GCR/LNER Robinson "B7" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
25/05/1921 | Reallocation | 72 | GOR | Gorton | |||
25/06/1921 | Reallocation | 73 | GOR | Gorton | |||
30/07/1921 | Reallocation | 78 | GOR | Gorton | |||
14/10/1921 | Reallocation | 38 | NEA | Neasden | |||
04/11/1921 | Reallocation | 36 | NEA | Neasden | |||
04/11/1921 | Reallocation | 37 | NEA | Neasden | |||
18/11/1921 | Reallocation | 458 | NEA | Neasden | |||
25/11/1921 | Reallocation | 459 | NEA | Neasden | |||
02/12/1921 | Reallocation | 460 | NEA | Neasden | |||
09/12/1921 | Reallocation | 461 | NEA | Neasden | |||
09/12/1921 | Reallocation | 462 | NEA | Neasden | |||
09/12/1921 | Reallocation | 463 | NEA | Neasden | |||
09/12/1921 | Reallocation | 464 | NEA | Neasden | |||
03/02/1922 | Reallocation | 36 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
03/02/1922 | Reallocation | 37 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
03/02/1922 | Reallocation | 38 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
24/02/1922 | Reallocation | 465 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
24/02/1922 | Reallocation | 466 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
03/05/1922 | Reallocation | 470 | GOR | Gorton | |||
19/05/1922 | Reallocation | 462 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/06/1922 | Reallocation | 471 | GOR | Gorton | |||
24/06/1922 | Reallocation | 472 | GOR | Gorton | |||
14/07/1922 | Reallocation | 467 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
14/07/1922 | Reallocation | 468 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
14/07/1922 | Reallocation | 469 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
28/07/1922 | Reallocation | 38 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
29/07/1922 | Reallocation | 473 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/08/1922 | Reallocation | 33 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
25/08/1922 | Reallocation | 34 | GOR | Gorton | |||
26/08/1922 | Reallocation | 474 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/09/1922 | Reallocation | 35 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/09/1922 | Reallocation | 31 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
29/09/1922 | Reallocation | 32 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |||
12/01/1923 | Reallocation | 36 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
12/01/1923 | Reallocation | 463 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
12/01/1923 | Reallocation | 464 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
26/01/1923 | Reallocation | 37 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
28/01/1923 | Reallocation | 38 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
10/03/1923 | Reallocation | 31 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | GOR | Gorton | |
11/08/1923 | To Service | 475 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
25/08/1923 | To Service | 476 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
22/09/1923 | To Service | 477 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
20/10/1923 | To Service | 478 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
03/11/1923 | To Service | 479 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
24/11/1923 | To Service | 480 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
08/12/1923 | To Service | 5481 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
22/12/1923 | To Service | 5482 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
02/02/1924 | To Service | 5483 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
01/03/1924 | To Service | 5484 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
19/04/1924 | Reallocation | 34 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 5470 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 471 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
03/05/1924 | Reallocation | 5482 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
05/05/1924 | Reallocation | 5472 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
05/05/1924 | Reallocation | 34 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
10/05/1924 | Reallocation | 5469 | WFD | Woodford Halse | IMM | Immingham | |
24/05/1924 | Reallocation | 5036 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
24/05/1924 | Reallocation | 5465 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
30/05/1924 | Reallocation | 5484 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
05/06/1924 | Reallocation | 5465 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
05/06/1924 | Reallocation | 5470 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
28/06/1924 | Reallocation | 477 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
13/07/1924 | Reallocation | 471 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
19/07/1924 | Reallocation | 37 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
19/07/1924 | Reallocation | 5463 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
19/07/1924 | Reallocation | 32 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
19/07/1924 | Reallocation | 33 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
22/09/1924 | Reallocation | 5473 | GOR | Gorton | YK | York (North) | |
15/11/1924 | Reallocation | 5463 | ANN | Annesley | NEA | Neasden | |
15/11/1924 | Reallocation | 32 | ANN | Annesley | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |
17/11/1924 | Reallocation | 5463 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/11/1924 | Reallocation | 458 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
22/11/1924 | Reallocation | 37 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
26/12/1924 | Reallocation | 5472 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
24/02/1925 | Reallocation | 32 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | GOR | Gorton | |
28/02/1925 | Reallocation | 5473 | YK | York (North) | GOR | Gorton | |
08/06/1925 | Reallocation | 5032 | GOR | Gorton | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |
08/06/1925 | Reallocation | 33 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
08/06/1925 | Reallocation | 5034 | GOR | Gorton | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | |
10/06/1925 | Reallocation | 5036 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
10/06/1925 | Reallocation | 5035 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
03/09/1925 | Reallocation | 5458 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
09/09/1925 | Reallocation | 5466 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | NEA | Neasden | |
28/10/1925 | Reallocation | 5037 | WFD | Woodford Halse | CLK | Colwick | |
19/11/1925 | Reallocation | 477 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
30/11/1925 | Reallocation | 5034 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | CLK | Colwick | |
01/12/1925 | Reallocation | 476 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
10/12/1925 | Reallocation | 475 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
17/12/1925 | Reallocation | 5482 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
