Depot: Tondu
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 1886 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 3411 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6651 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6651 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1938 | 3411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1945 | 1886 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4643 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 04/06/1946 | 9649 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 7752 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2735 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2761 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2767 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2769 | Snapshot | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3100 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3103 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3612 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3627 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3640 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3668 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3674 | Snapshot | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3695 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3699 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3772 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4214 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4218 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4241 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4251 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4273 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4408 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4557 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4634 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4643 | Snapshot | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4643 | Snapshot | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4669 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5202 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5252 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5556 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5633 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5797 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6642 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6685 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7725 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7746 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7752 | Snapshot | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7752 | Snapshot | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7770 | Snapshot | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7775 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7778 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8712 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8721 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8748 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9649 | Snapshot | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9649 | Snapshot | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 27/08/1947 | 2735 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 4217 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 4214 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3616 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 7775 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 1870 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 7214 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1949 | 2767 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1949 | 2769 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 3652 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 4236 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 7214 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 4276 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 6649 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1950 | 2761 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4260 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4217 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 6621 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 3612 | Transfer out to: | 86D | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 6685 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8740 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6679 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6642 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 6679 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 6679 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1950 | 1870 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4662 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4662 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4662 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4215 | Transfer in from: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 4215 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 4215 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5633 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 5236 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 7778 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 5202 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6621 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6675 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 7778 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 3690 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 3690 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3640 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1952 | 4404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4406 | Transfer in from: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 4222 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 4222 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 4222 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5624 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6638 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3652 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5707 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3652 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5707 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4217 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3695 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4215 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1953 | 4408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 8497 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 8498 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 8499 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 3699 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 5797 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 6638 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5789 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 4643 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 7753 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5524 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5545 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5555 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5560 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5574 | Transfer in from: | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4557 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5556 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5789 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6649 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8499 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5208 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5236 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 4260 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/05/1954 | 9492 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1954 | 8446 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9492 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 3652 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 4662 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6676 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 4406 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 7732 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6679 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 5624 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5555 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4224 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4263 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 5555 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4634 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 8446 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1955 | 13188 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/11/1955 | 13189 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/11/1955 | 13190 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 3674 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 5574 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6672 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6673 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 4581 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 6672 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5545 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 9609 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3772 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 4217 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4269 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5171 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4276 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1957 | 3100 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5545 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4273 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 4144 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5560 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5629 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1958 | 4581 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4589 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5574 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1958 | 5171 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4121 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5179 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 4589 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5179 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5524 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1958 | 5574 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 02/1959 | 4224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 4243 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1959 | 5707 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 4274 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 5534 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 5706 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1959 | 7770 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 8710 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6676 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 5529 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 8453 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 4241 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1959 | 7746 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5529 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1959 | 7752 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 3781 | Transfer in from: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 8498 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1959 | 7778 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1960 | 3103 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 9738 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 3627 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 5534 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 5706 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5690 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8497 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 5529 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 08/1960 | 5529 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1960 | 7725 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 5560 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 3738 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4108 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5545 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5555 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5560 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1961 | 8740 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 3756 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1961 | 8721 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 9711 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 3648 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6438 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6438 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1962 | 9738 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 6601 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 4236 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6431 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 4228 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 6673 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1962 | 7753 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 4273 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 3781 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 5252 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 9711 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 06/1962 | 4274 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6436 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 3668 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4247 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 9466 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 6435 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 6436 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 8748 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4262 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 05/10/1962 | 4218 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 05/10/1962 | 8453 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 9678 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 22/10/1962 | 7732 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4213 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 05/11/1962 | 6601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 19/11/1962 | 4269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 4652 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 5243 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 4144 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 5629 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6430 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9780 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 8712 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1963 | 3756 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1963 | 8710 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 4684 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 9648 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6430 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 4283 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 5203 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 6657 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 06/1963 | 4251 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 4214 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5692 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 6434 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 4108 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 4684 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 9466 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 08/1963 | 5690 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4243 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 06/10/1963 | 6434 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 3616 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9649 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 4233 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 4243 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6435 | Transfer out to: | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9678 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 3648 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 12/1963 | 4228 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 12/1963 | 5203 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 4295 | Transfer in from: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 01/1964 | 4213 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9780 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 02/1964 | 4263 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 5226 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 04/1964 | 4247 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 04/1964 | 4262 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1964 | 4652 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 05/1964 | 4214 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 05/1964 | 4243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 3738 | Transfer out to: | 88G | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4121 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4222 | Transfer out to: | 88G | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4233 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4273 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4283 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4295 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4669 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4675 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 5208 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 5226 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 5243 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 5692 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6657 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 9609 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 9648 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3188 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3189 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3190 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |