
SR
1923-1947
London South Western
London, Brighton & South Coast
South Eastern & Chatham
LNER
LNER Designs 1923-1947
Great Central
Great Eastern
Great Northern
Great North of Scotland
Hull and Barnsley
Midland and Great Northern
North British
North Eastern
LMS
LMS Designs 1923-1947
Caledonian
Furness
Glasgow & South Western
Highland
London & North Western
London, Tilbury & Southend
Lancashire & Yorkshire
Maryport & Carlisle
Midland
North Staffordshire
Somerset & Dorset
ex WD
by Wheels
2 Driver Tank Engines
2-2-4T
2 Driver Tender Engines
2-2-2
4 Coupled Tank Engines
0-4-0T
0-4-0ST
0-4-2T
0-4-2ST
0-4-4T
2-4-0T
2-4-0WT
2-4-2T
4-4-0T
4-4-2T
4-4-4T
4 Coupled Tender Engines
0-4-0
0-4-2
0-4-4
2-4-0
2-4-2
4-4-0
4-4-2
4-4-4
6 Coupled Tank Engines
0-6-0T
0-6-0PT
0-6-0ST
0-6-2T
0-6-2ST
0-6-4T
2-6-0T
2-6-2T
2-6-4T
4-6-0T
4-6-2T
4-6-4T
6 Coupled Tender Engines
0-6-0
0-6-2
0-6-4
2-6-0
2-6-2
2-6-4
4-6-0
4-6-2
4-6-4
8 Coupled Tank Engines
0-8-0T
0-8-2T
0-8-4T
2-8-0T
2-8-2T
8 Coupled Tender Engines
0-8-0
0-8-2
0-8-4
2-8-0
2-8-2
10 Coupled Tank Engines
0-10-0T
10 Coupled Tender Engines
0-10-0
2-10-0
Special
0-6-6-0T
2-6-6-2T
2-8-8-2T
Diesel
Shunters
Type 1
Type 2
Type 3
Type 4
Type 5
Electric
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Multiple Units
Steam Railmotors
GWR Railmotors
LNER Railmotors
LMS Railmotors
Diesel Multiple Units
GWR Railcars
LNER Railcars
1st Generation DMU's
2nd Generation DMU's
DEMU's
Pullman
HST
Electric Multiple Units
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Sites
Depots
Builders
Locomotive Works
Scrapyards
People
Chief Mechanical Engineers
Management
Miscellaneous
Companies
British Railways
GWR & Constituents
Taff Vale
Rhymney
Cambrian
Barry
Cardiff Railway
SR & Constituents
LSWR
LBSCR
SECR
LNER & Constituents
GER
GCR
GNR
MGNR
NER
NBR
GNSR
ex LMS
MR
LNWR
LYR
LTSR
S&DJR
G&SWR
CR
HR
Timelines
Line Closures
Workings
Events
News Stories
Miscellaneous
Reports
Graphs
Anecdotes
Headcodes
Royal Trains
Accidents
Wheel Arrangements
Modernisation Plan 1955
The Beeching Plan
Generate an ABC!
Background Images
On This Day ...
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.
?
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 1922 Today
» 2521 Yesterday
» 16274 Week
» 63107 Month
» 365128 Year
» 2765592 Total
Record: 6840 (19/09/2023)
(
Free MySQL Counter
)
Locomotives of the Taff Vale Railway
Build Date
TVR Class
GWR Class
First TVR Number
Wheels
Designer
Manufacturer
Order Number
Works Number
Withdrawn
12/1884
H
141
0-6-0T
T. Hurry Riches
Kitson
??
25/02/1952
12/1884
H
142
0-6-0T
T. Hurry Riches
Kitson
??
10/11/1953
12/1884
H
143
0-6-0T
T. Hurry Riches
Kitson
??
26/11/1951
01/1904
O3
410
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Kitson
??
06/03/1948
02/1904
O3
411
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Kitson
??
16/02/1948
04/1907
O4
38
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Manning, Wardle & Co.
??
1698
24/08/1953
04/1907
O4
43
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Manning, Wardle & Co.
??
1699
07/12/1949
06/1907
O4
59
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Manning, Wardle & Co.
??
1700
27/07/1951
07/1907
O4
67
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Manning, Wardle & Co.
??
1701
17/07/1950
07/1907
O4
68
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Manning, Wardle & Co.
??
1702
23/06/1951
08/1907
O4
69
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Manning, Wardle & Co.
??
1703
08/04/1951
09/1907
O4
94
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Manning, Wardle & Co.
??