16/01/1926 | Reallocation | 5458 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
09/02/1926 | Reallocation | 5458 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
10/02/1926 | Reallocation | 5465 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
20/02/1926 | Reallocation | 5459 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
04/03/1926 | Reallocation | 5036 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
27/03/1926 | Reallocation | 5034 | CLK | Colwick | GOR | Gorton | |
01/04/1926 | Reallocation | 5036 | CLK | Colwick | GOR | Gorton | |
01/04/1926 | Reallocation | 5458 | CLK | Colwick | GOR | Gorton | |
07/04/1926 | Reallocation | 5037 | CLK | Colwick | GOR | Gorton | |
17/04/1926 | Reallocation | 5035 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
05/06/1926 | Reallocation | 5462 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
05/06/1926 | Reallocation | 5484 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
30/06/1926 | Reallocation | 5467 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
14/09/1926 | Reallocation | 5467 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
25/01/1927 | Reallocation | 5462 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
27/01/1927 | Reallocation | 5473 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
16/06/1927 | Reallocation | 5474 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
26/06/1927 | Reallocation | 5072 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
27/06/1927 | Reallocation | 5477 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
07/10/1927 | Reallocation | 5032 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | NEA | Neasden | |
22/10/1927 | Reallocation | 5032 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
28/10/1927 | Reallocation | 5481 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
14/01/1928 | Reallocation | 5467 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
14/01/1928 | Reallocation | 5481 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
16/02/1928 | Reallocation | 5033 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
17/02/1928 | Reallocation | 5032 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
23/08/1928 | Reallocation | 5462 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
14/09/1928 | Reallocation | 5462 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
14/02/1929 | Reallocation | 5035 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
05/03/1929 | Reallocation | 5466 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
14/03/1929 | Reallocation | 5462 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
23/03/1929 | Reallocation | 5035 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
30/03/1929 | Reallocation | 5466 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
06/05/1929 | Reallocation | 5033 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
08/05/1929 | Reallocation | 5483 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
09/05/1929 | Reallocation | 5072 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
29/06/1929 | Reallocation | 5032 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
29/06/1929 | Reallocation | 5033 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
15/07/1929 | Reallocation | 5484 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
16/07/1929 | Reallocation | 5467 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
18/07/1929 | Reallocation | 5459 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
18/07/1929 | Reallocation | 5469 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
19/07/1929 | Reallocation | 5478 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
17/12/1929 | Reallocation | 5481 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
15/03/1930 | Reallocation | 5481 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
30/06/1930 | Reallocation | 5480 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/06/1930 | Reallocation | 5484 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
23/06/1931 | Reallocation | 5073 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
09/08/1931 | Reallocation | 5073 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
10/02/1932 | Reallocation | 5471 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
27/08/1932 | Reallocation | 5078 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
20/10/1932 | Reallocation | 5078 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
21/07/1933 | Reallocation | 5472 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
03/02/1934 | Reallocation | 5032 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
25/03/1934 | Reallocation | 5475 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
02/05/1934 | Reallocation | 5461 | NEA | Neasden | DON | Doncaster | |
03/05/1934 | Reallocation | 5469 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
08/09/1934 | Reallocation | 5475 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
12/09/1934 | Reallocation | 5461 | DON | Doncaster | NEA | Neasden | |
26/09/1934 | Reallocation | 5469 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
01/01/1935 | Reallocation | 5471 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/09/1935 | Reallocation | 5479 | GOR | Gorton | LIN | Lincoln | |
08/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5460 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
09/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5468 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
09/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5475 | GOR | Gorton | LIN | Lincoln | |
10/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5461 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
11/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5462 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
11/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5465 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5482 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
31/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5469 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
05/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5475 | LIN | Lincoln | GOR | Gorton | |
01/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5476 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
05/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5477 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
07/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5479 | LIN | Lincoln | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
20/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5078 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/01/1937 | Reallocation | 5484 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
22/01/1937 | Reallocation | 5073 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
04/03/1937 | Reallocation | 5470 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
05/03/1937 | Reallocation | 5072 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
16/03/1937 | Reallocation | 5034 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
13/12/1937 | Reallocation | 5034 | CLK | Colwick | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