1704
19/09/1949
06/1908
O4
102
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5100
06/12/1948
06/1908
O4
105
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5132
12/01/1953
06/1908
O4
39
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5095
02/10/1950
07/1908
O4
101
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5099
10/07/1948
07/1908
O4
104
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5101
10/04/1948
07/1908
O4
48
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5129
15/08/1949
07/1908
O4
56
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5130
16/01/1950
07/1908
O4
58
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5131
10/04/1952
07/1908
O4
6
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5127
09/05/1949
07/1908
O4
9
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5128
14/06/1954
07/1908
O4
95
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5096
12/12/1949
07/1908
O4
97
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5097
10/07/1948
07/1908
O4
98
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5098
18/06/1951
08/1908
O4
111
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5133
08/12/1949
07/1910
O4
1
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2529
28/05/1951
07/1910
O4
2
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2530
31/05/1954
08/1910
O4
17
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2532
14/03/1949
08/1910
O4
35
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2533
03/11/1952
08/1910
O4
36
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2534
04/06/1951
08/1910
O4
8
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2531
25/08/1950
09/1910
O4
108
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2536
07/01/1952
09/1910
O4
109
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2537
26/07/1955
09/1910
O4
110
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2538
12/07/1954
09/1910
O4
46
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Vulcan Foundry
??
2535
10/03/1950
10/1910
O4
112
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5386
18/11/1952
10/1910
O4
113
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5387
22/07/1955
10/1910
O4
114
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5388
27/08/1952
10/1910
O4
115
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5389
04/03/1955
10/1910
O4
116
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5390
03/05/1955
10/1910
O4
118
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5391
23/07/1955
10/1910
O4
119
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5392
24/01/1955
10/1910
O4
121
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5393
08/09/1952
10/1910
O4
13
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5384
04/12/1952
10/1910
O4
49
0-6-2T
T. Hurry Riches
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5385
26/07/1955
10/1914
A
3
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
16/02/1953
11/1914
A
7
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
18/03/1954
12/1914
A
10
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
09/02/1953
12/1914
A
11
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
05/10/1955
12/1914
A
12
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
18/11/1952
01/1915
A
120
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
30/10/1954
08/1915
A
122
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
North British
??
14/03/1955
08/1915
A
123
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
North British
??
03/01/1955
08/1915
A
124
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
North British
??
02/01/1956
08/1915
A
42
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
North British
??
11/06/1956
08/1915
A
45
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
North British
??
05/10/1955
08/1915
A
52
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
North British
??
23/07/1956
07/1916
A
125
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
10/02/1955
07/1916
A
127
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
29/01/1957
07/1916
A
128
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
28/05/1956
07/1916
A
129
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
04/03/1957
07/1916
A
130
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
17/10/1955
08/1916
A
132
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
10/10/1955
02/1919
A
133
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
23/03/1956
02/1919
A
135
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
13/08/1957
03/1919
A
136
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
18/01/1955
03/1919
A
138
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
23/02/1955
04/1919
A
139
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
26/08/1957
04/1919
A
140
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
19/09/1955
05/1919
A
154
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
14/05/1956
05/1919
A
156
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
17/12/1956
05/1919
A
157
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
27/02/1956
07/1919
A
158
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
22/10/1956
07/1919
A
159
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
26/08/1957
07/1919
A
160
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Nasmyth Wilson
??
26/04/1956
05/1920
A
134
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
24/10/1956
05/1920
A
144
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
22/11/1954
05/1920
A
149
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
14/01/1957
05/1920
A
162
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
12/08/1957
05/1920
A
20
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
22/09/1955
06/1920
A
164
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
13/02/1956
06/1920
A
165
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
01/04/1957
06/1920
A
400
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
27/04/1956
07/1920
A
401
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
05/11/1956
08/1920
A
402
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
01/10/1956
09/1920
A
403
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
20/01/1956
09/1920
A
404
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
26/08/1957
10/1920
A
405
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
03/09/1956
11/1920
A
406
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
13/05/1957
12/1920
A
407
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
09/07/1956
12/1920
A
408
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
01/04/1957
01/1921
A
409
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
13/08/1957
01/1921
A
410
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
03/09/1956
02/1921
A
411
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
05/05/1956
02/1921
A
412
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
12/08/1957
03/1921
A
413
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Hawthorn Leslie
??
01/04/1957
12/1921
A
414
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
16/04/1956
12/1921
A
415
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
13/03/1956
12/1921
A
416
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
19/12/1955
12/1921
A
75
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
04/12/1956
12/1921
A
80
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
05/05/1956
12/1921
A
90
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
04/03/1957
12/1921
A
91
0-6-2T
J. Cameron
Vulcan Foundry
??
09/07/1956