05/01/1938 | Reallocation | 5470 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
08/01/1938 | Reallocation | 5471 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
09/02/1938 | Reallocation | 5031 | GOR | Gorton | LIV | Brunswick | |
07/03/1938 | Reallocation | 5481 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
14/04/1938 | Reallocation | 5462 | NEA | Neasden | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
29/06/1938 | Reallocation | 5476 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
17/03/1939 | Reallocation | 5034 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | IMM | Immingham | |
05/12/1939 | Reallocation | 5036 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
24/12/1939 | Reallocation | 5036 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
04/03/1940 | Reallocation | 5473 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
11/08/1940 | Reallocation | 5037 | GOR | Gorton | LIV | Brunswick | |
11/08/1940 | Reallocation | 5031 | LIV | Brunswick | GOR | Gorton | |
30/08/1940 | Reallocation | 5035 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
30/08/1940 | Reallocation | 5475 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
20/09/1940 | Reallocation | 5037 | LIV | Brunswick | GOR | Gorton | |
20/09/1940 | Reallocation | 5031 | GOR | Gorton | LIV | Brunswick | |
09/02/1941 | Reallocation | 5466 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
09/02/1941 | Reallocation | 5468 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
11/02/1941 | Reallocation | 5483 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | MEX | Mexborough | |
27/09/1941 | Reallocation | 5459 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
27/09/1941 | Reallocation | 5474 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
05/07/1942 | Reallocation | 5473 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
05/07/1942 | Reallocation | 5035 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
05/07/1942 | Reallocation | 5477 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
09/08/1942 | Reallocation | 5477 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
01/11/1942 | Reallocation | 5473 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
01/11/1942 | Reallocation | 5035 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
02/11/1942 | Reallocation | 5458 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/11/1942 | Reallocation | 5479 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 5462 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 5471 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 5033 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 5480 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 5481 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5037 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5462 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ANN | Annesley | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5467 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5471 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ANN | Annesley | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5031 | LIV | Brunswick | ANN | Annesley | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5033 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ANN | Annesley | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5034 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5035 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5477 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5478 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5480 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ANN | Annesley | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5481 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ANN | Annesley | |
03/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5483 | MEX | Mexborough | ANN | Annesley | |
07/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5479 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
19/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5476 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
24/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5458 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
24/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5467 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
24/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5034 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
24/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5035 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
24/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5477 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
24/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5478 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
29/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5473 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/06/1943 | Reallocation | 5458 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/06/1943 | Reallocation | 5467 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/06/1943 | Reallocation | 5034 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/06/1943 | Reallocation | 5035 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/06/1943 | Reallocation | 5477 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/06/1943 | Reallocation | 5478 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
05/07/1943 | Reallocation | 5458 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
05/07/1943 | Reallocation | 5467 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
05/07/1943 | Reallocation | 5034 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
05/07/1943 | Reallocation | 5035 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
05/07/1943 | Reallocation | 5477 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
05/07/1943 | Reallocation | 5478 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
05/09/1943 | Reallocation | 5460 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
05/09/1943 | Reallocation | 5464 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
07/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5479 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
10/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5461 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
24/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5073 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
24/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5462 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
24/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5034 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
24/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5475 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
24/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5477 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
24/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5480 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
24/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5483 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5072 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5078 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5036 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5037 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5038 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5458 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5459 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5460 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5463 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5464 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5465 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5466 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5467 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5468 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5469 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5472 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5473 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5474 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5031 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5032 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5033 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5035 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5476 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5478 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5481 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
30/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5482 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
06/11/1943 | Reallocation | 5470 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
13/11/1943 | Reallocation | 5471 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
27/11/1943 | Reallocation | 5484 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 5036 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 5037 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 5038 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 5031 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 5032 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 5033 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 5034 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 5035 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
01/07/1945 | Reallocation | 5073 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
01/07/1945 | Reallocation | 5078 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/09/1946 | Reallocation | 5469 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/09/1946 | Reallocation | 5470 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/09/1946 | Reallocation | 1379 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/09/1946 | Reallocation | 5472 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/10/1946 | Reallocation | 5072 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/10/1946 | Reallocation | 5461 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/10/1946 | Reallocation | 1372 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/10/1946 | Reallocation | 5484 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
19/01/1947 | Reallocation | 1395 | GOR | Gorton | WAL | Walton on the Hill | |
09/02/1947 | Reallocation | 1395 | WAL | Walton on the Hill | GOR | Gorton | |
16/04/1947 | Reallocation | 1364 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | GOR | Gorton | |
16/04/1947 | Reallocation | 1369 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | GOR | Gorton | |
16/04/1947 | Reallocation | 1380 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | GOR | Gorton | |
16/04/1947 | Reallocation | 1385 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | GOR | Gorton | |
22/04/1948 | Condemned | 61394 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
14/05/1948 | Condemned | 61383 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
04/06/1948 | Condemned | 61397 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
12/06/1948 | Condemned | 61363 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
12/06/1948 | Condemned | 61364 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
03/08/1948 | Condemned | 61380 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
03/08/1948 | Condemned | 61393 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
19/08/1948 | Condemned | 61373 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
19/08/1948 | Condemned | 61378 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
19/08/1948 | Condemned | 61384 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
21/08/1948 | Condemned | 61369 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
10/09/1948 | Condemned | 61360 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
10/09/1948 | Condemned | 61372 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
18/09/1948 | Condemned | 61374 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
06/10/1948 | Condemned | 61368 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
02/11/1948 | Condemned | 61390 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
19/11/1948 | Condemned | 1370 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
30/11/1948 | Condemned | 61395 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
31/12/1948 | Condemned | 61366 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
31/12/1948 | Condemned | 61376 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
12/01/1949 | Condemned | 61385 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
22/01/1949 | Condemned | 61371 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
04/02/1949 | Condemned | 61389 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
12/02/1949 | Condemned | 61379 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
04/03/1949 | Condemned | 61361 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
20/04/1949 | Condemned | 61362 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
12/06/1949 | Reallocation | 61710 | GOR | Gorton | GOR | To London Midland Region | |
13/06/1949 | Condemned | 61702 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
13/06/1949 | Condemned | 61704 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
13/06/1949 | Condemned | 61707 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
13/06/1949 | Condemned | 61386 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
13/06/1949 | Condemned | 61708 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
13/06/1949 | Condemned | 61712 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
24/06/1949 | Reallocation | 61710 | GOR | Gorton | GOR | Gorton | |
05/09/1949 | Condemned | 61703 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
05/09/1949 | Condemned | 61713 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
26/12/1949 | Condemned | 61706 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
09/01/1950 | Condemned | 61709 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
13/02/1950 | Condemned | 61705 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
20/02/1950 | Condemned | 61710 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
03/07/1950 | Condemned | 61711 | GOR | Gorton | COND |